Norris v. STMicroelectronics, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-00001-EHC
District Judge Earl H. Carroll, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Benita Norris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Philip R Wooten PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Miles Gregory +1 480 839 4711 +1 480 452 1753 robert.gregory@azbar.org
v.
No Logo SGS Thompson Co, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborn Maledon, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meghan Hallinan Grabel +1 602 640 9000 +1 602 664 2095 mgrabel@omlaw.com
No Logo Sgs-thomson Microelectronics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborn Maledon, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Meghan Hallinan Grabel +1 602 640 9000 +1 602 664 2095 mgrabel@omlaw.com
Space Jill Harrison +1 602 640 9000 +1 602 640 9050 jharrison@omlaw.com
Space Scott William Rodgers +1 602 640 9000 +1 602 640 6057 srodgers@omlaw.com
No Logo Stmicroelectronics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborn Maledon, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronda R Fisk +1 602 640 9000 +1 602 640 6063 rfisk@omlaw.com
Space Meghan Hallinan Grabel +1 602 640 9000 +1 602 664 2095 mgrabel@omlaw.com
Space Jill Harrison +1 602 640 9000 +1 602 640 9050 jharrison@omlaw.com
Space Scott William Rodgers +1 602 640 9000 +1 602 640 6057 srodgers@omlaw.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Maricopa
Terminated 1/23/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, STD
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 68 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. ORDER vacating the Status Hearing set for 2/25/08 re: stipulation [67] Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 1/22/08. (TLJ)
    LREF
    Legal Document 67 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008, Terminated: 6/1/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by STMicroelectronics, Inc., SGS Thomson Microelectronics, Inc., SGS Thompson Co. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Rodgers, Scott)
      LREF
      Legal Document 66 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER - re [65] NOTICE of Settlement by STMicroelectronics, Inc., IT IS ORDERED vacating the Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2008 at 3:00 p.m. and vacating the Bench Trial set for 2/5/2008 at 9:00 a.m. FURTHER ORDERED setting a Status Hearing for 2/25/2008 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Earl H Carroll, to be vacated upon the parties filing a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 1/15/08. (SAT)
        LREF
        Legal Document 65 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Notice of Settlement
        NOTICE of Settlement by STMicroelectronics, Inc. (Rodgers, Scott)
          LREF
          Blank 64 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
          Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey: The parties and counsel appeared at the Settlement Conference held on 12/13/2007. Settlement was not reached in this matter and it is referred back to Judge Carroll for further proceedings. (Court Reporter none.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MEA,ps)
            LREF
            Legal Document 63 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Ronda R Fisk on behalf of STMicroelectronics, Inc. (Fisk, Ronda)
              LREF
              Legal Document 62 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Settlement Conference is set for 12/13/2007 at 10:00 AM in First Floor Courtroom, 123 North San Francisco Street, Flagstaff, AZ 86001 before Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey. Signed by Judge Mark E Aspey on 10/25/07. (SAT)
                LREF
                Legal Document 61 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                ORDER pursuant to parties' [59] Joint Motion/Request for Assignment of Magistrate Judge to Conduct Settlement Conference, IT IS ORDERED referring the matter to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey for the purpose of setting a settlement conference in Phoenix, Arizona within sixty days (60) of the date of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that within ten days from the date of this Order the parties are to contact Magistrate Judge Aspey at 928-774-2566 to schedule the date and time of the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 10/1/07. (SAT)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Notice of Filer of Deficiency
                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re [59] Request filed by SGS Thompson Co, Benita Norris, SGS Thomson Microelectronics, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc.. Description of deficiency: Incorrect document type selected. The correct event is Motion/Miscellaneous Relief and it is fouond in the Motions menu. (SAT)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007, Terminated: 10/1/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                    MOTION/Joint Request for Assignment of Magistrate Judge to Conduct Settlement Conference by Defendants STMicroelectronics, Inc., SGS Thomson Microelectronics, Inc., SGS Thompson Co, Plaintiff Benita Norris. (Rodgers, Scott) Modified on 10/1/2007 (SAT). INCORRECT EVENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "REQUEST" TO "MOTION".
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 2/5/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Earl H Carroll. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Earl H Carroll. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/15/2008. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 9/17/07. (SAT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 57 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Earl H. Carroll : Appearances: Robert Gregory on behalf of plaintiff, Scott Rodgers on behalf of defendants.Status Conference held on 9/17/2007. Order to follow setting the matter for a trial to the court. (Court Reporter Candy Potter.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAH)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 56 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Status Report
                          STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Rodgers, Scott)
                            LREF
                            Blank 55 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                            Minute Order - IT IS ORDERED setting a Status Conference for Monday, 9/17/2007 at 02:15 PM before Judge Earl H. Carroll. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file a joint status report seven (7) court days prior to the Status Conference. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAH)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 54 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                              ORDER - IT IS ORDERED Defendant's [47] Motion for Summary Judgment is granted as to Plaintiff's retaliation claim involving Plaintiff's transfer to Hi-Vac for a 30 to 60 day evaluation and training program. 2. Defendant's [47] Motion for Summary Judgment is granted as to Plaintiff's retaliation claim involving her June 4, 1997, negative performance evaluation. 3. Defendant's [47] Motion for Summary Judgment is granted as to Plaintiff's retaliation claim involving her June 5, 1997, termination. 4. Defendant's [47] Motion for Summary Judgment is denied as to Plaintiff's retaliation claims involving the May 1, 1997, Corrective Action memorandum and the May 9, 1997, Corrective Action memorandum. 5. Defendant's [47] Motion for Summary Judgment is denied as toPlaintiff's hostile work environment claim. 6. Plaintiff's request to strike the deposition testimony of Defillo,Yerkey, and Smith is denied. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 7/30/07.(SAT)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 53 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply Memorandum Supporting Defendant STMicroelectronics Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed by STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Grabel, Meghan)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Statement
                                  STATEMENT of Facts Supporting Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike the Testimony of Defendants' Witnesses by Plaintiff Benita Norris. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit)(Gregory, Robert)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Response to Motion
                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment , Motion to Strike the Testimony of Defendants' Witnesses and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Benita Norris. (Gregory, Robert)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES re [49] STIPULATION Extending Trial Date. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 12/23/05. (SBU, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005, Terminated: 6/1/2008 Stipulation
                                        STIPULATION Extending Trial Date by STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Grabel, Meghan)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Statement
                                          STATEMENT of of Facts Supporting Defendant STMicroelectronics Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment re [47] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit Index and Ex. 1-2# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 3-5)(Grabel, Meghan)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005, Terminated: 7/31/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Grabel, Meghan)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 46 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Notice of Deposition
                                            NOTICE of Deposition of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed by STMicroelectronics, Inc., SGS Thomson Microelectronics, Inc., SGS Thompson Co. (Rodgers, Scott)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Notice of Deposition
                                              NOTICE of Deposition of Jack Smith, filed by STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Grabel, Meghan)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint)
                                                AMENDED DOCUMENT by STMicroelectronics, Inc., SGS Thomson Microelectronics, Inc., SGS Thompson Co. Amended Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6). (Rodgers, Scott)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Notice of Deposition
                                                  NOTICE of Deposition of Olga Rodriguez, filed by Benita Norris. (Gregory, Robert)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/11/2005, Entered: 11/11/2005 Notice of Deposition
                                                    NOTICE of Deposition of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed by all defendants. (Grabel, Meghan)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/11/2005, Entered: 11/11/2005 Other Notice
                                                      Notice re Notice of Service of Defendant's Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement by STMicroelectronics, Inc., SGS Thomson Microelectronics, Inc., SGS Thompson Co (Grabel, Meghan)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Notice of Deposition
                                                        NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Yerkey, filed by STMicroelectronics, Inc., SGS Thomson Microelectronics, Inc.. (Grabel, Meghan)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER re [37] GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINE (Second Request). Discovery due by 11/30/2005.. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 9/21/05. (LCF)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Hallinan Grabel on behalf of STMicroelectronics, Inc., SGS Thomson Microelectronics, Inc., SGS Thompson Co (Grabel, Meghan)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005, Terminated: 6/1/2008 Stipulation
                                                              STIPULATION EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINE (Second Request) by STMicroelectronics, Inc., SGS Thomson Microelectronics, Inc., SGS Thompson Co. (Grabel, Meghan)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Other Notice
                                                                Notice re Service of Defendant's First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by STMicroelectronics, Inc. (Harrison, Jill)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Other Notice
                                                                  Notice re Amended Notice of Deposition of Lou Defillo by STMicroelectronics, Inc. (Grabel, Meghan)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Notice of Deposition
                                                                    NOTICE of Deposition of Lou Defillo, filed by STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Harrison, Jill)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Other Notice
                                                                      NOTICE of service of discovery by dft STMicroelectronics (REW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll bench trial set for 9:00 3/14/06 ; Pretrial conference set for 9:30 3/6/06 ; PTO ddl set for 2/9/06 ; dispositive motions due 12/16/05 ; discovery ddl set for 10/17/05 (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Other Notice
                                                                          NOTICE of service of discovery by dft SGS Thomson Microele, dft SGS Thompson Co . (SRB)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Other Notice
                                                                            NOTICE of service of discovery by pla Benita Norris . (KMG)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 Stipulation
                                                                              STIPULATION to Extend (time) Case Deadlines by pla Benita Norris, dft SGS Thomson Microele (KMG)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Other Notice
                                                                                NOTICE of service of discovery by pla Benita Norris . (SRB)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Other Notice
                                                                                  NOTICE of service of discovery by dft STMicroelectronics . (SRB)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Notice of Deposition
                                                                                    NOTICE by dft STMicroelectronics OF TAKING DEPO OF Benita Norris on the following date(s): 5/19/05 (SRB)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Other Notice
                                                                                      NOTICE of service of discovery by pla Benita Norris . (SRB)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                        NOTICE of service of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by dft STMicroelectronics (LSP)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                          NOTICE of service of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by pla Benita Norris (LSP)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting stipulation to dismiss individual Dfts w/out prejudice and correcting caption to reflect correct name of the remaining Dft by Pla, Dfts Paul Norman Dux, Jane Dux, Robert A Yerkey, Jane Doe Yerkey, Louis A Defillo, Jane Doe Defillo; terminating party Jane Doe Defillo, party Louis A Defillo, party Jane Doe Yerkey, Robert A Yerkey, party Jane Dux, party Paul Norman Dux, t-labels as to . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the correct corporate name of the remaining Defendant is STMicroelectronics, Inc., and this name should be reflected on the case caption going forward. (cc: all counsel) (LSP) Modified on 10/15/2004
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll ; bench trial set for 9:00 11/15/05 ; Final Pretrial conference set for 9:00 11/7/05 ; PTO ddl set for 10/25/05 ; dispositive motions due 8/31/05 ; discovery ddl set for 6/30/05 (cc: all counsel) (LSP)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                STIPULATION to dismiss individual Dfts w/out prejudice and correcting caption to reflect correct name of the remaining Dft by Pla, Dfts Paul Norman Dux, Jane Dux, Robert A Yerkey, Jane Doe Yerkey, Louis A Defillo, Jane Doe Defillo (MAP)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Crt Rptr: Candy Potter. Appearances: Robert Gregory for plaintiff, telephonically; Jill Harrison and Scott Rodgers for defendants. Preliminary scheduling conference held. Written order to issue setting forth case management deadlines and a trial date. [19-2] (BAH)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Report re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                                                    JOINT CASE MGT REPORT: joint pretrial order ddl 10/31/05; discovery cutoff 6/30/05; dispositive motions filing ddl is 8/31/05 (LSP)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll ; prel scheduling conf set for 9:15 10/4/04 ; Parties are directed to meet at least 14 days before the conference. Initial disclosures shall be made at or within 10 days after the meeting of the parties. Counsel shall file with the Court, not less than 7 days before the conference, a joint report reflecting the results of their meeting and outlining the discovery plan (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Answer
                                                                                                        ANSWER to complaint [1-1] by dft STMicroelectronics fka: SGS Thomson Microelectronics (LSP)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss case by dft SGS Thomson Microelectronics (nka: STMicroelectronics, Inc.) [11-1] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and only Plaintiff's Title VII claim remains pending before the Court; FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the entire Complaint for failure to serve the Summons and Complaint in a timely manner is DENIED; FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the breach of contract claim is GRANTED pursuant to ARS 12-541(3); FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing is GRANTED pursuant to ARS 12-541(3); FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Arizona Civil Rights Act claim is GRANTED pursuant to ARS 41-1481(D); FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the breach of implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing for failure to state a claim is DENIED as moot. (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                            NOTICE by pla of change of address of Atty Gregory to 1930 S Alms School Road,Suite A-115 Mesa, AZ 85210 480-839-4711 (DMT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                              REPLY Memorandum by dft SGS Thomson Microelectronics to response to motion to dismiss case by dft SGS Thomson Microelectronics (nka: STMicroelectronics, Inc.) [11-1] (LSP)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                RESPONSE by pla to motion to dismiss case by dft SGS Thomson Microelectronics (nka: STMicroelectronics, Inc.) [11-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003, Terminated: 7/21/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                  MOTION to dismiss case by dft SGS Thomson Microelectronics (nka: STMicroelectronics, Inc.) [11-1] (LSP)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft SGS Thomson Microele on 10/7/03 (DMT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Crt Rptr: Candy Potter. APPEARANCES: Robert Gregory on behalf of Benita Norris. Status hearing set. The Court being advised the plaintiff has retained counsel, IT IS ORDERED vacating the status hearing. [9-2] (BAH)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for pla by Robert Miles Gregory (DMT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER IT IS ORDERED vacating the 9/29/03 hearing date, resetting the status hearing for Tuesday, 9/30/03 at 4:30 p.m. (cc: all counsel) [7-2] (BAH)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Crt Rptr: Candy Potter. APPEARANCE: Benita Norris, pro per plaintiff. Show cause hearing held. Discussion held regarding service of the complaint. IT IS ORDERED setting a status hearing for September 29, 2003 at 4:30 p.m. [6-3] (BAH)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll ; show cause hearing set for 3:15 9/8/03 (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Remark - Public
                                                                                                                                REMARK as to Benita Norris packet of information and incomplete service packets returned to Pla for completion (Second request) (former emp) Modified on 03/05/2001
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 Remark - Public
                                                                                                                                  REMARK as to Benita Norris service packet received incomplete (former emp)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER re: order [3-1] due to clerical error, the Order issued by this Court, signed 1/3/01, was file stamped 1/5/00. The Clerk of the Court has corrected the pleading to reflect the correct file stamped date to be 1/5/01 (copy attached). (cc: all counsel) [4-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis by pla Benita Norris [2-1]; FURTHER ORDERED copies of the summons and complaint shall be served at governments expense on dfts by US Marshal subject to reinbursement (cc: all counsel) re: order [3-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001, Terminated: 1/5/2001 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis by pla Benita Norris [2-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT FILED (SAT)
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?