Martinez et al v. Metro Metals Northwest Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-00860-BR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Alvaro Martinez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Don S. Willner +1 509 395 2000 +1 509 395 2939 donswillner@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Eduardo Talavera, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Don S. Willner +1 509 395 2000 +1 509 395 2939 donswillner@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Emilio Jimenez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Don S. Willner +1 509 395 2000 +1 509 395 2939 donswillner@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Jaime Ruiz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Don S. Willner +1 509 395 2000 +1 509 395 2939 donswillner@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Jorge Castro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Don S. Willner +1 509 395 2000 +1 509 395 2939 donswillner@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Luis Martinez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Don S. Willner +1 509 395 2000 +1 509 395 2939 donswillner@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
v.
No Logo Metro Metals Northwest Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victor Joseph Kisch +1 503 294 9648 +1 503 220 2480 vkisch@stoel.com
Space Dennis E. Westlind +1 503 294 9221 +1 503 220 2480 dewestlind@stoel.com
Office Portland
Filed 6/25/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Multnomah
Terminated 9/17/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, PROTECTIVE ORD, TERMINATED
  Entries (91) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 91 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 FRC Notice - Sealed Documents
NOTICE FROM THE CLERK: A review of the Court's records shows that this case is ready to be shipped to the Federal Records Center for storage. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.11 the parties are directed to inform the Clerk by letter within 20 days of the entry of this order why the documents that were filed and placed under seal should not be unsealed and placed in the file or request to have the documents returned to them pursuant to LR 3.11. If any party fails to so notify the Clerk, the sealed documents will be unsealed and placed in the file in preparation for the transfer of the file to the Federal Records Center. (Meyer, Craig)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Order Dismissing Case
    Order Dismissing Case. Signed on 9/17/2004 by Clerk. (sm, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 89 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Scheduling
      Order by the Honorable Anna J. Brown. Final Paper Call set for 4/23/2004. The parties shall submit closing papers no later than the date indicated. If papers are not received by that date, the Court will dismiss this action pursuant to LR 41.1. All pending deadlines and case management dates, including Jury Trial set for 4/27/2004, are STRICKEN, and any pending motions are denied as MOOT. (sm, )
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
        OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (#69) as to Plaintiffs' claim of disparate treatment in the payment of wages and the retaliation claim of Plaintiff L. Martinez. The Court DENIES Defendant'sMotion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' remainingclaims. Signed on 3/24/04 by Judge Anna J. Brown. [69] (dls, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Scheduling
          Order (Informational): Reminder to counsel regarding pretrial filings and requirements. (Attachments: # (1)) (sm, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Joint ADR Report
            Third Joint ADR Report. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Kisch, Victor)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Affidavit
              Supplemental Affidavit of Michael Ward in Support of Defendant's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Related document(s)[82]) (Kisch, Victor)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Affidavit
                Supplemental Affidavit of Dennis E. Westlind in Support of Defendant's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-E)(Related document(s)[82]) (Kisch, Victor)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Reply
                  Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Related document(s)[78]) (Kisch, Victor)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Reply
                    Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Kisch, Victor)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Affidavit
                      Affidavit of Don S. Willner. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[80]) (ljl, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004, Terminated: 4/1/2004 Motion to Supplement
                        Motion to Supplement Response to the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Request for Expedited Consideration. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 76 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 SchedulingCourt Filing
                          CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. On the Court's own Motion, the following new deadlines are set: Pretrial Order due by 4/6/2004. Trial Documents due by Noon, 4/12/2004. Pretrial Conference RESET for 4/19/2004 at 09:30AM. All other dates remain as previously set. (sm, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Affidavit
                            Affidavit of Don S. Willner. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Response to Motion
                              Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related motion(s)[69]) (ljl, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Response
                                Response to Defendant's Concise Statement of Material Facts. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[73]) (ljl, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 75 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                  CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Plaintiff's Motion (#74) for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Second Motion (#69) for Summary Judgment due by 1/12/2004. (Related documents(s) [69]) (sm, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                    Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion # [69].. Filed by all plaintiffs. (sm, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                      Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Kisch, Victor)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Affidavit
                                        Affidavit of Dennis E. Westlind in Support of Defendant's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit J-K# (2) Exhibit A-D# (3) Exhibit E-I)(Related document(s)[69]) (Kisch, Victor)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Affidavit
                                          Affidavit of Michael Ward in Support of Defendant's Second Motion for Partial Summary judgment. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Related document(s)[69]) (Kisch, Victor)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Memorandum in Support
                                            Memorandum in Support of Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Related document(s)[69]) (Kisch, Victor)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003, Terminated: 3/24/2004 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                              Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Kisch, Victor)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 68 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Defendant's Motion (#67) for Leave to Exceed Page Limit is GRANTED as requested. (sm, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003, Terminated: 12/11/2003 Motion to File Excess Pages
                                                  Motion to File Excess Pages Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Concise Statement of Facts. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Westlind, Dennis)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                    CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Further Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 2/13/2004. (sm, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court's Opinion and Order (#54) issued 10/9/2003 inadvertently was not filed under seal. The Court hereby ORDERS the Opinion and Order (#54) issued 10/9/03 to be placed under seal immediately. The Court also requests the University of Oregon School of Law Resources (United States District Court Documents) to withdraw this opinion because it should not have been published or made part of the public record. (sm, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                        Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Unlawful Employment Discrimination. Filed by Jorge Castro, Emilio Jimenez, Alvaro Martinez, Luis Martinez, Jaime Ruiz, Eduardo Talavera against Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (ljl, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Joint ADR Report
                                                          Second Joint ADR Report. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Kisch, Victor)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                            CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Plaintiffs' MOtion (#61) for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Second Amended Complaint shall be filed by 12/5/2003; Defendant's Dispositive Motions, if any, shall be due by 12/12/2003. No further extensions will be allowed. (sm, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                              Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file second amended complaint. Expedited Consideration requested. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Defendant's Motion (#59) for Extension of Time is GRANTED: Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2003. On the Court's own motion, the following deadlines are extended: Pretrial Order due by 3/26/2004; Trial Documents due by Noon, 4/2/2004. All other dates remain as previously set. (sm, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003, Terminated: 11/20/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Kisch, Victor)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Plaintiff's Motion (#57) for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint, although not opposed by Defendant, is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Local Rule 15.1(c)(1) which requires Plaintiffs to tender a single pleading that reproduces all previous allegations of Plaintiffs' Complaint and includes the allegations of the proposed supplemental complaint. Plaintiffs, therefore, must file a new motion with a pleading that complies with LR 15.1(c)(1) no later than 11/21/2003, to the extent they wish to make the proposed supplemental complaint of record. (sm, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Motion for Leave
                                                                      Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Remark
                                                                        Letter dated 10/10/03 from Don S. Willner in response to Mr. Kisch. Remark: (ljl, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Returned Mail
                                                                          Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Mail sent to Don S. Willner, attorney returned as undeliverable. Resent to 621 SW Morrison, Suite 1440, Portland, OR 97205. Called law firm and requested change of address. (Related documents(s) [43]) (ljl, ) Modified on 10/20/2003 (ljl, ).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            Opinion and Order FILED UNDER SEAL. For the reasons stated in the opinion and order, the Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed 10/9/03 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (Related document(s)[22]) (ljl, ) Modified on 12/8/2003 (sm, ).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 Supplement
                                                                              Supplement filed as Additional Authority. Filed by all plaintiffs. (sm, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Proceedings (Oral Argument) before Judge Anna J. Brown. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Don Wilner; Michael Dale. Counsel Present for Defendant: Victor Kisch. Court Reporter: Dennis Grube. ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is taken under advisement as of 9/18/2003. (Related documents(s) [22]) (sm, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                  CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Oral Argument on Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (#22) set for 9/24/2003 is STRICKEN and RESET to 9/18/2003 at 01:30PM. (Related documents(s) [22]) (sm, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                    CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Defendant's Motion (#49) for Extension of Deadlines is GRANTED as follows: Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report, filing of Dispositive motions, amendment of pleadings and joinder of parties to be completed by 11/21/2003. Pretrial Order due by 3/19/2004. Trial Documents due by Noon, 3/29/2004. Pretrial Conference RESET for 4/12/2004 at 09:30AM. Oral Argument on Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (#22) set for 9/24/2003 at 2:30 p.m. (sm, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                      Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Deadlines. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (ljl, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                        Supplemental Affidavit of Dennis E. Westlind in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Related document(s)[22]) (ljl, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Objection
                                                                                          Objection(s) to Plaintiffs' Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (ljl, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 reply to motion
                                                                                            Reply to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Related motion(s)[22]) (ljl, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Reply
                                                                                              Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Concise Statement of Material Facts. FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Related document(s)[36]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Scheduling
                                                                                                CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of the Court's Opinon & Order (7/15/03) to: Ronnie McNaughton, 13390 SW Farmington Rd, Beaverton, OR 97005 (ljl, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Order on Motion - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                  OPINION AND ORDER: for the reasons in the 9 page opinion and order, the Court finds McNaughton in contempt for his failure to appear at deposition after being subpoenaed. The Court also GRANTS in part that portion of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause (#16) and Plaintiffs' Statement of Costs(Related Doc #[20]) as specified herein. Accordingly, the Court orders McNaughton to pay to Don S. Willner, as counsel for Plaintiffs, the sum of $58.97 as compensation for costs incurred as a result of McNaughton's noncompliance. Signed on 7/15/03 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljl, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                    CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Defendant's Motion (#41) for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant's Reply in support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment shall be due by 7/15/2003; and the Motion will be taken under advisement as of 7/15/2003. (Related documents(s) [22]) (sm, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                      Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion # [22]. for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (ljl, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                        CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Plaintiff's Motion (#34) for Leave to File Amended Response to Defendant's Concise Statement of Material Fact is GRANTED. (sm, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                          Affidavit of Matthew U'Ren. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                            Affidavit of Don S. Willner in Connection with the Rule Requiring Consultation Before Filing a Motion. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                              Certificate of Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[34], [35], [36]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Response
                                                                                                                Amended Response to Defendant's Concise Statement of Materal Facts. FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[23]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                  Affidavit of D. Michael Dale. FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                    Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Amended Response to Defendant's Concise Statement of Material Fact. FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[30], [31], [32]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Don S. Willner. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[30]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 Response
                                                                                                                          Response to Defendant's Concise State of Materal Facts. FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[23]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition to Partial Summary Judgment. FILED UNDER SEAL. ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related motion(s)[22]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Defendant's Unopposed Motion (#28) for Extension of Deadlines is GRANTED as follows: Completion of Discovery, amendment of pleadings and joinder of parties completed by 8/29/2003. Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 8/29/2003. Dispositive Motions due by 8/29/2003. Trial Documents due by Noon, 3/15/2004. Pretrial Conference RESET for 4/5/2004 at 09:30AM. Jury trial remains set for 4/27/2004. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion (#22) for Summary Judgment due by 6/26/2003; Defendant's reply due 7/10/2003. (sm, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003, Terminated: 6/23/2003 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Westlind, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. The parties have leave to file an Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines no later than 4:30 PM on 6/17/2003. (sm, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Rhonda Meadows in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Related document(s)[22]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Dennis E. Westlind in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Related document(s)[22]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (Related document(s)[22]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                          Concise Statement of Material Fact FILED UNDER SEAL. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                            Motion for Partial Summary Judgment FILED UNDER SEAL. Oral Argument Requested. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order To Show Cause Hearing before Judge Anna J Brown. Plaintiff's is to File a Supplemental Memorandum Confirming McNaughton's compliance with the Court's Order due by 6/6/2003. (See Minute Order for Full Text). Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Don S Wilner. Counsel Present for Defendant: Dennis E Westlind. Court Reporter: Katie Bradford. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Motion
                                                                                                                                                Motion filed as Statement of Costs. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service of serving Order to Show Cause upon Ron McNaughton. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service. Service of Order to Show Cause upon Ron McNaughton at 13390 SW Farmington Rd., Beaverton Oregon. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[15]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation and Order Regarding Luis Martinez. FILED UNDER SEAL Signed 5/14/03 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Order to Show Cause. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Order to Show Cause: Signed 5/15/03 by Judge Anna J. Brown. Order to Show Cause hearing set for 5/27/2003 at 11:00AM in Portland for Ron McNaughton who failed to appear for his deposition at 9:00 on 5/14/03. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Proceeding (Hearing) -- ORDER: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion (#11) for Extension of Deadlines is GRANTED. All prior deadlines, including Jury Trial set for 7/29/2003, are STRICKEN. New deadlines are set as follows: Amend pleadings, Join parties, and Discovery to be completed by 6/16/2003. Pretrial Order due by 10/31/2003. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 6/16/2003. Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2003. Trial Documents due by Noon, 2/2/2004. Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2004 at 01:30PM. Jury Trial (5-days) set for 4/27/2004 at 09:00AM. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Don Wilner. Counsel Present for Defendant: Dennis Westlind. Court Reporter: Julie Colling. (sm, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion (#11) for Extension of Deadlines is set for 2/24/2003 at 02:00 PM by Telephone. The Court will initate the call to counse. (Related documents(s) [11]) Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sm, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Joint ADR Report
                                                                                                                                                                Joint ADR Report. Parties do not believe that Alternate Dispute Resolution would be productive until after the completion of the depositions. Filed by all parties. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulated Protective Order: Signed 10/22/02 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                      Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Proceedings (Rule 16 Conference) -- Discovery to be completed by 1/31/2003. Pretrial Order due by 6/13/2003. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 2/7/2003. Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2003. Trial Documents due by Noon, 6/30/2003. Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2003 at 09:00AM. Jury Trial (5-days) set for 7/29/2003 at 09:00AM. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Don Willner. Counsel Present for Defendant: Dennis Westlind. Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. (sm, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 Attorney Substitution
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Substitution of Attorney Don S. Willner in place of Attorney Matthew A.C. U'Ren. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Rule 16 Conference set for 9/19/2002 at 08:15AM in Chambers. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses (Related Doc # [1]). Filed by Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed upon Debra Vail for Metro Metals on 7/1/02. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: Case assigned to the Honorable Anna J. Brown. Discovery to be completed by 10/24/2002. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 11/22/2002. Pretrial Order due by 11/22/2002. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                      Complaint Unlawful Employment Discrimination, Race, and Sex Discrimiantion, Hostile Work Environment and Unpaid Wages Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 444840 issued Summons issued as to Metro Metals Northwest. Filed by Jorge Castro, Emilio Jimenez, Alvaro Martinez, Luis Martinez, Jaime Ruiz, Eduardo Talavera against Metro Metals Northwest Inc. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?