BENNETT v. LIN, et al.

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. 23CV025930
Superior Court Judge Karin Schwartz, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge Karin Schwartz
Last Updated March 1, 2023 at 12:19 AM EST (2.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Robert Bennett, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Charlie Chiang, Defendant
No Logo Chin-Shin Lin, Defendant
No Logo Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Relating to Impac Secured Assets Corp., Defendant
No Logo Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series, Series 2003-3, Defendant
No Logo Newrez LLC, Defendant
No Logo Phh Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Ray J. Li, Defendant
No Logo Sheng Mei Lin, Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo Jason Estavillo, Attorney
No Logo Karin Schwartz,
Attributes
Case Type Unlimited Civil
Complaint Type Other Real Property
Department Department 20
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Courthouse
Timeline
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 2/16/2023, Entered: None Document
Notice of Recorded Pendency of Action Filed by: Robert Bennett (Plaintiff) As to: Chin-Shin Lin (Defendant); Sheng Mei Lin (Defendant); Ray J. Li (Defendant) et al.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 2/7/2023, Entered: None Document
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by: Robert Bennett (Plaintiff) As to: Sheng Mei Lin (Defendant) Proof of Mailing Date: 02/01/2023 Service Cost: 102.30 Service Cost Waived: No
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 2/7/2023, Entered: None Document
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by: Robert Bennett (Plaintiff) As to: Chin-Shin Lin (Defendant) Proof of Mailing Date: 02/01/2023 Service Cost: 152.30 Service Cost Waived: No
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 2/7/2023, Entered: None Document
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by: Robert Bennett (Plaintiff) As to: Charlie Chiang (Defendant) Proof of Mailing Date: 02/01/2023 Service Cost: 102.30 Service Cost Waived: No
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 2/7/2023, Entered: None Document
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by: Robert Bennett (Plaintiff) As to: Ray J. Li (Defendant) Proof of Mailing Date: 02/01/2023 Service Cost: 102.30 Service Cost Waived: No
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 2/3/2023, Entered: None Document
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Robert Bennett (Plaintiff) As to: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Relating to Impac Secured Assets Corp. (Defendant) Service Date: 01/27/2023 Service Cost: 54.90 Service Cost Waived: No
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 2/3/2023, Entered: None Document
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Robert Bennett (Plaintiff) As to: NewRez LLC (Defendant) Service Date: 01/27/2023 Service Cost: 54.90 Service Cost Waived: No
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 2/3/2023, Entered: None Document
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Robert Bennett (Plaintiff) As to: NewRez LLC (Defendant) Service Date: 01/27/2023 Service Cost: 54.90 Service Cost Waived: No
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 2/3/2023, Entered: None Document
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Robert Bennett (Plaintiff) As to: NewRez LLC (Defendant); PHH Mortgage Corporation (Defendant) Service Date: 01/27/2023 Service Cost: 54.90 Service Cost Waived: No
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 1/20/2023, Entered: None Assignment
Case assigned to Hon. Karin Schwartz in Department 20 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 1/20/2023, Entered: None Event
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/05/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 1/19/2023, Entered: None Document
Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 1/19/2023, Entered: None Document
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 1/19/2023, Entered: None Document
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Robert Bennett (Plaintiff) As to: Chin-Shin Lin (Defendant); Sheng Mei Lin (Defendant); Ray J. Li (Defendant) et al.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 1/19/2023, Entered: None Document
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Robert Bennett (Plaintiff) As to: Chin-Shin Lin (Defendant); Sheng Mei Lin (Defendant); Ray J. Li (Defendant) et al.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 1/19/2023, Entered: None Document
Complaint Filed by: Robert Bennett (Plaintiff) As to: Chin-Shin Lin (Defendant); Sheng Mei Lin (Defendant); Ray J. Li (Defendant) et al.
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?