John Doe v. City Of New York et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:22-cv-02690-PKC-KHP
District Judge P. Kevin Castel, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge P. Kevin Castel
Last Updated April 11, 2025 at 1:33 PM EDT (2.6 weeks ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo John Doe, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine R. Rosenfeld +1 212 763 5000 krosenfeld@ecbawm.com
Space Emily Kane Wanger +1 212 763 5000 +1 212 763 5001 ewanger@ecbawm.com

Represented by ecbawm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew G. Celli +1 212 763 5000 +1 212 763 5001 acelli@ecbawm.com
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Howard Scheiner +1 212 788 0600 +1 212 788 0367 ascheine@law.nyc.gov
No Logo John and Jane Roes #1-10, Defendant
No Logo Richard Roe, Defendant

Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Howard Scheiner +1 212 788 0600 +1 212 788 0367 ascheine@law.nyc.gov
Attributes
Office Foley Square
Filed 4/1/2022
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CASREF,ECF,MEDTFR8
Timeline
  Entries (169) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/11/2025, Entered: None Order of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/17/2025, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/14/2025, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/13/2025, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/13/2025, Entered: None Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/13/2025, Entered: None Pretrial Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/10/2025, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/7/2025, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/6/2025, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/21/2025, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/21/2025, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/19/2024, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/19/2024, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/5/2024, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/4/2024, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/18/2024, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/14/2024, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/13/2024, Entered: None Proposed Pre-Trial Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/13/2024, Entered: None Proposed Pre-Trial Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/13/2024, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/30/2024, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/30/2024, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/30/2024, Entered: None In Limine
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/30/2024, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/22/2024, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/22/2024, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/22/2024, Entered: None Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/3/2024, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/3/2024, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/3/2024, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/2/2024, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/2/2024, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/2/2024, Entered: None In Limine
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/2/2024, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/2/2024, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/2/2024, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire Questions
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/2/2024, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire Questions
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/2/2024, Entered: None Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/19/2024, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/17/2024, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/17/2024, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/2/2024, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/2/2024, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/2/2024, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/26/2024, Entered: None Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/26/2024, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/22/2024, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/22/2024, Entered: None Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/17/2024, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/17/2024, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/15/2024, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/2/2024, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/1/2024, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/1/2024, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/25/2024, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/24/2024, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/1/2024, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/29/2024, Entered: None Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/25/2024, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/26/2024, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/26/2024, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/26/2024, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/12/2024, Entered: None Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/12/2024, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/12/2024, Entered: None Preclude
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/6/2023, Entered: None Subpoena Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/6/2023, Entered: None Subpoena Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/6/2023, Entered: None Subpoena Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/23/2023, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/20/2023, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/19/2023, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/19/2023, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/18/2023, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/6/2023, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/25/2023, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/22/2023, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/17/2023, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/31/2023, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/28/2023, Entered: None extension of time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/24/2023, Entered: 7/24/2023 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: As discussed at the July 24, 2023 Case Management Conference: The deadline for all discovery is extended to Friday, September 29, 2023. To the extent the parties anticipate seeking additional discovery from third parties, they shall make those discovery requests by Monday, July 31, 2023. By Tuesday, August 22, 2023, the parties shall submit a joint status letter providing an update as to what, if any, discovery remains to be taken. ( Discovery due by 9/29/2023.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/24/2023) (ate)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/24/2023, Entered: 7/24/2023 Case Management ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker - Courtroom 17D : Case Management Conference / Discovery / Scheduling / Status - held on 7/24/2023 : See Transcript for Details. A transcript of this proceeding is available by utilizing the attached order form. (ca)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Notice (other)
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: REMINDER of the Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katharine H. Parker re: [72] Memo Endorsement (ca)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/12/2023, Entered: 6/12/2023 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
ORDER granting [75] Letter Motion to Seal. APPLICATION GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to seal the Order at ECF No. 65, as well as the exhibit at ECF No. 64-1, both of which contain personally sensitive information of the Plaintiff. The below Exhibit 1 constitutes the publicly filed version of the Order with applicable redactions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 6/12/2023) (vfr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/9/2023, Entered: 6/9/2023, Terminated: 6/12/2023 Motion to SealCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION to Seal Court's May 9, 2023 Order to Disclose Certain Discovery Material addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Emily Wanger dated June 9, 2023. Document filed by John Doe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1- Proposed Redactions, # (2) Exhibit 2- Proposed Redactions).(Wanger, Emily)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/9/2023, Entered: 6/9/2023 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [73] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Nairuby L. Beckles terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/9/2023) (vfr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/8/2023, Entered: 6/8/2023, Terminated: 6/9/2023 Motion to withdraw as attorney
MOTION for Nairuby L. Beckles to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by John Doe..(Beckles, Nairuby)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/1/2023, Entered: 6/1/2023 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [71] Letter filed by John Doe. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks the parties for the status update. The settlement conference previously scheduled on July 24, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. is adjourned to Thursday, September 28, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall complete the Settlement Conference Summary Report and submit pre-conference submissions in accordance with my Individual Rules no later than August 29, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. A Case Management Conference is scheduled on Monday, July 24, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17D, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York NY. SO ORDERED. ( Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Settlement Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 6/1/2023) (vfr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/31/2023, Entered: 5/31/2023 LetterCourt Filing
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Nairuby L. Beckles dated May 31, 2023 re: Deposition Schedule and Settlement Conference. Document filed by John Doe..(Beckles, Nairuby)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/25/2023, Entered: 5/25/2023 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: On March 3, 2023, the Court scheduled a settlement conference in this matter to occur on July 24, 2023. The Court subsequently extended the discovery deadlines in this case to July 31, 2023. By Tuesday, May 30, 2023, the parties shall meet and confer to discuss whether they anticipate that holding a settlement conference prior to the close of discovery would be productive. In the event the parties wish to adjourn the settlement conference to a later date after the close of discovery, they shall file a letter by May 30, 2023 seeking to adjourn the conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/22/2023) (vfr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/22/2023, Entered: 5/22/2023 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: The deadline for discovery is extended to Monday, July 31, 2023. The parties shall file a joint status letter by July 31, 2023 advising the Court on the status of discovery and, if needed, requesting a reasonable extension of the discovery deadline. On Monday, June 5, 2023, the parties shall have scheduled all depositions to occur by July 31, 2023, and shall file a joint status letter advising the Court of the schedule for all deposition dates. The parties are directed to be cooperative with each other and with relevant third parties in scheduling depositions. Defendants shall produce law enforcement officer logbooks at least a week in advance of the deposition of any such officer. ( Deposition due by 7/31/2023., Discovery due by 7/31/2023.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/22/2023) (ate)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/22/2023, Entered: 5/22/2023 Case Management ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Telephonic Case Management Conference / Discovery / Scheduling / Status - held on 5/22/2023 : A transcript of this proceeding is available by utilizing the attached order form. AT&T Conference Line (ca)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/19/2023, Entered: 5/19/2023 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [66] Letter filed by John Doe. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks the parties for the status update. The case management conference currently scheduled on Monday, May 22, 2023 will proceed as scheduled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/19/2023) (vfr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/18/2023, Entered: 5/18/2023 LetterCourt Filing
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Nairuby L. Beckles dated May 18, 2023 re: Pre-Conference Joint Discovery Status Letter. Document filed by John Doe..(Beckles, Nairuby)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 65 Filed: 5/9/2023, Entered: 5/9/2023 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
ORDER TO DISCLOSE CERTAIN DISCOVERY MATERIALS terminating [55] Letter Motion for Discovery; terminating [56] Letter Motion for Discovery. THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT: 1. Defendants have demonstrated a compelling and particularized need for the Protected Materials to the extent that they relate to plaintiff and/or the charge against plaintiff in the Criminal Case; 2. The Court finds that the interests of justice, due process, and the requirements of full and fair adjudication of federal rights, require that the Protected Materials be disclosed to the Parties, subject to the limitations set forth herein, notwithstanding the provisions of N.Y. Crim. P. Law ยงยง 190.25(4)(a), 700.65(3), 705.30(1), or other law or prior court orders relating to the Protected Materials. 3. OSNP in the first instance shall review the Protected Materials for materials that relate to the conspiracy charges against plaintiff in the Criminal Case, hereinafter the "Relevant Protected Materials." OSNP, in consultation with DEA, is hereby required to disclose the Relevant Protected Materials in discovery in this action, subject to the limitations and conditions set forth herein. 4. If OSNP determines that all the Protected Materials are Relevant Protected Materials, and that no redactions are required pursuant to paragraph 6 of this Order, then they shall promptly inform the Parties by email. 5. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, OSNP shall provide the Parties with a bates-stamped set of (a) the Relevant Protected Materials with any redactions made pursuant to Paragraph 6, and (b) a log of Protected Materials that have been withheld for lack of relevance and/or privilege. 6. OSNP, after consultation with DEA, may redact from Relevant Protected Materials the names of any persons who are not parties to this action whom they believe require additional confidentiality protection not otherwise provided for in this Order, and provide the parties with a key assigning a letter to each unique redacted person and stating the general reasons for the redaction of each person, and each redaction shall contain the letter for the person redacted. 7. The bates-stamped sets produced by OSNP, after consultation with DEA, and in accordance with Paragraphs 3-6 of this Order, shall be the sole and exclusive versions of the Protected Materials and the Relevant Protected Materials used for discovery in this action and shall be referred to as the "Unsealed Materials." 8. Following OSNP's production of the Unsealed Materials to the Parties pursuant to paragraphs 3-6 of this Order, the Parties shall, within ten (10) business days of such production, delete or destroy any Protected Materials that they previously received from any other source, including but not limited to materials received from plaintiff's criminal defense counsel and materials previously received from OSNP. The Parties may not otherwise use, review, access, or disseminate the Protected Materials other than the Unsealed Materials. 9. Should the Parties disagree with the designation of any document as Protected Materials or Relevant Protected Materials or Unsealed Materials, the objecting party must notify OSNP and DEA in writing within ten (10) days of receipt of the materials and make good faith attempts to confer with OSNP and DEA to resolve the dispute. If the dispute cannot be resolved, and within ten (10) days after efforts to confer are completed, the objecting party may make an application to the Court challenging such designation. Until the Court resolves the dispute about the designation, the disputed document shall be treated as Protected Materials within the meaning of this Order. 10. The Parties may not use, review, access, obtain, receive, procure, or disseminate Protected Materials other than in conformance with this Order or as needed to effect compliance with this Order and only after the procedure set forth in paragraphs 3-6 of this Order has been completed. 11. The Unsealed Materials may be used by the Parties to this case and their attorneys solely for the purposes of this litigation, and by OSNP and DEA in preparing for depositions and shall be deemed Confidential pursuant to the terms of the Confidentiality Stipulation and Order of June 27, 2022 (ECF No. 11) (the "Confidentiality Order"). 12. Witnesses in this case may be questioned at deposition regarding the Unsealed Materials and/or the information contained therein on a Confidential basis subject to the Confidentiality Order. 13. To the extent that the parties determine that it is necessary to submit any of the Unsealed Materials to this Court, those materials shall be filed under seal. 14. The Court shall in its sole discretion determine how the Unsealed Materials may be used at trial and under what circumstances and conditions. 15. The Parties, OSNP and DEA shall retain the right to seek further relief relating to the Protected Materials, Relevant Protected Materials, and Unsealed Materials. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 55 and the corrected motion at ECF No. 56, as those motions are resolved by this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/9/2023) (vfr)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/8/2023, Entered: 5/8/2023 Memorandum of Law in Support of MotionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [56] LETTER MOTION for Discovery Corrected to Add Redacted Exhibit A addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Alan H. Scheiner dated April 17, 2023. Submitting Proposed Order. Document filed by City Of New York, Richard Roe. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Disclose Certain Discovery Materials, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A (redacted) to Proposed Order).(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/1/2023, Entered: 5/1/2023 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
ORDER granting [62] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/1/2023) (ate)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None ***Set/Reset Deadlines
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/8/2023 (ate)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/28/2023, Entered: 4/28/2023, Terminated: 5/1/2023 Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Application for Proposed Order or Revised Proposed Order, on Behalf of All Parties, addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Alan H. Scheiner dated April 28, 2023. Document filed by City Of New York, Richard Roe..(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/26/2023, Entered: 4/26/2023 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
ORDER granting [57] Letter Motion for Discovery; terminating [60] Letter Motion for Discovery. Having considered the positions of both sides, the Court grants Defendants' request that certain deposition dates be adjourned to accommodate Defense counsel's scheduling conflict. The parties shall meet and confer in good faith to reschedule the depositions for the soonest amenable dates between May 17, 2023 and June 30, 2023. If needed, the parties shall propose a reasonable extension of the June 30 discovery deadline to allow for the depositions of the OSNP witnesses. In the event the parties cannot agree in good faith on rescheduled dates for the depositions, they shall write to the Court no later than June 15, 2023 and the Court will set new dates. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/26/2023) (vfr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/26/2023, Entered: 4/26/2023, Terminated: 4/26/2023 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Discovery Respectfully Requesting Expedited Ruling on ECF No. 57 addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Alan H. Scheiner dated April 26, 2023. Document filed by City Of New York, Richard Roe..(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/25/2023, Entered: 4/25/2023 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Andrew G. Celli, Jr. dated April 25, 2023 re: [57] LETTER MOTION for Discovery for a protective order to Adjourn Certain Depositions Over Plaintiff's Objection addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Alan H. Scheiner dated April 24, 2023. . Document filed by John Doe..(Celli, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/25/2023, Entered: 4/25/2023 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
ORDER with respect to [57] Letter Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's letter motion by April 25, 2023 (today) at 5:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/25/2023) (vfr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None ***Set/Reset Deadlines
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/25/2023 (vfr)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/24/2023, Entered: 4/24/2023, Terminated: 4/26/2023 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Discovery for a protective order to Adjourn Certain Depositions Over Plaintiff's Objection addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Alan H. Scheiner dated April 24, 2023. Document filed by City Of New York, Richard Roe..(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/17/2023, Entered: 4/17/2023, Terminated: 5/9/2023 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Discovery Corrected to Add Redacted Exhibit A addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Alan H. Scheiner dated April 17, 2023. Document filed by City Of New York, Richard Roe. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Disclosure of Certain Criminal Case Documents, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A to Application to Disclose and Proposed Order to Disclose - Redacted Letter from SNP).(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/17/2023, Entered: 4/17/2023, Terminated: 5/9/2023 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Discovery To Disclose Certain Materials from the Special Narcotics Prosecutor addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Alan H. Scheiner dated April 17, 2023. Document filed by City Of New York. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Disclose Certain Discovery Materials).(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/14/2023, Entered: 4/14/2023 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
ORDER granting [53] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/14/2023) (vfr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None ***Set/Reset Deadlines
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/17/2023. Responses due by 5/1/2023 (vfr)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/13/2023, Entered: 4/13/2023, Terminated: 4/14/2023 Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Unseal and Response, Upon Consent addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Alan H. Scheiner dated April 13, 2023. Document filed by City Of New York, Richard Roe..(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/10/2023, Entered: 4/10/2023 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Nairuby L. Beckles dated April 10, 2023 re: Plaintiff's Production of Certain Sealed Documents. Document filed by John Doe..(Beckles, Nairuby)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/5/2023, Entered: 4/5/2023 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: On April 3, 2023, the parties filed a joint status letter that raised several discovery disputes. (ECF No. 50.) After consideration of the parties' representations in the letter, the Court orders as follows: CI Database: The Court previously denied Plaintiff's request for discovery of the "CI Database" (aka "SafeNet Records") on the grounds that the information was not relevant and, even if marginally relevant, its production is not proportional to the needs of the case. Plaintiff's request to be heard further on this issue based on its review of the relevant NYPD Protocol is denied. Logbooks: Plaintiff's request for an order compelling production of Officer Roe's logbooks and memo books is denied. Plaintiff has not shown that Defense Counsel failed in its obligation to conduct a reasonable review of these documents or that its representations to the Court about the content of these documents is inaccurate. Depositions: The parties are directed to meet and confer in good faith to schedule depositions. Based on the subject matter limitations the Court has already imposed, depositions of the witnesses who were not involved in the arrest and prosecution of Plaintiff shall be limited to no more than three hours, subject to any post-deposition application for relief. Sealed Documents in Plaintiff's Underlying Criminal Case. Any motion by Defendants to unseal the documents shall be filed by Friday, April 14, 2023, and Defendants shall serve a copy of the motion on the Special Narcotics Prosecutor and the U.S. Drug Enforcement Agency, and file proof of service on the docket. Any oppositions to the motion (including by Plaintiff, the Special Narcotics Prosecutor, and/or the U.S. Drug Enforcement Agency) are due on Friday, April 28, 2023. The parties shall immediately advise the Special Narcotics Prosecutor and the U.S. Drug Enforcement Agency of this briefing schedule. To the extent Plaintiff agrees to produce the documents to Defendants, he shall so advise the Court by April 10, 2023. Non-Party Document Subpoena. Any motions for a protective order relating to non-party document subpoenas are due on Friday, May 5, 2023; opposition briefs are due on Friday, May 19, 2023; and replies are due on Friday, May 26, 2023. Case Management Conference. A telephonic Case Management Conference is scheduled on Monday, May 22, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. At the scheduled time, the parties shall dial the Court's conference line at 866-434-5269, access code 4858267#. To the extent the parties raised issues in the status letter that are not addressed by this Order, the Court will discuss those issues at the Conference. The parties shall meet and confer in advance of the Conference to narrow any outstanding disputes. On Thursday, May 18, 2023, the parties shall file a joint letter of no more than five pages setting forth agenda items for the conference. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 5/5/2023., Responses due by 5/19/2023, Replies due by 5/26/2023., Telephone Conference set for 5/22/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/5/2023) (vfr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/3/2023, Entered: 4/3/2023 Status report
STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Letter Regarding the Status of Discovery Document filed by John Doe..(Beckles, Nairuby)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/14/2023, Entered: 3/14/2023 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/2/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(js)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/14/2023, Entered: 3/14/2023 transcriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/2/2023 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/4/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/14/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2023. (js)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/3/2023, Entered: 3/3/2023 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER terminating [35] Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. As discussed at the March 2, 2023 Discovery Conference: The deadline for all discovery is extended to Friday, June 30, 2023. On Monday, April 3, 2023, the parties shall file a joint status letter regarding the status of discovery. A Settlement Conference is scheduled on Monday, July 24, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Parties must attend in person with their counsel. Corporate parties must send the person with decision-making authority to settle the matter to the conference. The parties are instructed to complete the Settlement Conference Summary Report and prepare pre-conference submissions in accordance with Judge Parker's Individual Rules of Practice. Pre-conference submissions must be received by the Court no later than Monday, July 17, 2023 at 5:00 p.m. The Court refers the parties to the transcript from the conference for the Court's discovery-related rulings. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 35. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/2/2023) (vfr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None ***Set/Reset Deadlines
Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Discovery due by 6/30/2023.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Settlement Conference set for 7/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (vfr)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/2/2023, Entered: 3/2/2023 discovery hearingCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker - Courtroom 17D: Discovery Hearing/ Scheduling held on 3/2/2023 : See Transcript for Details. A transcript of this proceeding is available by utilizing the attached order form. (ca)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Notice (other)
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: REMINDER of the Discovery Hearing set for 3/2/2023 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katharine H. Parker re: [45] Order (ca)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/24/2023, Entered: 2/24/2023 Order on Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
ORDER granting [44] Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. APPLICATION GRANTED: The Discovery Conference for Thursday, March 2, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York is hereby rescheduled to Thursday, March 2, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. Discovery Hearing set for 3/2/2023 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/24/2023) (vfr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/23/2023, Entered: 2/23/2023, Terminated: 2/24/2023 Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference March 2, 2023 Discovery Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Nairuby L. Beckles dated February 23, 2023. Document filed by John Doe..(Beckles, Nairuby)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/23/2023, Entered: 2/23/2023 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
ORDER SCHEDULING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE granting [34] Letter Motion for Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Nairuby L. Beckles dated February 7, 2023. This case has been referred to me for general pretrial supervision purposes (Doc. No. 42). A Discovery Conference will be held on Thursday, March 2, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York to address the parties outstanding discovery disputes. SO ORDERED. Discovery Hearing set for 3/2/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/23/2023) (vfr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/23/2023, Entered: 2/23/2023 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/23/2023) (ama)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Notice (other)
NOTICE: The case management conference scheduled for March 31, 2023 is VACATED. (Nacanther, Florence)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/22/2023, Entered: 2/22/2023 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
ORDER granting [39] Letter Motion to Seal. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/22/2023) (tg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/21/2023, Entered: 2/21/2023 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated February 21, 2023 re: [34] LETTER MOTION for Conference (pre-motion discovery) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Nairuby L. Beckles dated February 7, 2023. To Submit Exhibit A Under Seal. Document filed by Richard Roe, City Of New York, John Doe, John and Jane Roes #1-10. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A - Excerpts from Defendants' Responses to Discovery Requests (Confidential and Under Seal))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [39].(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/21/2023, Entered: 2/21/2023, Terminated: 2/22/2023 Motion to SealCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION to Seal (Exhibit A to be sealed filed separately under seal) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated February 21, 2023. Document filed by City Of New York, Richard Roe..(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/21/2023, Entered: 2/21/2023 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [34] LETTER MOTION for Conference (pre-motion discovery) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Nairuby L. Beckles dated February 7, 2023. (Exhibit A to be Filed Under Seal). Document filed by City Of New York, Richard Roe..(Scheiner, Alan)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/10/2023, Entered: 2/10/2023 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
ORDER: granting [36] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/10/2023) (ama)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/9/2023, Entered: 2/9/2023, Terminated: 2/10/2023 Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Premotion Letter of February 7, 2023 addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated February 9, 2023. Document filed by City Of New York, Richard Roe..(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/7/2023, Entered: 2/7/2023, Terminated: 3/3/2023 Motion for Leave to file documentCourt Filing
***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER MOTION for Leave to File (deficiency letter permanently under seal) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew G. Celli, Jr. dated February 7, 2023. Document filed by John Doe, City Of New York, John and Jane Roes #1-10, Richard Roe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit (A - to Feb. 7, 2023 Letter Motion (Dkt. 34)), # (2) Exhibit (B - to Feb. 7, 2023 Letter Motion (Dkt. 34)))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [11].(Celli, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/7/2023, Entered: 2/7/2023, Terminated: 2/23/2023 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Conference (pre-motion discovery) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Nairuby L. Beckles dated February 7, 2023. Document filed by John Doe..(Beckles, Nairuby)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/3/2022, Entered: 11/3/2022 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: [31] Letter filed by John Doe. ENDORSEMENT: The Order of Referral (Doc. 25) is VACATED in its entirety. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/03/2022) (ama)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/3/2022, Entered: 11/3/2022 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew G. Celli, Jr. dated November 3, 2022 re: Adjourned Mediation Date. Document filed by John Doe..(Celli, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/1/2022, Entered: 11/1/2022 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Kane Wanger on behalf of John Doe..(Wanger, Emily)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/4/2022, Entered: 10/4/2022 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint against City Of New York, John and Jane Roes #1-10, Richard Roe with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by John Doe. Related document: [1] Complaint..(Celli, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/3/2022, Entered: 10/3/2022 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: [27] Letter filed by John Doe. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff may file an amended complaint protecting the proposed redacted information within 14 days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/03/2022) (ama)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/30/2022, Entered: 9/30/2022 LetterCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew G. Celli, Jr dated September 30, 2022 re: Revised Redacted Complaint. Document filed by John Doe. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Revised Redacted Complaint and Jury Demand).(Celli, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Mediation Conference Scheduled/Re-Scheduled
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(ah)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Notice of Mediator Assignment
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator.(ah)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/16/2022, Entered: 9/16/2022 Case Management PlanCourt Filing
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan (the "Plan") is submitted by the parties in accordance with Rule 26(f)(3), Fed. R. Civ. P. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. ยง 636(c). this case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 3/16/2023. All Fact Discovery due by 3/16/2023. All Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2023. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: 1 Week (Defendants), 2 Weeks (Plaintiff). Referral to mediation. Mediation session scheduled for November 15, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. The next Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. The conference will proceed telephonically. Dial-In No.: 1-888-363-4749, Access Code: 3667981. And as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/16/2022) (ama)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/16/2022, Entered: 9/16/2022 Mediation Referral OrderCourt Filing
Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 11/03/2022, Doc. 32 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. This expedited mediation is set for November 15, 2022 at 10:00 a.m., location or format to be determined. The assigned Mediator is authorized to advance or extend the mediation date by up to 7 days without leave of Court. After the initial mediation session, the Mediator is empowered to conduct such subsequent mediation sessions as the Mediator in his or her discretion chooses to conduct. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 9/30/2022. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/16/2022) (ama) Modified on 11/3/2022 (ama).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/16/2022. Appearing for plaintiff: Andrew Celli and Katherine Rosenfeld. Appearing for defendants: Alan Scheiner. Submit revised redacted complaint by September 30, 2022. Case referred to mediation for a session scheduled on November 15, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. The next case management conference is scheduled for March 31, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. (Nacanther, Florence)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/15/2022, Entered: 9/15/2022 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: The Initial Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for September 16, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. will now begin at 12:00 p.m. The dial-in information remains the same. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 9/16/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/15/2022) (tg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/9/2022, Entered: 9/9/2022 LetterCourt Filing
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Katherine Rosenfeld dated September 9, 2022 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by John Doe..(Rosenfeld, Katherine)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/31/2022, Entered: 8/31/2022 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: [21] Letter filed by John Doe. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/31/2022) (ama)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/26/2022, Entered: 8/26/2022 LetterCourt Filing
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Katherine Rosenfeld dated August 26, 2022 re: 1983 Plan Exemption. Document filed by John Doe..(Rosenfeld, Katherine)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 8/17/2022, Entered: 8/17/2022 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
ORDER granting [19] Letter Motion to Seal. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/12/2022, Entered: 8/12/2022, Terminated: 8/17/2022 Motion to SealCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION to Seal Unredacted Answer, Provisionally Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Confidentiality Stipulation and Order addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated August 12, 2022. Document filed by City Of New York, Richard Roe..(Scheiner, Alan)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/12/2022, Entered: 8/12/2022 Answer to Complaint
ANSWER to [1] Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by City Of New York, Richard Roe..(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/12/2022, Entered: 8/12/2022 Answer to Complaint
***SELECTED PARTIES***ANSWER to [1] Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Richard Roe, City Of New York, John Doe.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [1].(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/4/2022, Entered: 8/4/2022 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
ORDER: granting [15] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [15] LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer the Complaint. addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated August 3, 2022. The time for all defendants to answer or move is adjourned to August 12, 2022. Any future request will be denied for failure to comply with Section 1(A)(iv) of the Court's Individual Practices. SO ORDERED. City Of New York answer due 8/12/2022; Richard Roe answer due 8/12/2022. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/04/2022) (ama)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/3/2022, Entered: 8/3/2022, Terminated: 8/4/2022 Motion for Extension of Time to File AnswerCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer the Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated August 3, 2022. Document filed by City Of New York..(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/6/2022, Entered: 7/6/2022 Order on Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
ORDER: granting [13] Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting [13] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [13] LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Upon Consent. addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated July 5, 2022. LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, Upon Consent. addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated July 5, 2022. Time for all served defendants to respond extended to August 4, 2022. July 25, 2022 conference adjourned to September 16, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. The conference will proceed telephonically. Call-in information is: Dial-In No.: 1-888-363-4749, Access Code: 3667981#. SO ORDERED. City Of New York answer due 8/4/2022; Richard Roe answer due 8/4/2022. ( Telephonic Initial Conference set for 9/16/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.). (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/06/2022) (ama)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/5/2022, Entered: 7/5/2022, Terminated: 7/6/2022 Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Upon Consent addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated July 5, 2022., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, Upon Consent addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated July 5, 2022. Document filed by City Of New York..(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/29/2022, Entered: 6/29/2022 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine R. Rosenfeld on behalf of John Doe..(Rosenfeld, Katherine)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/27/2022, Entered: 6/27/2022 protective orderCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/27/2022) (tg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/23/2022, Entered: 6/23/2022 Proposed Protective Order
PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by John Doe. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order ([proposed] Stipulation of Confidentiality and Protective Order)).(Beckles, Nairuby)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/4/2022, Entered: 5/4/2022 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
ORDER granting [8] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [8] LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond, upon consent addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated May 3, 2022. LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Upon Consent addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated May 3, 2022.. City Of New York answer due 7/5/2022( Initial Conference set for 7/25/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.); granting [8] Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. Time to respond extended to July 5, 2022. Initial pretrial conference adjourned to July 25, 2022 at 11:30 AM, to be held telephonically (Dial-in: 1-888-363-4749; Access code: 3667981). SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/4/2022) (ks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/3/2022, Entered: 5/3/2022, Terminated: 5/4/2022 Motion for Extension of Time to File AnswerCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond, upon consent addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated May 3, 2022., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Upon Consent addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alan H. Scheiner dated May 3, 2022. Document filed by City Of New York..(Scheiner, Alan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/18/2022, Entered: 4/18/2022 Affidavit of Service Complaints
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. City Of New York served on 4/14/2022, answer due 5/5/2022. Service was accepted by Lamar Reid, Clerk. Document filed by John Doe..(Celli, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/14/2022, Entered: 4/14/2022 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, on May 16, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. The call-in information for all teleconferences is:Dial-in: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/16/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/14/2022) (ama)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/1/2022, Entered: 4/1/2022 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew G. Celli on behalf of John Doe..(Celli, Andrew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/1/2022, Entered: 4/1/2022 Sealed document
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nmo)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/1/2022, Entered: 4/1/2022 OrderCourt Filing
DOCUMENTS TO BE SEALED (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/30/2022) (pc) (pc).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/1/2022, Entered: 4/1/2022 Civil Cover Sheet
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(pc) (gp).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/1/2022, Entered: 4/1/2022 Complaint
COMPLAINT against City Of New York, John and Jane Roes #1-10, Richard Roe. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 465410296318)Document filed by John Doe..(pc) (gp).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Remark
ORDER REDACTING PLEADING FILED IN 21-MC-96. Document filed by John Doe..(pc)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Case Designated ECF.
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Case Designation
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 26 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?