Chao v. Marshall
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-00625-BR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Chao, Elaine L. Chao, Elaine L., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Elaine Chao"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, PROTECTIVE LIFE CORP
News Corporation Unknown Role, News Corporation
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Unknown Role, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ingersoll-Rand plc

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Labor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Lee Brown +1 206 553 0940 +1 206 553 2768 brown.bruce.l@dol.gov
v.
No Logo Todd Marshall, Defendant
Office Portland
Filed 5/12/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 201 Fair Labor Standards Act - Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Multnomah
Terminated 8/5/2005
Origin 4
Reopened 7/12/2004
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
Judgment and Order. See 4 page order. Signed on 8/12/05 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljl, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
    Judgment and Order. Signed on 8/4/2005 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (See formal judgment and order 4-pages) (ecp, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
      ORDER: Signed on 7/25/05 by Judge Anna J. Brown. For the reasons in the 4 page Opinion and Order, the Court Grants Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment [51] on the Issue of Damages. Plaintiff shall submit a form of Judgment by 8/8/05. (ljl, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
        Affidavit of Larry Benjamin in Support of Motion. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[51].)(ljl, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Concise Statement of Material Fact
          Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[51].)(ljl, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
            Memorandum in Support. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[51].)(ljl, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
              Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Damages. Filed by Elaine Chao. (ljl, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                Opinon and ORDER: Signed on 4/18/05 by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment [46] and DENIES Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief. Plaintiff shall have until 4/29/05 to file a Motion on the issue of the appropriate amount of a monetary judgment against Marshall. (ljl, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 49 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Scheduling
                  CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Anna J. Brown. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file its Concise Statement of Material Facts late. Plaintiff's Concise Statement of Material Facts shall be deemed filed timely.In light of the fact that Defendant Marshall is appearing pro se and Plaintiff filed its Concise Statement of Material Facts related to its Motion for Summary Judgment (#46) on 1/26/05, Defendant shall have until 2/9/05 to file a response, if any. (sm, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Report
                    Plaintiff's Certificate of Compliance with LR 7.1 (with attached Exhibit - Plaintiff's Concise Statement of Material Facts). Filed by Elaine Chao. (sm, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                      Memorandum in Support. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[46].)(ljl, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005, Terminated: 4/18/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                        Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Elaine Chao. (ljl, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 45 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court has completed its consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Deeming Matters Admitted [39] to which Defendant Todd Marshall filed no response. Based on the record, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion. (sm, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                            (Amended) Certificate of Service by Elaine Chao re Motion for Order[39], Memorandum in Support of Motion[40], Declaration[41]. Filed by Elaine Chao. (ljl, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 43 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004 Scheduling
                              CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Anna J. Brown: Defendant Todd Marshall's response to Plaintiff's Motion [39] for Order Deeming Matters Admitted was due 10/28/2004. Because Defendant Marshall is appeareing pro se, the Court sua sponte grants Defendant until 11/18/2004 to file a response. If Defendant fails to file a response by 11/18/2004, the Court will grant Plaintiff's Motion. (sm, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                Certificate of Service by Elaine Chao re Memorandum in Support of Motion[40], Declaration[41]. Filed by Elaine Chao. (ecp, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Declaration
                                  Declaration of Bruce L. Brown in Support o Motion to Deem Matters Admitted. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s): Motion for Order[39].)(ljl, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                    Memorandum in Support of Motion for Order Deeming Matters Admitted. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s): Motion for Order[39].)(ljl, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Motion for Order
                                      Motion for Order Deeming Matters Admitted. Filed by Elaine Chao. (ljl, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 38 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Rule 16 Conference
                                        CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Proceedings: Status Conference. Discovery to be completed by 11/30/2004. Joint Status Report due by 12/10/2004. Bruce Brown present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Todd Marshall, pro se present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Julie Colling. Anna J. Brown presiding. (sm, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 37 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004 Scheduling
                                          CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Anna J. Brown. Status Conference is CONTINUED to 7/29/2004 at 01:30PM by Telephone before Honorable Anna J. Brown. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. (sm, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                            ORDER: Signed on 7/9/04 by Judge Anna J. Brown. Denying as moot Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Judgment [20]; and Granting Defendant Marshall's Motion to Set Aside the Default Judgment [26]. A status conference is set for 7/27/04 at 2:30pm for the purpose of scheduling a further proceedings. (ljl, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                              Certificate of Service by Elaine Chao re Response to Motion[33], Declaration[34]. Filed by Elaine Chao. (ljl, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Declaration
                                                Declaration of Bruce L. Brown in Support of Supplemental Response. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s): Response to Motion[33].)(ljl, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Response to Motion
                                                  Supplemental Response to Defendant Marshall's Motion to Set Aside the Default Judgment[26]. Filed by Elaine Chao.(ljl, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Motion Hearing
                                                    CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Proceedings: Motion Hearing. ORDER: Defendant's Motion [26] to Set Aside Default is taken under advisement as of 4/30/2004. Plaintiff's supplemental memo due 4/21/2004; Defendant's reply due 4/30/2004. Bruce Brown present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Todd Marshall, pro se present for himself. Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. Anna J. Brown presiding. (sm, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                      Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion (#20) to Amend and Defendant's Motion (#26) to Set Aside Default is set for 3/30/2004 at 09:30AM before Honorable Anna J. Brown, Courtroom 14A. (sm, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Declaration
                                                        Declaration of Bruce L. Brown in Response to Marshall's Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s)[29]) (ljl, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Response to Motion
                                                          Response to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related motion(s)[26]) (ljl, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 reply to motion
                                                            Reply to Motion to Amend Default Judgment. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related motion(s)[20]) (ljl, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Memorandum in Support
                                                              Memorandum in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default. Filed by pro se Todd Marshall. (Related document(s)[26]) (ljl, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment
                                                                Motion to Set Aside the Default Judgment. Filed by pro se Todd Marshall. (ljl, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                  Response to Motion to Amend Default Judgment. Filed by pro se Todd Marshall. (Related motion(s)[20]) (ljl, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Answer
                                                                    Answer to Complaint (Related Doc # [1]). Filed by pro se Todd Marshall. (ljl, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                      CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Proceedings (Telephone Conference) before Judge Anna J. Brown. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Bruce Brown. Counsel Present for Defendant: Todd Marshall. Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. ORDER: Further Motion to Set Aside by Defendant due 12/1/2003; Plaintiff's Response due 12/22/2003. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion (#19) to Amend due 12/1/2003; Plaintiff's Reply due 12/22/2003. All motions will be taken under advisement as of 12/22/2003. (Related documents(s) [19], [20]) (sm, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                        CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Status Conference set for 10/30/2003 at 01:30PM by Telephone. The Court will initiate the call. (sm, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003, Terminated: 7/12/2004 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                          Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Default Judgment (FRCP 55(b)). Filed by Elaine Chao. (kw, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003, Terminated: 3/30/2004 Motion
                                                                            Motion to Set Aside Default. Filed by Todd Marshall. (kw, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                              Judgment by Default: Against Defendant Todd Marshall. Signed 9/23/2003 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sm, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                Memorandum in Support of Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s)[17]) (ljl, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                  Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Elaine Chao. (ljl, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT:Order Granting Motion for Default against Todd Marshall (Related Doc #[13]) Signed on 9/15/03 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljl, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Declaration
                                                                                      Declaration of Bruce L. Brown in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant Todd Marshall. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s)[13]) (kw, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                        Affidavit of Larry Benjamin in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Todd Marshall. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s)[13]) (kw, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003, Terminated: 9/16/2003 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                          Motion for Default Judgment (against Defendant Todd Marshall). Filed by Elaine Chao. (kw, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                            Judgment by Default: See Judgment. Signed 8/19/03 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljl, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                              Affidavit of Larry Benjamin Support of Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s)[9]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                Memorandum in Support of Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s)[9]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                  Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Elaine Chao. (ljl, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/14/2003 Waiver of Service Summons
                                                                                                    Waiver of Service of Summons-- Accepted by Todd Marshall on 8/1/03.. Filed by Elaine Chao. (ljl, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/14/2003 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER:Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment (Related Doc #[5])against Defendants Telecommunications Support Systems, and Keith McCollum. Signed on 8/12/03 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljl, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                        Declaration of Bruce L. Brown in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment. Filed by Elaine Chao. (Related document(s)[5]) (ljl, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003, Terminated: 8/12/2003 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                          Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Elaine Chao. (ljl, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Waiver of Service Summons
                                                                                                            Waiver of Service of Summons-- Accepted by Keith McCollum on 5/28/2003.. Filed by Keith McCollum. (sm, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Waiver of Service Summons
                                                                                                              Waiver of Service of Summons-- Accepted by TSSI by Keith McCollum, CEO on 5/28/2003.. Filed by Telecommunications Support Systems, Inc. (sm, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Discovery Order
                                                                                                                Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: Case assigned to the Honorable Anna J. Brown. Discovery to be completed by 9/9/2003. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 10/9/2003. Pretrial Order due by 10/9/2003. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                  Complaint Labor-FLSA. Filed by Elaine Chao against Todd Marshall, Keith McCollum, Telecommunications Support Systems, Inc. (ljl, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 6,659 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?