Salamanca v. Providence Health System-Oregon
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:03-cv-01773-AA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Cora Salamanca, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
v.
No Logo Providence Health System-oregon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barran Liebman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara E. Russell +1 503 228 0500 +1 503 274 1212 trussell@barran.com
Office Eugene
Filed 12/22/2003
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Multnomah
Terminated 2/15/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMINATED
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Judgment*
Judgment - This action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney fees to any party. Signed on 2/15/06 by Deputy Clerk Leslie Engdall. (lae, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 78 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 OrderCourt Filing
    Record of Order: Granting Stipulation for Judgment of Dismissal [77]. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lae, )
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006, Terminated: 2/15/2006 Stipulation
      Stipulation for Judgment of Dismissal by Providence Health System-Oregon. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Russell, Tamara)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 76 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006 SchedulingCourt Filing
        Record of Order by Ann L. Aiken: Striking pretrial conference set 1/17/06 and jury trial set 1/24/06 as defendant's counsel has advised this case has settled. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lae, )
          LREF
          Blank 75 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 SchedulingCourt Filing
          Scheduling Order by Ann L. Aiken: The deadline for lodging the Pretrial Order is extended to 1/3/2006. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lae, )
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
            ORDER: Noting that the degree of proof required to survive summary judgment under Title VII is minimal, defendant's motion for summary judgment [41] is granted in part and denied in part as follows: defendant's motion is denied as to plaintiff's race discrimination and retaliation claims; defendant's motion is granted as to plaintiff's age discrimination claim. Further defendant's Motion to Strike [68] is denied. The parties' request for oral argument is denied as unnecessary. The court notes that this is a very close case with plaintiff's two remaining claims barely surviving summary judgment. Given the costs of litigation, the parties are encouraged to notify the court if they are interested in pursuing settlement negotiations. Signed on November 28, 2005 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cp, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Declaration
              Declaration of Tamara E. Russell in Support of Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion[72].) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Russell, Tamara)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 reply to motion
                Reply entitled: Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike to Motion to Strike[68]. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon.(Russell, Tamara)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Declaration
                  Supplemental Declaration of D. Michael Dale in Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion. Filed by Cora Salamanca. (Related document(s): [60])(cp, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                    Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Strike[68]. Filed by Cora Salamanca.(cp, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Memorandum in Support
                      Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion to Strike[68].)(Russell, Tamara)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005, Terminated: 11/28/2005 Motion to Strike
                        Motion to Strike. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Russell, Tamara)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 reply to motion
                          Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon.(Russell, Tamara) Modified on 9/19/2005 to create link to document [41](cp, ).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Declaration
                            Declaration of Tamara E. Russell in Support of Defendant's Reply Memorandum. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion[65].) (Attachments: # (1))(Russell, Tamara)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 reply to motion
                              Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Concise Statement of Material Facts and Concise Statement of Additional Facts. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon.(Russell, Tamara) Modified on 9/19/2005 to link to document [62](cp, ).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 64 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Granting Defendant's Motion to Modify Summary Judgment Reply Brief Filing Date [63]. Reply due by 9/16/2005. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment taken under advisement as of 9/19/2005 [41]. (lae, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005, Terminated: 8/25/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply entitled: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Modify Summary Judgment Reply Brief Filing Deadline to Motion for Summary Judgment[41]. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Russell, Tamara)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts
                                    Response to Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by Cora Salamanca. (Related document(s): [42])(cp, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Exhibits
                                      Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment [41]. Filed by Cora Salamanca.(cp, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Memorandum in Opposition
                                        Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment[41] (Oral Argument Requested). Filed by Cora Salamanca.(cp, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 59 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                          ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Answer Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [57]. Response due by 8/22/2005. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment taken under advisement as of 9/12/2005 [41]. (lae, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Declaration
                                            Declaration of D. Michael Dale in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Filed by Cora Salamanca. (Related document(s): [57] )(cp, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005, Terminated: 8/5/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                              Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Motion for Summary Judgment[41]. Filed by Cora Salamanca. (cp, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 56 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                Record of Order: The court received the parties' letters dated July 15, 2005, requesting clarification on the discovery dispute raised in plaintiff's motion to compel [29] and ruled on by minute order [36]. Defendant is ordered to produce the job titles and addresses of those Asian or Pacific Island identified nurses employed by St. Vincent's that defendant has already identified by name. This information is also subject to the Protective Order in place in this case. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lae, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Declaration
                                                  Amended Declaration of Doug Patnode. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[41].) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline by One Business Day [40]. Dispositive motions due 7/18/05. (lae, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Declaration
                                                      Declaration of Tamara E. Russell in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[41].) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Declaration
                                                        Declaration of Elissa Walsh in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[41].)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Declaration
                                                          Declaration of Myrna Serrano in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[41].)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Declaration
                                                            Declaration of Emily Goerke in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[41].)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Declaration
                                                              Declaration of Amber Ralston in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[41].)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Declaration
                                                                Declaration of Luz Sacdal in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[41].)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Declaration
                                                                  Declaration of Sophie Cipriana Kesinger in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[41].)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Declaration
                                                                    Declaration of Doug Patnode. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[41].)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Declaration
                                                                      Declaration of Frederico Calixtro in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[41].) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Declaration
                                                                        Declaration of Lynne Perkins in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[41].)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                          Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[41].)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                            Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment[41].)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005, Terminated: 11/28/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                              Motion for Summary Judgment (Oral Argument Requested). Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005, Terminated: 7/18/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time entitled: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline by One Business Day. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Declaration
                                                                                  Declaration of D. Michael Dale. Filed by Cora Salamanca. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition [38])(cp, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination. Filed by Cora Salamanca. (Related document(s): Motion to compel[33].)(cp, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Denying defendant's motion to compel an independent medical examination ([33]. The court does not find "good cause" as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 35(a); further, pursuant to Turner v. Imperial Stores, 161 F.R.D. 89, 96 (S.D. Cal. 1995), the court finds that plaintiff's claim for emotional distress does not rise to the level requiring an IME. (lae, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Plaintiff's motion to compel [29] is ruled on as follows:Motions 2 and 4 have been withdrawn by the plaintiff due to the parties reaching an agreement.Motion 1 is granted with the following limitations: the interrogatory is limited to nurses of Asian or Pacific Islander origin and nurses employed at the St. Vincents facility. Any response by the defendant is subject to a Protective Order that limits the use of this discovery to legitimate purposes in this litigation only. Finally, Motion 3 is denied based on defendant's stipulation that plaintiff's supervisor was not "disciplined or demoted for anything having to do with the [plaintiff]," and that there is nothing in the supervisor's personnel file that "refers or relates" to the plaintiff. (lae,)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Declaration
                                                                                          Declaration of Tamara E. Russell in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion to compel[33].) (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                            Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion to compel[33].)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005, Terminated: 6/27/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                              Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                Declaration of Tamara E. Russell in Support of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Response to Discovery Motion[31].) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005 Response to Discovery Motion
                                                                                                  Response entitled: Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery to Motion to Compel[29]. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon.(Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support of Motion to compel discovery. Filed by Cora Salamanca. (Related document(s): [29])(cp, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005, Terminated: 6/20/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                      Motion to Compel Discovery. Filed by Cora Salamanca. (cp, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                        CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Ann L. Aiken amending the deadlines set forth in the court's minute order of 4/25/05 as follows: Pretrial Documents due by 1/9/2006. Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2006 at 10:00AM in Portland before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Estimated 3 day Jury Trial set for 1/24/2006 at 09:00AM in Portland before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lae, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                          CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Ann L. Aiken: Pursuant to the proposed deadlines submitted by the parties in plaintiff's letter to the court, dated 4/20/05, ordered motions to compel to be filed by 5/5/05. Pretrial Order due by 12/1/2005. Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2005. Expert Discovery to be completed by 8/19/2005. Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2006 at 10:00AM in Portland before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Estimated 3 day Jury Trial set for 1/20/2006 at 09:00AM in Portland before Judge Ann L. Aiken. Ordered proposed voir dire and jury instructions, witness lists (including a time estimate for each witness and a brief description of their testimony), exhibit lists, trial memoranda, proposed verdict forms, motions in limine, and objections to exhibits to be filed by 1/5/2006. Proposed jury instructions and verdict forms to be submitted to the court on disk in WordPerfect 10 for Windows (previous versions of WordPerfect are acceptable). Each party shall also submit a COPY of their exhibits and be prepared to discuss objections to exhibits at the pretrial conference. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lae, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                            CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Ann L. Aiken: The parties shall confer and plaintiff shall provide the court by 4/21/05 with proposed deadlines for completion of discovery, filing of dispositive motions, and lodging of the pretrial order. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lae, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                              RECORD OF ORDER: Judge Hubel will conduct a settlement conference in this matter commmencing at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom #9B, on April 4, 2005. Pre-conference material due 4:30 p.m., March 29, 2005. (see formal order) (kb, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Proceedings: Telephone Status Conference held 3/9/05 at defendant's request to discuss mediation. Defendant requests the court's assistance in finding a Portland judge to conduct a settlement conference. Parties directed to e-mail available dates to the court, after which the court will send out a request to the Portland judges. D. Michael Dale present as counsel for plaintiff. Tamara Russell present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: Kristi Anderson. Ann L. Aiken presiding. (lae, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Ann L. Aiken. Status Conference set at defendant's request for 3/9/2005 at 09:30AM by Telephone to discuss settlement options. The Court will initiate the call. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lae, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Place All Deadlines on Hold until completion of mediation at the end of February, 2005 [21]. (lae, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005, Terminated: 2/1/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                      Motion for Extension of Time entitled: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Place All Deadlines on Hold. Filed by all defendants. (Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO dCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER: Record of Order - by Judge Ann L. Aiken Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines [19]. Discovery to be completed by 1/31/2005. Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2005. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 3/14/2005.Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2005. (cp, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004, Terminated: 11/24/2004 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines entitled: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Modify Discovery Order. Filed by all defendants. (Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO dCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline [16]. Discovery to be completed and experts disclosed by 11/30/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 12/30/2004. Pretrial Order due by 12/30/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Declaration
                                                                                                                              Declaration of D. Michael Dale in Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Cora Salamanca. (Related document(s): [16])(cp, )
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004, Terminated: 10/13/2004 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Cora Salamanca. (cp, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline [13]. Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 11/29/2004. Pretrial Order due by 11/29/2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Declaration
                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Tamara E. Russell in Support of Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time[13].)(Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004, Terminated: 9/21/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                      Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time entitled: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO dCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Modify Discovery Order [11]. Discovery to be completed and experts disclosed by 9/30/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 11/1/2004. Pretrial Order due by 11/1/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004, Terminated: 6/9/2004 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines entitled: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Modify Discovery Order. Filed by all defendants. (Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO dCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Record of Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines [8]. Discovery to be completed and experts disclosed by 6/21/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 7/21/2004. Pretrial Order due by 7/21/2004. Dispositive Motions due by 6/21/2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Declaration
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of D. Michael Dale in Support of Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Cora Salamanca. (Related document(s): [8] )(cp, )
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004, Terminated: 4/26/2004 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Cora Salamanca. (cp, )
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Order on motion for Intra-District TransferCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Ordered by Judge Ann L Aiken: Denying Joint Motion to Reassign Case to Portland Division (Related Doc #[4]). Judge Aiken handles cases (including assigned cases) state-wide, including Eugene, Portland and Medford. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                    Answer to Complaint entitled: Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaim (Demand for Jury) (Related Doc # [1]). Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004, Terminated: 3/1/2004 Motion Intra-District Transfer
                                                                                                                                                        Joint Motion for Intra-District Transfer entitled: Joint Motion to Reassign Case to Portland Division. Filed by Providence Health System-Oregon. (Russell, Tamara)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Waiver of Service Summons
                                                                                                                                                          Waiver of Service of Summons-- Accepted by Providence Health System-Oregon on 12/29/04.. Filed by Cora Salamanca. (cp, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                            Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: Case assigned to the Honorable Ann L. Aiken. Discovery to be completed by 4/20/2004. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 5/20/2004. Pretrial Order due by 5/20/2004. (pvh, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                              Complaint . Jury Trial demanded. Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 170549 issued. Filed by Cora Salamanca against Providence Health System-Oregon. (pvh, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2005 (cp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?