USA v. Chiles
Criminal Case Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:00-cr-00570-BR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fredric N. Weinhouse +1 503 727 1014 +1 503 727 1117 fred.weinhouse@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Portland
Filed 12/6/2000
County Multnomah
Terminated 4/18/2001
Reopened
Magistrate Case
300-mj-00592
Citation
Offense Level
18 USC 922(g)(1) FELON IN POSSESSION OF A FIREARM [ 300-m -592 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 922G.F
Offense Level 4
18922(g)(1) FELON IN POSSESSION OF A FIREARM WHICH HAD PREVIOUSLY BEEN TRANSPORTED IN INTERSTATE COMMERCE
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=ND.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a) POSSESSION OF COCAINE
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 OrderCourt Filing
Order Revoking Supervised Release Term and Imposing Sentence as to Defendant Gabriel James Chiles; IT IS ORDERED Defendant's term of Supervised Release is REVOKED and Defendant is COMMITTED to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a period of 24 months, which is the statutory maximum, to run CONCURRENTLY with the Sentence imposed in Multnomah County Circuit Court Case #04-08-34495; Reimposition of Supervised Release is not ordered; by Judge Anna J. Brown; signed on 4/27/05. (kw, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 34 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Supervised Release - Final Revocation HrgCourt Filing
    Minutes of Proceedings:Supervised Release Violation Hearing before Judge Anna J. Brown as to Gabriel James Chiles. Defendant admits violation of conditions of Supervised Release. Supervised Release is REVOKED, and Defendant is committed to the Bureau of Prisons for a period of 24 months, to be served CONCURRENTLY with the undischarged term of imprisonment Defendant is serving. No further Supervised Relese is imposed. (See separate Order)Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Fred Weinhouse.Counsel Present for Defendant: Francesca Freccero.(Court Reporter Susan Walker) (sm, )
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Sentencing Memorandum
      Sentencing Memorandum filed by USA as to Defendant Gabriel James Chiles. (kw, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Violation Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
        Supervised Release Violation Arrest Warrant issued 8/18/04 returned executed on 4/12/05 as to Defendant Gabriel James Chiles. (kw, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 31 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown as to Gabriel James Chiles. On the Court's own motion, Supervised Release Violation Hearing set for 4/28/2005 is RESET to 4/26/2005 at 02:30PM before Honorable Anna J. Brown. (sm, )
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
            Order of Detention as to Defendant Gabriel James Chiles by Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas; signed on 4/14/05. (kw, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Initial Appearance - Revocation ProceedingsCourt Filing
              Minutes of Proceedings:Initial Appearance, Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing regarding Violation of Supervised Release before Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas as to Defendant Gabriel James Chiles; Defendant waived advice of rights; Defendant waived Preliminary Hearing; Order that Defendant is DETAINED pending further hearing; Hearing re: Violation of Supervised Release SET for 4/28/2005 at 08:30AM in Portland before Honorable Anna J. Brown;Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Fred Weinhouse.Counsel Present for Defendant: Francesca Freccero.(Court Reporter: Courtroom Deputy Paul Gale)(Tape #FTR) (kw, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum IssuedCourt Filing
                Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Defendant Gabriel James Chiles for 4/14/05; Violation of Supervised Release Hearing SET for 4/14/2005 at 01:30PM in Portland before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (kw, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005, Terminated: 3/30/2005 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
                  Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum filed by USA as to Defendant Gabriel James Chiles. (kw, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                    Order Appointing Counsel as to Defendant Gabriel James Chiles; IT IS ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender is appointed as counsel for Defendant Gabriel James Chiles; Assistant Federal Public Defender Francesca Freccero will be representing Defendant; by Judge John Jelderks; signed on 3/18/05. (kw, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
                      Order Appointing Counsel as to Defendant Gabriel James Chiles; IT IS ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender is appointed as counsel for Defendant; Assistant Federal Public Defender Francesca Freccero will represent Defendant Gabriel James Chiles; by Judge Anna J. Brown; signed on 3/14/05. (kw, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                        Probation Form 12 - Petition and Order for Modification of Conditions of Supervised Release by Judge Anna J. Brown; The Defendant Gabriel James Chiles shall reside in a community corrections center for up to 120 days; signed on 3/14/04. (kw, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 160 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?