Alaniz v. Lake County, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 1:94-cv-03083-CO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Rafael Alaniz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Black Turner +1 541 385 6950 +1 541 385 8915 bob.turner@lasoregon.org
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
v.
No Logo John Does, Defendant
No Logo Lake County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MCCUSKER, ANSELMI, ROSEN & CARVELLI, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald L. Warren +1 503 480 7252 +1 503 779 2716 gwarren@geraldwarrenlaw.com
No Logo Pepper Withers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MCCUSKER, ANSELMI, ROSEN & CARVELLI, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald L. Warren +1 503 480 7252 +1 503 779 2716 gwarren@geraldwarrenlaw.com
Office Medford
Filed 12/22/1994
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Lake
Terminated 11/21/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, PROTECTIVE ORD, TERMINATED
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: 6/19/2000 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 021 00 0018 Location number X0005805-X0005839 Box 12 of 35 (wk)
    LREF
    Blank 42 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 Notice
    STIPULATED NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (Meyer)
      LREF
      Blank 41 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Affidavit
      AFFIDAVIT of Doctor William Strieby re MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [28-1] (Meyer)
        LREF
        Blank 40 Filed: 11/21/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 Order Dismissing Case
        ORDER OF DISMISSAL action is dismissed w/o prejudice without costs and with leave within 60 days to have dismissal set aside if settlement is not consummated Signed by Craig W Meyer Deputy Clerk (counsel notified) (Meyer)
          LREF
          Blank 39 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
          RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge John P Cooney SETTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [28-1] Telephone argument set for 9:00 11/27/95 (counsel notified) (Meyer)
            LREF
            Blank 38 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 reply to motion
            REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S CONCISE STATEMENT OF FACTS by Defendants re MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [28-1] (Meyer)
              LREF
              Blank 37 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995 reply to motion
              REPLY TO RESPONSE by Defendants re [28-1] MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Meyer)
                LREF
                Blank 36 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 10/31/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MOTION RESPONSE [33-1] STATEMENT OF FACTS [34-1] and AFFIDAVIT OF RAFAEL ALANIZ [35-1] by Plaintiff Rafael Alaniz (Meyer)
                  LREF
                  Blank 35 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 10/31/1995 Affidavit
                  AFFIDAVIT of Rafael Alaniz in opposition to MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [28-1] (Meyer)
                    LREF
                    Blank 34 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 10/31/1995 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                    STATEMENT OF FACTS by Plaintiff Rafael Alaniz in opposition to MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [28-1] (Meyer)
                      LREF
                      Blank 33 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 10/31/1995 Response to Motion
                      RESPONSE by Plaintiff Rafael Alaniz to [28-1] MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Meyer)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 10/12/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                        CONCISE STATEMENT OF FACTS by Defendant Lake County, Defendant Pepper Withers in support of MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [28-1], in support of MOTION [28-2] (ljb)
                          LREF
                          Blank 31 Filed: 10/12/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Affidavit
                          AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Lake County, Defendant Pepper Withers of Dr. John C. Stoner MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [28-1], MOTION [28-2] (ljb)
                            LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 10/12/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Affidavit
                            AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Lake County, Defendant Pepper Withers of Sheriff Pepper Withers MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [28-1], MOTION [28-2] (ljb)
                              LREF
                              Blank 29 Filed: 10/12/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Memorandum in Support
                              MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Lake County, Defendant Pepper Withers of MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [28-1], of MOTION [28-2] (ljb)
                                LREF
                                Blank 28 Filed: 10/12/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995, Terminated: 11/21/1995 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                MOTION by Defendant Lake County, Defendant Pepper Withers FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , Oral Argument Requested (ljb)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995 Proposed Pretrial Order - Joint
                                  LODGED PRETRIAL ORDER (Meyer)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 27 Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: 9/12/1995, Terminated: 9/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER [25-1] Signed 9/12/95 Magistrate Judge John P Cooney (Meyer)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 26 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995 Affidavit
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Bob Turner in support of Plaintiff's MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER [25-1] (Meyer)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 25 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995, Terminated: 9/12/1995 Motion for Protective Order
                                        MOTION by Plaintiff Rafael Alaniz FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (Meyer)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 24 Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: 7/11/1995 Description not available
                                          NOTICE of taking deposition by Plaintiff Rafael Alaniz of Ike Wells on 7/24/95 (Meyer)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 23 Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: 7/11/1995 Description not available
                                            NOTICE of taking deposition by Plaintiff Rafael Alaniz of Ronald Cates on 7/24/95 (Meyer)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 22 Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: 7/11/1995 Description not available
                                              NOTICE of taking deposition by Plaintiff Rafael Alaniz of Gregg Baker on 7/24/95 (Meyer)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 21 Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: 7/11/1995 Description not available
                                                NOTICE of taking deposition by Plaintiff Rafael Alaniz of Carroll Flowers on 7/24/95 (Meyer)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/14/1995, Terminated: 6/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge John P. Cooney GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [18-1] discovery deadline set for 8/31/95 pretrial order set for 10/2/95 dispositive motions due 10/13/95 Response to dispositive motions due 10/27/95 Reply to response due 11/13/95 Motion Hearing set for 10:00 11/20/95 Pretrial documents due 1/29/96 pretrial conference set for 1:30 2/5/96 4 day jury trial set for 9:00 2/13/96 in Medford (counsel notified) (Meyer)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/14/1995 Affidavit
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Bob Turner in support of JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [18-1] (Meyer)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/14/1995, Terminated: 6/14/1995 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                      JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES (Meyer)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 4/19/1995, Entered: 4/19/1995 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                                                        RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge John P Cooney GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [15-1] discovery ddl set for 6/30/95 pretrial order ddl set for 7/31/95 (counsel notified) (Meyer)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 4/19/1995, Entered: 4/19/1995 Affidavit
                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Bob Turner MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [15-1] (Meyer)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 4/19/1995, Entered: 4/19/1995, Terminated: 4/19/1995 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                            MOTION by Plaintiff Rafael Alaniz TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES (Meyer)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 3/14/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                                                              RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge John P Cooney that attorney Bob Turner shall submit proof of membership in the bar of this court prior to entry as a counsel of record [13-1] (counsel notified) (Meyer)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Notice
                                                                NOTICE by Plaintiff Rafael Alaniz of appearance of attorney Bob Turner (not a member of the bar of this court) (Meyer)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 2/22/1995, Entered: 2/22/1995 Description not available
                                                                  ANSWER by Defendant Lake County and Defendant Pepper Withers to complaint [3-1] (Meyer)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 1/25/1995, Entered: 1/25/1995 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                                                                    RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge John P Cooney GRANTING Defendants' MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER [10-1] (counsel notified) Defendants answer due 2/24/95 (Meyer)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 1/25/1995, Entered: 1/25/1995, Terminated: 1/25/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
                                                                      MOTION by Defendants Lake County and Pepper Withers TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER (Meyer)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 1/12/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 Return of Service Executed
                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Pepper Withers on 1/6/95 (Meyer)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/12/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 Return of Service Executed
                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Lake County on 1/6/95 (Meyer)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 12/27/1994, Entered: 12/27/1994 Summons Issued
                                                                            SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Pepper Withers (Meyer)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 12/27/1994, Entered: 12/27/1994 Summons Issued
                                                                              SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Lake County c/o County Clerk (Meyer)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 12/27/1994, Entered: 12/27/1994 Discovery Order
                                                                                ORDER Discovery Schedule discovery ddl set for 4/26/95 pretrial order deadline set for 5/26/95 (Meyer)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 12/27/1994, Entered: 12/27/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER Provisional in forma pauperis status given the pltf confirmed and this complaint may go forward without the payment of fees or costs The clerk shall issue process Service of the summons and complaint shall be made by the United States Marshal's Service Signed 12/27/94 Magistrate Judge John P Cooney (Meyer)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 12/23/1994 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT and JURY TRIAL DEMAND (Cause Code 42:1983cv) (Meyer)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 12/23/1994 Order
                                                                                      ORDER Plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis subject to further review of the court Signed 12/22/94 L Brinn Deputy Clerk [1-1] (Meyer)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 12/23/1994 Application for leave to proceed ifp
                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiff Rafael Alaniz TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (Meyer)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 26 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?