Nike, Inc. v. Tarter

Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:89-cv-00735-PA
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
Nike USA, Inc. Nike USA, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Nike Incorporated"

Represented by Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Bennett +1 503 499 4418 +1 503 295 0915 john.bennett@bullivant.com
Space Douglas G. Houser +1 503 228 6351 +1 503 295 0915 doug.houser@bullivant.com
Space Stuart Duncan Jones +1 503 228 6351 +1 503 295 0915 stuart.jones@bullivant.com
v.
No Logo Fred B Tarter, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert D Kaplan +1 212 355 6400
Space Neier, Hal +1 212 833 1100

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Stephen Kaplan +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 bkaplan@fklaw.com

Represented by Jolles & Bernstein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harlan Bernstein +1 503 228 6474 +1 503 228 0836 harlan@harlanbernstein.com
Space Bernard Jolles +1 503 228 6474 +1 503 228 0836 BernieJ@JollesBernstein.com
Attributes
Office Portland
Filed 7/12/1989
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $24000
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Washington
Terminated 12/12/1990
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
Timeline
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 12/6/1993, Entered: 12/6/1993 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-93-0076 Location number 638323 Box 106 of 163 (former employee)
LREF
Blank 58 Filed: 12/12/1990, Entered: 12/13/1990 Order Dismissing Case
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: action is dismissed with prejudice nd without costs or fees to any party. signed 12/11/90 Owen Panner. 12/11/90 (cpriestley)
LREF
Blank 57 Filed: 10/10/1990, Entered: 10/11/1990 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF tel conf call: ORD cont to Tues 12/11/90 at 8:00am. , ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (cpriestley)
LREF
Blank 56 Filed: 10/1/1990, Entered: 10/2/1990 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF order scheduling tel conf 10/10/90 at 8:00am. , ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (cpriestley)
LREF
Blank 55 Filed: 9/12/1990, Entered: 9/13/1990 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF ORDER: denying defendant's motion to dismiss 3rd A/Complt [51-1] ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (Neal)
LREF
Blank 54 Filed: 7/25/1990, Entered: 7/26/1990 Memorandum in Opposition
Memorandum by plaintiff in oppos deft's to motion to dismiss 3rd A/Complt [51-1] (former employee)
LREF
Blank 53 Filed: 7/18/1990, Entered: 7/19/1990 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF ORD: sched motion to dismiss 3rd A/Complt [51-1] M/C 8/20/90 (noa) ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (former employee)
LREF
Blank 52 Filed: 7/16/1990, Entered: 7/17/1990 Memorandum in Support
Memorandum by defendant in support of motion to dismiss 3rd A/Complt #51 [51-1] (former employee)
LREF
Blank 51 Filed: 7/16/1990, Entered: 7/17/1990, Terminated: 9/12/1990 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by defendant to dismiss 3rd A/Complt #51 (former employee)
LREF
Blank 50 Filed: 7/5/1990, Entered: 7/6/1990 Description not available
3rd AMENDED complaint (Civil Rico) - Jury Trial Demanded. (Neal)
LREF
Blank 49 Filed: 6/28/1990, Entered: 6/29/1990 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL: re cross motions for summary judgment (8 & 10): ORDER allowing 5 days for further submission as to when the August report should have been due and how this differs from Wallace. The motions will be taken under advisement as of July 5. ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (Neal)
LREF
Blank 48 Filed: 6/25/1990, Entered: 6/28/1990 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF ORDER: DENYING plaintiff's motion for leave to supplement record (expedited hearing requested) [47-1] ORDER allowing defendant's motion for leave to file 2nd a/complt [32-1] with leave to amend by 7/5/90. Defendants allowed until 7/16/90 to move to dismiss; response due 7/25/90. Matter will be taken under advisement at that time. ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (Neal)
LREF
Blank 47 Filed: 6/22/1990, Entered: 6/22/1990, Terminated: 6/25/1990 Motion to Supplement
MOTION by plaintiff for leave to supplement record (ex[pedited hearing requested) [47-1] (Neal)
LREF
Blank 46 Filed: 6/13/1990, Entered: 6/13/1990 Certificate Of Service.
Certificate of service by defendant (Neal)
LREF
Blank 45 Filed: 6/13/1990, Entered: 6/13/1990 reply to motion
Reply memorandum by defendant's in support of his motion to dismiss the second amended complaint (O/A Requested) #37 (Neal)
LREF
Blank 44 Filed: 6/8/1990, Entered: 6/11/1990 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF ORDER: rescheduling deft's motion to dismiss second amended complaint (32) from 6/18/90 to Monday, 6/25/90 at 1:30 pm. at request of counsel. ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (Neal)
LREF
Blank 43 Filed: 6/5/1990, Entered: 6/6/1990 Affidavit
Affidavit of Douglas G. Houser regarding motion for continuance of hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss [42-1] (Neal)
LREF
Blank 42 Filed: 6/5/1990, Entered: 6/6/1990 Motion to Continue
MOTION by plaintiff for continuance of hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss [42-1] (Neal)
LREF
Blank 41 Filed: 5/30/1990, Entered: 5/31/1990 Memorandum in Opposition
Memorandum by plaintiff in opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss second amended complaint [37-1] (Neal)
LREF
Blank 40 Filed: 5/14/1990, Entered: 5/15/1990 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF ORDER: scheduling defendant's motion to dismiss the second amended complaint [37-1] for hearing on Monday, June 18 at 1:30 PM. ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (Neal)
LREF
Blank 39 Filed: 5/10/1990, Entered: 5/10/1990 Certificate Of Service.
Certificate of service by defendant regarding its motion to dismiss #37. (Neal)
LREF
Blank 38 Filed: 5/10/1990, Entered: 5/10/1990 Memorandum in Support
Memorandum by defendant in support of its motion to dismiss the second amended complaint (O/A Requested) [37-1] (Neal)
LREF
Blank 37 Filed: 5/10/1990, Entered: 5/10/1990, Terminated: 12/12/1990 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by defendant Fred B. Tarter to dismiss the second amended complaint (O/A Requested) #37 (Neal)
LREF
Blank 36 Filed: 5/2/1990, Entered: 5/3/1990 Description not available
2nd AMENDED complaint J/T demanded (former employee)
LREF
Blank 35 Filed: 5/2/1990, Entered: 5/2/1990 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF ord granting stip motion to extend time to ext time to allow Deft Fred B. Tarter until 5/10/90 to file responsive ans or mot to Pltf's 2nd A/Complt #33 [33-1] ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (former employee)
LREF
Blank 34 Filed: 4/26/1990, Entered: 4/27/1990 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF ord granting stip motion for leave to file 2nd a/complt #32 [32-1] ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (former employee)
LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 4/19/1990, Entered: 4/27/1990 Motion for Extension of Time
Stip MOTION to extend time to ext time to allow Deft Fred B. Tarter until 5/10/90 to file responsive ans or mot to Pltf's 2nd A/Complt #33 (former employee)
LREF
Blank 32 Filed: 4/19/1990, Entered: 4/27/1990 Motion for Leave
Stip MOTION by plaintiff for leave to file 2nd a/complt #32 (former employee)
LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 3/27/1990, Entered: 3/27/1990 Order
ORDER Tarter's mot to dism is converted into one for s/j w/respect to those claims. Tarter's mot to dism w/respect to Nike's RICO clm is granted w/out prej. ntfd Signed 3/27/90 microfilmed & ent 3/27/90 Honorable Owen M. Panner (former employee)
LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 3/27/1990, Entered: 3/27/1990 Opinion
Opinion re mot to dism Signed 3/27/90 Honorable Owen M. Panner (former employee)
LREF
Blank 28 Filed: 10/17/1989, Entered: 10/18/1989 Supplement
Supplemental affidavit by plaintiff of Charles A. Galford in opposition to motion to dismiss [20-1] (Neal)
LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 10/16/1989, Entered: 10/25/1989 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF HEARING: deft's mot to dismiss A/Cmplt. (being treated as a motion for summary judgment (12): ORDER taking under advisement. ORDER- ALLOWING mot to supplement record (27). ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (Neal)
LREF
Blank 27 Filed: 10/12/1989, Entered: 10/13/1989 Motion for Leave
MOTION by plaintiff Nike, Inc. for leave to supplement record #27 expedited hrg req. (cpriestley)
LREF
Blank 26 Filed: 10/2/1989, Entered: 10/2/1989 Certificate Of Service.
Certificate of service by defendant (Neal)
LREF
Blank 25 Filed: 10/2/1989, Entered: 10/2/1989 Affidavit
Affidavit of Fred B. Tarter regarding motion reply [24-1] (Neal)
LREF
Blank 24 Filed: 10/2/1989, Entered: 10/2/1989 reply to motion
Defendant's reply memorandum in support of his motion to dismiss the amended complaint [12-1] (Neal)
LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 9/11/1989, Entered: 9/12/1989 Certificate Of Service.
Proof of service by plaintiff (Neal)
LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 9/11/1989, Entered: 9/12/1989 Affidavit
Affidavit of John A. Bennett (Neal)
LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 9/11/1989, Entered: 9/12/1989 Affidavit
Affidavit of George Porter in opposition to defendants motion to dismiss the amended complaint [12-1] (Neal)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 9/11/1989, Entered: 9/12/1989 Affidavit
Affidavit of Charles A. Galford in opposition to defendants motion to dismiss the amended complaint [12-1] (Neal)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 9/11/1989, Entered: 9/12/1989 Memorandum in Opposition
Memorandum by plaintiff in opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss [12-1] (Neal)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 8/29/1989, Entered: 8/29/1989 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF ORDER: granting the stipulated motion for extension of time etc. (16). ORDER rescheduling the motion of deft. to dismiss the amended complaint (12) from 10/2 to Monday, 10/16/89 at 1:30 pm. Opposition memo is due 9/11 and reply to be filed 10/2. ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (Neal)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 8/23/1989, Entered: 8/23/1989 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF ord setting deft's motion to dismiss the amended complaint [12-1] on m/c of 10/2 at 1:30pm. ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (former employee)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 8/21/1989, Entered: 8/21/1989 Certificate Of Service.
Certificate of service by defendant (Neal)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 8/21/1989, Entered: 8/21/1989 Affidavit
Affidavit of Robert D. Kaplan, Esq. regarding motion to dismiss the amended complaint [12-1] (Neal)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 8/21/1989, Entered: 8/21/1989 Memorandum in Support
Memorandum by defendant in support of motion to dismiss the amended complaint [12-1] (Neal)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 8/21/1989, Entered: 8/21/1989, Terminated: 3/27/1990 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by defendant to dismiss the amended complaint oral argument requested (Neal)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 8/18/1989, Entered: 8/18/1989 Return of Service Executed
Return of service executed upon defendant Fred B. Tarter on 7/19/89 (Neal)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 8/17/1989, Entered: 8/22/1989 Motion for Extension of Time
STIPULATED MOTION for extension of time for filing opposition and reply to deft's initial appearance (Neal)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 8/11/1989, Entered: 8/14/1989 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF ORDER: granting motion for permission to appear and participate pro hac vice as to Bruce S. Kaplan and Robert D. Kaplan for defendant. [7-1] ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (Neal)
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 8/9/1989, Entered: 8/9/1989 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF ORDER: granting defendant's motion for leave to file to file brief greater than 35 pages [8-1] ntfd Honorable Owen Panner (Neal)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 8/9/1989, Entered: 8/9/1989, Terminated: 8/9/1989 Motion for Leave
MOTION by defendant for leave to file to file brief greater than 35 pages (Neal)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 8/8/1989, Entered: 8/8/1989, Terminated: 8/11/1989 Motion
MOTION by defendant for permission to appear and participate pro hac vice (Neal)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 7/31/1989, Entered: 7/31/1989 Motion Hearing
RECORD OF ORDER: granting defendant an extension of time to and including 8/22/89 to file an initial pleading #5 ntfd Honorable Owen M. Panner (Neal)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 7/31/1989, Entered: 7/31/1989, Terminated: 7/31/1989 Motion for Extension of Time
STIPULATED MOTION to extend time to make initial appearance (Neal)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 7/27/1989, Entered: 7/28/1989 Description not available
AMENDED complaint (Fraud, Civil Rico and Negligence) Jury Trial Demanded. (Neal)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 7/12/1989, Entered: 7/13/1989 Summons Issued
Summons issued as to defendant Fred B. Tarter (dn)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 7/12/1989, Entered: 7/13/1989 Discovery Order
ORDER: discovery ddl set for 11/9/89 ;setting pretrial order ddl for 12/11/89 (dn)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 7/12/1989, Entered: 7/13/1989 Complaint
COMPLAINT for fraud, civil rico and negligence; Jury Trial Demanded (dn)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 207 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?