Spector v. Lay et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-00394-HA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mildred Spector, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Banks Law Office, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S. Banks, Jr. +1 503 222 7475 +1 503 467 7689 bob@bankslawoffice.com
v.
No Logo Andrew S. Fastow, Defendant
Arthur Andersen LLP Arthur Andersen LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindsay Hart Neil & Weigler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay W. Beattie +1 503 226 7677 +1 503 226 7697 jbeattie@lindsayhart.com
Space Carl R. Neil +1 503 226 7677 +1 503 226 7697 cneil@lindsayhart.com
No Logo James V. Derrick, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey K. Skilling, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Stern +1 202 383 5414
No Logo Kenneth D. Rice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C Nickens +1 713 571 9191 + 713 571 9652 jnickens@nickenskeeton.com
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L. Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Kennedy, Watts, Arellano & Ricks LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph C. Arellano +1 503 228 6191 +1 503 228 0009 arellano@kwar.com
No Logo Mark A. Frevert, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C Nickens +1 713 571 9191 + 713 571 9652 jnickens@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Richard A. Causey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C Nickens +1 713 571 9191 + 713 571 9652 jnickens@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Richard B. Buy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C Nickens +1 713 571 9191 + 713 571 9652 jnickens@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Stanley C. Horton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacks C Nickens +1 713 571 9191 + 713 571 9652 jnickens@nickenskeeton.com
Office Portland
Filed 3/27/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446 Petition for Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Multnomah
Terminated 10/15/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 0202-00994[Circuit Court Multnomah County Oregon]
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
Order Vacating Transfer Order: Panel having been advised that this action was dismissed by Judge Haggerty on 10/9/02 Vacates its Order of Transfer to the Southern District of Texas for inclusion in the MDL Docket #1446. Signed 10/24/02 by Judge Wm. Terrell Hodges / Chairman MDL Panel. (Related document(s)[25]) (Kirk, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    Conditional Transfer Order dated 10/16/02 transferring case to the USDC for the Southern District of Texas pursuant to MDL docket #1446. Signed 10/16/02 by Judge Wm. Terrell Hodges/ Chairman MDL Panel. (Kirk, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
      Order of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. Signed October 9, 2002 (rtrb, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
        Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice [Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 41(A) (1)(i). Filed by Mildred Spector. (rtrb, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
          CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order granting stipulated motion for extension of time for defendant Kenneth Lay to respond to plaintiff's complaint to and including October 31,2002. Ordered by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. (md, )
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002, Terminated: 10/7/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
            Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Kenneth L. Lay. (rtrb, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 Notice
              Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Enron Corporation. Filed by Barnes H. Ellis, Attorney for Enron Corporation. (Enron is not listed as a party on this case.) (rtrb, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                Order: It is ordered that plaintiff's motion to refer to arbitration is denied as there is a conditional order of remand (with objections) pending with the Multi-District Litigation panel.Signed 8/23/02 by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. (Related document(s)[3]) (md, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                  CIVIL MINUTES:Record of ORDER granting stipulated motion for extension of time for defendant Kenneth L. Lay to file a response to plaintiff's complaint to and includingSeptember 30,2002. (Related documents(s) [16]) Ordered by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. (md, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/26/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                    Acceptance of Service on Behalf of the Defendant Jeffrey K. Skilling. Filed by Jeffrey K. Skilling.(rtrb, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/19/2002, Terminated: 8/21/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
                      Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer /Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Kenneth L. Lay. (rtrb, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                        CIVIL MINUTES:Record of ORDER granting agreed motion for extension of time for defendants Causey,Frevert,Horton, Rice and Buy shall have until September 9,2002 to answer or otherwise plead and defendant Derrick shall have until September 11,2002 toanswer or otherwise plead. (Related documents(s) [14]) Ordered by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. (md, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002, Terminated: 8/15/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
                          Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Agreed Motion for Extension of Time). Filed by Richard B. Buy, Richard A. Causey, Mark A. Frevert, Stanley C. Horton, Kenneth D. Rice. (rtrb, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Return of Service Executed
                            Return of Service Executed upon Kenneth L. Lay (Joseph C. Arellano Accepted Service on Behalf of Kenneth L. Lay) on 7/29/02. Filed by Kenneth L. Lay. (rtrb, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 Supplement
                              Third Supplement to Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP's Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Related document(s)[6]) (lam, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Reply
                                Reply in Support of Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Related document(s)[6]) (lam, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Memorandum in Support
                                  Second Memorandum in Support of Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP's Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Related document(s)[6]) (lam, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/13/2002 reply to motion
                                    Reply to Motion Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Refer Case to Mediation and Opposition to Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP's Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Mildred Spector. (Related motion(s)[3]) (lam, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Memorandum in Support
                                      Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP's Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Related document(s)[6]) (lam, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Affidavit
                                        Affidavit of Carl R. Neil in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Refer Case to Mediation and Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Related document(s)[6]) (lam, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Memorandum in Opposition
                                          Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Refer Case to Mediation and Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Related motion(s)[3]) (lam, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                            Certificate of Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[3], [4]) (lam, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Affidavit
                                              Affidavit of Robert S. Banks Jr. in Support of Motion to Refer Case to Mediation. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[3]) (lam, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Motion
                                                Motion to Refer Case to Mediation. Expedited Hearing Requested. Filed by all plaintiffs. (lam, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 4/1/2002 Discovery Order
                                                  Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: Case assigned to the Honorable Ancer L. Haggerty. Discovery to be completed by 7/26/2002. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 8/26/2002. Pretrial Order due by 8/26/2002. (lam, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 4/1/2002 Notice of Removal
                                                    Notice of Removal. Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 443166 issued. Filed by Arthur Andersen LLP against Arthur Andersen LLP, Richard B. Buy, Richard A. Causey, James V. Derrick Jr., Andrew S. Fastow, Mark A. Frevert, Stanley C. Horton, Kenneth L. Lay, Kenneth D. Rice, Jeffrey K. Skilling. (lam, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 108 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?