Chinn v. Belfer et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-01392-JO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wai Chinn, Plaintiff

Represented by Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by The Banks Law Office, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S. Banks, Jr. +1 503 222 7475 +1 503 467 7689 bob@bankslawoffice.com
v.
No Logo Andrew S. Fastow, Defendant
Arthur Andersen LLP Arthur Andersen LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindsay Hart Neil & Weigler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay W. Beattie +1 503 226 7677 +1 503 226 7697 jbeattie@lindsayhart.com
Space Carl R. Neil +1 503 226 7677 +1 503 226 7697 cneil@lindsayhart.com
No Logo Bruce Willison, Defendant
No Logo Charles A. LeMaistre, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Charls Walker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Frank Savage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Herbert S. Winokur, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Jeffrey K. Skilling, Defendant
No Logo Jerome J. Meyer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Joe E. Foy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo John A. Urquhart, Defendant
No Logo John H. Duncan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo John Mendelsohn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo John Wakeham, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Ken L. Harrison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Joseph Pedersen +1 503 294 9408 +1 503 220 2480 ajpedersen@stoel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tonkon Torp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary W L Wright +1 503 802 2041 +1 503 802 3741 zach.wright@tonkon.com
Space William F. Martson, Jr. +1 503 802 2005 +1 503 972 3705 rick.martson@tonkon.com
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ken L. Lay"
No Logo Norman P. Blake, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche, Defendant
No Logo Richard Causey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Robert A. Belfer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Robert Jaedicke, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Ronnie C. Chan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Wendy L. Gramm, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey C Dobbins +1 503 727 2182 +1 503 727 2222 jdobbins@perkinscoie.com
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com
Office Portland
Filed 10/10/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442 Petition for Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Outside State
Terminated 2/26/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 0201-00262[Multnomah County Circuit Court]
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
Conditional Transfer Order dated 3/4/03 transfering case to the USDC for the Southern District of Texas pursuant to MDL docket #1446. Signed & sealed 2/14/03 by Judge Wm. Terrell Hodges/Chairman of the MDL Panel. (Kirk, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Remark
    Original case file & certified copies of the docket sheet & transfer order mailed to the Southern District of Texas. (Related documents(s) [27]) (Kirk, )
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Motion HearingCourt Filing
      CIVIL MINUTES:Record of ORDER that based upon the 2/14/03 order of the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to the Southern District of Texas, MDL No. 1446, plaintiff's motion to remand (#9) and defendants' motion to transfer (#13) and any other pending motions are denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Robert Jones. (md, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Order
        Preliminary Conditional Transfer Order: Order dated 2/14/03 that this case will be transferred to the Southern District of Texas & assigned to the Honorable Melinda Harmon for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to MDL docket #1446 upon receipt of final transfer order. Signed 2/14/03 by Wm. Terrell Hodges, Chairman MDL Panel. (Kirk, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Order on Motion - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          ORDER:Record of Order: Defendants' alternative motion (#13) to stay consideration of plaintiff's motion to remand pending MDL Panel action on CTO-8 is granted through February 28, 2003. If the MDL Panel has not issued a ruling by that date, this court will hold oral argument on plaintiff's remand motion on an expedited basis.(Related Doc #[13]) by Judge Robert E. Jones. (dls, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Notice
            Notice of Outside Director Defendants' Joinder in Defendant Ken L. Harrison's Reply Memorandum in Support of His Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) or, in the Alternative, to Stay Consideration of Plaintiff's Remand Motion Pending MDL Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407. Filed by Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, Joe E. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, John Mendelsohn, Jerome J. Meyer, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charls Walker, Herbert S. Winokur Jr.. (Related document(s)[21]) (mja, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Declaration
              Supplemental Declaration of Zachary W.L. Wright Regarding Remand and Venue Motions. Filed by Ken L. Harrison. (Related document(s)[13]) (mja, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Reply
                Reply Memorandum of Ken L. Harrison in Support of Harrison's Motions to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) OR, in the Alternative to Stay Consideration of Plaintiff's Remand Motion Pending MDL Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407 REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. Filed by Ken L. Harrison. (Related document(s)[13]) (mja, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/5/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                  Certificate of Service. Filed by Wai Chinn. (Related document(s)[18], [19]) (mja, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/5/2002 Response
                    Response Filed as: Opposition to Motion To Transfer Venue or in the Alternative to Stay Consideration of Plaintiff's Remand Motion Pending MDL Transfer Under 28 USC 1407. Filed by Wai Chinn. (Related document(s)[13]) (mja, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/5/2002 Reply
                      Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Remand. Filed by Wai Chinn. (Related document(s)[9]) (mja, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
                        CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Motion [#9] to remand and motion [#13] to transfer or stay are under advisement as of 11/29/02. Unopposed motion [#8] for extension of deadlines is moot -- all deadlines stayed pending decision on motions [#9] and [#13]taken under advisement as of 11/29/2002. (Related documents(s) [9], [13]) Ordered by Judge Robert E. Jones. (mja, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 Declaration
                          Declaration of Zachary W.L. Wright in Support of Defendant Ken L. Harrison's Consolidated Memorandum Regarding Remand and Venue Transfer Issues. Filed by Ken L. Harrison. (Related document(s)[13]) (mja, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 Memorandum
                            Memorandum of Defendant Ken L. Harrison (1) in Opposition to Plaintiff's Remand Motion and (2) in Support of Harrison's Motions to Transfer Venue Under 18 USC 1404(a) or, in the Alternative to Stay Consideration of Plaintiff's Remand Motion Pending MDL Transfer Under USC 1407 REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT ON ALL MOTIONS. Filed by Ken L. Harrison. (Related document(s)[13]) (mja, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 Notice
                              Notice of Outside Director Defendants' Joinder in Defendant Ken L. Harrison's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC 1404(a) or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Consideration of Plaintiff's Remand Motion Pending MDL Transfer Under USC 1407. Filed by Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Ronnie C. Chan, John H. Duncan, Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, Joe E. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Robert Jaedicke, Charles A. LeMaistre, John Mendelsohn, Jerome J. Meyer, Frank Savage, John Wakeham, Charls Walker, Herbert S. Winokur Jr.. (Related document(s)[13]) (mja, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 Motion
                                Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC 1404(a) or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Consideration of Plaintiff's Remand Motion Pending MDL Transfer Under USC 1407 ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED. Filed by Ken L. Harrison. (mja, ) Modified on 11/21/2002 (mja, ).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                  Certificate of Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[9], [10], [11]) (cmm)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 Affidavit
                                    Affidavit of Robert S. Banks, Jr.. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[9]) (cmm, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002 Memorandum in Support
                                      Memorandum in Support. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[9]) (cmm, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/8/2002, Terminated: 2/26/2003 Motion to Remand
                                        Motion to Remand . EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED. Filed by all plaintiffs. (cmm, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002, Terminated: 11/27/2002 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                          Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines [Defendant Ken L. Harrison's Unopposed Motion for Order Enlarging Time or Staying Schedule for Filing Pleadings or Motions Responsive to Complaint]. Filed by Ken L. Harrison. (cmm, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Case Reassignment NoticeCourt Filing
                                            Notice of Case Reassignment by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty: Case reassigned from Ancer L. Haggerty to Robert E. Jones. (rtrb, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                              Notice of Dismissal of Party LJM Cayman LP; LJM2 Cayman Co-Investment LP; Chewco Investments LP and Joint Energy Development Investments Limited Partnership. Filed by all plaintiffs. (rtrb, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Case Reassignment Notice
                                                Notice of Case Reassignment : Case reassigned from Helen J. Frye to Ancer L. Haggerty. (jlr, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                  Certificate of Service. Filed by Ken L. Harrison. (Related document(s)[3], [1]) (cmm)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                    Supplemental Amended Complaint Notice of Removal. DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed by Ken L. Harrison against Wai Chinn. (cmm, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Discovery Order
                                                      Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: Case assigned to the Honorable Helen J. Frye. Discovery to be completed by 2/7/2003. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 3/10/2003. Pretrial Order due by 3/10/2003. (jlr, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Notice of Removal
                                                        Notice of Removal from Multnomah County Circuit Court (0201-00262). Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 446618 issued. Filed by Ken L. Harrison against Arthur Andersen LLP, Robert A. Belfer, Norman P. Blake Jr., Richard Causey, Ronnie C. Chan, Chewco Investments LP, John H. Duncan, Andrew S. Fastow, Paulo V. Ferraz Pereira, Joe E. Foy, Wendy L. Gramm, Ken L. Harrison, Robert Jaedicke, Joint Energy Development Investments Limited Partnership, LJM Cayman LP, LJM2 Cayman Co-Investment LP, Ken L. Lay, Charles A. LeMaistre, Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche, John Mendelsohn, Jerome J. Meyer, Frank Savage, Jeffrey K. Skilling, John A. Urquhart, John Wakeham, Charls Walker, Bruce Willison, Herbert S. Winokur Jr.. (jlr, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 176 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?