Villavicencio v. Katz, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:00-cv-00623-BR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Blanchette Villavicencio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com
v.
No Logo City of Portland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark R. Moline +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 mmoline@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Edward Cummings, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark R. Moline +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 mmoline@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Vera Katz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark R. Moline +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 mmoline@ci.portland.or.us
Office Portland
Filed 5/8/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Multnomah
Terminated 9/7/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-03-0030 Location number 1049179 Box 327 of 454 (tomg)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Order Dismissing Case
    STIPULATED NOTICE OF DISMISSAL with prejudice and without costs of attorney fees by Blanchette Villavicencio, Vera Katz, Edward Cummings, City of Portland (ljl)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Court Trial - Begun
      RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Anna J. Brown GRANTING City of Portlands MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO FILE THEIR FIRST APPEARANCE 30 DAYS AFTER SERVICE HAS BEEN COMPLETED BOTH DEFENDANTS KATZ AND CUMMINGS [3-1] (counsel notified) (ljl)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 Affidavit
        AFFIDAVIT by Defendant of Mark R. Moline re: MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO FILE THEIR FIRST APPEARANCE 30 DAYS AFTER SERVICE HAS BEEN COMPLETED ON BOTH DEFENDANTS KATZ AND CUMMINGS [3-1] (ljl)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000, Terminated: 6/5/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
          MOTION by Defendantx FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO FILE THEIR FIRST APPEARANCE 30 DAYS AFTER SERVICE HAS BEEN COMPLETED ON BOTH DEFENDANTS KATZ AND CUMMINGS (ljl)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/8/2000 Discovery Order
            DISCOVERY ORDER AND ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT discovery due 9/5/00 Joint status report due 9/5/00 pretrial order due 10/5/00 (ljl)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/8/2000 Complaint
              COMPLAINT and JURY TRIAL DEMAND summons issued - Civil Rights - (Cause Code: 42:1983cv ) ( Receipt # 429888) (ljl)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 46 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?