Ford v. City of Sweet Home Police Department et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:03-cv-06120-AA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Derik E. Ford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dolan Griggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Griggs +1 503 228 7500 +1 503 243 1188 dgriggs@dolangriggs.com
v.
No Logo City of Sweet Home Police Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hart Wagner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kari A. Furnanz +1 503 222 4499 +1 503 222 2301 kaf@hhw.com
Space James P. Martin +1 503 222 4499 +1 503 222 2301 jpm@hhw.com
No Logo Robert F. Burford, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hart Wagner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kari A. Furnanz +1 503 222 4499 +1 503 222 2301 kaf@hhw.com
Space James P. Martin +1 503 222 4499 +1 503 222 2301 jpm@hhw.com
Office Eugene
Filed 5/21/2003
Jury Demand Both
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Linn
Terminated 1/6/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROTECTIVE ORD, TERMINATED
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Judgment*
Judgment: This action is dismissed. Signed January 6, 2005 by Deputy Clerk, Leslie Engdall. (cp, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
    ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [38] is granted and this case is dismissed. All pending motions are denied as moot. Signed on January 5, 2005 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cp, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Motion to Dismiss
      Stipulated Motion to Dismiss (Titled "Stipulated Notice of Dismissal") of Defendant Sweet Home Police Department. Filed by all parties. (cp, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 47 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
        ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [45]. Response due by 12/10/2004. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment taken under advisement as of 1/3/2005 [38]. (lae, )
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
          Affidavit of David H. Griggs in Support of Motion. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (Related document(s): [45])(cp, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004, Terminated: 11/15/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
            Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Motion for Summary Judgment[38]. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (cp, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Declaration
              Declaration of Gretchen Dolan. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[38].)(Furnanz, Kari)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                Affidavit of Kari A. Furnanz in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[38].)(Furnanz, Kari)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                  Affidavit of George Dominy in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[38].)(Furnanz, Kari)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                    Affidavit of Robert Burford in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[38].)(Furnanz, Kari)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                      Concise Statement of Material Fact in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[38].)(Furnanz, Kari)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                        Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[38].)(Furnanz, Kari)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004, Terminated: 1/5/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                          Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Furnanz, Kari)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                            ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents [27] is granted in part and denied in part. (See formal order). Both sides are to bear their own costs in bringing this motion; and the parties' request for oral argument on this matter is denied as unnecessary. Signed on September 7, 2004 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cp, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 36 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO dCourt Filing
                              ORDER: Record of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines [34]. Discovery to be completed by 10/29/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 12/15/2004.Pretrial Order due by 12/15/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2004. by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cp, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Affidavit
                                Affidavit of Patricia M. Pascone. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (Related document(s): [34])(cp, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004, Terminated: 8/25/2004 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                  Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (cp, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to file Response to Motion to Compel [30]. Response due by 8/12/2004. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel [27] taken under advisement as of 8/16/2004. (lae, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Affidavit
                                      Affidavit of Kari A. Furnanz in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s): Response to Motion[31].)(Furnanz, Kari)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Response to Motion
                                        Response to Motion to Compel[27]. Filed by all defendants.(Furnanz, Kari)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004, Terminated: 8/13/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                          Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Compel. Filed by all defendants. (Furnanz, Kari)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                            Affidavit of Patricia M. Pascone in Support of Motion to compel. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (Related document(s): [27] )(cp, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                              Memorandum in Support of Motion to compel. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (Related document(s): [27])(cp, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004, Terminated: 9/8/2004 Motion to Compel
                                                Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Oral Argument Requested). Filed by Derik E. Ford. (cp, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO dCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery & PTO Deadlines [24]. Discovery to be completed and experts disclosed by 8/23/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 9/20/2004. Pretrial Order due by 9/20/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 8/23/2004. (lae, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                    Affidavit of Patricia M. Pascone in Support of Motion. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (Related document(s): [24])(cp, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004, Terminated: 7/16/2004 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                      Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (cp, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                        Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 7/7/04 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lae, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          Record of Order: Pursuant to the County of Kern's County Counsel, this court has reviewed, in camera, the entire file assembled in connection with plaintiff's application for employment with the Kern County Sheriff's Department. The documents were produced by the Kern County Sheriff's Department in response to the Subpoena Duces Tecum issued by the plaintiff dated June 8, 2004. The court notes that the Kern County Sheriff's Department is not a party to this action. After reviewing the documents in conjunction with the applicable statutes and Code of Evidence, the court finds that the attached documents are discoverable and orders them disclosed to the plaintiff. The court finds that some documents are not appropriate for discovery and will withhold those documents from the plaintiff. The documents deemed not discoverable by the court will be returned to the Kern County Sheriff' Department as requested by that agency.Further, the court hereby issues the following Protective Order concerning the documents to be released: The parties are ordered not to use or disclose this material except as necessary in the defense or prosecution of the current litigation or as otherwise directed by the court. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lae, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO dCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery & PTO Deadlines [19]. Discovery to be completed by 7/14/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 8/13/2004. Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2004. (lae, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                              Affidavit of David H. Griggs in Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (Related document(s): [19] )(cp, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004, Terminated: 4/14/2004 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (cp, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                  Notice of Change of Address. Filed by David H. Griggs appearing on behalf of Derik E. Ford.(cp, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO dCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER:Record of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines (Related Doc #[15]). Discovery to be completed and experts disclosed by 4/15/2004. Pretrial Order due by 5/17/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 5/17/2004.Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2004. by Judge Ann Aiken. (lae, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Affidavit
                                                                      Affidavit of David H. Griggs. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (Related document(s)[15]) (cp, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004, Terminated: 1/15/2004 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                        Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines (90 days). Filed by Derik E. Ford. (cp, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Attorney Substitution
                                                                          Notice of Substitution of Attorney David H. Griggs substituted for Dawna F. Scott for Derik E. Ford. (lae, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Order on motion to withdraw/substitute attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER:Record of Order Granting Attorney Dawna F. Scott's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Derik Ford (Related Doc #[11]). Ordered plaintiff allowed until 12/30/03 to notify the court of new counsel or of plaintiff's intention to represent himself in this matter. by Judge Ann Aiken. (lae, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Affidavit
                                                                              Affidavit of Dawna F. Scott in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Derik E. Ford. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (Related document(s)[11]) (cp, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003, Terminated: 10/31/2003 Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Attorney
                                                                                Motion to Withdraw or Substitute an Attorney. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (cp, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO dCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER:Record of Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion Extend Pretrial, Discovery, and PTO Deadlines (Related Doc #[8])/ Discovery to be completed and experts disclosed by 1/16/2004. Pretrial Order due by 2/17/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 2/17/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 1/16/2004. by Judge Ann Aiken. (lae, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                    Affidavit of Counsel in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery & PTO Orders. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (Related document(s)[8]) (cp, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003, Terminated: 8/26/2003 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                      Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines (120 days). Filed by Derik E. Ford. (cp, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Description not available
                                                                                        Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (cp, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Reply
                                                                                          Reply and Affirmative Defenses to Defendant's Counterclaim. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (Related document(s)[5]) (cp, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Answer
                                                                                            Answer to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim. Jury Trial Demanded. (Related Doc # [1]). Filed by Robert F. Burford, City of Sweet Home Police Department. (lae, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                              Return of Service Executed upon Roberth H. Buford on May 28, 2003. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (cp, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                Return of Service Executed upon City of Sweet Home on May 28, 2003. Filed by Derik E. Ford. (cp, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Discovery Order
                                                                                                  Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: Case assigned to the Honorable Ann Aiken. Discovery to be completed by 9/18/2003. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 10/20/2003. Pretrial Order due by 10/20/2003. (cp, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                    Complaint (42 USC 1983, Defamation, False Light, Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress) Jury Trial Requested Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 906372 issued Summons issued as to Robert Burford and Craig Margin, Registered Agent for the City of Sweet Home. Filed by Derik E. Ford against Robert F. Burford, City of Sweet Home Police Department. (cp, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 1,743 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?