Yeakle et al v. City of Portland et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-01447-HA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Angelique Yeakle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Johnson +1 503 473 8310 +1 503 295 0676 edjohnsonolc@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc E. Jolin +1 503 727 2000 +1 503 727 2222 marcejolin@yahoo.com
No Logo Teresa Sheffer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Johnson +1 503 473 8310 +1 503 295 0676 edjohnsonolc@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc E. Jolin +1 503 727 2000 +1 503 727 2222 marcejolin@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo City of Portland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space William W. Manlove, III +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 bmanlove@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space William W. Manlove, III +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 bmanlove@ci.portland.or.us
Office Portland
Filed 10/25/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Multnomah
Terminated 6/23/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, IFP, TERMINATED
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004 Returned Mail
Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Judgment[55] sent to Oregon Law Center, Marc E. Jolin returned as undeliverable. (Will resend) (pvh, )
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
    Stipulated Judgment of Dismissal: It is ordered that this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or disbursements or attorney fees to any party. Signed on 6/23/04 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (md, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Notice of Change of Address
      Notice of Change of Address of Counsel, Edward Johnson and Spencer M. Neal. Filed by Spencer M. Neal appearing on behalf of all plaintiffs.(pvh, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
        ORDER: It is order that defendants' motion for reconsideration is denied. Signed on 4/5/04 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (md, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Memorandum in Opposition
          Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration of Order on motion for summary judgment,,, [49][50]. Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle. Reply due by 4/1/2004 for [50],. (pvh, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
            Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration. Oral Argument Requested. Filed by City of Portland, Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc.. (Related document(s) [50]).(pvh, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Motion for Reconsideration
              Motion for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order dated February 26, 2004. Oral Argument Requested. Filed by City of Portland, Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc.. (pvh, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                ORDER: Opinion and Order Granting plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Related Doc #[30]), Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Related Doc #[33]). Defendants are liable to plaintiffs for compensatory damages for violations of their constitutional rights. Signed on 2/26/04 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (md, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 48 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                  CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Oral Argument on motions for summary judgment before Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Ed Johnson. Counsel Present for Defendant: Harry Auerbach. Court Reporter: D.Apodaca. ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for leave to file supplemental authority. Order taking motions for summary judgment under advisement. (Related documents(s) [33], [30]) (md, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Motion for Leave
                    Motion for Leave to file supplemental authority. Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle. (md, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 46 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                      CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order setting oral argument on motions for summary judgment for oral argument on February 2,2004 at 1:30pm before Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. (Related documents(s) [33], [30]) (md, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                        Notice of Address Change for Edward Johnson and Spencer Neal, counsel for plaintiffs to 700 SW Taylor, Ste 205, Portland, OR 97205. Filed by all plaintiffs. (md, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 44 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Scheduling
                          CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order that the court will vacate the pretrial lodging date of August 15,2003. The court will set a new pretrial lodging date,if necessary,after the court rules on the pending summary judgment motions. (md, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Reply
                            Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[41]) (rtrb, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Response to Motion
                              Response to Motion for Summary Judgment Oral Argument Requested. Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle. (Related motion(s)[33]) (rtrb, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Response to Motion
                                Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by City of Portland, Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc.. (Related motion(s)[30]) (rtrb, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 40 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                  CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order granting City Defendants' motion for extension of time to file responses to all pending summary judgment motions to August 4,2003 by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. Response due by 8/4/2003. (Related documents(s) [33], [30]) (md, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Affidavit
                                    Affidavit of Jarru Auerbach (In Support of City Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment). Filed by City of Portland, Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc.. (Related document(s)[38]) (rtrb, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                      Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion # [30]. to and including August 4, 2003. Filed by City of Portland, Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc.. (rtrb, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Affidavit
                                        Affidavit of Mark Warrington in support of motion for summary judgment. Filed by City of Portland, Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc.. (Related document(s)[33]) (md, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Affidavit
                                          Affidavit of Jennifer Polver in support of defendants'motion for summary judgment. Filed by City of Portland, Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc.. (Related document(s)[33]) (md, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Memorandum in Support
                                            Memorandum in Support of defendants' motion for summary judgment. Filed by City of Portland, Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc.. (Related document(s)[33]) (md, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                              Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by City of Portland, Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc.. (md, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003, Terminated: 7/24/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                Motion for Summary Judgment .Oral Argument Requested. Filed by City of Portland, Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc.. (md, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Memorandum in Support
                                                  Memorandum in Support of plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle. (Related document(s)[30]) (md, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                    Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by all plaintiffs. (md, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003, Terminated: 2/26/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                      Motion for Summary Judgment .Oral Argument Requested. Filed by all plaintiffs. (md, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                        CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order granting City defendants' motion for extension of time to file dispostive motions to July 14,2003 and to lodge the pretrial order to August 15,2003. by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. (md, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Affidavit
                                                          Affidavit of Harry Auerbach In Support of Motion For Extension of Time For Filing Dispositive Motions and Lodging Pretrial Order. Filed by City of Portland, Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc.. (Related document(s)[28]) (cib, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                            Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by City of Portland, Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc.. (cib, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order granting plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to complete discovery, for disclosure of expert witnesses and exchange of reports and filing of dispositive motions to June 16,2003 and for lodging the pretrial order toJuly 18,2003. by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. Discovery to be completed by 6/16/2003. Pretrial Order due by 7/17/2003. (md, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines to and including June 16, 2003 (Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline). Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle. (rtrb, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                                                  Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant Portland Patrol, Inc. Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle. (rtrb, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                    CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order granting plaintiffs' motion for extension of completion of discovery date, date to file all claims and parties, for filing of dispositive motions and for disclosure of expert witnesses and exchange of reports by May 12,2003 and for the pretrial order to be lodged by June 12,2003. by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. Discovery to be completed by 5/12/2003. Pretrial Order due by 6/12/2003. (md, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                      Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines (Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline to and including May 10, 2003). Filed by all plaintiffs. (rtrb, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                        Answer to Amended Complaint (Related Doc # [19]). Filed by Portland Patrol Services, Inc.. (Albee, Pamela)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Description not available
                                                                          Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle. (rtrb, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                            Amended Complaint Civil Rights 42 USC 1983 Damages, Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Jury Trial Requested. Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle against all defendants. (rtrb, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint. Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint within 20 days of this order. Ordered by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. (md, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Declaration
                                                                                Declaration of Edward Johnson in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to Amend Complaint. Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle. (Related document(s)[16]) (rtrb, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Motion for Leave
                                                                                  Motion for Leave of Court to Amend Complaint. Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle. (rtrb, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Answer
                                                                                    Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses (Related Doc # [3]). Filed by City of Portland, Pioneer Courthouse Square of Portland Inc.. (rtrb, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/5/2002 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                      CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order granting defendant Portland Patrol,Inc's motion for extension of time to file its responsive pleading to December 18,2002. Ordered by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. (md, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                        Affidavit of Pamela R. Albee in Support of Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Portland Patrol Services, Inc.. (Related document(s)[10]) (Albee, Pamela)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                          Affidavit of John Hren in Support of Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Portland Patrol Services, Inc.. (Related document(s)[10]) (Albee, Pamela)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                            Memorandum in Support of Defendant Portland Patrol, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Portland Patrol Services, Inc.. (Related document(s)[10]) (Albee, Pamela)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002, Terminated: 12/5/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                              Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Portland Patrol Services, Inc.. (Related document(s)[3]) (Albee, Pamela)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                Return of Service Executed upon Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc. by Theresa Vetsch on November 15, 2002 at 1345 p.m. Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle. (rtrb, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed upon Portland Patrol Services by John Rhen on November 15, 2002 at 1330 p.m. Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle. (rtrb, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed upon City of Portland by Kim Sneath, Office Manager on November 15, 2002 at 1300 p.m. Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle. (rtrb, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Discovery Order
                                                                                                      Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: Case assigned to the Honorable Ancer L. Haggerty. Discovery to be completed by 3/10/2003. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 4/7/2003. Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2003. (rtrb, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Order on motion/application for leave to proceed iCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER:Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motions for Leave to Proceed IFP (Related Doc #[1])., (Related Doc #[2]). This action may go forward without payment of fees,costs orU.S. Marshal service fees. Order that Clerk shall issue process and the service shall be done by the U.S.Marshal Service and cost of service is waived. Signed on 11/4/02 by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. (md, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002 Case Assignment NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (rtrb, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                            Complaint Civil Rights 42 USC 1983 Damages, Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Jury Trial Requested). Filed by Teresa Sheffer, Angelique Yeakle against all defendants. (rtrb, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002 Application for leave to proceed ifp
                                                                                                              Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Teresa Sheffer. (rtrb, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002, Terminated: 11/4/2002 Application for leave to proceed ifp
                                                                                                                Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Angelique Yeakle. (rtrb, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 116 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?