Kim v. INS
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:89-cv-00457-MA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Soon Hui Kim, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Pedro J. Landrau-Lopez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey T Noles +1 503 224 1900 +1 503 224 0604 jeffnoles@email.com
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Virginia Miller Bedor +3263 326 326 3416
Space Robert J Solmonson +3263 326 326 3416
Office Portland
Filed 4/27/1989
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 8 U.S.C. § 1105(a) Aliens
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Multnomah
Terminated 6/14/1989
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/31/1993, Entered: 8/31/1993 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-93-0075 Location number 600753 Box 95 of 105 (former employee) Modified on 01/07/1999
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 6/14/1989, Entered: 6/15/1989 Order
    ORDER It is ordered that the habeas corpus proceedings herein be dismissed. , , ntfd Signed 6/14/89 Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh (cpriestley)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 6/12/1989, Entered: 6/12/1989, Terminated: 6/14/1989 Motion to Dismiss
      MOTION by plaintiff Soon Hui Kim to dismiss #7 (cpriestley)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 6/6/1989, Entered: 6/7/1989 Motion Hearing
        RECORD OF order setting final paper call 6/26/89 at 1:30pm , ntfd Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh (cpriestley)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 5/2/1989, Entered: 5/3/1989 Motion Hearing
          RECORD OF hearing: ORD continuing the hrg on petition for writ of habeas corpus #1 to a time when petitioner's husband can appear. ORD parties submit briefs re court's standard of review. ntfd Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh (cpriestley)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 4/28/1989, Entered: 5/1/1989 Motion HearingCourt Filing
            RECORD OF tel scheduling conf. ORD setting hrg on petition for writ of habeas corp #1 before Judge M. Marsh 5/2/89 at 9:30am. ORD reassigning this action to Judge M. Marsh for all further proceedings. ntfd Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh (cpriestley)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 4/28/1989, Entered: 5/1/1989 Case Reassignment Notice
              Notice of Reassignment to Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh (cpriestley)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 4/27/1989, Entered: 4/28/1989 Affidavit
                Affidavit of Jeffrey T. Noles regarding habeas corpus petition [1-1] (cpriestley)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 4/27/1989, Entered: 4/28/1989 Affidavit
                  Affidavit of Soon Hui Kim regarding habeas corpus petition [1-1] (cpriestley)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/27/1989, Entered: 4/28/1989 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2254
                    PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (cpriestley)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 40 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?