Terry v. USA, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-00003-MHM
District Judge Mary H. Murguia, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Girtha Mae Terry, Plaintiff
v.
Social Security Administration Social Security Administration, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A Johns +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 mike.johns@usdoj.gov
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 864 - Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Maricopa
Terminated 9/27/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 01-15772[]
Def Custody Status
Flags EXP, TERMED
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 64 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia denying motion for default judgment against dft USA and Melkonoff/Delaney & Melkonoff PC and Charles Striver (not listed as parties) by pla Girtha Mae Terry [63-1] (cc: all counsel) (SRB)
    LREF
    Blank 63 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004, Terminated: 2/28/2005 Motion for Default Judgment
    MOTION for default judgment against dft USA and Melkonoff/Delaney & Melkonoff PC and Charles Striver (not listed as parties) by pla Girtha Mae Terry [63-1] (LAD)
      LREF
      Blank 62 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia denying motion for default judgment against USA and Delaney & Melkonoff, PC (Not listed as a defendant) for 2/23/01 by pla Girtha Mae Terry [61-1] (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
        LREF
        Blank 61 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004, Terminated: 7/20/2004 Notice of Change of Address
        NOTICE by pla Girtha Mae Terry of change of address: 1350 W. VanBuren St., #1020, Phoenix, AZ 85007 (LSP)
          LREF
          Blank 61 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004, Terminated: 7/20/2004 Motion for Default Judgment
          MOTION for default judgment against USA and Delaney & Melkonoff, PC (Not listed as a defendant) for 2/23/01 by pla Girtha Mae Terry [61-1] (LSP)
            LREF
            Blank 60 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Other NoticeCourt Filing
            NOTICE by pla Girtha Mae Terry of Complaint filed by Girtha M Terry on 1/2/01 and assigned to Judge Robert C Broomfield; False Civil Docket, reassigned case to Judge Mary H Murguia filed on 1/2/01; Speedy Trial, Speedy Trial Act (no relief requested in document) (REW)
              LREF
              Blank 59 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia dismissing for lack of jurisdiction the motion for judgment re: previous motions for summary judgment and default judgments by pla Girtha Mae Terry [55-1], dismissing for lack of jurisdiction the motion again for subpoena duces tecum by pla Girtha Mae Terry [56-1], dismissing for lack of jurisdiction the motion for default judgment against SSA by pla Girtha Mae Terry [57-1], dismissing for lack of jurisdiction the motion for supplemental security income from 2/27/91 ongoing 2003 by pla Girtha Mae Terry [57-2], dismissing for lack of jurisdiction the motion for sovereign immunity by pla Girtha Mae Terry [58-1] (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                LREF
                Blank 58 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                MOTION for sovereign immunity by pla Girtha Mae Terry [58-1] (LAD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 57 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003, Terminated: 5/2/2003 Motion for Default Judgment
                  MOTION for default judgment against SSA by pla Girtha Mae Terry [57-1] and for supplemental security income from 2/27/91 ongoing 2003 by pla Girtha Mae Terry [57-2] (LAD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 56 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Motion for Issuance
                    MOTION again for subpoena duces tecum by pla Girtha Mae Terry [56-1] (LAD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 55 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 ~Motion for Judgment
                      MOTION for judgment re: previous motions for summary judgment and default judgments by pla Girtha Mae Terry [55-1] (former emp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 54 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia dismissing for lack of jurisdiction the motion for default judgment against USA and RA Melkonoff, Delaney & Melkonoff PC by pla Girtha Mae Terry [51-1], dismissing for lack of jurisdiction the motion for default judgment against USA, RA Melkonoff, Delaney & Melkonoff by pla Girtha Mae Terry [52-1], dismissing for lack of jurisdiction the motion for default judgment against SSA by pla Girtha Mae Terry [53-1] (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 53 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Motion for Default Judgment
                          MOTION for default judgment against SSA by pla Girtha Mae Terry [53-1] (MAP)
                            LREF
                            Blank 52 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Motion for Default Judgment
                            MOTION for default judgment against USA, RA Melkonoff, Delaney & Melkonoff by pla Girtha Mae Terry [52-1] (LAD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 51 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Motion for Default Judgment
                              MOTION for default judgment against USA and RA Melkonoff, Delaney & Melkonoff PC by pla Girtha Mae Terry [51-1] (LAD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 50 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Judgment*
                                JUDGMENT: re: memorandum and order [49-1] to dismiss case ; ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court having granted the motion for summary judgment in accordance with the provisions of Rule 56(b) Fed.R.Civ.P. by dft SSA [43-1], pla take nothing and this action is hereby dismissed (cc: all counsel/jgm drawer) (LAD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 49 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia : denying motion for default judgment against USA and Delaney & Melkonoff Law Firm (USA is a termed party and Delaney and Melkonoff not parties to this case) by pla Girtha Mae Terry [42-1], denying motion for default judgment against SSA and Delaney & Melkenoff PC (not listed as a party) by pla Girtha Mae Terry [47-1] granting motion for summary judgment in accordance with the provisions of Rule 56(b) Fed.R.Civ.P. by dft SSA [43-1]; FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 48 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 Motion for Default Judgment
                                    MOTION for default judgment against SSA on 2/23/01, disability and Supplemental Security Income from 2/27/91 ongoing 2002 by pla Girtha Mae Terry [48-1] (LAD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 47 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Motion for Default Judgment
                                      MOTION for default judgment against SSA and Delaney & Melkenoff PC (not listed as a party) by pla Girtha Mae Terry [47-1] (LAD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 46 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                        MOTION AND RESPOND by pla Girtha Mae Terry to deny dft uSA summary judgment, order by Judge Mary H Murguia. Deny dft Delaney & Melkonoff Law Firm summary judgment. Deny the Officer of Agency summary judgment, Jo Anne B Barnhart, Commissioner of Social Security (deny motion for summary judgment in accordance with the provisions of Rule 56(b) Fed.R.Civ.P. by dft SSA [43-1]) (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 42 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002, Terminated: 9/27/2002 Motion for Default Judgment
                                          MOTION for default judgment against USA and Delaney & Melkonoff Law Firm (USA is a termed party and Delaney and Melkonoff not parties to this case) by pla Girtha Mae Terry [42-1] , and request for admission, request to admit, and request for production of specified documents for review by pla Girtha Mae Terry [42-2] (former emp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 45 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Brief (non-appeal)
                                            BRIEF in support of dft SSA regarding motion for summary judgment in accordance with the provisions of Rule 56(b) Fed.R.Civ.P. by dft SSA [43-1] [43-1] (former emp)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 44 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Statement
                                              STATEMENT OF FACTS by dft SSA re motion for summary judgment in accordance with the provisions of Rule 56(b) Fed.R.Civ.P. by dft SSA [43-1] [43-1] (former emp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 43 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                MOTION for summary judgment in accordance with the provisions of Rule 56(b) Fed.R.Civ.P. by dft SSA [43-1] (former emp)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion for clarification speedy trial review (of orders attached at exhibits 1 through 29) by pla Girtha Mae Terry [39-1] (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                    MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Mary H. Murguia. Crt Rptr: Merilyn Sanchez. Appearances: Plaintiff Girtha Terry appears on her own behalf and is accompanied by Theodore Terry; defendant is represented by Michael Johns. Status hearing is held. Plaintiff was not able to obtain counsel. The court affirms its prior briefing order: defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by 7/5/02; plaintiff's response/cross-motion shall be filed by 8/8/02; afterwards, the court will set oral argument. [cc: MHM] [40-2] (KCB)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002, Terminated: 7/2/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      MOTION for clarification speedy trial review (of oerders attached at exhibits 1 through 29) by pla Girtha Mae Terry [39-1] (LAD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                        MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Mary H. Murguia . Crt Rptr: M. Sanchez. Present: Girtha and Theodore Terry, pla; Michael Johns for dft. Status hearing held. Court advises pla that since dft has filed an answer, the motion for default in inappropriate; the next step in this litigation is the filing of motions for summary judgment. ORDERED denying motion to sign this minute order status hearing motion for default judgment 2/23/01 and SSID for 1991 ongoing 2002 by pla Girtha Mae Terry [37] and denying motion for default judgment against SSA by pla Girtha Mae Terry [35-1]. FURTHER ORDERED that dft shall file its motion for summary judgment within 45 days. FURTHER ORDERED setting a status hearing for 11:30AM, 6/18/02. [cc: all cnsl] [38] (former emp)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002, Terminated: 5/21/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                          MOTION to sign this minute order status hearing motion for default judgment 2/23/01 and SSID for 1991 ongoing 2002 by pla Girtha Mae Terry [37-1] (LAD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Response to Motion
                                                            RESPONSE by dft SSA to motion for default judgment against SSA by pla Girtha Mae Terry [35-1] (LAD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                              MOTION for default judgment against SSA by pla Girtha Mae Terry [35-1] (LAD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                                                MINUTE ORDER status hearing is set for 4:30PM, 5/21/02 before the Honorable Mary H. Murguia, Courtroom 505. (cc: all counsel) [34] (former emp)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Notice of Attorney Substitution
                                                                  ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Michael R Arkfeld for SSA and substituting attorney Michael A Johns (LAD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Mandate of 9th Circuit
                                                                    CERTIFIED COPY of 9th Circuit Mandate dismissing the NOTICE of Interlocutory Appeal for lack of jurisdiction as the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable, re: 01-16550 [25-1] (cc: all counsel/judge) (REW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Mandate of 9th Circuit
                                                                      CERTIFIED COPY of 9th Circuit Mandate dismissing the NOTICE of Interlocutory Appeal for lack of jurisdiction as the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable, re: 01-16548 [24-1] (cc: all counsel/judge) (REW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 USCA Case Number
                                                                        Notification by 9th Circuit of Appellate Docket Number 01-16550 re NOTICE of Interlocutory Appeal [25-1] (REW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 USCA Case Number
                                                                          Notification by 9th Circuit of Appellate Docket Number 01-16548 (per Ninth Circuit docket) re NOTICE of Interlocutory Appeal [24-1] (REW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Exhibit
                                                                            CERTIFIED COPY OF RECORD received from dft SSA, Re: answer to complaint [29-1] by dft SSA (REW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Answer
                                                                              ANSWER to complaint [1-1] by dft SSA (REW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion for enlargement of time within which dft may file a responsive pleading (to the complaint) [1-1] by dft SSA [27-1]; dft may have until 8/20/01 to answer or otherwise respond to pla's complaint, re: complaint [1-1] (cc: all counsel) (motion #17 termed) (REW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                  MOTION for enlargement of time within which dft may file a responsive pleading (to the complaint) [1-1] by dft SSA [27-1] (REW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Mandate of 9th Circuit
                                                                                    CERTIFIED COPY of 9th Circuit Mandate dismissing the appeal for lack of jurisdiction as the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable, re: 01-15772 [16-1], [14-1] (cc: all counsel/judge) (REW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Certificate of Record
                                                                                      Certificate of Record Transmitted to 9th Circuit NOTICE of Interlocutory Appeal [25-1] (REW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Certificate of Record
                                                                                        Certificate of Record Transmitted to 9th Circuit NOTICE of Interlocutory Appeal [24-1] (REW)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
                                                                                          NOTICE of Interlocutory Appeal by Girtha Mae Terry from District Court order filed [23-1] (cc: 9CCA/all counsel/judge) (REW)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion for enlargement of time until 8/6/01 for dft to file a responsive pleading to the complaint [1-1] by dft SSA [22-1] (cc: all counsel) (REW)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                              MOTION for enlargement of time for dft to file a responsive pleading to the complaint [1-1] by dft SSA [22-1] (REW)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
                                                                                                NOTICE of Interlocutory Appeal by Girtha Mae Terry from District Court order filed [21-1] (cc: 9CCA/all counsel/judge) (appeal filed at and forwarded from the Ninth Circuit) (REW)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion for enlargement of time until 7/6/01 to file responsive pleading, re: complaint [1-1] by dft SSA [20-1] (cc: all counsel) (REW)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                    MOTION for enlargement of time to file responsive pleading, re: complaint [1-1] by dft SSA [20-1] (REW)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion to substitute The Commissioner of Social Security Administration (for dft USA) by dft USA, dft SSA [18-1] terminating party USA (cc: all counsel/9CCA) (REW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001, Terminated: 5/23/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                        MOTION to substitute The Commissioner of Social Security Administration (for dft USA) by dft USA, dft SSA [18-1] (REW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                          MOTION for enlargement of time to answer by dft USA, dft SSA [17-1] (REW)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/7/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by dft USA (LAD)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                              Notification by 9CCA of Appellate Docket Number 01-15772 (REW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
                                                                                                                AMENDED NOTICE of Interlocutory Appeal by Girtha Mae Terry from District Court order [10-1], and order [3-1], re: appeal [14-1] (cc: 9CCA/cnsl/MHM) (REW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001 Certificate of Record
                                                                                                                  Certificate of Record Transmitted to 9CCA [14-1] (REW)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia joint or individual status report due 5/2/01 (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Interlocutory Appeal by Girtha Mae Terry from District Court order [10-1] (cc: 9CCA/cnsl/MHM) (REW)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED of summons/complaint/order upon dft USA by service upon Attorney General of USA by certified mail on 3/12/01 (LAD)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED of summons/complaint/order upon dft SSA by certified mail service upon the Social Security Commissioner on 3/12/01 (LAD)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia denying motion for default judgment against USA, SSA by pla [6-1] as dft has not received proper service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i)(1)(A) and 4(i)(1)(B) (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED of summons/complaint upon dft USA by service upon G Brodish, Receptionist, on 3/9/01 (LAD)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                REPLY (RESPONSE) by pla Girtha Mae Terry to response to motion for default judgment against USA, SSA by pla [6-1] (LAD)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by dfts to motion for default judgment against USA, SSA by pla [6-1] (LAD)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Service Packet Forwarded to USMS
                                                                                                                                    USM 285, summons/notice/complaint/order, forwarded to USMS this date. (MAP)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001, Terminated: 3/14/2001 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for default judgment against USA, SSA by pla [6-1] (LAD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        SOC SEC SCHED ORDER ( Judge Mary H. Murguia ) 1) Pltf to file any mtn including mtn for s/j w/in 30 days of filing answer and rcrd ; 2) Dft to file resp and any x-mtn; 3) Pltf to file applicable rply or resp all purs to LR 1.10 of the Rules of Practice (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          The Court has ORDERED that effective February 1, 2001, the above captioned matter is reassigned to Judge Mary H. Murguia for all further proceedings. Any hearing, conference, or trial scheduled on or after 2/1/2001 in this action is vacated and will be reset by the Court. Counsel are to file a Joint Status Report in accordance with the attached order by 2/22/2001. All further pleadings and papers filed in this action should bear the complete case number and judge's initials, as shown above. (cc: all counsel) [4-1] (MAP)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Remark - Public
                                                                                                                                            SERVICE PACKET sent to Pla for completion. Social Security Scheduling Order forwarded to Chambers for signature (MAP)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Robert C. Broomfield granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis by pla Girtha Mae Terry [2-1] (cc: all counsel) (LAD) Modified on 01/05/2001
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001, Terminated: 1/4/2001 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis by pla Girtha Mae Terry [2-1] (LAD)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001, Terminated: 6/15/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed. (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 81 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?