USA v. Nolan, et al
Criminal Case Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:02-cr-00390-JO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 21, 2020 at 3:41 PM DT (6.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott M. Kerin +1 503 727 1002 +1 503 727 1117 scott.kerin@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Portland
Filed 9/23/2002
County Multnomah
Terminated 7/30/2003
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 514.F
Offense Level 4
18514(a)(1) and 18 USC 2 UNLAWFUL MANUFACTURE OF FICTITIOUS OBLIGATIONS
Count 3-15
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 514.F
Offense Level 4
18514(a)(2) and 18 USC 2 UNLAWFUL PASSING OF FICTITIOUS OBLIGATIONS
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Robert E. Jones Granting [173] Motion to Strike Resentencing 9/29/05 as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (2) (jlr, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Certificate Of Service.
      Certificate of Service by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr regarding Motion to Strike Resentencing[173] (jlr, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005, Terminated: 9/16/2005 Motion to Strike
        Motion to Strike Resentencing Hearing by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr. (jlr, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          Scheduling Order by Judge Robert E. Jones as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr. Resentencing reset from 9/27/05 to 9/29/2005 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert E. Jones in Courtroom 10A. (jlr, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Mandate of USCA
            MANDATE of USCA-9th Circuit (certified copy) as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr regarding Notice of Appeal[127] USCA # 03-30361; The decision of the District Court is: CONVICTION IS AFFIRMED; SENTENCE REMANDED. (Kirk, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              Record of Order as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr: Resentencing is set for 9/27/2005 at 09:00AM in Portland before Judge Robert E. Jones, inCourtroom 10A. by Judge Robert E. Jones (Kirk, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/31/2005 Appeal Record Returned
                Appeal Record Returned (three original volumes and original transcripts 35, 98, 130-137, 140 and 147) returned as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr regarding Notice of Appeal CA 03-30361 [127]. (tomg, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005, Terminated: 9/12/2005 Certificate of Record by Clerk to USCA
                  Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA-9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal CA 03-30361 [127] filed by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr. on 8/11/03. (tomg, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005, Terminated: 9/12/2005 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                    Record on Appeal (entire original file) as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr sent to USCA-9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal CA 03-30361 [127]. (tomg, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Notice of Substitution of Defense Attorney
                      Notice of Attorney Substitution: Attorney Scott M. Kerin for USA substituted for AUSA Allan Garten. (Kirk, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Order on Motion for Release from CustodyCourt Filing
                        Findings & Conclusions as to Defendant Van Dyke's Motion for Release Pending Appeal: Denying [148] Motion for Release from Custody as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr (2) by Judge Robert E. Jones signed on 1/27/05. (Kirk, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Response to Motion
                          Response in Opposition to Motion for Release Pending Appeal by USA as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr regarding Motion for Release from Custody[148] filed by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr (Kirk, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                            Certificate of Service by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr regarding Motion for Release from Custody[148], Memorandum in Support[149], Declaration[150] (Kirk, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Declaration
                              Declaration by Robert A. Weppner in Support of Motion to Terminate Detention Pending Appeal [148] filed by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr (Kirk, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Memorandum in Support
                                Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Terminate Detention Pending Appeal by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr regarding [148] filed by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr (Kirk, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Motion for Release from Custody
                                  Motion to Terminate Detention Pending Appeal by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr. (Kirk, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                    Transcript of Proceedings as to Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr for the hearing held on 10/8/02 before Judge Janice M. Stewart. Court Reporter: Yuki Ogawa Transcription Service. (jlr, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Transcript Designation and Order FormCourt Filing
                                      Transcript Designation by Lyle Hartford Van Dyke Jr for the hearing held on 10/8/02 before Judge Janice M. Stewart. (Document #16) Tape Number: 641 & 642 (jlr, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                        CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney Robert A. Weppner for Lyle Hartford Van Dyke, Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert E. Jones. effective 4/26/04. (jlr, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 4,961 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?