USA v. Lincoln
Criminal Case Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:02-cr-00208-RE

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Noonan, Jr. +1 503 727 1010 +1 503 727 1117 frank.noonan@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Portland
Filed 5/16/2002
County Multnomah
Terminated 1/22/2004
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18871 THREATS AGAINST PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005 Mandate of USCA
MANDATE of USCA-9th Circuit as to Jonathan Joseph Lincoln regarding Notice of Appeal CA 04-30040 [51]: The decision of the District Court is REVERSED. (tomg, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Certificate of Record by Clerk to USCA
    Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA-9th Circuit, re Notice of Appeal CA 04-30040 [51] filed by Jonathan Joseph Lincoln on 1/26/04. (tomg, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Appeal Record Returned
      Appeal Record Returned (one original volume and original transcripts #s 27, 29, 56-59) returned as to Jonathan Joseph Lincoln regarding Notice of Appeal CA 04-30040 [51]. (tomg, )
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Petition for Probation/Supervised Release Action/MCourt Filing
        Petition for Supervised Release Modification and Order as to Defendant Jonathan Joseph Lincoln; IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall reside in and satisfactorily participate in a community corrections center to include a prerelease component, if determined appropriate by the Community Corrections Manager and the US Probation Officer, for up to 60 days or until discharged by the Community Corrections Manager and the US Probation Officer; by Judge Garr M. King; signed on 2/23/05. (kw, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Petition for Probation/Supervised Release Action/MCourt Filing
          Petition for Probation/Supervised Release Action/Modification and Order as to Defendant Jonathan Joseph Lincoln by Judge James A. Redden signed on 2/1/05. (schman, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
            Transcript of Proceedings as to Jonathan Joseph Lincoln for the hearing held on 1/14/04 before Judge James A. Redden. Court Reporter: Bridget R. Hayes-Montero. (schman, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
              Record on Appeal (entire original file) sent to USCA-9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal CA 04-30040 [51]. (tomg, )
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Judgment or Order Returned Executed
                Judgment or Order Returned Executed as to Jonathan Joseph Lincoln regarding [49] Judgment, on 3/11/04. (Meyer, Craig)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                  Transcript of Proceedings as to Jonathan Joseph Lincoln for the hearing held on 5/8/03, Sentencing before Judge James A. Redden. Court Reporter: Julie A. Colling. (schman, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                    Transcript of Proceedings as to Jonathan Joseph Lincoln for the hearing held on 10/20/03 before Judge Redden. Court Reporter: Susan Glenn Walker. (schman, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                      Transcript of Proceedings as to Jonathan Joseph Lincoln for the hearing held on 12/5/03, Telephone Conference, before Judge James A. Redden. Court Reporter: Dennis R. Grube. (schman, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Jonathan Joseph Lincoln for the hearing held on 11/4/02 before Judge James A. Redden. Court Reporter: Robert Stimler. (jlr, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 25 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?