District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Oregon District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  1. Case No. 05-30219
    Filed 5/4/2005
  2. Case No. 03-30361
    Filed 8/21/2003
United States Supreme Court

USA v. Nolan, et al
Criminal Case Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:02-cr-00390-JO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2019 at 4:37 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott M. Kerin +1 503 727 1002 +1 503 727 1117 scott.kerin@usdoj.gov
Space Owen Peter Martikan +1 415 436 7241 +1 415 436 6748 CaseView.ECF@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Weppner +1 503 901 5239 +1 503 229 1856 raw-law@comcast.net
No Logo John S Nolan (1), FPC SHERIDAN/Legal Mail

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew A. Schindler +1 503 699 7333 +1 503 345 9372 mas@schindlerdefends.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Portland
Filed 9/23/2002
County Multnomah
Terminated 7/30/2003
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD
Count 16
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 MAIL FRAUD
Count 17-21
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 MAIL FRAUD
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 514.F
Offense Level 4
18514(a)(1) and 18 USC 2 UNLAWFUL MANUFACTURE OF FICTITIOUS OBLIGATIONS
Count 3-15
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 514.F
Offense Level 4
18514(a)(2) and 18 USC 2 UNLAWFUL PASSING OF FICTITIOUS OBLIGATIONS
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (208) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 182 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Transcript of ProceedingsCourt Filing
OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED as to Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr for date of 8/10/10 before Judge Robert E. Jones, Court Reporter Denise C. Zito. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 9/27/2010. Redaction Request due 10/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2010. (mkk)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: 8/13/2010 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER Terminating Supervised Release as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr. Signed 8/12/10 by Judge Robert E. Jones. (mkk)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 Supervised Release - Final Revocation HrgCourt Filing
      Minutes of Proceedings:Record of time set for Hearing on Supervised Release Violation before Judge Robert E. Jones as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr.: The Court orders Defendant's Supervised Release terminated (Probation to prepare formal Order). Courtroom Deputy: Cindy Schultz.Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Scott M. Kerin.Counsel Present for Defendant: Pro se.(Court Reporter Denise Zito (503) 406-2288) (mkk)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 Violation Summons Returned Executed
        Violation Summons Returned Executed on 7/15/10 as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr. (mkk)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  appeal record returned
          Appeal Record Returned (three original volumes and original transcripts #s 35, 75, 98, 130-137, 140 and 147) returned as to John S Nolan regarding Notice of Appeal CA 05-30219 [160]. (tomg)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Mandate of USCA
            MANDATE of USCA-9th Circuit (certified copy) as to John S Nolan regarding Notice of Appeal[160], Notice of Appeal[161] USCA # 02-30219 & 05-30220 The decision of the District Court is: AFFIRMED (mkk)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Appeal Record Sent to USCA
              Record on Appeal (entire original file) as to John S Nolan sent to USCA-9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal CA 05-30219 [160]. (tomg, )
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Robert E. Jones Granting [173] Motion to Strike Resentencing 9/29/05 as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (2) (jlr, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Certificate of service
                  Certificate of Service by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr regarding Motion to Strike Resentencing[173] (jlr, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Motion to strike
                    Motion to Strike Resentencing Hearing by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr. (jlr, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      Scheduling Order by Judge Robert E. Jones as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr. Resentencing reset from 9/27/05 to 9/29/2005 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert E. Jones in Courtroom 10A. (jlr, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Mandate of USCA
                        MANDATE of USCA-9th Circuit (certified copy) as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr regarding Notice of Appeal[127] USCA # 03-30361; The decision of the District Court is: CONVICTION IS AFFIRMED; SENTENCE REMANDED. (Kirk, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                          Record of Order as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr: Resentencing is set for 9/27/2005 at 09:00AM in Portland before Judge Robert E. Jones, inCourtroom 10A. by Judge Robert E. Jones (Kirk, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  appeal record returned
                            Appeal Record Returned (three original volumes and original transcripts 35, 98, 130-137, 140 and 147) returned as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr regarding Notice of Appeal CA 03-30361 [127]. (tomg, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005, Terminated: 10/16/2006 Certificate of Record by Clerk to USCA
                              Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA-9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal CA 05-30220 [161] filed by John S. Nolan on 4/15/05. (tomg, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005, Terminated: 10/16/2006 Certificate of Record by Clerk to USCA
                                Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA-9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal CA 05-30219 [160] filed by John S. Nolan on 4/15/05. (tomg, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Order of USCA
                                  Order of USCA-9th Circuit as to John S Nolan Notices of Appeal CA 05-30219 [160] and CA 05-30220 [161]: The court, on its own motion, consolidates these appeals; Briefing Schedule. (tomg, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Notice (GENERIC)
                                    Notice of Cancellation of Power of Attorney of Carla Marie Jones as to John S Nolan (Kirk, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Notice (GENERIC)
                                      Designation of Appeal Record as to John S Nolan regarding Notice of Appeal [160] and Notice of Appeal [161]. Filed by John S Nolan. (tomg, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  USCA Case Number
                                        Notification by USCA 9th Circuit of case number CA 05-30219 for Notice of Appeal [160] filed by John S Nolan on 4/15/05. (tomg, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Fee Paid
                                          USCA-9th Circuit Appeal Fee Paid. $ 255.00 received. Receipt number 3234 issued as to John S Nolan regarding Notice of Appeal [161]. Court of appeals notified. (tomg, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Fee Paid
                                            USCA-9th Circuit Appeal Fee Paid. $ 255.00 received. Receipt number 3233 issued as to John S Nolan regarding Notice of Appeal [160]. Court of appeals notified. (tomg, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  USCA Case Number
                                              Notification by USCA 9th Circuit of case number CA 05-30220 for Notice of Appeal [161] filed by John S Nolan on 4/15/05. (tomg, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 DeclarationCourt Filing
                                                Declaration of Filed Appeal of Judge Haggerty's & Judge Jones' Orders pursuant to 28 USC 1746 by John Stuart Nolan regarding Notice of Appeal[161](Kirk, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005, Terminated: 10/16/2006 Order for Time Schedule
                                                  Order for Time Schedule regarding Notice of Appeal [161] as to Defendant John S Nolan: Transcript Order Form due 5/6/05, Transcripts and Certificate of Record due 6/6/05, Appellant's Brief due 7/18/05, Appellee's Brief due 8/17/05, Optional Reply Brief due 8/31/05. (tomg, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005, Terminated: 10/16/2006 Order for Time Schedule
                                                    Order for Time Schedule regarding Notice of Appeal [160] as to Defendant John S Nolan: Transcript Order Form due 5/6/05, Transcripts and Certificate of Record due 6/6/05, Appellant's Brief due 7/18/05, Appellee's Brief due 8/17/05, Optional Reply Brief due 8/31/05. (tomg, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Notification of Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                      Notification of Appeal sent to USCA-9th Circuit and to counsel along with Time Schedule Order and docket sheet as to John S Nolan regarding Notice of Appeal [161]. (tomg, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Notification of Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                        Notification of Appeal sent to USCA-9th Circuit and to counsel along with Time Schedule Order and docket sheet as to John S Nolan regarding Notice of Appeal [160]. (tomg, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Notice of appeal
                                                          Notice of Appeal To USCA 9th Circuit from Order [158] entered 4/4/05. No appeal fee received. IFP granted 9/24/02. Filed by john S. Nolan. (tomg, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Notice of appeal
                                                            Notice of Appeal To USCA 9th Circuit from Order [157]. No appeal fee received. IFP granted 9/24/02. Filed by John S. Nolan. (tomg, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 159 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005, Terminated: 9/12/2005 Certificate of Record by Clerk to USCA
                                                              Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA-9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal CA 03-30361 [127] filed by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr. on 8/11/03. (tomg, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                Record on Appeal (entire original file) as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr sent to USCA-9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal CA 03-30361 [127]. (tomg, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER Denying [156] Motion for writ of mandamus as to John S Nolan (1) by Judge Robert E. Jones signed on 4/4/05. (Kirk, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Order on Motion for RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER Denying defendant Nolan's Motion for Recusal of Judge Jones [#153]. by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty signed on 3/31/05. (md, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Motion for order
                                                                      Petition for Writ of Mandamus by John S Nolan. (Kirk, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Notice of Substitution of Defense Attorney
                                                                        Notice of Attorney Substitution: Attorney Scott M. Kerin for USA substituted for AUSA Allan Garten. (Kirk, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 154 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 order on motion for release from custodyCourt Filing
                                                                          Findings & Conclusions as to Defendant Van Dyke's Motion for Release Pending Appeal: Denying [148] Motion for Release from Custody as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (2) by Judge Robert E. Jones signed on 1/27/05. (Kirk, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Motion for RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                            Motion (Filed as a Notice) & Demand of Disqualification of Judge Robert E. Jones Pursuant to 28 USC 455(b)(3) by John S Nolan. (Kirk, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Response to motion
                                                                              Response in Opposition to Motion for Release Pending Appeal by USA as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr regarding Motion for Release from Custody[148] filed by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr (Kirk, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Certificate of service
                                                                                Certificate of Service by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr regarding Motion for Release from Custody[148], Memorandum in Support[149], Declaration[150] (Kirk, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Declaration
                                                                                  Declaration by Robert A. Weppner in Support of Motion to Terminate Detention Pending Appeal [148] filed by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr (Kirk, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                    Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Terminate Detention Pending Appeal by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr regarding [148] filed by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr (Kirk, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 148 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 motion for release from custody
                                                                                      Motion to Terminate Detention Pending Appeal by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr. (Kirk, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Transcript of ProceedingsCourt Filing
                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr for the hearing held on 10/8/02 before Judge Janice M. Stewart. Court Reporter: Yuki Ogawa Transcription Service. (jlr, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Transcript Designation and Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                          Transcript Designation by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr for the hearing held on 10/8/02 before Judge Janice M. Stewart. (Document #16) Tape Number: 641 & 642 (jlr, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                            CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney Robert A. Weppner for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert E. Jones. effective 4/26/04. (jlr, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 USCA order
                                                                                              CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER from the US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit regarding appeal filed by Defendant Lyle Hartford VanDyke, Jr[127-1] - appellant is granted leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis and counsel will be appointed for purposes of the appeal; Clerk shall serve copy of this order on Steven T Wax, Federal Public Defender, Portland, Oregon; district court shall provide Clerk of this court with name and address of appointed counsel by facsimile transmission within 14 days of locating counsel; Appellant shall designate the reporter's transcript by 2/2/04; transcript due 3/3/04; opening brief and excerpts of record due 4/12/04; answering brief due 5/12/04; optional reply brief due within 14 days after service of the answering brief; the Clerk shall serve this order on appellant individually - see order for additional details (rr)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Order
                                                                                                ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, ordering that defendant's passport, previously surrendered to Pretrial Services on 10/2/02, be forward to the US Department of State s/ 12/30/03 (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 USCA order
                                                                                                  CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER from the US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit: Appeal 03-30350 is dismissed as duplicative of appeal 03-30361. All filings in appeal 03-30350 are transferred to appeal 03-30361. (fh)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Judgment or Order Returned Executed
                                                                                                    JUDGMENT AND COMMITMENT returned executed 9/16/03 regarding Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr - defendant delivered to FCI Waseca, at Waseca, Minnesota [121-1] (rr)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of 7/28/03 sentencing proceedings for Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones Court reporter: Nancy Walker (rr)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                        NOTIFICATION by US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit of Docket Number 03-30361 by Defendant Van Dyke regarding [127-1] (fh)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Returned Mail
                                                                                                          MAIL RETURNED [] addressed to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jrc/o Evelyn Bolt Van Dyke, for Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (fh)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of 12/11/02 proceedings for Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones Court reporter: Dennis W Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of 12/10/03 proceedings (VOL 6) for Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones Court reporter: Dennis W Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of 12/9/03 proceedings (VOL 5) for Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones Court reporter: Dennis W Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of 12/6/02 proceedings (VOL 4) for Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones Court reporter: Dennis W Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of 12/5/02 proceedings (VOL 3) for Defendants John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones Court reporter: Dennis W Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of 12/4/02 proceedings (VOL 2) for Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones Court reporter: Dennis W Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of 12/3/02 proceedings (VOL 1) for Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones Court reporter: Dennis W Apodaca(rr) Modified on 08/21/2003
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of 11/22/02 proceedings for Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones Court reporter: Dennis W Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                            NOTIFICATION by US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit of Docket Number 03-30390 regarding [125-1] (fh)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003, Terminated: 9/12/2005 Order for Time Schedule
                                                                                                                              ORDER for time schedule. appeal [127-1]: transcripts to be ordered by 9/2/03; transcripts and certificate of record to be filed 10/2/03; appellants opening brief due 11/12/03; appellees brief due 12/12/03; appellants reply brief due 12/26/03. (fh)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Notification of Appeal Sent
                                                                                                                                NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL mailed to Court of Appeals For the Ninth Circuit and to counsel along with copy of appealed document,time schedule order, and docket sheet. (fh)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL to Court of Appeals by Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr of conviction and sentence, entered 7/30/03. (fh)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003, Terminated: 10/16/2006 Order for Time Schedule
                                                                                                                                    ORDER for time schedule. appeal [125-1]: Transcripts to be ordered by 8/21/03; certificate of record due 9/22/03; appellants opening brief due 10/30/03; appellees brief due 12/1/03; appellants reply brief due 12/15/03. (fh)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003, Terminated: 9/12/2005 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL to Court of Appeals, filed by Evelyn Bolt Van Dyke for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr., Receipt # 086900 (fh)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notification of Appeal Sent
                                                                                                                                        NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL mailed to Court of Appeals For the Ninth Circuit and to counsel along with copy of appealed document, time schedule order, and docket sheet. (fh)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                          FINDINGS OF FACT ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones as to Defendant John S Nolan (cc: all counsel) [123-1] (rr)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Judgment and Commitment
                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT AND COMMITMENT issued to U.S. Marshal as to defendant John S Nolan (1) count(s) 1, 2 , 3 -15 , 17 -21 . SENTENCING DATE: 7/29/03; IMPRISONMENT: Count 2 - 63 months; Count 1 - 60 months, to run concurrently with the sentence imposed in Count 2; Counts 3 through 15: 63 months as to each count, to run concurrently with each other and with the sentences imposed in Counts 1 and 2; Counts 17 through 21: 60 months as to each count, to run concurrently with each other and with the sentences imposed in Counts 1, 2, and 3 through 15; SUPERVISED RELEASE: 5 years; RESTITUTION: $20,395.83, joint and several with Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr; SPECIAL ASSESSMENT: $100 for counts 1-15 and 17-21, for a total of $2,000.00; Defendant has been found not guilty on Count 16, and is discharged as to such counts s/ 7/30/03 by Honorable Robert E. Jones (rr)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                              FINDINGS OF FACT ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones as to Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (cc: all counsel) [121-1] (rr)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Judgment and Commitment
                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT AND COMMITMENT issued to U.S. Marshal as to defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke (2) count(s) 1, 2 , 3 -15 . SENTENCING DATE: 7/28/03; IMPRISONMENT: Count 1 - 60 months; Counts 3 through 15: 37 months as to each count, to run concurrently with each other and consecutive with the sentence imposed in Count 1; Count 2 - 37 months, to run concurrently with the sentences imposed in Count 1 and Counts 3 through 15; SUPERVISED RELEASE: 5 years; RESTITUTION: $20,395.83; SPECIAL ASSESSMENT: $100 for each count, total of $1,500.00 s/ 7/30/03 by Honorable Robert E. Jones (rr)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan - sentencing hearing held - see formal judgment and Findings of Fact Order (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Dennis Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - sentencing hearing held - see formal Judgment and Findings of Fact Order (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Nancy Walker (rr)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 sentencing memorandum
                                                                                                                                                      SENTENCING MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA regarding Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (rr)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 sentencing memorandum
                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED SENTENCING MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA re Defendant John S Nolan (rr)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003, Terminated: 7/30/2003 Mandate
                                                                                                                                                          MANDATE/JUDGMENT from USCA DISMISSING the appeal filed by Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr for failure to prosecute [61-2] (Court of Appeals Case Number 03-30006) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - sentencing set 9:00 7/28/03 for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan - the TIME of the sentencing is reset from 10:30 a.m. to 9:00 7/29/03 for John S Nolan before Honorable Robert E. Jones (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 USCA order
                                                                                                                                                                COPY OF ORDER from the US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit dismissing appeal filed by Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke (Court of Appeal Case Number 03-30006) for failure to prosecute [61-2] (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - DENYING Petition to vacate a void judgment and collateral attack [111-1] (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                    PETITION TO VACATE A VOID JUDGMENT AND COLLATERAL ATTACK UNDER AUTHORITY OF ARTICLES V AND VI OF AMENDMENTS OF THE CONSTITUTION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by Gordon W Rogers of Promoters of Truth (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan - [108-1], GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING by Defendant John S Nolan [108-2] sentencing reset from 6/10 to 10:30 7/29/03 for John S Nolan before Honorable Robert E. Jones (cc: Counsel notified) (jlr)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by Defendant John S Nolan of Counsel Matthew Schindler re: MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TIME FOR FILING OBJECTIONS TO THE PRESENTENCE REPORT by Defendant John S Nolan [108-1], MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING by Defendant John S Nolan [108-2] (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003, Terminated: 6/5/2003 Motion to Continue / Reset
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TIME FOR FILING OBJECTIONS TO THE PRESENTENCE REPORT by Defendant John S Nolan , and TO CONTINUE SENTENCING by Defendant John S Nolan (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY for Defendant John S Nolan by Matthew A Schindler (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 sentencing memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA regarding Defendant John S Nolan (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan - sentencing set 10:30 6/10/03 for John S Nolan before Honorable Robert E. Jones (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE/JUDGMENT from USCA AFFIRMING the decision of the District Court [54-1] regarding defendant Nolan (fh) Modified on 04/03/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Case Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - DENYING MOTION TO QUASH INDICTMENT AND PURPORTED VERDICT (Demand for Due Process) (entitled "Demand to Quash Indictment and Purported Verdict - Demand for Due Process") by Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr [101-1] (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003, Terminated: 3/14/2003 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION TO QUASH INDICTMENT AND PURPORTED VERDICT (Demand for Due Process) (entitled "Demand to Quash Indictment and Purported Verdict - Demand for Due Process") by Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (rr) Modified on 03/14/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003, Terminated: 7/30/2003 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FOR SENTENCING AND APPEAL by Defendant John S Nolan (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Case Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan - Defendant Nolan is presently undergoing psychiatric evaluation at the federal medical facility in Massachusetts; his request for release (#96) is denied at this time; DENYING MOTION FOR RELEASE by Defendant John S Nolan [96-1] (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of 11/8/02 for Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones Court reporter: Amanda M LeGore (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE by Defendant John S Nolan of: Motion for Release (96) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 motion for release from custody
                                                                                                                                                                                                FRAP 9(b) MOTION FOR RELEASE by Defendant John S Nolan with attached Affidavits and other attachments (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Case Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan - DENYING Defendant's request for disqualification and/or recusal - affidavit [84-1], DENYING notice [85-1], DENYING affidavit [86-1] (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Case Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - DENYING relief requested by Defendant Van Dyke in document entitled Petition for Redress of Grievances - a Citizen's US Criminal Complaint, Affidavit, Citation, and Brief of Information pursuant to 18 USC 4 and 42 USC 1986 dated 1/22/03 [80-1] (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      REMARK as to Defendant John S Nolan - Certified copy of Release of Medical Information to Carla Marie Jones filed (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REMARK as to Defendant John S Nolan - Certified copy of Power of Appointment appointing Carla Marie Jones filed (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REMARK as to Defendant John S Nolan - Certified copy of Power of Attorney appointing Carla Marie Jones filed (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE by Defendant John S Nolan of: documents #84,85, and 86 (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE by Defendant John S Nolan of Witnesses re: affidavit [84-1] (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF PROTEST BY AFFIDAVIT by Defendant John S Nolan (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE by Defendant John S Nolan of John Stuart Nolan (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - sentencing date of 5/16/03 for both defendants is stricken; a new date will be set upon receipt of evaluations being conducted by the Bureau of Prisons (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr - Pursuant to Order dated 12/20/02, the Bureau of Prisons' Federal Medical Center, Butner, North Carolina, is conducting an evaluation of the above-named defendant pursuant to 18 USCA 3552; the Federal Medical Center has requested that the evaluation period for this defendant run from 1/15/03 to 5/13/03; the request is granted; the 5/16/03 sentencing hearing is stricken, and will be reset upon receipt of the evaluation s/ 2/4/03 (cc: Counsel notified) (rr) Modified on 03/04/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Jodi M Herold filed by Oregon State Department of Justice re: MOTION TO QUASH THE SUBPOENAS ISSUED TO GOVERNOR JOHN KITZHABER, JUDGE ROBERT SELANDER, JUDGE PATRICK GILROY, JUDGE STEVEN MAURER, JUDGE RAYMOND BAGLEY, MARY NEIDIG, CHIEF JUSTICE WALLACE CARSON, PRESIDING JUDGE JACK LANDAU, JUDGE ALAN JACK, JUDGE RONALD CINNIGER, JUDGE JAMES ELLIS, JUDGE NELY JOHNSON, JUDGE ANN FISHER AND RUNN KENNEL filed by Oregon State Department of Justice by Assistant Attorney General Sean T Brady [93-1] (rr) Modified on 07/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT and DEMAND FOR CHARGING AFFIDAVITS by Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr of Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            US CONSTITUTIONAL FIRST AMENDMENT PETITION FOR REDRESS OF GRIEVANCES - A CITIZEN'S US CRIMINAL COMPLAINT, AFFIDAVIT, CITATION, AND BRIEF OF INFORMATION PURSUANT TO 18 USC 4 AND 42 USC 1986 filed by Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (rr) Modified on 02/07/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Case Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan -in response to Defendant Nolan's demand for transcripts for appeal and other matters, all of these materials have been provided to the defendant or will be in due course [78-1] (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Notice (GENERIC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REMARK as to Defendant John S Nolan - DEMAND FOR TRANSCRIPTS FOR APPEAL, TO INCLUDE PRETRIAL MEMORANDA, MINUTE NOTICES, TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS AND GOVERNMENT'S DISCOVERY, ESPECIALLY JOSH FINDLEY BEFORE THE GRAND JURY filed by Defendant John Stuart Nolan (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - sentencing reset from 3/5/03 to 10:30 5/16/03 for John S Nolan, for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECEIPT in the amount of $105.00 made out to Evelyn L Bolt for appeal filed by Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr (check was forwarded to US District Court from the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of 11/5/02 for Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Anna J. Brown Court reporter: Kellie Humiston (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTIFICATION by US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit of Docket Number 03-30006, for appeal [61-2], filed by defendant Van Dyke (fh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Case Assignment NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - transcripts of all criminal proceedings against Defendants Nolan and Van Dyke may be ordered at the defendants' request at government expense, as authorized by Judge Robert E Jones; requests must be in writing and signed by the individual defendants and no one else (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE by Defendant John S Nolan of: document #68 (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE by Defendant John S Nolan of: Documents #66 and 67 (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Case Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan - DENYING MOTION FOR ABATEMENT OF PROCEEDINGS FOR WANT OF TERRITORIAL JURISDICTION by Defendant John S Nolan (titled "Demand for Abatement of Proceedings for Want of Territorial Jurisdiction") [66-1], DENYING MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF BOND BONDING THE CHARGES FOR IN REM AND SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Defendant John S Nolan [68-1] (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT by Defendant John S Nolan of John Stuart Nolan re: MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF BOND BONDING THE CHARGES FOR IN REM AND SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Defendant John S Nolan [68-1] (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Returned Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MAIL RETURNED [appeal [61-2], appeal MOTION FOR RELEASE (Titled DEMAND FOR RELEASE) [61-1], minutes order [62-1], minutes order [63-1] ] addressed to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr for Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF BOND BONDING THE CHARGES FOR IN REM AND SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Defendant John S Nolan (titled "Demand for Production of Bond Bonding the Charges for In Rem and Subject Matter Jurisdiction" (rr) Modified on 01/13/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by Defendant John S Nolan of John Stuart Nolan re: MOTION FOR ABATEMENT OF PROCEEDINGS FOR WANT OF TERRITORIAL JURISDICTION by Defendant John S Nolan (titled "Demand for Abatement of Proceedings for Want of Territorial Jurisdiction") [66-1] (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003, Terminated: 1/13/2003 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION FOR ABATEMENT OF PROCEEDINGS FOR WANT OF TERRITORIAL JURISDICTION by Defendant John S Nolan (titled "Demand for Abatement of Proceedings for Want of Territorial Jurisdiction") (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Transcript Designation and Order Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM filed by Defendant John S Nolan for date(s) 9/23/02 and 9/26/02 appearances by Defendant Van Dyke in Eastern District of Washington (Spokane), 9/24/02, 10/2/02, 11/5/02, 11/8/02, 11/22/02, 12/3/02-1/10/02 for appeal filed by Defendant John S Nolan [54-1] (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Order for Time Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER for time schedule. appeal [61-2] defendant Van Dyke: transcripts to be ordered by 1/14/03; ct reporters transcripts to be filed by 2/13/03; appellants opng brief due 3/25/03; appellees brief by 4/24/03; aplts reply brief by 5/8/03. (fh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notification of Appeal Sent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL mailed to Court of Appeals For the Ninth Circuit and to counsel along with copy of appealed document, order for time schedule, and docket sheet. (fh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Case Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - Unsigned motions (not docketed) for recusal DENIED. see attachments to m/o (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr none (schman) Modified on 12/31/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Case Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr -Record of Order: Notice of Appeal of Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, unsigned by defendant, is filed. DENYING MOTION FOR RELEASE (Titled DEMAND FOR RELEASE) [61-1] (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr none (schman) Modified on 12/31/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL to Court of Appeals by Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr appealing jury verdict of GUILTY as to this defendant [46-4] and MOTION FOR RELEASE (Titled DEMAND FOR RELEASE) Receipt # no fee paid, filed pro se (schman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002, Terminated: 10/16/2006 Order for Time Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER for time schedule for appeal [54-1]: Transcripts to be ordered by 1/8/03; transcripts and certificate of record due 2/7/03; appellants opening brief due 3/19/03; appellees answering brief due 4/18/03; reply brief due 5/2/03. (fh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notification of Appeal Sent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL mailed to Court of Appeals For the Ninth Circuit and to counsel along with copy of appealed document, time schedule order, and docket sheet. (fh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr - Ordering the US Bureau of Prisons to perform a complete psychiatric/psychological examination of the above defendant at a facility as designated by the Bureau s/ 12/20/02 (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan - Ordering US Bureau of Prisons to perform a complete psychiatric/psychological examination of the above defendant at a facility as designated by the Bureau s/ 12/20/02 (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Case Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - Regarding Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr: Detention finding #5 (in order [52-1]) s amended to read as follows: He bragged about having circulated $5 billion in fictitious notes and drafts and that $1 billion was still in possession of the Social Security Administration (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Case Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - the Court notes an attempt by the Defendant Nolan to appeal this court's detention order; the Notice appears to be inappropriate, in that it has not eeen signed by the defendant and the person purporting to sign for him is not an attorney at law or other legal representative - appeal [54-1] (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Case Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - order [50-1] appointing Dr Ruth Matarazzo to conduct psychological examinations is rescinded (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002, Terminated: 3/29/2003 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL to Court of Appeals by Defendant John S Nolan of order revoking release and ordering detention [52-1] Receipt # 447757 (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE by Defendant John S Nolan for Defendant John S Nolan - new address: John Stuart Nolan, P.O. Box 9010, Portland, OR 97207 (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Order of Detention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DETENTION FINDINGS of Defendant John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding the 12/11/02 revoking of pretrial release and ordered detention of both defendants (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Returned Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MAIL RETURNED [minute order [37-1], minutes order [38-2], minutes order [39-2] ] addressed to John S Nolan for Defendant John S Nolan (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones - pursuant to 18 USCA 3552, Dr Ruth Matarazzo is appointed to conduct a psychological examination of the above defendants and report to this court within 90 days s/ 12/13/02 (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS as to Defendants John S Nolan and Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - sentencing set 10:30 3/5/03 for John S Nolan, for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Dennis Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COURT JURY INSTRUCTIONS (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 jury verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      VERDICT as to Defendant John S Nolan John S Nolan - not guilty John S Nolan (1) on count(s) 16 , finding John S Nolan guilty John S Nolan (1) on count(s) 1, 2, 3-15, 17-21 ; finding Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr guilty Lyle Hartford Van Dyke (2) on count(s) 1, 2, 3-15 (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Jury Trial Completed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL 7th day before Honorable Robert E. Jones re: Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - witness sworn, evidence adduced; Defendants'oral motion to dismiss for insufficient evidence is denied; jury instructed; closing arguments; jury to deliberations; verdict returned; jury dismissed JURY TRIAL ENDS (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Dennis Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL 6th day before Honorable Robert E. Jones re: Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - witnesses sworn, evidence adduced; JURY TRIAL to be continued on 9:00 12/11/02 as to John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Dennis Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002 Returned Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MAIL RETURNED [minutes order [22-2] ] addressed to John S Nolan for Defendant John S Nolan (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002 Returned Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MAIL RETURNED [minutes order [23-1] ] addressed to John S Nolan for Defendant John S Nolan (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL 5th day before Honorable Robert E. Jones re: Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - witnesses sworn, evidence adduced; the Court released one juror; JURY TRIAL to be continued on 9:00 12/10/02 as to John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Dennis Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL 4th day before Honorable Robert E. Jones re: Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - witnesses sworn, evidence adduced; defendants' oral motion for judgment of acquittal is denied; JURY TRIAL to be continued on 9:00 12/9/02 as to John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Dennis Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL 3rd day before Honorable Robert E. Jones re: Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT NOLAN'S SUBPOENA TO IRS/CID SPECIAL AGENT JIM DANIELS by USA as to Defendants John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr [34-1] witnesses sworn, evidence adduced; JURY TRIAL to be continued on 9:00 12/6/02 as to John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Dennis Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL 2nd day before Honorable Robert E. Jones re: Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - witnesses sworn, evidence adduced; Defendants' oral motion to exclude witnesses from the courtroom is granted; JURY TRIAL to be continued on 9:00 12/5/02 as to John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Dennis Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 2/12/2003 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT of MOTION TO QUASH THE SUBPOENAS ISSUED TO GOVERNOR JOHN KITZHABER, JUDGE ROBERT SELANDER, JUDGE PATRICK GILROY, JUDGE STEVEN MAURER, JUDGE RAYMOND BAGLEY, MARY NEIDIG, CHIEF JUSTICE WALLACE CARSON, PRESIDING JUDGE JACK LANDAU, JUDGE ALAN JACK, JUDGE RONALD CINNIGER, JUDGE JAMES ELLIS, JUDGE NELY JOHNSON, JUDGE ANN FISHER AND RUNN KENNEL filed by Oregon State Department of Justice by Assistant Attorney General Sean T Brady [93-1] (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Appeal Record Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appeal Record Returned (three original volumes and original transcripts #s 35, 75, 98, 130-137, 140 and 147) returned as to John S Nolan regarding Notice of Appeal CA 05-30219 [160]. (tomg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 2/12/2003 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION TO QUASH THE SUBPOENAS ISSUED TO GOVERNOR JOHN KITZHABER, JUDGE ROBERT SELANDER, JUDGE PATRICK GILROY, JUDGE STEVEN MAURER, JUDGE RAYMOND BAGLEY, MARY NEIDIG, CHIEF JUSTICE WALLACE CARSON, PRESIDING JUDGE JACK LANDAU, JUDGE ALAN JACK, JUDGE RONALD CINNIGER, JUDGE JAMES ELLIS, JUDGE NELY JOHNSON, JUDGE ANN FISHER AND RUNN KENNEL filed by Oregon State Department of Justice by Assistant Attorney General Sean T Brady (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/5/2002 Voir Dire Begins - Jury Trial BeginsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF JURY TRIAL 1 day before Honorable Robert E. Jones re: Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr VOIR DIRE BEGINS, JURY IMPANELED, JURY TRIAL BEGINS. - witnesses sworn, evidence adduced; Motion to quash the subpoenas issued to Governor John Kitzhaber, Judge Robert Selander, Judge Patrick Gilroy, Judge Steven Maurer, Judge Raymond Bagley, Mary Neidig, Chief Justice Wallace Carson, Presiding Judge Jack Landau, Judge Alan Jack, Judge Ronald Cinniger, Judge James Ellis, Judge Nely Johnson, Judge Ann Fisher and Runn Kennel is GRANTED; Subpoenas issued to Chief Judge Haggerty, Judge Brown, Judge Ashmanskas and Judge Stewart are QUASHED; SETTING MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT NOLAN'S SUBPOENA TO IRS/CID SPECIAL AGENT JIM DANIELS by USA as to Defendants John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr [34-1] Motion taken under advisement as of 12/3/02 for John S Nolan, for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr,; Special agent Daniels shall be available again at 8:45 a.m. on 12/5/02; Defendants' motion to incorporate the entire case file of the present action into Civil Case No. 01-967-JO is DENIED; Defendants' notice of removal of Case No. CV 01-967-JO to Case NO. 99-2170 in Clackamas County Circuit Court is DENIED; JURY TRIAL to be continued on 9:00 12/4/02 as to John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Dennis Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005, Terminated: 10/16/2006 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Record on Appeal (entire original file) as to John S Nolan sent to USCA-9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal CA 05-30219 [160]. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Copy of LETTER from Carla Marie Jones to US Attorneys Allan M Garten and Scott Kerin (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/29/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT NOLAN'S SUBPOENA TO IRS/CID SPECIAL AGENT JIM DANIELS by USA as to Defendants John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Transcript of Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of 11/22/02 proceedings for Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Robert E. Jones Court reporter: Dennis W Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - Pretrial Conference held - the Government's exhibits are received without objection; GRANTING MOTION IN LIMINE TO PROHIBIT DEFENDANTS FROM PRESENTING INADMISSIBLE EVIDENCE by USA as to Defendants John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr [27-1]; the order preventing defendants from filing civil lawsuits is rescinded - minutes order [13-4] ; Defendant's objections to the Government's proposed jury instructions shall be received by 12/2/02; 3 day trial remains set for 12/3/02 at 9:00 (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Dennis Apodaca (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Plaintiff USA (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Voir Dire Questions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED VOIR DIRE by Plaintiff USA (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS A, B, AND C TO GOVERNMENT'S TRIAL MEMORANDUM DATED 11/18/02 [26-1] (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/31/2005 Appeal Record Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appeal Record Returned (three original volumes and original transcripts 35, 98, 130-137, 140 and 147) returned as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr regarding Notice of Appeal CA 03-30361 [127]. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  GOVERNMENT'S SUMMARY OF EXPERT TESTIMONY OF WILLIAM KERR by Plaintiff USA (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    GOVERNMENT'S EXPANDED EXHIBIT LIST FOR PREADMISSION OF EVIDANCE by Plaintiff USA (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002, Terminated: 11/22/2002 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION IN LIMINE TO PROHIBIT DEFENDANTS FROM PRESENTING INADMISSIBLE EVIDENCE by USA as to Defendants John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff USA (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WITNESS LIST by Plaintiff USA (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT LIST by Plaintiff USA (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notification by USCA 9th Circuit of case number CA 05-30219 for Notice of Appeal [160] filed by John S Nolan on 4/15/05. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Case Assignment NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - a tape of each of the following hearings shall be prepared at government expense and provided by the court to each defendant: (1) the hearing before Judge Ashmanskas on 9/23/02 (2) the hearing before Judge Jelderks on 9/24/02 (3) the hearings before Judge Stewart on 10/2/02 and 10/8/02; the defendants have received a transcript of the 11/5/02 hearing before Judge Brown; a transcript of the 11/8/02 hearing before Judge Jones shall be prepared at government expense and provided by the court to each defendant (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005, Terminated: 10/16/2006 Fee Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USCA-9th Circuit Appeal Fee Paid. $ 255.00 received. Receipt number 3234 issued as to John S Nolan regarding Notice of Appeal [161]. Court of appeals notified. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDICIAL NOTICE BY AFFIDAVIT REQUIRED BY 18 USC 3161-3174 by Defendant John S Nolan of John S. Nolan (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005, Terminated: 10/16/2006 Fee Paid
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      USCA-9th Circuit Appeal Fee Paid. $ 255.00 received. Receipt number 3233 issued as to John S Nolan regarding Notice of Appeal [160]. Court of appeals notified. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - conference held. The government will submit its pretrial memorandum, witness list and exhibit list by 11/18/02 at 9:00. Resetting pretrial conference for 9:00 11/22/02 for John S Nolan, for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr. Resetting 3 day jury trial for 9:00 12/3/02 for John S Nolan, for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr in Portland before Robert E. Jones (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr LeGore (schman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notification by USCA 9th Circuit of case number CA 05-30220 for Notice of Appeal [161] filed by John S Nolan on 4/15/05. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Case Reassignment NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - case reassigned from Honorable Anna J. Brown to Honorable Robert E. Jones , jury trial set for 12/10/02 is transferred from Judge Brown's calendar to Judge Jones' calendar; 5 day jury trial reset for 9:00 12/10/02 for John S Nolan, for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr in Portland before Honorable Robert E. Jones ; all other pending deadlines and dates, as set in Judge Brown's Minute Order of 11/5/02, remain in effect until further order of the Court (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Reassignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT from Honorable Anna J. Brown to Honorable Robert E. Jones (counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Honorable Anna J. Brown regarding Defendant John S Nolan, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - Record of status conference. pretrial conference set 9:00 12/4/02. Jury trial set for 11/26 is reset to 5 day jury trial 9:00 12/10/02 before Honorable Anna J. Brown The court finds for the reasons set forth on the record in light of the complexity of the case that the ends of justice are served and such action outweighs the best interests of the public and the defendant under the Speedy Trial Act. The time from 11/26/02 to 12/10/02 shall be excluded. Any motion to continue this trial date shall be filed no later than 12/2/02. The government's Witness and Exhibit List are due by 11/15/02. All Trial documents including trial memorandum, proposed jury instructions, proposed verdict form, and proposed voir dire questions, are due 11/22/02. Any pretrial motions, including motions in limine, by any party, shall be due by 11/22/02; opposing party's response to such motions shall be due by 12/2/02. (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Kelly Humiston (jlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF ORDER by Honorable Anna J. Brown regarding Defendant John S Nolan - status hearing set 3:00 11/5/02 for John S Nolan, for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr before Honorable Anna J. Brown (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005, Terminated: 10/16/2006 Notification of Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notification of Appeal sent to USCA-9th Circuit and to counsel along with Time Schedule Order and docket sheet as to John S Nolan regarding Notice of Appeal [161]. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Janice M. Stewart setting conditions of release for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (cc: Counsel notified) (schman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005, Terminated: 10/16/2006 Notification of Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notification of Appeal sent to USCA-9th Circuit and to counsel along with Time Schedule Order and docket sheet as to John S Nolan regarding Notice of Appeal [160]. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 A First Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Janice M. Stewart regarding Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr - first appearance, arraignment and detention hearing of Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr defendant waived reading of indictment. defendant advised of rights, Defendant Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr arraigned; NOT-GUILTY PLEA ENTERED; detention hearing held, ORDER: defendant is RELEASED on conditions (see separate order) 5 day jury trial set for 9:00 11/26/02 for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr in Portland before Honorable Anna J. Brown. ORDER: finding defendant knowingly and voluntarily waives counsel. (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr M. Anderson, tape 641 and 642 (schman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANT Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr arrested (schman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Transcript Designation and Order Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TAPE DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM for date(s) 10/2/02 arraignment filed by Defendant John S Nolan; receipt # 446506 (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REVISED ORDER by Judge Janice M. Stewart setting conditions of release for Defendant John S Nolan (cc: Counsel notified) (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005, Terminated: 9/12/2005 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Record on Appeal (entire original file) as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr sent to USCA-9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal CA 03-30361 [127]. (tomg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Janice M. Stewart regarding Defendant John S Nolan - record of review of detention hearing and arraignment; Defendant John S Nolan arraigned; NOT GUILTY PLEA ENTERED; Attorney Paul Papak present; , ORDER finding defendant knowingly and voluntarily waives counsel; Paul Papak is discharged from representation of defendant; 5 day jury trial set for 9:00 11/26/02 for John S Nolan in Portland before Honorable Anna J. Brown , ORDER GRANTING MOTION by USA as to John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr TO IMPOSE APPROPRIATE PRETRIAL RESTRICTIONS ON DEFENDANTS AND TO PROHIBIT DEFENDANTS FROM FILING SPURIOUS LIENS AND LAWSUITS AGAINST INDIVIDUALS ASSOCIATED WITH THE CASE. [11-1]; Defendant advised his true name is John S Nolan; ORDER defendant is released on conditions - ses separate order (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Tapes 636 and 637 (rr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Documents Received from Other Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 40 Documents received from Eastern District of Washington, Spokane case# 02-541-01 as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (schman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA as to John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr TO IMPOSE APPROPRIATE PRETRIAL RESTRICTIONS ON DEFENDANTS AND TO PROHIBIT DEFENDANTS FROM FILING SPURIOUS LIENS AND LAWSUITS AGAINST INDIVIDUALS ASSOCIATED WITH THE CASE. (schman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge John Jelderks setting conditions of release after processing for John S Nolan (cc: Counsel notified) (schman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT returned executed as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr 9/23/02 in the Eastern District of Washington (schman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT returned executed as to John S Nolan 9/23/02 (schman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 A First Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge John Jelderks regarding Defendant John S Nolan - first appearance, of John S Nolan Attorney Ellen Pitcher present for this appearance only; , detention hearing held. Defendant is ReLEASED on conditions (see separate order) arraignment and status hearing are set for 1:30 10/2/02 for John S Nolan before the duty magistrate judge. (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Ilene TenBrook, tape 1582 (schman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas regarding Defendant John S Nolan (NOT PRESENT) - Attorney Ellen Pitcher present. detention hearing set and arraignment set 1:30 9/24/02 for John S Nolan before Duty Magistrate (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Tape:597 (jlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas GRANTING MOTION UNSEAL INDICTMENT by USA as to John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr [4-1] s/ 9/23/02 (cc: Counsel notified) (jlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION UNSEAL INDICTMENT by USA as to John S Nolan, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (jlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANT John S Nolan arrested - assumed date, no return yet on warrant. (jlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Arrest Warrant Issued Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ARREST WARRANT ISSUED for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr DETENTION REQUESTED. by Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas (jlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Arrest Warrant Issued Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT ISSUED for John S Nolan DETENTION REQUESTED. by Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas (jlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INDICTMENT by AUSA Allan M Garten. Counts filed against John S Nolan (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-15, 16-21, Lyle Hartford Van Dyke (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3-15. 18 USC 371 CONSPIRACY Count 1. 18 USC 514(a)(1) and 18 USC 2. UNLAWFUL MANUFACTURE OF FICTITIOUS OBLIGATIONS (Count 2). 18 USC 514(a)(2) and 18 USC 2 (Counts 3-15) UNLAWFUL PASSING OF FICTITIOUS OBLIGATIONS. 18 USC 1341 (Counts 16-21 Defendant Nolan only) MAIL FRAUD (jlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PURSUANT to this courts Case Assignment Plan, this case to be assigned to JUDGE BROWN for all further proceedings. (jlr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 5,113 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?