Mr. James K. Duck v. World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91288244-OPP
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 25, 2024 at 8:00 AM EDT (11.3 months ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Mr. James K. Duck, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James K. Duck

Represented by Trademark Owner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James K. Duck
v.
No Logo World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren A. Dienes-middlen
No Logo World Wrestling Entertainment, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura K. Pitts
Attributes
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney STEVEN W FERRELL
Date in Location 11/15/2023
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
Timeline
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/25/2024, Entered: None S
Susp Pend Disp Of Outstndng Mot
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/18/2024, Entered: None T
P Reply In Support Of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/8/2024, Entered: None T
D Opp/resp To Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2024, Entered: None N
Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/8/2024, Entered: None T
D Appearance / Power Of Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/3/2024, Entered: None T
P Mot For Default Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/15/2023, Entered: None T
Instituted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/15/2023, Entered: None T
Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/15/2023, Entered: None N
Filed And Fee
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?