Watson v. Weeks
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00227-JE

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 12, 2018 at 3:11 AM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Amar Juslen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Roy Vernon Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellen Gradison +1 541 791 3429 +1 503 295 0676 orlawctr@peak.org

Toggle Switch Represented by lclac.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Skipton +5414 851 017 x125 +1 541 342 5091 sskipton@lclac.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily J. Kaufmann +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 jenny.kaufmann@lasoregon.org
Space Leslie N. Kay +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 leslie.kay@lasoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by NATIONAL SENIOR CITIZENS LAW CENTER - WASHINGTON DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric M. Carlson +2136 390 930 x313 +1 213 639 0934 ecarlson@nsclc.org
Space Eugene V. Coffey +1 202 289 6976 +1 202 289 7224 gcoffey@nsclc.org
No Logo Charles E Papst, JR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Roy Vernon Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellen Gradison +1 541 791 3429 +1 503 295 0676 orlawctr@peak.org

Toggle Switch Represented by lclac.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Skipton +5414 851 017 x125 +1 541 342 5091 sskipton@lclac.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily J. Kaufmann +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 jenny.kaufmann@lasoregon.org
Space Leslie N. Kay +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 leslie.kay@lasoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by NATIONAL SENIOR CITIZENS LAW CENTER - WASHINGTON DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric M. Carlson +2136 390 930 x313 +1 213 639 0934 ecarlson@nsclc.org
Space Eugene V. Coffey +1 202 289 6976 +1 202 289 7224 gcoffey@nsclc.org
No Logo Heidi Halter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Roy Vernon Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellen Gradison +1 541 791 3429 +1 503 295 0676 orlawctr@peak.org

Toggle Switch Represented by lclac.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Skipton +5414 851 017 x125 +1 541 342 5091 sskipton@lclac.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily J. Kaufmann +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 jenny.kaufmann@lasoregon.org
Space Leslie N. Kay +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 leslie.kay@lasoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by NATIONAL SENIOR CITIZENS LAW CENTER - WASHINGTON DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric M. Carlson +2136 390 930 x313 +1 213 639 0934 ecarlson@nsclc.org
Space Eugene V. Coffey +1 202 289 6976 +1 202 289 7224 gcoffey@nsclc.org
No Logo Irma Radtke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Roy Vernon Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellen Gradison +1 541 791 3429 +1 503 295 0676 orlawctr@peak.org

Toggle Switch Represented by lclac.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Skipton +5414 851 017 x125 +1 541 342 5091 sskipton@lclac.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily J. Kaufmann +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 jenny.kaufmann@lasoregon.org
Space Leslie N. Kay +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 leslie.kay@lasoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by NATIONAL SENIOR CITIZENS LAW CENTER - WASHINGTON DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric M. Carlson +2136 390 930 x313 +1 213 639 0934 ecarlson@nsclc.org
Space Eugene V. Coffey +1 202 289 6976 +1 202 289 7224 gcoffey@nsclc.org
No Logo Mae Sweeney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily J. Kaufmann +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 jenny.kaufmann@lasoregon.org
No Logo Oregon Advocacy Center, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Roy Vernon Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellen Gradison +1 541 791 3429 +1 503 295 0676 orlawctr@peak.org

Toggle Switch Represented by lclac.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Skipton +5414 851 017 x125 +1 541 342 5091 sskipton@lclac.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily J. Kaufmann +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 jenny.kaufmann@lasoregon.org
Space Leslie N. Kay +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 leslie.kay@lasoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by NATIONAL SENIOR CITIZENS LAW CENTER - WASHINGTON DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric M. Carlson +2136 390 930 x313 +1 213 639 0934 ecarlson@nsclc.org
Space Eugene V. Coffey +1 202 289 6976 +1 202 289 7224 gcoffey@nsclc.org
No Logo Robert Woodford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Roy Vernon Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellen Gradison +1 541 791 3429 +1 503 295 0676 orlawctr@peak.org

Toggle Switch Represented by lclac.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Skipton +5414 851 017 x125 +1 541 342 5091 sskipton@lclac.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily J. Kaufmann +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 jenny.kaufmann@lasoregon.org
Space Leslie N. Kay +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 leslie.kay@lasoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by NATIONAL SENIOR CITIZENS LAW CENTER - WASHINGTON DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric M. Carlson +2136 390 930 x313 +1 213 639 0934 ecarlson@nsclc.org
Space Eugene V. Coffey +1 202 289 6976 +1 202 289 7224 gcoffey@nsclc.org
No Logo Shelli A Cameron, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Roy Vernon Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellen Gradison +1 541 791 3429 +1 503 295 0676 orlawctr@peak.org

Toggle Switch Represented by lclac.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Skipton +5414 851 017 x125 +1 541 342 5091 sskipton@lclac.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily J. Kaufmann +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 jenny.kaufmann@lasoregon.org
Space Leslie N. Kay +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 leslie.kay@lasoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by NATIONAL SENIOR CITIZENS LAW CENTER - WASHINGTON DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric M. Carlson +2136 390 930 x313 +1 213 639 0934 ecarlson@nsclc.org
Space Eugene V. Coffey +1 202 289 6976 +1 202 289 7224 gcoffey@nsclc.org
No Logo William W Watson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Roy Vernon Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellen Gradison +1 541 791 3429 +1 503 295 0676 orlawctr@peak.org

Toggle Switch Represented by lclac.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Skipton +5414 851 017 x125 +1 541 342 5091 sskipton@lclac.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily J. Kaufmann +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 jenny.kaufmann@lasoregon.org
Space Leslie N. Kay +1 503 224 4086 +1 503 295 9496 leslie.kay@lasoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by NATIONAL SENIOR CITIZENS LAW CENTER - WASHINGTON DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric M. Carlson +2136 390 930 x313 +1 213 639 0934 ecarlson@nsclc.org
Space Eugene V. Coffey +1 202 289 6976 +1 202 289 7224 gcoffey@nsclc.org
v.
No Logo Allen Duoma, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Greene Georges +1 503 378 6313 +1 503 378 3465 katherine.georges@doj.state.or.us
No Logo Bruce Goldberg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Greene Georges +1 503 378 6313 +1 503 378 3465 katherine.georges@doj.state.or.us
No Logo Gary Weeks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen K. Bushong +1 503 378 6313 +1 503 378 3465 Stephen.bushong@state.or.us
Space Katherine Greene Georges +1 503 378 6313 +1 503 378 3465 katherine.georges@doj.state.or.us
No Logo James Toews, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen K. Bushong +1 503 378 6313 +1 503 378 3465 Stephen.bushong@state.or.us
Space Katherine Greene Georges +1 503 378 6313 +1 503 378 3465 katherine.georges@doj.state.or.us
No Logo Lynn Read, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen K. Bushong +1 503 378 6313 +1 503 378 3465 Stephen.bushong@state.or.us
Space Katherine Greene Georges +1 503 378 6313 +1 503 378 3465 katherine.georges@doj.state.or.us
Office Portland
Filed 2/20/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 444 - Civil Rights: Welfare
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Multnomah
Terminated 7/23/2008
Origin 3
Reopened 6/12/2006
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '04-35704'['9th Circuit']
Def Custody Status
Flags F&R, IFP, REOPENED, TERMINATED
  Entries (210) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT: Based on the Order adopting the Findings and Recommendation (#[197]) in its entirety, defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (#[157]) is granted and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed on July 23, 2008 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (eo)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
    ORDER: Plaintiff's objections have been scrutinized, and this court has undertaken a de novo review of the Findings and Recommendation at issue. The Objections (#[201]) are overruled. The Findings and Recommendation (#[197]) is sound and persuasive, and is adopted in its entirety. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (#[157]) is granted. Signed on July 23, 2008 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (eo)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 204 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Findings & Recommendation ReferredCourt Filing
      RECORD OF ORDER: Judge Jelderks' Findings & Recommendation (#[197]), filed 4/2/2008, is ready for review before Judge Haggerty. Objections (#[201]) and responses (#[203]) have been filed. (eo)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendatio
        Response to Objections to Findings and Recommendation. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 202 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Administrative Correction of the Record
          Order for Administrative Correction of the Record regarding Plaintiff's Objections to Findings & Recommendation (#[201]) filed by Mae Sweeney. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a), the Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and to notify all parties accordingly. NOTE: This document was filed using the wrong event. The docket text has been corrected to indicate that this pleading is an Objection to the Findings & Recommendation, in accordance with the caption on the pleading. (eo)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008, Terminated: 4/28/2008 Objections to Magistrate Judges Order
            Objections to Findings & Recommendation (#[197]) by Mae Sweeney. Filed by Mae Sweeney. (Neal, Spencer) Modified to indicate correct event on 4/29/2008 (Oss, Eric).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 200 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
              RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: GRANTING Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Objection to Findings & Recommendation (#[198]). Responses to any objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 5/14/2008. (eo)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                Affidavit of Katherine G. Georges in Support of Motion. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Objection to F & R, [198].) (Georges, Katherine)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008, Terminated: 4/21/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to O
                  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Objection to Findings & Recommendation: Motion for Summary Judgment[157] should be GRANTEDFindings & Recommendation: Motion for Summary Judgment[157] should be GRANTEDFindings & Recommendation: Motion for Summary Judgment[157] should be GRANTEDFindings & Recommendation: Motion for Summary Judgment[157] should be GRANTED[197]. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008, Terminated: 7/23/2008 Findings and RecommendationCourt Filing
                    FINDINGS & RECOMMENDATION: Defendants' motion for summary judgment (#[157]) should be GRANTED, and a judgment should be entered dismissing this action with prejudice. The above Findings and Recommendation are referred to a United States District Judge for review. Objections, if any, are due April 18, 2008. If no objections are filed, review of the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement on that date. A party may respond to another party's objections within 10 days after service of a copy of the objection. If objections are filed, review of the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement upon receipt of the response, or the latest date for filing a response. Signed on April 2, 2008 by Judge John Jelderks. (eo)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 196 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Motion Hearing
                      MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS: Hearing regarding Motion for Summary Judgment (#[157]) held 1/22/08: ORDER: Motion is taken under advisement as of 1/22/2008. Spencer Neal, Emily Kaufmann and Ellen Gradison present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Katherine Georges present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Grube. John Jelderks presiding. (eo)
                        LREF
                        Blank 195 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 SchedulingCourt Filing
                        RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: RESETTING oral argument on Defendant's motion for summary judgment (#[157]) from the current date of 12/31/07, to Tuesday, 1/22/2008 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. The Court will initiate calls to counsel. (eo)
                          LREF
                          Blank 194 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 SchedulingCourt Filing
                          RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: SETTING oral argument on Defendant's motion for summary judgment (#[157]) for Monday, 12/31/2007 at 09:30 a.m. in Courtroom 12B. (eo)
                            LREF
                            Blank 193 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Order on Motion to SupplementCourt Filing
                            RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: GRANTING Defendant's unopposed motion to supplement the record of summary judgment with transcript of August 21, 2007 hearing (#[190]). The transcript is attached to the Affidavit of Katherine Georges (#[192]). (eo)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                              Affidavit of Katherine G. Georges in Support of Motion to Supplement Record on Summary Judgment with Transcript of August 21, 2007 Hearing. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Supplement[190].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion to Supplement Record on Summary Judgment with Transcript of August 21, 2007 Hearing. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Supplement[190].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007, Terminated: 11/1/2007 Motion to Supplement
                                  Unopposed Motion to Supplement Record on Summary Judgment with Transcript of August 21, 2007 Hearing. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Reply
                                    Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Concise Statement of Facts. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts[184].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts
                                      Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts regarding Motion for Summary Judgment[157]. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Reply
                                        Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[157].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on August 21, 2007 before Judge John Jelderks. Court Reporter: Denise C. Johnson. (eo)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                            Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[157].) (Neal, Spencer)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts
                                              Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts regarding Motion for Summary Judgment[157]. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Neal, Spencer)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Declaration
                                                Declaration of Spencer M. Neal. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion[182].) (Attachments: # (1) Attachment Declaration of Mae Sweeney# (2) Attachment Excerpts from Toews Deposition# (3) Attachment Affidavit of Deanna J. Hartwig) (Neal, Spencer)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment[157] oral argument requested. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Neal, Spencer)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 181 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Status Conference
                                                    MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS: Status Conference held 8/21/07: ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (#[171] & [173]) are DENIED. Defendant's Motion for Protective Order (#[167]) is GRANTED to the extent that Defendants are not required to provide additional discovery until the Court has ruled on Defendants pending Motion for Summary Judgment (#[157]). Defendants Motion for Extension of Time (#[176]) is MOOT. ORDER: GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time as follows: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (#[157]) is due 9/24/07. Defendant's reply is due 10/25/07. Spencer Neal and Emily Kaufmann present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Katherine Georges present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Denise Johnson. John Jelderks presiding. (eo)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 180 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                      CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: The Oral Argument of 8/21/2007 at 9:30AM on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [157] is changed to a Status Conference of that same date/time in Courtroom 12-B. Oral argument on the dispositive motion will be reset at a later date and will be discussed at the Status Conference. (gm)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007 Reply
                                                        Reply in Support of Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time[176].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Response in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time[176]. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Neal, Spencer)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                            Memorandum in Support of Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time[176].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007, Terminated: 8/21/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                              Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Memorandum in Support
                                                                Memorandum in Support Compel Answers to Interrogatories. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to compel[173].) (Neal, Spencer)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Declaration
                                                                  Declaration of Stephen Skipton. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to compel[173].) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Set of Interrogatories) (Neal, Spencer)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007, Terminated: 8/21/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                    Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Neal, Spencer)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Memorandum in Support
                                                                      Memorandum in Support. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to compel[171].) (Neal, Spencer)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007, Terminated: 8/21/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                        Motion to Compel. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Defendants' Responses to Request for Production of Documents# (2) Declaration of Steve Skipton) (Neal, Spencer)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Reply
                                                                          Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Protective Order[167].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Response to Discovery Motion
                                                                            Response to Motion for Protective Order[167]. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Neal, Spencer)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                              Memorandum in Support of Motion for Protective Order. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Protective Order[167].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007, Terminated: 8/21/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                Motion for Protective Order. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Declaration
                                                                                  Declaration of Katherine G. Georges. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Objection[165].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Objection
                                                                                    Objection(s) to Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion[163].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Declaration
                                                                                      Declaration of Spencer M. Neal. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion[163].) (Neal, Spencer)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007, Terminated: 8/21/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                        Monthly Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment[157]. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Neal, Spencer)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 162 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                          RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: SETTING Oral Argument on Defendant's motion for summary judgment (#[157]) for Tuesday, 8/21/2007 at 09:30 a.m. in Portland before Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (eo)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                            Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[157].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                              Affidavit of Genevieve M. Sundet in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[157].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                Affidavit of Katherine G. Georges in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[157].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[157].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007, Terminated: 7/23/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                    Motion for Summary Judgment. Oral Argumentrequested Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                      Answer to Amended Complaint (filed as) Answer to Second Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filed by Lynn Read, James Toews, Gary Weeks, Bruce Goldberg, Allen Duoma, Jean Thorne. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 155 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (#[154]) as follows: The answer to Plaintiff's second amended complaint (#[153]) is due 3/1/07. (eo)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007, Terminated: 2/1/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                          Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                            Second Amended Complaint For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief.Filed by Mae Sweeney, William W Watson against all defendants. (Kaufmann, Emily)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 152 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                              RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: WITHDRAWING Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (#[136]) and STRIKING all deadlines associated with the Motion, based on a letter indicating withdrawal of the motion dated 11/6/06 and received by the Court on 11/8/06. (eo)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 151 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (#[148]) to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (#[136]) as follows: The response to Plaintiff's motion is due by 1/2/2007. (eo)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  Response to Motion for Extension of Time[148]. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Kaufmann, Emily)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Katherine G. Georges in Support of Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time[148].) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006, Terminated: 11/3/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                      Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 147 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Status Conference
                                                                                                                        RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS: Telephonic Status Conference held 9/11/06: ORDER: DENYING Defendant's Motion for Stay of Proceedings (#[143]). ORDER: Responses to the Motion for Summary Judgment (#[136]) are due 12/1/06. ORDER: STRIKING the hearing on 10/17/06 regarding the Motion for Summary Judgment (#[136]). Spencer Neal and Emily Kaufmann present as counsel for plaintiff(s). David Leath present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: None. John Jelderks presiding. (eo)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 146 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          AMENDEDcolor="ff0000"> RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: SETTING a Telephonic Status Conference for Monday, 9/11/06 at 3:00 p.m.. The Court will initiate calls to counsel David Leith (for Plaintiffs) and Spencer Neal (for Defendants). (eo)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 145 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: SETTING a Telephonic Status Conference for Monday, 9/11/06 at 3:30 p.m.. The Court will initiate calls to counsel David Leith (for Plaintiffs) and Spencer Neal (for Defendants). (eo)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Stay of Proceedings or, Alternatively, for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Expedited Consideration Requested)[143]. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Kaufmann, Emily)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006, Terminated: 9/11/2006 Motion for Stay
                                                                                                                                Motion for Stay of Proceedings or, Alternatively, for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Expedited Consideration Requested). Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 142 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: SETTING Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (#[136]) on Judge Jelderks' Oral Argument calendar of 10/17/06 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 12B. (eo)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[136].) (Neal, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                      Affidavit in Support of Motion. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[136].) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of William Watson# (2) Exhibit Affidavit of Deanna Hartwig# (3) Exhibit Affidavit of James Toews) (Neal, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of spencer m. neal in Support of Motion. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[136].) (Neal, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                          Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[136].) (Neal, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006, Terminated: 11/8/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                            Motion for Summary Judgment. oral argument requested Filed by all plaintiffs. (Neal, Spencer)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Withdrawal of Attorney
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney : Timothy P. Baxter as Counsel for Plaintiffs.Filed by Shelli A Cameron, Oregon Advocacy Center, William W Watson, Robert Woodford, Charles E Papst, JR, Heidi Halter, Amar Juslen, Irma Radtke. (eo)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Withdrawal of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Withdrawal of Beth Englander as Counsel for Plaintiff William Watson. Filed by Ellen Gradison, Spencer M. Neal, appearing on behalf of all plaintiffs. (eo)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 134 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: STRIKING the Status Conference currently scheduled for 9/12/06 at 9:30 a.m. in Judge Jelderks' chambers. Counsel for Defendants will contact the court at a later date to reschedule the Status Conference. (eo)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 133 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: SETTING a Status Conference for 9/12/06 at 9:30 a.m. in Judge Jelderks chambers. (eo)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Appeal Record Returned
                                                                                                                                                      Appeal Record Returned (two original volumes and original transcripts #s 89, 103 and 126) returned from the 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal CA 04-35704 [121]. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal, [121] ) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006 Mandate
                                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT of USCA for the 9th Circuit re [04-35704], Notice of Appeal [121]. The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED in PART, REVERSED in PART, REMANDED. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal [121] ) (Attachments: # (1) Opinion booklet# (2) Service List) (pvh, )
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005, Terminated: 6/12/2006 Certificate of Record by Clerk to USCA
                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA for the 9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal CA 04-35704 [121] filed by plaintiffs on 7/21/04. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal, [121] ) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005, Terminated: 6/12/2006 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                            Record on Appeal (entire original file) sent to USCA 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal CA 04-35704 [121]. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal, [121] ) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Administrative Correction of the Record
                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Correction of the Record. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a), the Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and to notify all parties accordingly: Link JUDGMENT from USCA (document #128) with Notice of Preliminary Injunction Appeal filed 6/26/03 (document #80) and unlink it from document #121. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal CA 04-35704 [121]: Appellants' motion for voluntary dismissal of the case as to appellant Irma Radke only is granted. This appeal shall continue as to the remaining appellants. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal, [121] ) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Order of Dismissal of Appeal by USCA
                                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT from USCA for the 9th Circuit DISMISSING Appeal No. 03-35545 regarding the Notice of Appeal filed on 6/26/03 [80] (dmd, ) Modified on 11/23/2004 (Brennan, Laura) (see Administrative Correction of Record filed 11/23/04).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Notification by USCA - 9th Circuit of case number CA 04-35704 for appeal [121] filed by plaintiffs on 7/21/04, including Briefing Schedule. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal, [121] ) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/28/03 before Judge John Jelderks.. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004, Terminated: 9/13/2004 Notification of Appeal Sent
                                                                                                                                                                        Notification of Appeal mailed to USCA - 9th Circuit and to counsel along with copy of docket sheet. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal, [121] ) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service by all plaintiffs re Representation Statement[122], Notice[123], Transcript Designation[124], Notice of Appeal, [121]. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Transcript Designation and Order Form
                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript Designation for the hearing held on 7/28/03 regarding Notice of Appeal, [121]. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal, [121] ) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                              Statement Regarding Transcript, re Notice of Appeal, [121]. Filed by Eric M. Carlson appearing on behalf of all plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Notice of Appeal, [121].)(tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Representation Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                Representation Statement. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal, [121] ) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004, Terminated: 11/22/2004 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appeal To USCA 9th Circuit from judgment and order entered 6/25/04 and from Findings and Recommendations. No appeal fee received. IFP GRANTED 2/25/03. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related Document(s): Order on motion to dismiss,, Order on motion for summary judgment,,,, Order on Findings & Recommendation,, Order on Motion - Miscellaneous, [119], Judgment, [120], Findings & Recommendation, Order,[100] ) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Judgment : It is ordered that judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs on the Fifth Claim of plaintiff's complaint. It is further ordered that plaintiffs' remaining claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 6/25/04 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (md, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: It is ordered that the Findings and Recommendation (Doc. # 100)of Magistrate Judge Jelderks is adopted as follows: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment (Doc. #14) is granted insofar as summary judgment is granted against plaintiffs' Fifth Claim, and plaintiffs' remaining claims are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #53) is denied. Signed on 6/24/04 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (md, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time [117] as follows: Discovery to be completed by 8/18/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 8/18/2004. Pretrial Order due by 9/17/2004. Exchange of Expert Witness Statements must be completed by 9/17/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 9/17/2004. ***Clerk's Note: Counsel are reminded to use the correct case caption of Watson, et al. v. Weeks, et al. on all future pleadings filed in this case.*** (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004, Terminated: 5/19/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Substitution of Parties (Defendant Gary Weeks replacing Defendant Jean Thorne as Director of the Oregon Dept. of Human Services). Filed by Katherine Greene Georges appearing on behalf of all defendants.(Georges, Katherine) Modified on 3/12/2004 to include name being substituted.(gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Related Doc #[114]) as follows: Discovery to be completed by 5/20/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 5/20/2004. Pretrial Order due by 6/21/2004. Exchange of Expert Witness Statements completed by 6/21/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 6/21/2004. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004, Terminated: 2/23/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Withdrawal Of Herb Semmel As Counsel For Plaintiff William Watson. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, ) Modified on 2/10/2004 (tomg, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply To Defendants' Post-Briefing Responsive Argument On Clayworth v. Bonta. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Motion to Supplement the Record with Recent District Court Decision and Motion to Supplement the Pleadings (Corrected Caption). Filed by all plaintiffs. (gm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL MINUTES:Record of order granting plaintiffs' motion to supplement the record with recent 9th Circuit decision and order granting plaintiff's request for leave to file a reply to defendant's response to the plaintiff's submission of the Clayworth v. Bonta case. Reply shoud be filed by February 2,2004. (md, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004, Terminated: 1/22/2004 Motion to Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Supplement the Record with Recent Ninth Circuit Decision and Motion to Supplement the Pleadings. Filed by all plaintiffs. (gm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Authority on Plaintiffs' Objections to Findings and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/31/2003 Findings & Recommendation ReferredCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Findings and Recommendation (Related documents(s) [100]) is referred to Judge Ancer L. Haggerty for review. Objections/Responses have both been filed. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Related Doc #[104]) as follows: Discovery to be completed by 2/20/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 2/20/2004. Pretrial Order due by 3/22/2004. Exchange of Expert Witness Statements completed by 3/22/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 3/22/2004. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/24/2003 Response to Objections to Findings & RecommendatioCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation of Magistrate Judge on Motions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related motion(s)[100]) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003, Terminated: 12/29/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/12/03 before Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. Court Reporter: Katie Bradford. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/14/2003 Objections to Findings & Recommendation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Filed by all plaintiffs. Response to the objection to the F & R due by 12/24/2003. (Related motion(s)[100]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Address Change for Spencer Neal. Filed by all plaintiffs. (da, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Findings and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Findings & Recommendation: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (the First Four Claims) (Related document(s)[14]) and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (on the Fifth Claim) (Related document(s)[14]) should be granted, and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on the Fifth Claim (Related document(s)[53]) should be denied. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation due by 12/10/2003. Response to the objection to the Findings and Recommendation due by 12/24/2003. Signed on 11/24/03 by Judge John Jelderks.(gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Certificate of Record by Clerk to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA. USDC Notice of Appeal Doc. # [80]and USCA # 03-35545.. . (fh, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time (Related Doc #[97]) as follows: Discovery to be completed by 12/22/2003. Pretrial Order due by 1/21/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 12/22/2003. Exchange of Expert Witness Statements completed by 1/21/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 1/21/2004. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003, Terminated: 9/11/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Order on Motion to SupplementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Supplement Record Regarding Status of Individuals in Service Priority Levels 10 Through 13 (Related Doc #[93]). (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Katherine G. Georges. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[93]) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion to Supplement Record Regarding Status of Individuals in Service Priority Levels 10 through 13. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[93]) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003, Terminated: 9/2/2003 Motion to Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion to Supplement Record Regarding Status of Individuals in Service Priority Levels 10 through 13. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/14/2003 Order on Motion to SupplementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendants' Motion to Supplement Record Regarding Status of Individuals in Service Priority Levels 10 and 11 (Related Doc #[90]). (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Katherine G. Georges. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003, Terminated: 8/14/2003 Motion to Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Supplement Record Regarding Status of Individuals in Service Priority Levels 10 and 11. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings held on June 12, 2003 before Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. Court Reporter: Katie Bradford. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Order on Motion to SupplementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement the Record with Exhibit Referenced but Omitted (in Reference to 7/28/03 Hearing) (Related Doc #[87]). (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Proceedings before Judge John Jelderks: Oral Argument held 7/28/03. Order: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Related documents(s) [14]), Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Related documents(s) [14]) and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Related documents(s) [53]) are taken under advisement as of 7/28/2003. Order: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Related documents(s) [41]) is Moot as the motion has been decided.Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Eric Carlson; Spencer Neal; Stephen Skipton. Counsel Present for Defendant: Katherine Georges. Tape No: 1673/1674/1675. Court Reporter: Ilene TenBrook. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003, Terminated: 7/29/2003 Motion to Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Supplement The Record With Exhibit Referenced But Omitted - Filed In Reference To July 28 Hearing. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Order on Motion to SupplementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Supplement the Record with Notice of Recent Ninth Circuit Opinion (Related Doc #[84]). (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003, Terminated: 7/24/2003 Motion to Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion to Supplement The Record With Notice Of Recent Ninth Circuit Opinion. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003, Terminated: 9/13/2004 USCA Docket Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket number 03-35545 assigned by the United States Court of Appeals. USDC Notice of Appeal Doc. # [80]. . fh, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement Regarding Transcript. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003, Terminated: 9/13/2004 Representation Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Representation Statement . Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003, Terminated: 9/13/2004 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Preliminary Injunction Appeal to USCA For The Ninth Circuit from order #[77] entered on 6/16/03 . No Appeal Fee Received. IFP granted 2/25/03. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[77]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003, Terminated: 9/13/2004 Notification of Appeal Sent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notification of Preliminary Injunction Appeal mailed to USCA for the Ninth Circuit and to counsel along with copy of appealed document and docket sheet, Representation Statement and CADS (FRAP 3(d)((3)) USDC Notice of Appeal Doc. # [80]. . (Related document(s)[80]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Related Doc #[78]) as follows: Discovery to be completed by 9/22/2003. Pretrial Order due by 10/22/2003. Dispositive Motions due by 9/22/2003. Exchange of Expert Witness Statements completed by 10/22/2003. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 10/22/2003. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003, Terminated: 6/23/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/16/2003 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Opinion Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Related Doc #[19]), The case remains with Magistrate Judge Jelderks for resolution of the pending motion to dismiss or for summary judgment filed by defendants and plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed on 6/16/03 by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. (md, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Hearing on plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction before Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. Motion for preliminary injunction #19 taken under advisement by Judge Haggerty. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Spencer Neal, Emily Kaufmann, Eric Carlson. Counsel Present for Defendant: Katherine Georges. Court Reporter: K. Bradford. (Related documents(s) [19]) (md, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Withdrawal Of Paul Alig As Counsel For Plaintiff William Watson. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Affidavit of Deanna J. Hartwig (Second) in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (signed and corrected). Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[72]) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Appearance. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Affidavit of Deanna J. Hartwig (Second) in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendants' Request for Oral Argument on Motions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment (Related documents(s) [43]). Order: Resetting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Related documents(s) [14]) from the Under Advisement Calendar of 6/2/2003 to the Oral Argument Calendar of 7/28/2003 at 09:30AM in Courtroom 12-B (at the time set for oral argument on Plaintiff's summary judgment motion).(gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order to correct the minute orders dated June 5 & 6,2003 to read that Judge Haggerty will hear oral argument ONLY on the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction on June 12,2003 at 10:30AM.The hearing that Judge Jelderks set for the summary judgments will remain on July 28,2003 at 9:30AM before him. (Related documents(s) [53], [14]) (md, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order setting the time for the oral argument scheduled for June 12,2003 on the pending motions for summary judgment, to dismiss and for preliminary injunction for 10:30 AM before Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. Hearing set for 6/12/2003 at 10:30 AM. (md, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order setting oral argument on the defendants' motion to dismiss and or for summary judgment, plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction and plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on the issue of notice claim on Thursday, June 12,2003 by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. (Related documents(s) [53], [19], [14]) (md, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment on Notice Claim. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related motion(s)[53]) (gm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Order on motion to file excess pagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitations Governing Non-Discovery Motions (Related Doc #[62]). (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 5/31/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Margaret Murphy Carley, Deputy Director Oregon Health Care Association. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 5/31/2003 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to Motion (filed as Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunction). Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related motion(s)[19]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply (Combined) in Support of Motions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Corrected). Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003, Terminated: 6/3/2003 Motion to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion to File Excess Pages Governing Non-Discovery Motions. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply (Combined) in Support of Motions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[53], [14]) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Related Doc #[57]) as follows: Replies to responses to dispositive/dismissal motion (Related documents(s) [14]) due by 5/28/2003. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of David E. Leith. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[57]) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003, Terminated: 5/27/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by all defendants. (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of James D. Toews (signed). Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[52]) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Setting Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Related documents(s) [53]) on the Oral Argument Calendar of 7/28/2003 at 09:30AM in Courtroom 12-B. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[53]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Summary Judgment (Oral Argument Requested). Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of James D. Toews and Exhibit (unsigned). Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[19]) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by all defendants. (Related motion(s)[19]) (Georges, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Margaret Murphy Carley, Deputy Director Oregon Health Care Association. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Ellen Gradison Pertaining To Exhibits A,B,C, And D. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response To Defendants' Concise Statement Of Facts. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[16]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to Motion (To Dismiss And For Summary Judgment). Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related motion(s)[14]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Affidavit of Deanna J. Hartwig In Support Of Defendants' Motions To Dismiss And For Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[14]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response To Defendants' Request For Scheduling On Motions To Dismiss And For Summary Judgment. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[43]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Edna Meyer. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003, Terminated: 6/9/2003 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request For Scheduling And For Oral Argument On Motions To Dismiss And For Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment (Related Doc #[39]) as follows: Response to Dismissal and Dispositive Motions due by 5/13/2003. Replies to Responses due by 5/27/2003.Order: Resetting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Related documents(s) [14]) and Motion for Summary Judgment (Related documents(s) [14]) from 5/27/2003 to the under advisement calendar of 6/2/2003. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction. Filed by all defendants. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request For Oral Argument On Preliminary Injunction Motion. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[19]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003, Terminated: 5/5/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File Response To Defendants' Motions To Dismiss And For Summary Judgment. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Georgia Adams, RN, Regarding William Watson. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Meredith Cote, Director, Office Of The Long-Term Care Ombudsman. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Georgia Adams, RN, Regarding William Watson (not an original signature). Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Edna Meyer (not an original signature). Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Shelli A. Cameron. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Margaret Murphy Carley, Deputy Director Oregon Health Care Association. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Joseph Honchosky. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Letty Morgan. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Anita Geistlinger. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Janise Gronholm. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Gene Carpenter. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Raymond Jacobs. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Mary Ellen Pierce, RN, BSN. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of William W. Watson, Jr.. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Brian S. Trafficante, MD. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Jane Radtke. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Robert Joondeph. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support Of Motion For Preliminary Injunction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[19]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003, Terminated: 6/16/2003 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge John Jelderks: Setting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Related documents(s) [14]) and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Related documents(s) [14]) on the under advisement calendar of 5/27/2003. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service. Filed by Lynn Read, Jean Thorne, James Toews. (Related document(s)[14], [15], [16], [17]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Deanna J. Hartwig. Filed by Lynn Read, Jean Thorne, James Toews. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by Lynn Read, Jean Thorne, James Toews. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support Of Motions To Dismiss And For Summary Judgment. Filed by Lynn Read, Jean Thorne, James Toews. (Related document(s)[14]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Lynn Read, Jean Thorne, James Toews. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First Amended Complaint. Filed by Shelli A Cameron, Heidi Halter, Amar Juslen, Oregon Advocacy Center, Charles E Papst JR, Irma Radtke, William W Watson, Robert Woodford against Lynn Read, Jean Thorne, James Toews. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Waiver of Service Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Waiver of Service of Summons-- Accepted by Jean Thorne, Lynn Read, James Toews on 2/25/03.. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: Case assigned to the Honorable John Jelderks. Discovery to be completed by 6/26/2003. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 7/28/2003. Pretrial Order due by 7/28/2003. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Order on Application for special admission pro hacCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Plaintiffs' Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric M. Carlson for Plaintiffs William W Watson, Nida Morris and Charles E Papst. Receipt # 448893. Signed 2/25/03 by Judge John Jelderks. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Order on Application for special admission pro hacCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Plaintiffs' Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Herbert Semmel for Plaintiffs William W Watson, Nida Morris and Charles E. Papst. Receipt # 448893. Signed 2/25/03 by Judge John Jelderks. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Order on Application for special admission pro hacCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Plaintiffs' Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eugene V. Coffey for Plaintiffs William W Watson, Nida Morris and Charles E Papst. Receipt # 448893. Signed 2/25/03 by Judge John Jelderks. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Order on motion/application for leave to proceed iCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER:Order Granting Petitioners' Applications/Motions for Leave to Proceed IFP (Related Doc #[2]) & (Related Doc #[3]). The Clerk shall issue process. Service of the summons and complaint shall be made by the U.S. Marshal's Office. Signed on 2/25/03 by Judge John Jelderks. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Case Reassignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Case Reassignment : Case reassigned from Anna J. Brown to John Jelderks. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Case Assignment NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003, Terminated: 2/26/2003 Application for leave to proceed ifp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Nida Morris, Charles E Papst JR. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003, Terminated: 2/26/2003 Application for leave to proceed ifp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by William W Watson. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003, Terminated: 3/24/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Summons issued as to Jean Thorne, Lynn Read, and James Toews. Filed by Nida Morris, Charles E Papst JR, William W Watson against Lynn Read, Jean Thorne, James Toews. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 203 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?