Martinez, et al v. Nygaard, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:84-cv-00380-PA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carmen Rayo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Rosenbaum +1 213 487 1720

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
No Logo Gabino Nunez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo Grace Martinez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Rosenbaum +1 213 487 1720

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
No Logo Laurie Ramirez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Rosenbaum +1 213 487 1720

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
No Logo Olga Marines, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Rosenbaum +1 213 487 1720

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
No Logo Yolanda Muro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Rosenbaum +1 213 487 1720

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
v.
No Logo Alan C Nelson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo Carl Houseman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo Charles Childers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo Charles W Thompson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo Crescencio DeAlba, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo Douglas Heasley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo J Kent Nygaard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo James H Kimball, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo James Huffer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo James Stenger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo John H Colson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo Michael Maloney, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo Pam Ferguson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo Robert Krueger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo Ronald McKinley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo Sheila Poole, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
No Logo William B Means, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
Office Portland
Filed 4/3/1984
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $105000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Multnomah
Terminated 8/26/1988
Origin 3
Reopened 11/19/1987
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMINATED
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 204 Filed: 3/25/1993, Entered: 3/30/1993 Letter
LETTER from Court re Exhibits not attached to pleadings to be destroyed if not picked up by Counsel of Record by 2/10/93 - Plaintiff's destroyed 3/25/93 (former employee)
    LREF
    Blank 203 Filed: 4/5/1989, Entered: 4/6/1989 Satisfaction
    SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT as to defendant John H Colson, defendant Pam Ferguson, defendant J Kent Nygaard indiv capacities $4,401.85 (former employee)
      LREF
      Blank 202 Filed: 2/21/1989, Entered: 2/22/1989 USCA Order
      Order from the US Court of Appeals for the Ninth District Applts' mot for voluntary dismissal of appeal FRCP 42(b) grnated. Acts as mandate (former employee)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/26/1988, Entered: 8/30/1988 Terminate Civil Case
        (former employee)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 52 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?