USA, et al v. Lundell
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00917-MHM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen W Laramore +1 602 514 7500 Stephen.Laramore@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 10/10/2001
County La Paz
Terminated 2/14/2005
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
267201 - Attempted Tax Evasion
Count 2
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
267201 and 182 - Attempted Tax Evasion and Aid and Abet
Count 3
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
267201 - Attempted Tax Evasion
Count 4
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
267201 and 182 - Attempted Tax Evasion and Aid and Abet
Count 5
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
267201 - Attempted Tax Evasion
Count 6
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
267201 and 182 - Attempted Tax Evasion and Aid and Abet
Count 1s-3s
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7203D.F
Offense Level 4
267203 Failure to File Income Tax Returns
Def Custody Status Released
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (184) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 184 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006 OrderCourt Filing
REPORT AND ORDER TERMINATING PROBATION as to dft Dwight C Lundell . Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/25/06. (KMG, )
    LREF
    Blank 183 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Plea Agreement
    PLEA Agreement filed as to Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
      LREF
      Blank 182 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 OrderCourt Filing
      JUDGMENT of Probation issued by Judge Mary H. Murguia for Dwight C Lundell Dwight C Lundell (1) count(s) 1, 2 , 3 , 4 , 5 , 6 . Dismissed on government motion at sentencing , sentencing for Dwight C Lundell (1) count(s) 1s-3s. Placed on probation for THREE (3) YRS, said counts to run concurrently; S/A: $75.00 , Case closed (SAT)
        LREF
        Blank 181 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        ( FILED: 2/18/05) MINUTES: before Judge Mary H. Murguia . Ct Rptr: Merilyn Sanchez . ; sentencing held as to dft Dwight Carl Lundell ; FURTHER ORDERED that the Court GRANTS the Government's Motion (Revised) for Downward Departure Pursuant to Section 5K1.1 [180-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell; The Government's Motion for a Downward Departure Pursuant to Section 5K1.1 [151-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell is DENIED as moot. [181-2] (SAT)
          LREF
          Blank 180 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005, Terminated: 2/14/2005 Motion for Departure
          MOTION (Revised) for Downward Departure Pursuant to Section 5K1.1 [180-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
            LREF
            Blank 179 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia that having received and considered the Defendant's Motion to Continue Sentencing Due to Bentson Continuance (Unopposed) [178-1] by Dwight C Lundell, IT IS ORDERED that sentencing in this matter is continued until 2/14/05 at 1:30 p.m.; sentencing re-set for 1:30 for Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
              LREF
              Blank 178 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Motion to Continue
              MOTION to Continue Sentencing Due to Bentson Continuance (Unopposed) [178-1] by Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                LREF
                Blank 177 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Order
                MINUTE ORDER sentencing reset for 1:30 12/14/04 for Dwight C Lundell [177-2] (LAD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 176 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  ( FILED: 10/6/04) MINUTES: before Judge Mary H. Murguia . Ct Rptr: Merilyn Sanchez . This is the time set for sentencing. The Court sustains that dft's objection to paragraph 15 of the presentence report with the government's occurrence. The two level increase due to significant means should not apply. With respect to dft's objection to paragraph 8, the Court directs the probation officer to add at the end of paragraph 8 that the dft refutes the characterization. The Court adopts the factual statements in the presentence report. Discussion held regarding government's motion for a downward departure [151-1]. On oral motion of the defendant, there being no objection, IT IS ORDERED continuing sentencing to 12/6/04 at 1:30 p.m. ; sentencing re-set for 1:30 12/6/04 for Dwight C Lundell [176-2] (SAT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 175 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Order
                    MINUTE ORDER ; sentencing re-set for 1:30 10/5/04 for Dwight Lundell [175-2] (SAT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 174 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Transcript
                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings - Change of Plea by Court Reporter: Candy L Potter, RMR, CRR as to Dwight C Lundell for the following date(s): 1/24/03 (SAT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 173 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
                        Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Patti Hibbeler for Raymond J Slomski PC re hearing held 1/24/03 as to Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 172 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia that having received and considered the Defendant's Motion to Continue Sentencing Due to Scheduling Conflict [171-1] by Dwight C Lundell, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that sentencing in this matter is continued until 10/4/04 at 11:30 a.m.; sentencing re-set for 11:30 10/4/04 for Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 171 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004, Terminated: 9/21/2004 Motion to Continue
                            MOTION to Continue Sentencing Due to Scheduling Conflict [171-1] by Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 170 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Memorandum
                              Presentence Memorandum re Blakely v Washington by dft Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 169 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Order
                                MINUTE ORDER ; sentencing re-set for 3:00 9/27/04 for Dwight Lundell [169-2] (SAT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 168 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia upon the United States' Motion to Continue Sentencing (1 week)(set for 9/7/04) [167-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED continuing sentencing until 9/20/04 at 2:00 p.m.; sentencing re-set for 2:00 9/20/04 for Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 167 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004, Terminated: 8/12/2004 Motion to Continue
                                    MOTION to Continue Sentencing (1 week)(set for 9/7/04) [167-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 166 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Order
                                      MINUTE ORDER as to Dwight Lundell: any motions for upward departure, downward departure and sentencing memoranda shall be filed at least 6 business days prior to the sentencing date; responses are due 3 business days prior to the sentencing date; any motions to continue sentencing shall be filed at least 2 business days prior to the sentencing date cc: pb/usa/cnsl [166-1] re: [166-1] (former emp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 165 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion to Continue Sentencing Due to Scheduling Conflict (30 days) (set for 8/6/04 at 1:30 p.m.) [164-1] by Dwight Lundell sentencing reset for 1:30 9/7/04 for Dwight C Lundell before Judge Murguia cc: pb/usa/cnsl (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 164 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/2/2004, Terminated: 7/8/2004 Motion to Continue
                                          MOTION to Continue Sentencing Due to Scheduling Conflict (30 days) (set for 8/6/04 at 1:30 p.m.) [164-1] by Dwight Lundell (SAT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 163 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Order
                                            MINUTE ORDER ; sentencing set for 1:30 8/6/04 for Dwight C Lundell [163-2] (SAT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 162 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll that the undersigned hereby recuses himself from further participation in the above-entitled case and the Clerk has reassigned the case by random lot to Judge Mary H Murguia; case reassigned to Judge Mary H. Murguia (SAT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 161 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                ( FILED: 6/17/04) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter . IT IS ORDERED vacating the sentencing hearing ; sentencing vacated ; FURTHER ORDERED the Court recuses itself from this matter, case referred to the Clerk for reassignment by lot. [161-2] (SAT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Order
                                                  MINUTE ORDER ; sentencing set for 6/14/04 vacated ; sentencing re-set for 1:30 6/17/04 for Dwight C Lundell [159-2] (SAT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 158 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Memorandum
                                                    Supplemental Presentence Information Memorandum by dft Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll that having recieved and considered the Defendant's Motion to Continue Documentation Deadline and Sentencing Due to Accountant Unavailability [156-1], [156-3], or in the alternative, Motion to Modify Order Dated 2/2/04 [156-2], IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that sentencing in this matter is continued to 6/14/04 at 3:00 p.m.; sentencing re-set for 3:00 6/14/04 for Dwight C Lundell ; FURTHER ORDERED extending Defendant's deadline to provide documents pursuant to the Order of 2/2/04 until 5/3/04. (SAT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 156 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004 Motion to Continue
                                                        MOTION to Continue Documentation Deadline Due to Accountant Unavailability re income tax returns for 1992 and 1993 [156-1] by Dwight C Lundell ,or in the alternative, to Modify 2/2/04 Order to require income tax returns for the years 1994 through 2002 instead of 1992 through 2001 [156-2] by Dwight C Lundell and to Continue Sentencing (30 days) (set for 4/26/04) Due to Scheduling Conflict [156-3] by Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 155 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll that this Court, having received and reviewed Defendant's Motion to Continue Sentencing Hearing [154-1] and Motion to Extend Document Deadline [154-2], IT IS ORDERED that sentencing in this matter is continued until 4/26/04 at 3:00 p.m.; sentencing re-set for 3:00 4/26/04 for Dwight C Lundell ; FURTHR ORDERED extending Defendant's deadline to provide documents pursuant to the order of 2/2/04 until 4/9/04 (SAT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Motion to Continue
                                                            MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing (30 days)(set for 3/15/04) [154-1] by Dwight C Lundell and to Extend Document Deadline (set for 3/1/04) [154-2] by Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                              ( FILED: 2/4/04) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter . ; sentencing re-set for 3:00 3/15/04 for Dwight C Lundell ; Court orders the following information be filed through the Clerk's Office with a copy to the Probation Office by 3/1/04; Income tax returns for the years 1992 through 2001, the amount of money paid by the defendant to the United States Government since 1994, as of the most current date, the amount of money purported to have been paid as a settlement in the bankruptcy matter(s) filed by the dft. Regarding the software conversion company, the Court requests information on who is being paid wages and where the income to pay those wages is coming from. Further, the identification of vehicles, boats, and if any lien are against them, any brokerage accounts, real estate or otherwise. Further, the information be provided in a written format listing assets, liabilities, monthly expenses, and monthly income. [153-2] (SAT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 152 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Memorandum
                                                                Presentence Memorandum by dft Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004, Terminated: 2/14/2005 Motion for Departure
                                                                  MOTION for a Downward Departure Pursuant to Section 5K1.1 [151-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to Defendant's Objection to Presentence Report as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting Motion 40. (Second) to Continue Sentencing Due to Trial Schedule of Wayne Bentson (set for 9/2/03) [145-1] by Dwight C Lundell sentencing re-set for 3:00 2/2/04 for Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                        ( FILED: 8/27/03) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter . Hearing held on Dft's Second Motion 40. to Continue Sentencing Date [145-1], dft's presence is waived for purpose of the hearing. Argument heard, the Court will take the motion under advisement; taking under advisement on 8/27/03 the Motion 40. (Second) to Continue Sentencing Due to Trial Schedule of Wayne Bentson (set for 9/2/03) [145-1] by Dwight C Lundell [148-1] (SAT) Modified on 08/28/2003
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                                                                          OBJECTION by Dwight C Lundell to Pre-Sentence Investigation Report as to dft Dwight C Lundell . (SAT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/14/2003 Order
                                                                            MINUTE ORDER re Motion 40. (Second) to Continue Sentencing Due to Trial Schedule of Wayne Bentson (set for 9/2/03) [145-1] by Dwight C Lundell ; hearing set for 8:30 8/27/03 for Dwight C Lundell [146-1] (SAT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003, Terminated: 9/2/2003 Motion to Continue
                                                                              MOTION 40. (Second) to Continue Sentencing Due to Trial Schedule of Wayne Bentson (set for 9/2/03) [145-1] by Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Order
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER ; sentencing of 9/8/03 vacated ; sentencing re-set for 8:30 9/2/03 for Dwight C Lundell [144-2] (SAT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting Motion 39. to Continue Sentencing (30 days) Due to Trial Schedule of Wayne Bentson [142-1] by Dwight C Lundell , sentencing re-set for 3:00 9/8/03 for Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 3/26/2003 Motion to Continue
                                                                                    MOTION 39. to Continue Sentencing (30 days) Due to Trial Schedule of Wayne Bentson [142-1] by Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                      ( FILED: 1/28/03) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter . Dwight C Lundell (1) count(s) 1s-3s enters a plea of guilty , ; trial vacated ; sentencing set for 2:30 4/7/03 for Dwight C Lundell , plea agreement lodged as to Dwight C Lundell ; Order dft to remain released pending sentencing [141-4] (SAT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 140 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Information - Misdemeanor
                                                                                        SUPERSEDING Information filed against Dwight C Lundell (1) count(s) 1s-3s (SAT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance of attorney for Dwight C Lundell : Patrick S Sampair appears as co-counsel (SAT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 138 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                            NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA : Stephen W Laramore appears and terminating attorney Stephen G Winerip for USA (SAT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 137 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting defendant's Motion 38. to Continue Trial Date Due to Plea Negotiations and Motion for Leave to File Pretrial Motion [136-1]; FURTHER ORDERED vacating the 2/11/03 trial and resetting the matter for 3/25/03 at 9:00 AM; ; trial set for 2/11/03 vacated ; trial re-set for 9:00 3/25/03 for Dwight C Lundell ; FURTHER ORDERED extending the time for filing pretrial motions to and including 3/7/03 ; pretrial motions ddl re-set for 3/7/03 for Dwight C Lundell , excludable delay int of justice started (SAT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 136 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003, Terminated: 1/14/2003 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                MOTION 38. to Continue Trial Date Due to Plea Negotiations [136-1] by Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 135 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                  REPLY by dft to response to motion 34. for disclosure of prosecution information (oral argument req) [118-1] by Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 134 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll denying Motion for Leave to File Pretrial Motion [131-1] by Dwight C Lundell; FURTHER ORDERED granting Motion 37. to Continue Trial Date [131-2] by Dwight C Lundell; FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot the Motion for Expedited Hearing [131-3] on the Motion to Continue Trial Date [131-2] by Dwight C Lundell; FURTHER ORDERED vacating the 11/5/02 trial, re-setting the matter for 2/11/03 at 9:00 AM ; trial vacated ; trial re-set for 9:00 2/11/03 for Dwight C Lundell , excludable delay int of justice started (SAT)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 132 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Other Notice
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Errata Re 37. Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial Date by dft Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 131 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002, Terminated: 10/25/2002 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Pretrial Motion [131-1] by Dwight C Lundell , 37. to Continue Trial Date [131-2] by Dwight C Lundell , for Expedited Hearing [131-3] on the Motion to Continue Trial Date [131-2] by Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 130 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Other Notice
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of 25. Defendant's Notice Under Rule 12.2 by dft Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll that within ten days of the date of this Order, that the Internal Revenue Service Special Agent's report recommending prosecution of the dft Dwight C. Lundell be filed under Seal with the Court for its in camera inspection. (cc: cnsl) re: [128-1] (KMG)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ( FILED: 10/15/02) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll. Ct Rptr: Candy Potter. Hearing held on Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney Donald MacPherson [doc.#120] and status hearing. Mr. MacPherson appears telephonically. Discussion held w/regard to the motion. There being no objections by the dft and for reasons stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED granting motion for withdrawal of attorney Donald W MacPherson [120-1] for dft Dwight C. Lundell (note: dft is presently represented by both MacPherson and attorney Heather Hendrix) ; terminating attorney Donald W MacPherson for Dwight C Lundell Trial date of 11/5/02 discussed. Counsel for dft states she filed a Motion to Continue with the court on 9/25/02, the docket doesn't reflect that filing. Pending motions being filed regarding a continuance, the trial set for 11/5/02 will proceed as scheduled. [129-2] (KMG)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 127 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                RESPONSE by pla USA to Motion 34. for disclosure of prosecution information (oral argument req) [118-1] by Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (KMG)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 126 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting Motion for Enlargement of Time until 10/23/02 for government to respond to defendants motions 29-32 [103-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 125 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Order
                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER ; status hearing set for 3:15 10/15/02 for Dwight C Lundell ; pretrial conference set for 3:15 10/15/02 for Dwight C Lundell [125-2] (SAT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 124 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                      REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 32. to dismiss all counts charged for entrapment by estoppel (oral argument req) [98-1] by Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 123 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                        REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 31. to dismiss all counts charged under equitable estoppel based on gov admissions: Bentson falsely instructed clients/victims which class impliedly includes dft (oral argument req) [96-1] by Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 122 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                          REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 30. for disclosure of listed documents (oral argument req) [95-1] by Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 121 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                            REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 29. for unredacted discovery under Brady and Rule 16 (oral argument req) [94-1] by Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 120 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/4/2002, Terminated: 10/15/2002 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                              MOTION for withdrawal of attorney Donald W MacPherson [120-1] for dft Dwight C. Lundell (note: dft is presently represented by both MacPherson and attorney Heather Hendrix) (KMG)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 119 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                REPLY in support of its post-hrg mem by pla to response to motion #7 to suppress evidence obtained thru IRS administrative summonses [19-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 118 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002, Terminated: 1/24/2003 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                  MOTION 34. for disclosure of prosecution information (oral argument req) [118-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 117 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                    Exhibits in Support of Defendant's Response to [116-1] Government's Post-Hearing Memorandum [112-1] Regarding Defendant's Motion 7 to Dismiss or Suppress Evidence by dft Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by dft to the Government's Post-Hearing Memorandum [112-1] Regarding Defendant's Motion 7. to Dismiss or Suppress Evidence as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time until 10/7/02 for dft to Reply to the government's response to pretrial motions 29-32 [115-1] by Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 114 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                          Second NOTICE of Intent to Use Evidence of Other Crimes, Wrongs, or Acts by pla USA as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 113 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to continue trial [99-1], granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [99-2] by Dwight C Lundell ; pretrial motions ddl set for 9/30/02 for Dwight C Lundell ; trial set for 9:00 11/5/02 for Dwight C Lundell , excludable delay int of justice started (former emp)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 112 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                              Post-Hearing Memorandum re motion 7. to dismiss indictment [19-1] AND motion to suppress evidence obtained thru IRS administrative summonses [19-2] by Dwight C Lundell by pla USA as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 111 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by pla USA to motion 32. to dismiss all counts charged for entrapment by estoppel (oral argument req) [98-1] by Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 110 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by pla USA to motion 31. to dismiss all counts charged under equitable estoppel based on gov admissions: Bentson falsely instructed clients/victims which class impliedly includes dft (oral argument req) [96-1] by Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 109 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Consolidated RESPONSE by pla USA to motion 29. for unredacted discovery under Brady and Rule 16 (oral argument req) [94-1] by Dwight C Lundell AND motion 30. for disclosure of listed documents (oral argument req) [95-1] by Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 106 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings - Motion Hearing by Court Reporter: Candy L Potter, RMR, CRR as to Dwight C Lundell for the following date(s): 09/06/02 (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 105 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
                                                                                                                                                        Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Dwight C Lundell as to Dwight C Lundell re pre-trial proceeding of 9/6/02 (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 104 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
                                                                                                                                                          Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by USA as to Dwight C Lundell re Motion Hearing of 9/6/02 - Testimony of John Collins, Richard Rapazzo and David Duncan (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 103 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002, Terminated: 10/10/2002 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Enlargement of Time for government to reply to defendants motions 29-32 [103-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell (SAT) Modified on 09/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 108 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS list of USA (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 107 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                WITNESS list by pla USA as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ( FILED: 09/06/02) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter . granting Motion for Expedited Hearing Re: 33. Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial Date and Deadline to File Pretrial Motions [100-1] by Dwight C Lundell; granting motion to continue trial [99-1]; FURTHER ORDERED denying motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [99-2] (oral argument req) by Dwight C Lundell; FURTHER ORDERED taking under advisement on 9/6/02 the motion 22. to suppress information obtained in violation of principals of international comity [34-1] by Dwight C Lundell; Hearing held re motion to suppress evidence obtained thru IRS administrative summonses [19-2] by Dwight C Lundell ; trial of 10/01/02 vacated ; trial re-set for 9:00 11/5/02 for Dwight C Lundell , ; pretrial conference of 9/13/02 vacated Upon oral motion of the defense and no objection by the government, FURTHER ORDERED the government provide their file 98V00158, to defense counsel including notes regarding conversations with Mr MacIntosh; FURTHER ORDERED that the government is directed to file supplemental memoranda regarding the Dft's Motion to Suppress [34] within 10 days from this date, with a response by the defendant to be filed 5 days thereafter; [102-3] (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Intent to Introduce Expert Testimony by dft Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002, Terminated: 9/6/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Expedited Hearing Re: 33. Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial Date and Deadline to File Pretrial Motions [100-1] by Dwight C Lundell (oral argument requested) (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002, Terminated: 9/23/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to continue trial [99-1] , for extension of time to file pretrial motions [99-2] (oral argument req) by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION 32. to dismiss all counts charged for entrapment by estoppel (oral argument req) [98-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Dwight C Lundell exhibits in support of motion 31. to dismiss all counts charged under equitable estoppel based on gov admissions: Bentson falsely instructed clients/victims which class impliedly includes dft (oral argument req) [96-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION 31. to dismiss all counts charged under equitable estoppel based on gov admissions: Bentson falsely instructed clients/victims which class impliedly includes dft (oral argument req) [96-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION 30. for disclosure of listed documents (oral argument req) [95-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION 29. for unredacted discovery under Brady and Rule 16 (oral argument req) [94-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Intent to Introduce Expert Testimony by pla USA as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/15/2002 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re of intent to use evidence of other crimes, wrongs or acts by pla as to dft Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER vacating 7/26/02 hearing re motion to suppress evidence obtained thru IRS administrative summonses [19-2] by Dwight C Lundell, vacating 7/26/02 hearing re motion 22. to suppress information obtained in violation of principals of international comity [34-1] by Dwight C Lundell; re motion to suppress evidence obtained thru IRS administrative summonses [19-2] by Dwight C Lundell ; hearing re-set for 9:30 9/6/02 for Dwight C Lundell, re motion 22. to suppress information obtained in violation of principals of international comity [34-1] by Dwight C Lundell ; hearing re-set for 9:30 9/6/02 for Dwight C Lundell [91-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [84-1] by Dwight C Lundell, granting motion to continue trial date [84-2] by Dwight C Lundell ; trial reset for 9:00 10/1/02 for Dwight C Lundell ; pretrial motions ddl set for 8/30/02 for Dwight C Lundell re motion to suppress evidence obtained thru administrative summonses [19-2] by Dwight C Lundell ; hearing set for 9:00 7/26/02 for Dwight C Lundell, re motion 22. to suppress information obtained in violation of principals of international comity [34-1] by Dwight C Lundell ; hearing set for 9:00 7/26/02 for Dwight C Lundell, pretrial conference set for 9:30 9/13/02 for Dwight C Lundell denying as moot motion to continue trial [74-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell, excludable delay int of justice started (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ( FILED: 05/30/02) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick . Motion hearing held; Discussion held; re: motion to continue trial [74-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell [74-1], re: motion to continue trial date [84-2] by Dwight C Lundell [84-2], re: motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Dwight C Lundell [84-1]; FURTHER ORDERED continuing trial; re-set for 9:00 AM 10/1/02; pretrial motions due 8/30/02; FURTHER ORDERED setting pretrial conference for 9/13/02 at 9:30 AM; FURTHER ORDERED setting hearing on Motions to Supress [34-1] and [19-2] for 7/26/02 at 9:00 AM [89-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER re motion to continue trial [74-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell ; hearing set for 9:30 5/30/02 for Dwight C Lundell, re motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [84-1] by Dwight C Lundell ; hearing set for 9:30 5/30/02 for Dwight C Lundell, re motion to continue trial date [84-2] by Dwight C Lundell ; hearing set for 9:30 5/30/02 for Dwight C Lundell [88-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER re motion to continue trial [74-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell ; hearing set for 9:30 5/30/02 for Dwight C Lundell, re motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [84-1] by Dwight C Lundell ; hearing set for 9:30 5/30/02 for Dwight C Lundell [88-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by dft to response to motion 28. for Discovery Regarding Wayne Bentson Victims Under Brady (oral argument requested) [81-1] by Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by pla to motion 28. for Discovery Regarding Wayne Bentson Victims Under Brady (oral argument requested) [81-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER vacating the 5/10/02 status conference; status hrg vacated as to dft Dwight C Lundell [85-2] (SAT) Modified on 05/10/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002, Terminated: 6/6/2002 Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for extension of time to file pretrial motions [84-1] by Dwight C Lundell , to continue trial date [84-2] by Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by dft Dwight C Lundell to motion to continue trial [74-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/9/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplement by Dwight C Lundell in Support of Defendant's Response [77-1] to Government's Surreply [72-1] to Defendant's Motion 7. to Dismiss Indictment [19-1] or Motion to Suppress Evidence Obtained thru IRS Administrative Summonses [19-2] by Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION 28. for Discovery Regarding Wayne Bentson Victims Under Brady (oral argument requested) [81-1] by Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibits in Support of Defendant's Reply [79-1] to response to Motion 27. for Order to Stay Trial [70-1] by dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 27 for order to stay trial (oral argument req) [70-1] by Dwight C Lundell (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibits in Support of Response [77-1] to "Government's Surreply to Defendant's Motion 7. to Dismiss [19-1] or Suppress Evidence Obtained Through Administrative Summons" [19-2] by dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT) Modified on 05/08/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by dft Dwight C Lundell to "Government's Surreply to Defendant's motion 7. to dismiss indictment [19-1] AND motion to suppress evidence obtained thru IRS administrative summonses" [19-2] as to dft Dwight C Lundell (SAT) Modified on 05/08/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ( FILED: 5/1/02) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Linda Schroeder-Willis . taking under advisement on 4/30/02 the motion to continue trial [74-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell, taking under advisement on 4/30/02 the motion for order to stay trial (oral argument req) [70-1] by Dwight C Lundell ; status hrg held , ; 5/10/02 pretrial conference vacated ; status hearing set for 8:30 5/10/02 for Dwight C Lundell [76-3] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by pla to motion for order to stay trial (oral argument req) [70-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to continue trial [74-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER ; status hearing set for 9:00 4/30/02 for Dwight C Lundell [73-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SURREPLY by pla to response to motion 7. to dismiss indictment [19-1], motion to suppress evidence obtained thru IRS administrative summonses [19-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 18. for disclosure of exculpatory computer evidence [30-1] by Dwight C Lundell (w/exhs-bulky) (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for order to stay trial (oral argument req) [70-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 26. for leave to allow preliminary opening stmts to entire jury panel before jury selection begins [36-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 24. in limine re privileged communications [37-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 23. in limine re improper political and pecuniary stmts [35-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 22. to suppress information obtained in violation of principals of international comity [34-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 21. for order to exclude employees of gov from the jury panel for cause [33-1], motion for voir dire [33-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 20. for disclosure of information obtained by gov re jury panel [32-1], motion for disclosure of jury contact by gov [32-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 17. for disclosure of exculpatory evidence re John Mathewson [29-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 16. for disclosure of exculpatory evidence re Wayne Bentson [28-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 14. for disclosure of exculpatory evidence [26-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 13. for disclosure of IRS special agent's rpt recommending prosecution [25-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 12. for discovery under Brady, Jencks, Rule 12.d(2) and Rule 16 [24-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 11. to dismiss community property charges [23-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 10. to dismiss indictment on grounds of lack of authority to investigate [22-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 9. to dismiss indictment on grounds of duplicity [21-1], motion for gov to elect [21-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 8. to dismiss indictment [20-1], motion for order to stay proceedings for failure to comply w/28:1861 [20-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 7. to dismiss indictment [19-1], motion to suppress evidence obtained thru IRS administrative summonses [19-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 6. to dismiss indictment for abuse of GJ process and prosecutorial misconduct [18-1], motion for disclosure of GJ transcripts and evidentiary hrg [18-2], motion to strike [18-3] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 5. to dismiss indictment on 1st and 5th amendment grounds [17-1], motion to strike portions of the indictment [17-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 4. to dismiss indictment for misstating the law [16-1], motion to strike portions of the indictment [16-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 3. to dismiss indictment due to selective prosecution [15-1], motion for evidentiary hearing and discovery [15-2], motion for in camera review [15-3] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by dft Dwight C Lundell to response to motion 2. for a bill of particulars [14-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to extend time to file reply to gov resp to pretrial mtns [47-1] by Dwight C Lundell; ddl for reply is ext to 4/15/02 (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002, Terminated: 3/12/2002 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to extend time to file reply to gov resp to pretrial mtns [47-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE to dft's pretrial mtns by pla to motion 3. to dismiss indictment due to selective prosecution [15-1] and [14], [16-37] as to dft Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to extend time to reply to dft's pretrial mtns [42-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell; time ext to 3/1/02 (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER ; pretrial conference set for 8:30 5/10/02 for Dwight C Lundell , before Judge Earl H. Carroll [44-3] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 2/5/02) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan . hrg held; granting motion to extend time to reply to dft's pretrial mtns [42-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell, time ext for gov resp to and incl 3/1/02; granting motion 1. 2nd unopposed to continue trial [13-1], granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [13-2] by Dwight C Lundell ; trial set for 9:00 6/4/02 for Dwight C Lundell ; pretrial conference set for 8:30 5/10/02 for Dwight C Lundell , excludable delay int of justice started ord to issue [43-3] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER re motion 1. 2nd unopposed to continue trial [13-1] ; hearing reset for 2:15 2/6/02 for Dwight C Lundell, re motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [13-2] by Dwight C Lundell ; hearing reset for 2:15 2/6/02 for Dwight C Lundell before Judge Earl H. Carroll , ; 2/8/02 pretrial conference vacated [41-3] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002, Terminated: 2/6/2002 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to extend time to reply to dft's pretrial mtns [42-1] by USA as to Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER re motion 1. 2nd unopposed to continue trial [13-1] ; hearing set for 2:30 2/5/02 for Dwight C Lundell, re motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [13-2] by Dwight C Lundell ; hearing set for 2:30 2/5/02 for Dwight C Lundell [40-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE re request for oral argument by dft Dwight C Lundell re dft's mtns 1 thru 26 (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE (25) under Rule 12.2 by dft Dwight C Lundell as to dft Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION 24. in limine re privileged communications [37-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION 26. for leave to allow preliminary opening stmts to entire jury panel before jury selection begins [36-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION 23. in limine re improper political and pecuniary stmts [35-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION 22. to suppress information obtained in violation of principals of international comity [34-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION 21. for order to exclude employees of gov from the jury panel for cause [33-1] , for voir dire [33-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION 20. for disclosure of information obtained by gov re jury panel [32-1] , for disclosure of jury contact by gov [32-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION 19. for disclosure of afdts requesting wiretap authorization and other surveillance [31-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION 18. for disclosure of exculpatory computer evidence [30-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION 17. for disclosure of exculpatory evidence re John Mathewson [29-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION 16. for disclosure of exculpatory evidence re Wayne Bentson [28-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion to Reveal ID of Informant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION 15. to reveal identity of informants [27-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION 14. for disclosure of exculpatory evidence [26-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION 13. for disclosure of IRS special agent's rpt recommending prosecution [25-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION 12. for discovery under Brady, Jencks, Rule 12.d(2) and Rule 16 [24-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION 11. to dismiss community property charges [23-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION 10. to dismiss indictment on grounds of lack of authority to investigate [22-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION 9. to dismiss indictment on grounds of duplicity [21-1] , or in alternative for gov to elect [21-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION 8. to dismiss indictment [20-1] , or in alternative for order to stay proceedings for failure to comply w/28:1861 [20-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION 7. to dismiss indictment [19-1] , or in alternative to suppress evidence obtained thru IRS administrative summonses [19-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION 6. to dismiss indictment for abuse of GJ process and prosecutorial misconduct [18-1] , or in alternative for disclosure of GJ transcripts and evidentiary hrg [18-2] , or in alternative to strike [18-3] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION 5. to dismiss indictment on 1st and 5th amendment grounds [17-1] , or in the alternative to strike portions of the indictment [17-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION 4. to dismiss indictment for misstating the law [16-1] , or in alternative to strike portions of the indictment [16-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION 3. to dismiss indictment due to selective prosecution [15-1] , or in alternative for evidentiary hearing and discovery [15-2] , or in alternative for in camera review [15-3] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion for Bill of Particulars
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION 2. for a bill of particulars [14-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION 1. 2nd unopposed to continue trial [13-1] , for extension of time to file pretrial motions [13-2] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to continue trial and ddl for filing pretrial mtns [9-1] by Dwight C Lundell ; pretrial motions ddl set for 9:00 1/18/02 for Dwight C Lundell ; trial set for 9:00 2/19/02 for Dwight C Lundell pretrial conference set for 8:30 2/8/02 for Dwight C Lundell; excludable delay int of justice started (former emp) Modified on 12/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 12/7/01) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan . granting motion to continue trial and ddl for filing pretrial mtns [9-1] by Dwight C Lundell trial reset to 2/19/02 at 9:00 AM; excludable delay to be incl by separate ord; pretrial mtn ddl ext to 1/18/02; pretrial conf set for 2/8/02 at 8:30 AM [12-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER re motion to continue trial and ddl for filing pretrial mtns [9-1] by Dwight C Lundell ; hearing set for 3:30 12/6/01 for Dwight C Lundell [10-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001, Terminated: 12/12/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION (unopposed) to continue trial and ddl for filing pretrial mtns [9-1] by Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance of attorney for Dwight C Lundell : Heather M Hendrix. (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson setting conditions of release; Bond set to RELEASED O/R for Dwight C Lundell. (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (FILED: 11/7/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson first appearance of Dwight C Lundell ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Dwight C Lundell appears with counsel , dft Dwight C Lundell arraigned; Attorney present; , Dwight C Lundell (1) count(s) 1, 3, 5, 2, 4, 6 enters a plea of not guilty , ; pretrial motions due 11/30/01 (30 days) for Dwight C Lundell ; trial set for 9:00 12/11/01 for Dwight C Lundell . Dft ordered released O/R w/conditions. [6-6] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan granting motion to continue arraignment by Dwight C Lundell [3-1] ; arraignment hearing set for 10:45 10/31/01 for Dwight C Lundell , before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS executed upon Dwight C Lundell on 10/15/01 (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001, Terminated: 10/23/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION to continue arraignment by Dwight C Lundell 1 UN[3-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE re limited entry of appearance by Dnoald W. MacPherson for dft Dwight C Lundell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Service - Miscellanous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS issued as to Dwight C Lundell ; arraignment hearing set for 10:45 10/24/01 for Dwight C Lundell , before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INDICTMENT by USA attorney Stephen G Winerip. Counts filed against Dwight C Lundell (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 894 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?