Chinn v. Belfer et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-00131-ST

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wai Chinn, Plaintiff

Represented by Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by The Banks Law Office, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S. Banks, Jr. +1 503 222 7475 +1 503 467 7689 bob@bankslawoffice.com
v.
No Logo Andrew S. Fastow, Defendant
Arthur Andersen LLP Arthur Andersen LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindsay Hart Neil & Weigler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay W. Beattie +1 503 226 7677 +1 503 226 7697 jbeattie@lindsayhart.com
Space Carl R. Neil +1 503 226 7677 +1 503 226 7697 cneil@lindsayhart.com
No Logo Bruce Willison, Defendant
No Logo Charles A. LeMaistre, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Charls Walker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Chewco Investments LP, Defendant
No Logo Frank Savage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Herbert S. Winokur, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Jeffrey K. Skilling, Defendant
No Logo Jerome J. Meyer, Defendant
No Logo Joe E. Foy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo John A. Urquhart, Defendant
No Logo John H. Duncan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo John Mendelsohn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo John Wakeham, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Joint Energy Development Investments Limited Partnership, Defendant
No Logo Ken L. Harrison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Joseph Pedersen +1 503 294 9408 +1 503 220 2480 ajpedersen@stoel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tonkon Torp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary W L Wright +1 503 802 2041 +1 503 802 3741 zach.wright@tonkon.com
Space William F. Martson, Jr. +1 503 802 2005 +1 503 972 3705 rick.martson@tonkon.com
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ken L. Lay"
No Logo Ljm Cayman L.p., Defendant
No Logo LJM2 Cayman Co-Investment LP, Defendant
No Logo Norman P. Blake, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche, Defendant
No Logo Richard Causey, Defendant
No Logo Robert A. Belfer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Robert Jaedicke, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Ronnie C. Chan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Wendy L. Gramm, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
Office Portland
Filed 2/1/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to State Court
County Multnomah
Terminated 9/24/2002
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 0110-51234[Multnomah County Circuit Court]
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Order
Order Vacating Conditional Transfer Order & 9/26/02 Hearing (RE: MDL 1446);Signed by Wm. Terrell Hodges, Chariman of MDL Panel (Kirk, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
    Judgment:Based upon the record, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED this case is remanded to Multnomah County Circuit Court. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed 9/23/2002 by Judge Robert E. Jones. (da, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Order on Findings and RecommendationCourt Filing
      ORDER:Order Adopting Judge Stewart's Findings and Recommendation dated 6/19/2002,: (Related Doc #[48]),Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Related Doc #[6]), Order Denying Defendant Andersen's cross-motion to stay, #[22], and this case is remanded to Multnomah County Circuit Court. Signed on 9/23/2002 by Judge Robert E. Jones. (da, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Attorney Substitution
        Notice of Substitution of Attorney Robert C. Williams in place of the Stoel Rives firm for Enron Corporation. (Kirk, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 57 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Motion HearingCourt Filing
          CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order reassigning the Findings and Recommendations dated June 20,2002 and objections to Judge Robert Jones for review. (Related documents(s) [48]) Ordered by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. (md, )
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 ReplyCourt Filing
            Reply Memo in Support of Defendants Joint Objections to Magistrate Judge Stewarts 6/19/02 F&R (by Arthur Andersen & Outside Directors). Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Related document(s)[55]) (Kirk, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Response to Objections To Magistrate Judges OrderCourt Filing
              Response to Objections to Magistrate Judges Order Response to Defendants Joint Objections to Judge Stewart's 6/19/02 Findings & Recommendations. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[50]) (Kirk, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 54 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Findings & Recommendation ReferredCourt Filing
                Record of ORDER by Judge Stewart:Referring Judge Stewart's Findings and Recommendation filed 6/20/2002, doc. #48, to the Honorable Judge Ancer L. Haggerty for consideration. Objections have been filed. (Related documents(s) [6], [14], [48]). (da, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 NoticeCourt Filing
                  Corrected Table of contents & Table of Authorities for Defendants Joint Objections to Magistrate Judge Stewart's June 19, 2002 Findings & Recommendation. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Related document(s)[50]) (Kirk, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Notice
                    Joinder in Defendants Joint Objections to Magistrate Stewart's F&R. (Oral Argument Requested) Filed by Ken L. Harrison. (Related document(s)[50]) (Kirk, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Exhibits
                      Exhibits to Defendants Joint Objections to Magistrate Stewart's 6/19/02 F&R. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP & Outside Director Defendants. (Related document(s)[50]) (Kirk, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Objections to Findings & Recommendation
                        Joint Objections to Findings & Recommendation Dated 6/19/02 (Oral Argument Requested). Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP, Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, Joe E. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, John Mendelsohn, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charls Walker, Herbert S. Winokur Jr.. Response to the objection to the F & R due by 7/26/2002. (Related motion(s)[48]) (Kirk, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Attorney Substitution
                          Notice of Substitution of Attorney Jeffrey C. Dobbins in place of Attorney Tanya Herrera. Filed by Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, Joe E. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, John Mendelsohn, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charls Walker, Herbert S. Winokur Jr.. (Kirk, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002, Terminated: 9/24/2002 Findings and RecommendationCourt Filing
                            Findings & Recommendations: Signed on 6/20/2002 by Judge Janice M. Stewart. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation due by 7/9/2002. Response to the objection to the F & R due by 7/26/2002. (Related document(s)[14], [6]) (stewart1, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 46 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
                              Record of ORDER by Judge Stewart:Taking Plaintiff's motion for remand, #6, under advisement as of 6/10/2002. Further request for oral argument is denied. (Related documents(s) [6]) (da, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 reply to motion
                                Supplemental Reply to Motion to Remand. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related motion(s)[6]) (Kirk, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Notice
                                  Defendant Ken L. Harrison's Joinder in Defendants Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs Supplemental Memorandum in Support of His Motion to Remand (Oral Argument Requested) (Related document(s)[43], [44]) (Kirk, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Affidavit
                                    Affidavit of Carl R. Neil in Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of His Motion to Remand. Filed by Robert A. Belfer. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Fortino, Paul)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Objection
                                      Objection(s) Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of His Motion to Remand. Filed by Robert A. Belfer. (Fortino, Paul)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Memorandum in Support
                                        Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[6]) (Kirk, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                          Transcript of Proceedings (Telephone Conference) held on May 13, 2002 before Judge Janice M. Stewart. (Kirk, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 40 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                            CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Record of hearing on pending motions. Order: Supplemental briefing schedule set as follows: Plaintiffs' Brief due by 5/20/2002. Defendants' Responsive Brief due by 5/27/2002. Oral argument, if requested on the one remaining issue, will be by telephone. All parties should ensure the accuracy of their telephone contact information prior to any further telephone hearing by contacting Judge Stewart's courtroom deputy (Donna Ausbie, 326-8057) as the court was unable to contact Mr. Neil prior to today's conference with the phone number listed in the court's official file. (Related documents(s) [6]) Ordered by Judge Janice M. Stewart. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Robert Schubert. Counsel Present for Defendant: Tanya Herrera, Dan Reising, Zachary Wright.Tape No: CH20. Court Reporter: Donna Ausbie. (stewart1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 Memorandum in Support
                                              Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Additional Authority in Support of Defendants Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Kirk, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 reply to motion
                                                Reply to Motion to Remand (Document entitled: Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand). Filed by Wai Chinn. (Related motion(s)[6]) (Kirk, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002 Objection
                                                  Objection(s) Affidavit of Not Yet Reported Authorities in Support of Defendants Joint Opposition to Motion to Remand & Renewed Cross-Motion to Stay. Filed by Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Joe E. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charls Walker, Herbert S. Winokur Jr.. (Related document(s)[32]) (Kirk, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                    Record of ORDER by Judge Stewart:Setting telephone oral argument before Judge Stewart on 5/13/2002 at 10:00AM on Plaintiff's motion to remand, (Related documents(s) [6]), and Defendants' renewed cross-motion to stay.Counsel wishing to participate in the telephone oral argument shall phone Donna Ausbie at (503)326-8057 no later than Friday, 5/10/02, with the phone number where they can be contacted for the hearing. (da, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Attorney Appearance
                                                      Notice of Appearance by Attorney William F. Martson, Jr. Zachary W.L. Wright & Amy J. Pedersen for Defendant Ken L. Harrison. (Kirk, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Notice
                                                        Defendant Ken L. Harrison's Joinder in Defendants Joint Opposition to Motion to Remand & Renewed Cross-Motion to Stay (Kirk, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Affidavit
                                                          Affidavit of Paul T. Fortino in Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition to Motion to Remand and Renewed Cross-Motion to Stay. Filed by Robert A. Belfer. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-F to Affidavit of Paul T. Fortino# (2) Appendix of Not Yet Reported Authorities in Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition to Motion to Remand and Renewed Cross-Motion to Stay# (3) Attachment to Appendix of Not Yet Reported Authorities)(Related document(s)[32]) (Fortino, Paul)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Response to Motion
                                                            Response to Motion Defendants' Joint Opposition to Motion to Remand and Renewed Cross-Motion to Stay. Filed by Robert A. Belfer. (Related motion(s)[6]) (Fortino, Paul)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/22/02 before Judge Janice M. Stewart. Court Reporter: (Audio) Donna Ausbie. (Kirk, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Affidavit
                                                                Amended Affidavit of Jay W. Beattie in Support of Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP's Reply in Support of Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Related document(s)[29]) (Kirk, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                  CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Proceedings -- ORDER: Denying Arthur Anderson's Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings (Related documents(s) [21]). See minute order #23 for revised briefing schedule. Ordered by Judge Janice M. Stewart. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Robert Schubert and Bob Banks. Counsel Present for Defendant: Jay Beattie, Tanya Herrera, and Dan Reising (for non-party, Enron).Tape No: 607. Court Reporter: Donna D. Ausbie. (stewart1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                    CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Proceedings -- Record of Hearing on Motion to Vacate Stay Order (docket #14). ORDER: Granting the motion (docket #14) and LIFTING THE STAY. ORDER: The parties shall complete briefing on the Motion to Remand (docket #6), as follows: Response due April 29; Reply due May 6. (Related documents(s) [6], [14]). Ordered by Judge Janice M. Stewart. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Robert Schubert and Bob Banks. Counsel Present for Defendant: Jay Beattie, Tanay Herrera, and Dan Reising (for non-party, Enron).Tape No: 607. Court Reporter: Donna D. Ausbie. (stewart1, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Affidavit
                                                                      Affidavit of Jay W. Beattie in Support of Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP's Reply in Support of Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Kirk, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Reply
                                                                        Reply in Support of Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Related document(s)[14]) (Kirk, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Order on Application for special admission pro hacCourt Filing
                                                                          Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert C Schubert for Wai Chinn. Receipt number 443674 Signed 4/19/2002 by Judge Janice M. Stewart. (da, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                            Certificate of Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[26]) (Kirk, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Reply
                                                                              Reply in Support of Motion to Vacate Stay & Opposition to Andersen's Cross Motion to Stay. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[14], [18]) (Kirk, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                Affidavit of Carl R. Neil in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Vacate Automatic Stay & in Support of Arthur Andersen's Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Related document(s)[21]) (Kirk, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/10/2002, Terminated: 4/22/2002 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Vacate Automatic Stay & Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Related motion(s)[14]) (Kirk, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                    CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Stewart - Resetting Plaintiff's motion to vacate stay order, (Related documents(s) [14]), from 4/30/2002 to oral argument before Judge Stewart on Monday, 4/22/2002 at 9:30 AM. ORDER - Plaintiff's Reply due by 4/17/2002. (da, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                      Record of ORDER by Judge Stewart: Granting Unopposed motion, # [18], of Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP for one week extension of time to file memorandum in opposition to Plaintiff's motion to vacate stay order #[14]. ORDER - Response due by 4/8/2002. Reply due by 4/22/2002. ORDER - Resetting oral argument on Plaintiff's motion to vacate stay order, #14, from 4/22/02 to Tuesday, 4/30/2002, at 01:30PM before Judge Stewart in Portland. (Related documents(s) [14]) (da, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002, Terminated: 4/2/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                        Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion # [14]. to Plaintiffs Motion to Vacate Stay Order. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Kirk, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                          CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Stewart - Setting Plaintiff's motion to vacate stay order, #14, for oral argument before Judge Stewart on 4/22/2002 at 09:30AM in Portland. (Related documents(s) [14]). ORDER: When submitting memoranda to the Court, the parties not participating in ECF filing shall either file a disk containing their motions, memoranda, and concise statement of facts, excluding exhibits, in a format compatible with Word Perfect, or send copies by e-mail to Donna_Ausbie@ord.uscourts.gov. (da, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                            Certificate of Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[15], [14]) (Kirk, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                              Memorandum in Support of Motion to Vacate Stay Order. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[14]) (Kirk, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002, Terminated: 4/22/2002 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                Motion to Vacate Stay Order (Request for Oral Argument). Filed by all plaintiffs. (Kirk, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/3/2002 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                  CIVIL MINUTES:Pursuant to the Notice of Bankruptcy filing by Defendant Enron Corporation, #9, this action is stayed. ORDER - Defense counsel shall file a written status report with the Court every 60 days starting May 1, 2002. (Related documents(s) [9]) (da, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                    Motion for Extension of Time Motion of Removing Defendants for One-Week Extension of Time to File Memorandum Opposing Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Kirk, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                                      Affidavit of Carl R. Neil in Support of Motion of Removing Defendants for One-Week Extension of Time, Etc. (Filed by Outside Director Defendants & Arthur Andersen, LLP). Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Related document(s)[10]) (Kirk, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Unopposed Motion of Removing Defendants for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Kirk, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Order
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing of Enron Corporation & Imposition of Automatic Stay.(Filed by Stoel Rives, LLP for Enron Corporation)(Kirk, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                            Certificate of Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[6], [7]) (Kirk, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support of Motion for Remand to Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[6]) (Kirk, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 Motion to Remand
                                                                                                                Motion to Remand to Multnomah County Circuit Court (Request for Oral Argument). Filed by all plaintiffs. (Kirk, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Order on motion for extension of time to answer a Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Record of ORDER by Judge Stewart: Granting unopposed joint motion for extension of time (to 3/11/02) to respond to plaintiff's complaint (Related Doc #[3]) by the outside Director Defendants and Arthur Andersen LLP . (da, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                    Declaration of Tanya Herrera in Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP, Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, Joe E. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, John Mendelsohn, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charls Walker, Herbert S. Winokur Jr.. (Related document(s)[3]) (Kirk, )
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
                                                                                                                      Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Unopposed Joint Motion for Extensio of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP, Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, Joe E. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, John Mendelsohn, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charls Walker, Herbert S. Winokur Jr.. (Kirk, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 Discovery Order
                                                                                                                        Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: Case assigned to the Honorable Janice M. Stewart. Discovery to be completed by 6/3/2002. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 7/2/2002. Pretrial Order due by 7/2/2002. (Kirk, )
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                          Notice of Removal from Multnomah County Circuit Court (Case # 0201-00262). Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: #442190 issued. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP, Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, Joe E. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, John Mendelsohn, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charls Walker, Herbert S. Winokur Jr. against Wai Chinn. (Kirk, )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?