Western Transformers v. INS
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:88-cv-00609-JU

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Srinivasan Seshadri-Srinivasan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald H Robinson +1 503 228 2963 +2280 228 228 0501
No Logo Western Transformers, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald H Robinson +1 503 228 2963 +2280 228 228 0501
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig J. Casey +1 503 727 1028
Office Portland
Filed 6/2/1988
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 460 - Deportation
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County
Terminated 12/15/1989
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CA89-35893[Court of Appeals]
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/3/1993, Entered: 8/3/1993 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-93-0075 Location number 600753 Box 35 of 105 (former employee) Modified on 09/28/1998
    LREF
    Blank 46 Filed: 7/1/1991, Entered: 7/1/1991 USCA Order
    Certified Copy of Order from the US Court of Appeals for the Ninth District [41-1]-appellants req. & supplemental req. for attys fees are Granted. Appellants are awarded attys fees in the total amt of $16,363.51. (former employee)
      LREF
      Blank 45 Filed: 2/25/1991, Entered: 2/25/1991 Mandate
      MANDATE/JUDGMENT from USCA dismissing the appeal [41-1]. Costs are taxed against the deft, INS in the amt of $ $227.25.[ ntfd]. (former employee)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 12/12/1990, Entered: 12/12/1990, Terminated: 12/12/1990 Order
        Costs taxed for plaintiff in the sum of $ 250.00 against defendant INS (former employee)
          LREF
          Blank 44 Filed: 10/5/1990, Entered: 10/5/1990, Terminated: 12/12/1990 Bill of Costs
          Bill of costs submitted by plaintiff (former employee)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/6/1990, Entered: 2/6/1990 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
            Clerk's record on appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit (former employee)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/4/1990, Entered: 1/4/1990 Certificate of Record by Clerk to USCA
              Certificate of Record Transmitted to US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit (former employee)
                LREF
                Blank 43 Filed: 12/26/1989, Entered: 12/26/1989 USCA Order
                Certified Copy of Order from the US Court of Appeals for the Ninth District setting brief schedule for appeal [41-1]: R/t order 1/2/90, certif. of record 1/30/90, appellants brief 3/19/90, appellees brief 4/17/90 with reply w/in 14 days. (former employee)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/26/1989, Entered: 12/26/1989 USCA Docket Number
                  Notification by US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit of Docket Number CA 89-35893 (former employee)
                    LREF
                    Blank 42 Filed: 12/15/1989, Entered: 12/19/1989 Judgment*
                    JUDGMENT: entered in favor of deft against pltf. Pltf's complt & action are dismissed. , ntfd Signed 12/15/89 microfilmed 12/19/89 Honorable Helen J. Frye (former employee)
                      LREF
                      Blank 41 Filed: 11/30/1989, Entered: 12/1/1989 Notice of Appeal
                      Notice of appeal by plaintiff from Dist. Court ord of court [40-2] (former employee)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 11/30/1989, Entered: 12/1/1989 Notification of Appeal Sent
                        Mailed copy of notice of appeal to cnsl and Court of Appeals along with copy of ord and docket sheet. (former employee)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/30/1989, Entered: 12/1/1989 Fee Paid
                          Received C/A fee of $: 100.00 D/C fee of $: 5.00 ( Receipt # 86531) (former employee)
                            LREF
                            Blank 40 Filed: 11/13/1989, Entered: 11/14/1989 Order
                            ORDER adopting F/R [30] of 5/31/89 and F/R [37] of 9/18 that pltf's mot for s/j [13] should be denied and defts mot for s/j should be granted [15]. ntfd Signed 11/9/89 microfilmed 11/14/89 Honorable Helen J. Frye (former employee)
                              LREF
                              Blank 39 Filed: 10/20/1989, Entered: 10/23/1989 Motion Hearing
                              RECORD OF ord denying o/a re on "request for reconsideration & notc of appeal". It will be decided upon the written material. ntfd Honorable Helen J. Frye (former employee)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 10/19/1989, Entered: 10/19/1989, Terminated: 11/13/1989 Order
                                Findings and Recommendations referred to Honorable Helen J. Frye (former employee)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 38 Filed: 9/28/1989, Entered: 9/28/1989 Objections to Findings & Recommendation
                                  Pltf's req. for reconsideration of Magistrate's F/R [37] and NOTICE OF APPEAL ;o/a req. (former employee)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 37 Filed: 9/18/1989, Entered: 9/19/1989 Findings and Recommendation
                                    Findings and Recommendation pltf's mot for s/j [13] should be Denied. Deft's cross mot for s/j [15] should be Granted. s/9-18 Magistrate George E. Juba , eod 9/19 ntfd (former employee)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 36 Filed: 9/5/1989, Entered: 9/5/1989 Motion Hearing
                                      RECORD OF ord taking u/advisement, review of the cases that the parties have submitted since the May 31, l989 F/R. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 35 Filed: 8/31/1989, Entered: 8/31/1989 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                        RECORD OF ord referring the May 3l, l989 F/R to Judge George E. Juba for review of the cases that the parties have been submitting to the court that have been decided since the F/R. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 34 Filed: 6/26/1989, Entered: 6/27/1989 reply to motion
                                          Reply by plaintiff to deft's response to Findings and Recommendations [30-1] (former employee)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 33 Filed: 6/23/1989, Entered: 6/23/1989 Motion Hearing
                                            RECORD OF ord denying o/a req. on objs. to F/R (labeled as a notice of appeal #21). It will be decided upon the written material. ntfd Honorable Helen J. Frye (former employee)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/20/1989, Entered: 6/20/1989, Terminated: 8/31/1989 Order
                                              Findings and Recommendations referred to Honorable Helen J. Frye (former employee)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 32 Filed: 6/19/1989, Entered: 6/20/1989 Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendatio
                                                Deft's response to pltf's objections to findings and recommendation of the Magistrate. (former employee)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 6/6/1989, Entered: 6/6/1989 Objections to Findings & Recommendation
                                                  Request for reconsideration by plaintiffs' to [30-1] findings and recommendation & Notice of Appeal; o/a req. (former employee)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 5/31/1989, Entered: 5/31/1989, Terminated: 8/31/1989 Findings and Recommendation
                                                    Findings and Recommendation pltf's mot for s/j [13] should be Denied. Deft's cross mot for s/j [15] should be Granted. s/5/31/89 Magistrate George E. Juba ntfd. (former employee)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 3/13/1989, Entered: 3/20/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                      RECORD OF ord submitted w/out o/a-pltf's mot for s/j [13] and deft's cross mot for s/j [17]. ORD taking mots u/advise 3/13/89. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 2/20/1989, Entered: 2/21/1989 Order
                                                        ORDER adopting F/R [25] that pltfs' mot to strike [20] should be granted. So ord. ntfd Signed 2/17/89 microfilmed 2/21/89 Honorable Helen J. Frye (former employee)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 2/16/1989, Entered: 2/16/1989 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                          Reply by plaintiff to response to motion for summary judgment [13-1] (former employee)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/14/1989, Entered: 2/14/1989, Terminated: 2/20/1989 Order
                                                            Findings and Recommendations referred to Honorable Helen J. Frye (former employee)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 2/8/1989, Entered: 2/8/1989 Memorandum in Support
                                                              Memorandum by defendant Immigration & Natura in support of cross mot for s/j. (former employee)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/31/1989, Entered: 2/1/1989 Findings and Recommendation
                                                                Findings and Recommendation referred [] Pltf's mot to strike should be granted [20]. Deft is directed to file, w/in 10 days, an amended memo in accordance with this decision and in accordance with LR 220-4 (regarding tables of contents).Pltfs shall file their response in accordance with LR 220-3 (regarding time for filing opposit).ntfd. s/ 1-31 Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee) Modified on 02/01/1989
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/30/1989, Entered: 2/1/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                  RECORD OF ord submitted w/out arg. pltf's mot to strike portions of deft's memo of law [20]. F/R to follow. ORD striking pltf's mot for s/j [13] and deft's cross mot-memo [17] from m/c of 1/30 and resetting same to m/c of 3/13/89 noa ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 1/17/1989, Entered: 1/18/1989 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                    Reply by plaintiff Srinivasan Seshadri-Srinivasan, plaintiff Western Transformers in support of pltfs' motion to strike portions of deft's memo of law # 20 (former employee)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 1/10/1989, Entered: 1/14/1989 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                      Response by defendant Immigration & Natura in opposition to motion to strike portions of deft's memo of law [20-1] (former employee)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 12/29/1988, Entered: 1/14/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                        RECORD OF ord setting motion to strike portions of deft's memo of law [20-1] on m/c of 1/30/88 (noa) ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 12/28/1988, Entered: 1/14/1989 Motion to Strike
                                                                          MOTION by plaintiffs' to strike portions of deft's memo of law # 20 (former employee)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 12/22/1988, Entered: 1/14/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                            RECORD OF ord setting pltf's motion for summary judgment [13-1] and deft's cross mot (respm) for s/j [17] on m/c of 1/30/89 (noa) ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 12/21/1988, Entered: 1/14/1989 Order
                                                                              ORDER granting motion to extend time for filing of its response to pltf's mot for s/j & its own mot for s/j till 12/20/88 [16-1]. Pltf's are granted 30 days until 1/20/89 to reply. ntfd Signed 12/21/88 Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 12/20/1988, Entered: 1/14/1989 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                Response by defendant Immigration & Natura in opposition to motion for summary judgment [13-1] & cross mot for s/j. (former employee)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 12/20/1988, Entered: 1/14/1989, Terminated: 12/21/1988 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                  MOTION by defendant Immigration & Natura to extend time for filing of its response to pltf's mot for s/j & its own mot for s/j till 12/20/88 # 16 (former employee)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 12/20/1988, Entered: 1/14/1989 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                    Response by defendant Immigration & Natura in opposition to motion for summary judgment [13-1] (former employee)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 11/28/1988, Entered: 1/14/1989 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                      MOTION by defendant Immigration & Natura to extend time to file its response to pltf's mot for s/j to 12/15/88 #14 (former employee)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 10/14/1988, Entered: 10/17/1988 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                        MOTION with memorandum in support filed by plaintiff Srinivasan Seshadri-Srinivasan, plaintiff Western Transformers for summary judgment (noa) . (former employee)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 9/30/1988, Entered: 9/30/1988 Motion Hearing
                                                                                          RECORD OF ord. granting motion to remove case from pretrial & discovery calendars (noa) [10-1] , , ORD pltf's mot for s/j to be filed by 10/17/88, deft's cross-mot & response by 12/1/ Pltf's resp. to deft's cross mot to be filed by 12/20. Mots will be calendared after briefing is complete.; , ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 9/21/1988, Entered: 9/21/1988 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                            Certificate of service by plaintiff Srinivasan Seshadri-Srinivasan, plaintiff Western Transformers of mot to remove. (former employee)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 9/21/1988, Entered: 9/21/1988, Terminated: 9/30/1988 Motion for Order
                                                                                              MOTION by plaintiff Srinivasan Seshadri-Srinivasan, plaintiff Western Transformers to remove case from pretrial & discovery calendars (noa) with attached afdt in support (former employee)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 8/8/1988, Entered: 9/15/1988 Answer
                                                                                                ANSWER by defendant Immigration & Naturalization service. (former employee)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 6/2/1988, Entered: 9/15/1988 Discovery Order
                                                                                                  ORDER-Discovery discovery ddl set for 9/30/88 ;setting pretrial order ddl for 10/31/88 (former employee)
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?