Brainerd v. AZ St Univ Regents, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-00002-ROS
District Judge Roslyn O Silver, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Charles Brainerd, Plaintiff
v.
Arizona State University Arizona State University, Defendant
Officially listed as "Arizona State University Regents, Board of"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosa Mroz +1 602 542 5025
No Logo Hansen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosa Mroz +1 602 542 5025
No Logo Hardina, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosa Mroz +1 602 542 5025
No Logo Hoyum, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosa Mroz +1 602 542 5025
No Logo Jiping He, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosa Mroz +1 602 542 5025
No Logo John Pickens, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosa Mroz +1 602 542 5025
No Logo Kris Harrison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosa Mroz +1 602 542 5025
No Logo Lasiter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosa Mroz +1 602 542 5025
No Logo Lattie F Coor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosa Mroz +1 602 542 5025
No Logo Loftus, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosa Mroz +1 602 542 5025
No Logo Mandat, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosa Mroz +1 602 542 5025
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Maricopa
Terminated 8/21/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags STD, TERMED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Judgment*
JUDGMENT: per the Court's order of July 6, 2001, this case is dismissed for failure of Plaintiff to provide evidence that he properly served Defendants. This case is closed. to dismiss case (cc: all counsel/jgmdrw) (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver: pla must properly serve process on the individual dfts in compliance with the provisions of this order on or before 7/13/01; pla must file evidence of such service with the court on or before 7/13/01 if pla fails to provide such evidence the Clerk of the Court will dismiss this action without further order of the Court; granting motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint with regard to pla's claims against the Board of Regents and plas claims against the individual dfts in their official capacities [4-1]; denying motion responsive memorandum stipulation for extension of time to answer (for an additional 21 days to answer the dft's to dismiss) by pla David Charles Brainerd [5-1], denying motion stipulation for extension of time to answer the motion to dismiss by pla David Charles Brainerd [6-1], denying motion for extension of time (21 days) to answer dfts' motion to dismiss by pla David Charles Brainerd [7-1] (cc: all counsel) (former emp) Modified on 07/10/2001
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 Response to Motion
      REPLY MEMORANDUM (RESPONSE) by pla David Charles Brainerd to motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint by dfts [4-1] (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
        RESPONSIVE MEMORANDUM (MOTION) for extension of time (21 days) to answer dfts' motion to dismiss by pla David Charles Brainerd [7-1] (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001, Terminated: 7/6/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
          RESPONSIVE MEMORANDUM (MOTION) stipulation for extension of time to answer the dft's motion to dismiss by pla David Charles Brainerd [6-1] (former emp)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001, Terminated: 7/6/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
            MOTION responsive memorandum stipulation for extension of time to answer (for an additional 21 days to answer the dft's motion to dismiss) by pla David Charles Brainerd [5-1] (former emp)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001, Terminated: 7/6/2001 Motion to Dismiss
              MOTION to dismiss plaintiff's complaint by dfts [4-1] (former emp)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll: the undersign recuses himself from participation in this case Case reassigned to Judge Roslyn O. Silver (with notice sent) (cc: all counsel/ROS) (former emp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                  RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons and complaint upon dft ASU Board of Regents by certified mail on 1/3/01 (former emp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT FILED (LSP)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 156 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?