USA v. Maloney
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00006-CO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristine Olson +1 503 727 1001 +1 503 727 1091 kris.olson@usdoj.gov
Space James L. Sutherland +1 503 727 1194 +1 503 727 1117 jim.sutherland@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Randy Wayne Maloney, Defendant
Office Medford
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 690 - Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
Cause Section 49 U.S.C. § 1471 Federal Aviation Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Lane
Terminated 5/30/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CONSENT, FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: 6/19/2000 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 021 00 0018 Location number X0005805-X0005839 Box 15 of 35 (wk)
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 2/10/1998, Entered: 2/12/1998 Satisfaction
    SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT judgment [16-2] as to Defendant (wk)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 5/30/1995, Entered: 5/31/1995 Judgment*Court Filing
      JUDGMENT Airman Pilot Certificate #542645982 declared null void and is revoked Defendant is fined in the amount of $2,500.00 plus costs Signed 5/30/95 Magistrate Judge John P Cooney (Counsel notified) (Meyer)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 5/30/1995, Entered: 5/31/1995 Stipulation
        STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT (Meyer)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 5/30/1995, Entered: 5/31/1995 Consent to a Magistrate
          CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by all parties (Meyer)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 5/30/1995, Entered: 5/31/1995 SchedulingCourt Filing
            RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge John P Cooney penalty hearing held Consents to Magistrate Judge signed Stipulation for Judgment presented and Stipulated Judgment signed (Counsel notified) Court Rptr Susan Prufer (Meyer)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER by Magistrate Judge John P Cooney penalty hearing set for 2:00 5/30/95 Signed 4/14/95 (counsel notified) (Meyer)
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Clerks Entry of Default*
                DEFAULT ENTERED as to Defendant Randy Wayne Maloney (counsel notified) (Meyer)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: 4/13/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO RANDY WAYNE MALONEY [9-1] by Plaintiff USA (Meyer)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: 4/13/1995, Terminated: 4/13/1995 Motion for default
                    MOTION by Plaintiff USA FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO RANDY WAYNE MALONEY (Meyer)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/14/1995, Entered: 3/16/1995 Return of Service Executed
                      RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Randy Wayne Maloney on 3/9/95 (Meyer)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 return of service unexecuted
                        RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Defendant Randy Wayne Maloney (Meyer)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 Summons Issued
                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Randy Wayne Maloney (Meyer)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995 Case Reassignment NoticeCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT from Honorable Janice M. Stewart to Magistrate Judge John P. Cooney (counsel notified) (gm)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/18/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                              RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Janice M. Stewart GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE [3-1]. Case reassigned to Honorable John P. Cooney for all further proceedings. (counsel notified) (gm)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/11/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995, Terminated: 1/18/1995 Motion to change/transfer venue
                                MOTION by Plaintiff USA TO TRANSFER CASE (gm)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Discovery Order
                                  ORDER Discovery Schedule discovery deadline set for 5/3/95; Pretrial order deadline set for 6/2/95 (gm)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT (Cause Code: 49:1471) (gm)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 97 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?