Hartung v. Bellows Rent All et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-00242-BR
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo David Hartung, Plaintiff

Represented by HEPWORTH JANIS & KLUKSDAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Charles Hepworth +1 208 343 7510 +1 208 342 2927 HLHBoise@aol.com

Represented by Yturri Rose, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl Burnham, Jr. +1 541 889 5368 +1 541 889 2432 cburnham@yturrirose.com
v.
No Logo Bellows Rent All, Defendant

Represented by cssklaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Cantrill +1 208 344 8035 +1 208 345 7212 cantrill@cssklaw.com

Represented by Skerjanec, Carol DeHaven

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry Alan Sullivan +1 541 473 3141 +4732 473 473 2651 sullivan@valelawyers.com
No Logo Duane L Bellows, Defendant

Represented by cssklaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Cantrill +1 208 344 8035 +1 208 345 7212 cantrill@cssklaw.com

Represented by Skerjanec, Carol DeHaven

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry Alan Sullivan +1 541 473 3141 +4732 473 473 2651 sullivan@valelawyers.com
No Logo Duane L Bellows Construction Inc, Defendant

Represented by cssklaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Cantrill +1 208 344 8035 +1 208 345 7212 cantrill@cssklaw.com

Represented by Skerjanec, Carol DeHaven

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry Alan Sullivan +1 541 473 3141 +4732 473 473 2651 sullivan@valelawyers.com
Attributes
Office Portland
Filed 2/28/2002
Jury Demand Both
Demand $500000
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Malheur
Terminated 5/16/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, IFP, TERMINATED
Timeline
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
Judgment of Dismissal: ADJUDGED that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs. Signed 5/15/02 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljb, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Stipulation for Judgment of Dismissal without Prejudice. Without costs to any party. Filed by David Hartung. (ljb, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Based on information from plaintiff's counsel, the Rule 16 Conference set for 5/13/2002 is STRICKEN. Plaintiff's dismissal papers shall be submitted no later than 5/23/2002. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sm, )
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Application for leave to proceed ifp
Amended Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP (original application has been approved). Filed by all defendants. (ljb, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Rule 16 Conference set for 5/13/2002 at 11:30AM in Chambers. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sm, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Answer
Answer to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (Related Doc # [1]). Filed by all defendants. (ljb, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Order on Application for special admission pro hacCourt Filing
Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of David W. Cantrill for Duane L Bellows Construction Inc; Duane L Bellows and Bellows Rent All. Receipt number 443103 Signed 3/22/02 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljb, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 Return of Service Executed
Return of Service Executed upon Duane L. Bellows on 3/5/02. Filed by David Hartung. (ljb, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 Return of Service Executed
Return of Service Executed upon Bellows Rent-All on 3/5/02. Filed by David Hartung. (ljb, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 Return of Service Executed
Return of Service Executed upon Duane L. Bellows Construction Inc on 3/5/02. Filed by David Hartung. (ljb, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Discovery Order
Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: Case assigned to the Honorable Anna J. Brown. Discovery to be completed by 7/1/2002. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 7/29/2002. Pretrial Order due by 7/29/2002. (ljb, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Complaint
Complaint Personal Injury Action. Demand for Jury Trial Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 442644 issued Summons issued as to Duane L Bellows, Bellows Rent-All, Duane L. Bellows Construction. Filed by David Hartung against Duane L Bellows, Bellows Rent All, Duane L Bellows Construction Inc. (ljb, )
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 357 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?