Robertson, et al v. Concannon, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:88-cv-01076-JU

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Barbara Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent B. Thurber +1 503 778 5202 +1 503 778 5299 berniethurber@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Ann Rogers +1 503 224 4086
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
No Logo Donna Stump, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Ann Rogers +1 503 224 4086
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
No Logo Kimberly Walker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent B. Thurber +1 503 778 5202 +1 503 778 5299 berniethurber@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Ann Rogers +1 503 224 4086
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
No Logo Lara Robertson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lorey H. Freeman +1 503 295 2760 +1 503 295 0676 loreyfreeman@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent B. Thurber +1 503 778 5202 +1 503 778 5299 berniethurber@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Ann Rogers +1 503 224 4086

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence R Young +1 503 378 4620
No Logo Lori Casaray, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent B. Thurber +1 503 778 5202 +1 503 778 5299 berniethurber@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Ann Rogers +1 503 224 4086
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
No Logo Monique Shelby, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Ann Rogers +1 503 224 4086
No Logo Toni O'Connor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Ann Rogers +1 503 224 4086
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
v.
No Logo Colleen Sealock, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank L Dell'Acqua
Space Luther L Jensen +3786 378 378 6313
Space Robert E. Keith, Jr. +1 202 475 4505
Space Charles H Turner +1 360 297 6722

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith D. Kobbervig +1 503 727 1009 +1 503 727 1117 judy.kobbervig@usdoj.gov
No Logo Freddye Webb-Petett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank L Dell'Acqua
Space Luther L Jensen +3786 378 378 6313
Space Robert E. Keith, Jr. +1 202 475 4505
Space Charles H Turner +1 360 297 6722

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith D. Kobbervig +1 503 727 1009 +1 503 727 1117 judy.kobbervig@usdoj.gov
No Logo Kevin Concannon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luther L Jensen +3786 378 378 6313
Space Robert E. Keith, Jr. +1 202 475 4505

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith D. Kobbervig +1 503 727 1009 +1 503 727 1117 judy.kobbervig@usdoj.gov
No Logo Otis R Bowen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank L Dell'Acqua
Space Robert E. Keith, Jr. +1 202 475 4505
Space Charles H Turner +1 360 297 6722

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith D. Kobbervig +1 503 727 1009 +1 503 727 1117 judy.kobbervig@usdoj.gov
Office Portland
Filed 9/19/1988
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 444 - Civil Rights: Welfare
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Multnomah
Terminated 6/28/1991
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (135) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/24/1994, Entered: 3/24/1994 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-94-0042 Location number 3028585 Box 29 of 197 (former employee)
    LREF
    Blank 125 Filed: 10/3/1991, Entered: 10/3/1991 Satisfaction
    SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (former employee)
      LREF
      Blank 124 Filed: 8/14/1991, Entered: 8/15/1991 Motion Hearing
      RECORD OF finding the motion for attorney fees [113-1] moot. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
        LREF
        Blank 123 Filed: 8/5/1991, Entered: 8/9/1991 Returned Mail
        Mail Returned to Jeanne Kiincaid (cpriestley)
          LREF
          Blank 122 Filed: 7/29/1991, Entered: 7/30/1991 Motion Hearing
          RECORD OF setting motion for attorney fees [113-1] 8/26/91 (noa) ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
            LREF
            Blank 121 Filed: 7/26/1991, Entered: 7/29/1991 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of Lorey Freeman re motion for attorney fees [113-1] (cpriestley)
              LREF
              Blank 120 Filed: 7/26/1991, Entered: 7/29/1991 Affidavit
              AFFIDAVIT of Terry Rogers re motion for attorney fees [113-1] (cpriestley)
                LREF
                Blank 119 Filed: 7/26/1991, Entered: 7/29/1991 Declaration
                Declaration Jeanne Kincaid re motion for attorney fees [113-1] (cpriestley)
                  LREF
                  Blank 118 Filed: 7/26/1991, Entered: 7/29/1991 Declaration
                  Declaration Maureen Mcknight re motion for attorney fees [113-1] (cpriestley)
                    LREF
                    Blank 117 Filed: 7/26/1991, Entered: 7/29/1991 Declaration
                    Declaration Kent B. Thurber re motion for attorney fees [113-1] (cpriestley)
                      LREF
                      Blank 116 Filed: 7/26/1991, Entered: 7/29/1991 Declaration
                      Declaration ELlen Mendoza re declaration [115-1] (cpriestley)
                        LREF
                        Blank 115 Filed: 7/26/1991, Entered: 7/29/1991 Declaration
                        Declaration Ellen Gradison re motion for attorney fees [113-1] (cpriestley)
                          LREF
                          Blank 114 Filed: 7/26/1991, Entered: 7/29/1991 Memorandum in Support
                          MEMORANDUM in support of motion for attorney fees [113-1] (cpriestley)
                            LREF
                            Blank 113 Filed: 7/26/1991, Entered: 7/29/1991 Motion for Attorney Fees
                            MOTION by plaintiff Lara Robertson for attorney fees (cpriestley)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/23/1991, Entered: 7/23/1991, Terminated: 7/23/1991 Order
                              Costs taxed for plaintiffs in the sum of $ 485.10 signed 7/23/91 Camile Hickman (cpriestley)
                                LREF
                                Blank 112 Filed: 7/9/1991, Entered: 7/12/1991 Declaration
                                Declaration by plaintiff Lara Robertson Kent B. Thurber re bill of costs [110-1] (cpriestley)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 111 Filed: 7/9/1991, Entered: 7/12/1991 Memorandum in Support
                                  MEMORANDUM in support of bill of costs [110-1] (cpriestley)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 110 Filed: 7/9/1991, Entered: 7/12/1991 Bill of Costs
                                    Bill of costs submitted by pltfs. (cpriestley)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 109 Filed: 6/28/1991, Entered: 6/28/1991 Judgment*
                                      JUDGMENT: That state defts' motion for summary judgment is granted as to claim 3 in that it does not constitute a denial of equal protection for state defts to fail to obtain child support due dates on the first of each month, or to seek to modify due dates to the first of each month, or in the alternative to calculate eligibilty for a pass through payment by deeming a child support payment to be timely if it is received within thirty days of the due date. , ntfd Signed 6/27/91 Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 108 Filed: 6/5/1991, Entered: 6/6/1991 Motion Hearing
                                        RECORD OF denying motion to dismiss the federal deft and to conform and order and opinion to the decision [106-1].(see stip motion and agreement filed 5/29/91. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 107 Filed: 5/29/1991, Entered: 5/31/1991 Stipulation
                                          STIPULATED AGREEMENT. (cpriestley)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 106 Filed: 5/29/1991, Entered: 5/30/1991 Motion to Dismiss
                                            MOTION by plaintiff Lara Robertson to dismiss the federal deft and to conform and order and opinion to the decision #106 (cpriestley)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 105 Filed: 5/17/1991, Entered: 5/20/1991 Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION by plaintiffs to dismiss federal deft and to conform the order to the decison of the ninth circuit #105. (cpriestley)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 104 Filed: 5/3/1991, Entered: 5/7/1991 Motion Hearing
                                                RECORD OF Tel Conf call: Order - pltf's cnsl to file motion on remaining issue by 5/17/91 and deft's response to by filed by 5/28/91. The motion will be set for hrg in June. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 4/24/1991, Entered: 4/24/1991 Motion Hearing
                                                  RECORD OF Order - settng tel conf call 5/3/91 at 10:30am. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 10/26/1990, Entered: 10/29/1990 Order
                                                    ORDER granting motion for summary judgment [81-1]. Any motions regarding claims are denied as moot. signed 10/26/90 Honorable Helen J. Frye (cpriestley)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 10/26/1990, Entered: 10/29/1990 Opinion
                                                      Opinion - The motion of the Secretary for summary judgment #81 is granted as to Claim 1.B, claim 1.E and 1.F are settled, and therefore any motions regarding these claims are denied as moot. Signed 10/26/90 Honorable Helen J. Frye (cpriestley)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/28/1990, Entered: 8/28/1990, Terminated: 6/28/1991 Order
                                                        Findings and Recommendations to Honorable Helen J. Frye (cpriestley)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 8/9/1990, Entered: 8/9/1990 Response
                                                          Response by defendant Kevin Concannon to pltfs' objections to magistrate's findings and recommendation. [98-1] (cpriestley)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 8/8/1990, Entered: 8/9/1990 Reply
                                                            Reply by defendants' to pltfs objections to magistrate's findings & recommendation [98-1] (cpriestley)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 8/6/1990, Entered: 8/7/1990 Objection
                                                              Objections by defendants' to magistrate's findings and recommendation. (cpriestley)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 8/3/1990, Entered: 8/3/1990 Objections to Findings & Recommendation
                                                                Objections by plaintiff to [94-1] findings and recommendation (cpriestley)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 7/26/1990, Entered: 7/26/1990 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                  Statement of additional facts by state defendants (cpriestley)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 7/25/1990, Entered: 7/26/1990 Stipulation
                                                                    Stipulation of parties. (cpriestley)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 7/24/1990, Entered: 7/25/1990 Findings and Recommendation
                                                                      Findings and Recommendation Pltfs' motion for s/j #77 should be granted on claims 1.A,1.c,1.D and 2. remainder of their motion should be denied. To the extent pltfs seek retropective monetary relief from the state, such relief from the state, such relief is barred by the eleventh amendment. The state defts motion for s/j #85 should be granted on claims 1.B and 3 with the remainder of their motion denied. The secretary's motion for s/j #81 should be granted with respect toclaim 1.B. Claims 1.E and 1.F and settled and motions regarding them should be denied as moot. Pltfs concede that claims 1.G and 1.H are repetititve of other claims; therefore, I make no specific recommendations. [77-1] Magistrate George E. Juba ntfd (cpriestley)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 7/16/1990, Entered: 7/19/1990 Motion Hearing
                                                                        Rec of Hrg on pltf's motion #77 & state defts' motion #85. ORD taken u/a. Federal deft's motion for s/j [81-1] ORD taking the motion u/a. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 6/26/1990, Entered: 6/28/1990 Motion Hearing
                                                                          RECORD OF Order granting motion for leave to file amended pretrial order [91-1] ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 6/22/1990, Entered: 6/22/1990, Terminated: 6/26/1990 Motion for Leave
                                                                            MOTION by defendant for leave to file amended pretrial order (cpriestley)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 6/22/1990, Entered: 6/22/1990 Reply
                                                                              Reply memo by plaintiffs Lara Robertson (cpriestley)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/22/1990, Entered: 6/22/1990 Proposed Pretrial Order - Joint
                                                                                LODGED: Pretrial Order (cpriestley)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 6/20/1990, Entered: 6/21/1990 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                  RECORD OF Order setting motion for summary judgment [81-1] before Judge Juba 7/16/90. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 6/19/1990, Entered: 6/20/1990 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                    RECORD OF Order granting State Defts motion to allow late filing #84. ORD setting State Defts motion for s/j and opposition to pltfs' motion for s/j, #85 for o/a on his 7/16/90 at 11:00. ORD resetting pltf's motion for s/j #77, from 7/9/90 o/a before Judge Juba 7/16/90 at 11:00. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 6/12/1990, Entered: 6/12/1990 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                      Statement of additional facts by State defendants (former employee)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 6/12/1990, Entered: 6/12/1990 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                        Memorandum by defendant in support of motion for summary judgment [85-2] & in oppos to pltfs' motion for summary judgment #77 (former employee)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 6/12/1990, Entered: 6/12/1990, Terminated: 6/28/1991 Motion
                                                                                          State defts' opposition to pltfs' motion for s/j [77-1] and , for summary judgment #85 (former employee)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 6/12/1990, Entered: 6/12/1990, Terminated: 6/19/1990 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                            MOTION by State defts to allow late filing #84 , declaration of Young (former employee)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 6/11/1990, Entered: 6/12/1990 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                              Certificate of service by federal defendant's (Neal)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 6/11/1990, Entered: 6/12/1990 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                Memorandum by federal defendant's in support of motion for summary judgment [81-1] (Neal)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 6/11/1990, Entered: 6/12/1990, Terminated: 10/26/1990 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                  MOTION by Federal Defendant's for summary judgment [81-1] (Neal)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 5/30/1990, Entered: 5/30/1990 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                    RECORD OF Order setting motion for summary judgment [77-1] 7/9/90 at 11:00am. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 5/30/1990, Entered: 5/30/1990 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                      Statement of facts in support of motion for summary judgment [77-1] (cpriestley)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 5/30/1990, Entered: 5/30/1990 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                        Memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment [77-1] (cpriestley)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 5/30/1990, Entered: 5/30/1990, Terminated: 6/28/1991 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiff Lara Robertson for summary judgment #77 o/a req (cpriestley)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 4/18/1990, Entered: 4/19/1990 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                            RECORD OF Order granting motion to extend time for lodging of PTO to 4/17/90. Pltfs motion for summary judgment to be filed by 5/28/90. Defts' motion for s/j to be filed by 6/11/90. Hrg on s/j motions will be set 7/16/90.[75-1] , ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/17/1990, Entered: 4/18/1990 Proposed Pretrial Order - Joint
                                                                                                              LODGED: Pretrial Order (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 3/27/1990, Entered: 3/28/1990, Terminated: 4/18/1990 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                MOTION & declar of Kent B.Thurber by plaintiff Lara Robertson to extend time for lodging of PTO [75-1] (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 2/1/1990, Entered: 2/2/1990 Order
                                                                                                                  ORDER discv to 3/30/90; PTO 4/3/90. , ntfd Signed 2/1/90 Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 1/31/1990, Entered: 2/1/1990 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                    MOTION by plaintiff Lara Robertson to extend discovery #72 (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 12/5/1989, Entered: 12/6/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                      RECORD OF Order granting motion to extend time discv 1/30/90 & pretrial order deadlines 3/1/90 [70-1] , ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 12/4/1989, Entered: 12/4/1989, Terminated: 12/5/1989 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff to extend time discv & pretrial order deadlines [70] (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 10/18/1989, Entered: 2/28/1990 Description not available
                                                                                                                          ANSWER of State defts. (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 10/5/1989, Entered: 10/6/1989 Order
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting motion for leave to file third amended complaint [59-1] ntfd Signed 10/4/89 Honorable Helen J. Frye (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 10/2/1989, Entered: 10/2/1989 Description not available
                                                                                                                              ANSWER by Federal defendant. (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 9/28/1989, Entered: 9/28/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                RECORD OF Order granting motion to extend discovery [66-1]; Discv 11/30/89; PTO 12/30/89 , ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 9/27/1989, Entered: 9/27/1989, Terminated: 9/28/1989 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                  MOTION & Declaration of Kent B. Thurber by plaintiff Lara Robertson to extend discovery #66 (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 9/21/1989, Entered: 9/21/1989 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                    THIRD AMENDED class action complaint for Injunctive and declaratory relief regarding public welfare. (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 9/13/1989, Entered: 9/13/1989, Terminated: 1/4/1990 Findings and Recommendation
                                                                                                                                      Findings and Recommendation Pltf's motion for leave to file a third amended complaint #59 is granted. The amended complaint shall be filed within 10 days. NTFD [59-1] Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 9/11/1989, Entered: 9/18/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                        RECORD OF order: submitted without oral argument - Pltf's motion for leave to file 3rd amended complaint, #59. Findings and Recommendation to follow. ntfd , ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 8/14/1989, Entered: 8/15/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                          RECORD OF order striking motion from the 9/11/89 for leave to file 2nd amended Complaint as pltf has withdrawn motion. [52-1] ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 8/8/1989, Entered: 8/9/1989 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            RECORD OF order striking motion for leave to file 2nd amended Complaint [52-1] from Judge Juba's calendar of 9/5/89 and resetting same before Judge Juba on his noa calendar of MON 9/11/89. ORd - setting pltf's mot for leave to file 3rd amended complaint #59 before Judge Juba on his noa of 9/11/89. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 8/7/1989, Entered: 8/7/1989 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                              SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Injunction and Declaratory relief regarding public welfare. (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 8/7/1989, Entered: 8/7/1989, Terminated: 10/5/1989 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiffs for leave to file third amended complaint #59 (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 8/1/1989, Entered: 8/1/1989 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  RECORD OF order setting motion for leave to file 2nd amended Complaint [52-1] before Judge Juba on his noa mot calendar of 9/5/89 ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 7/26/1989, Entered: 7/27/1989 Order
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Accordingly, with the exception of the "date of postmark" rule, Federal deft's motions to dismiss #21 & 28 for failure to state an actionable claim agains HHS and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted are denied to the extent specified in Magistrate Juba's findings and Recommendation. Pltf have ten days within which to file an amended complaint. ntfd Signed 7/26/89 Honorable Helen J. Frye (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/26/1989, Entered: 7/27/1989 Order
                                                                                                                                                      Text not available.
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 7/24/1989, Entered: 7/24/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                        RECORD OF order : Discv 9/30/89 PTO 10/30/89. [55-1] , ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 7/20/1989, Entered: 7/21/1989 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION & declar of Kent Thurber by plaintiff to extend discovery #55 (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 5/31/1989, Entered: 6/1/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                            RECORD OF order Ruling on motion for leave to file 2nd amended Complaint [52-1] is deferred granting motion to extend discovery to 7/31/89; PTO to be lodged 8/30/89 [53-1] , ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 5/25/1989, Entered: 5/25/1989, Terminated: 5/31/1989 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION & declaration of Kent B. Thurber by plaintiff to extend discovery #53 (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 5/10/1989, Entered: 5/11/1989, Terminated: 5/31/1989 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff for leave to file 2nd amended Complaint #52 (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 4/19/1989, Entered: 4/20/1989 Findings and Recommendation
                                                                                                                                                                  Findings and Recommendation Pltfs' motion to reconsider should be denied. [40-1] Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/18/1989, Entered: 4/18/1989, Terminated: 1/4/1990 Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Findings and Recommendations to Honorable Helen J. Frye (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 3/31/1989, Entered: 3/31/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                      RECORD OF order granting motion to extend discovery #49. ORD discv to be complete by 5/30/89; PTO to be lodged by 6/29/89. , ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 3/31/1989, Entered: 3/31/1989, Terminated: 3/31/1989 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION & declaration of Ken Thurber by plaintiff Lori - Casaray, plaintiff Kimberly - Walker, plaintiff Barbara - Miller to extend discovery and for entry of a pretrial order #49. (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 3/27/1989, Entered: 3/28/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                          RECORD OF order taking under advisement on 3/27/89 pltf's motion to partially reconsider findings and recommendations [40-1] ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 3/20/1989, Entered: 3/22/1989 Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendatio
                                                                                                                                                                            Response to objections to findings and recommendation by plaintiff (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 3/20/1989, Entered: 3/22/1989 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                              Reply by plaintiffs to response to motion to partially reconsider findings and recommendations [40-1] (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 3/16/1989, Entered: 3/20/1989 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Stip ORDER in lieu of class certification on the basis of claims which seek retroactive relief is stayed at this time and defts' mot to dismiss under the eleventh amendment is withdrawn at this time without prejudice to the right assert said mot at a later time. Pltfs' motion for class certification is denied as moot with respect to the subclass which sought only prospective relief. s/3/14/89 George Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 3/9/1989, Entered: 3/10/1989 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by federal defts' in opposition to motion to partially reconsider findings and recommendations #40 [40-1] (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 3/8/1989, Entered: 3/9/1989 Objections to Findings & Recommendation
                                                                                                                                                                                    Objections by Federal defendant to [39-1] findings and recommendation (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 3/2/1989, Entered: 3/3/1989 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      RECORD OF ord granting pltf's mot for stay of time limit to file obj. [41] until Judge Juba rules on pltf's mot to partially reconsider F/R . ORD setting pltf's mot to partially reconsider F/R [40] on m/c of 3/27/89 noa. Defts response to be filed by 3/10/89 and pltf's reply to be filed by 3/20/89. Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 2/28/1989, Entered: 3/1/1989 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff Kimberly - Walker, plaintiff Barbara - Miller to extend time [41-1to file objections; exped decision requested #41. (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 2/28/1989, Entered: 3/1/1989 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiff Lori - Casaray, plaintiff Kimberly - Walker to partially reconsider findings and recommendations #40 (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 2/22/1989, Entered: 2/23/1989 Findings and Recommendation
                                                                                                                                                                                            Findings and Recommendation referred [to FR] concerning motion to dismiss # 28 and memo of law. [28-1], motion to dismiss [21-1]For the reasons state above, defts motions to dismiss should be granted as to pltfs' 30 day rule claim and denied as the remainder. s/2/22/89 JU Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 2/7/1989, Entered: 2/8/1989 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                              Remark documents referenced in oral argument (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 2/6/1989, Entered: 2/9/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                RECORD OF hrg taking under advisement on 2/6/89 motion to dismiss # 21 [21-1] taking under advisement on 2/6/89 motion mot for class certification as a class # 25 [25-1] taking under advisement on 2/6/89 motion to dismiss # 28 and memo of law. [28-1] Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 1/23/1989, Entered: 1/24/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RECORD OF ORD striking State Deft's motion to dismiss # 28 , Plt'smotion mot for class certification as a class # 25 ,Fed Deft's motion to dismiss # 21 from 1/30/89 cal & resetting same for2/6/89 at 1:30 pm. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 1/20/1989, Entered: 1/24/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECORD OF ORD granting motion to extend time to respond to State Deft's mot to dism [28-1] # 31 to 1/17/89 ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 1/17/1989, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECORD OF ord resetting State defts motion to dismiss [28-1] from m/c of 1/30 noa to m/c of 1/30/89 at 11am. ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 1/17/1989, Entered: 1/19/1989 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pltfs' reply to State Defts' mot to dism [28-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 1/17/1989, Entered: 1/19/1989 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pltfs' reply to Federal Defts' mot to dism with o/a req. [21-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 1/11/1989, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiffs' to extend time to respond to State Deft's mot to dism [28-1] # 31 (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 1/6/1989, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECORD OF ord striking mots #25 and 21 from m/c's of 1/23. ORD setting State defts' motion to dismiss [28-1] on m/c of 1/30/89 noa. ORD setting pltf's motion mot for class certification as a class [25-1] on m/c of 1/30 at 11am. & setting Federal deft's motion to dismiss [21-1] on m/c of 1/30/89(noa) ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 1/5/1989, Entered: 1/19/1989 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum by State defts' Colleen Sealock, Freddye - Webb-Petett, Kevin Concannon in oppos to pltfs' mot for class certification . dismiss [28-1] (former employee) Modified on 01/31/1989
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 12/28/1988, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by State defts' Colleen Sealock, Freddye - Webb-Petett, Kevin Concannon to dismiss # 28 and memo of law. (former employee) Modified on 01/31/1989
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 12/28/1988, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECORD OF ord setting pltfs' motion mot for class certification as a class [25-1] on m/c of 1/23/89 at 11am ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 12/21/1988, Entered: 1/19/1989 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum by plaintiffs' in support of motion mot for class certification as a class [25-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 12/21/1988, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiffs' mot for class certification as a class # 25 (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 12/21/1988, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RECORD OF ord setting Federal deft's motion to dismiss [21-1] on m/c of 1/23/89(noa) ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 12/20/1988, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RECORD OF ord granting motion to file government's mot to dism beyond the time allowed by the court [22-1] to 12/19/88 ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 12/19/1988, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant Otis R Bowen to file government's mot to dism beyond the time allowed by the court # 22 (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 12/19/1988, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION with memorandum in support filed by defendant Otis R Bowen to dismiss # 21 (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 12/12/1988, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RECORD OF ord. granting motion to extend time to answer to pltf's lst amended complt to 12/16/88 [19-1] for Otis R Bowen ntfd Magistrate George E. Juba (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 12/8/1988, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant Otis R Bowen to extend time to answer to 12/16/88 # 19 (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 11/29/1988, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECORD OF ord granting motion to extend time to answer to class certification [15-1]. ORD pltf's mot for class certif. to be filed by 12/21/88. Magistrate George E. Juba ntfd. (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 11/21/1988, Entered: 1/19/1989 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED complaint [2-1] adding Barbara - Miller, Kimberly - Walker, Lori - Casaray as pltfs (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 11/18/1988, Entered: 1/19/1989 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiffs to extend time to 12/21/88 to file mot for class certif. # 18 (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 11/18/1988, Entered: 11/18/1988, Terminated: 11/29/1988 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Monique Shelby, Toni O'Connor, Donna Stump, Lara Robertson to extend time to answer to (noa)class certification (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/1/1988, Entered: 11/1/1988 Scheduling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECORD OF Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 10/31/1988, Entered: 11/1/1988 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RECORD OF order denying as moot, pltf's mot for preliminary injunction, #7a as pltf has Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 9/28/1988, Entered: 10/5/1988 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of service executed upon defendant Otis R Bowen on 9/21/88 (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/28/1988, Entered: 9/30/1988 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of service executed upon defendant Kevin Concannon on 9/23/88 (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 9/28/1988, Entered: 9/30/1988 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of service executed upon defendant Freddye - Webb-Petett on 9/23/88 (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 9/28/1988, Entered: 9/30/1988 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of service executed upon defendant Colleen Sealock on 9/23/88 (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 9/28/1988, Entered: 9/30/1988 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of service executed upon defendant Otis R Bowen on 9/26/88 (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 9/20/1988, Entered: 9/21/1988 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum by plaintiff Monique Shelby, plaintiff Toni O'Connor, plaintiff Donna Stump (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 9/20/1988, Entered: 9/21/1988 Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER-Discovery discovery ddl set for 1/18/89 ;setting pretrial order ddl for 2/17/89 (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 9/20/1988, Entered: 6/28/1990 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for preliminary injunction (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 9/20/1988, Entered: 9/21/1988 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons issued as to defendant Kevin Concannon (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 9/20/1988, Entered: 9/21/1988 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons issued as to defendant Freddye - Webb-Petett (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/20/1988, Entered: 9/21/1988 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons issued as to defendant Otis R Bowen (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/20/1988, Entered: 9/21/1988 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons issued as to defendant Colleen Sealock (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/20/1988, Entered: 9/21/1988 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER to waive Signed JUBA microfilmed Magistrate George E. Juba (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/19/1988, Entered: 9/21/1988 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Class Action COMPLAINT for injunctive and declaratory relief regarding public. (cpriestley)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/19/1988, Entered: 9/20/1988 Application for leave to proceed ifp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by plaintiff Monique Shelby, plaintiff Toni O'Connor, plaintiff Donna Stump, plaintiff Lara Robertson to proceed in forma pauperis (noa) (Hickman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 78 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?