Benham v. Massanari
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-00004-RCB
District Judge Robert C. Broomfield, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Milford J Benham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by palm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sherman R Bendalin +1 602 252 6033 +1 602 252 7885 srbla@393palm.com
v.
No Logo Larry G Massanari, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael R Arkfeld +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 mike.arkfeld@usdoj.gov
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 863 - D.I.W.C./D.I.W.W. (US Defendant)
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Maricopa
Terminated 3/15/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags EXP, TERMED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Judgment*
JUDGMENT entered in favor of dft and against plaintiff. Pla to take nothing and complaint and action are dismissed (cc: all counsel, jgm draw) re: judgment [22-1] (DMT)
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Robert C. Broomfield denying motion for summary judgment by pla [10-1], granting motion for summary judgment by dft [17-1]. Clerk of Court directed to enter jgm in favor of dft and terminate the action. terminating case (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Response to Motion
      RESPONSE by pla to motion for summary judgment by dft [17-1] (part of reply 20-1) (DMT)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by pla to response to motion for summary judgment by pla [10-1] (DMT)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Statement
          STATEMENT OF FACTS by dft re motion for summary judgment by dft [17-1] [17-1] (DMT)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Memorandum
            MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by dft of motion for summary judgment by dft [17-1] and in opposition to motion for summary judgment by pla [10-1] (DMT)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
              CROSS-MOTION for summary judgment by dft [17-1] and RESPONSE to motion for summary judgment by pla [10-1] [10-1] by dft (DMT)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Robert C. Broomfield granting motion to extend time to 9/26/01 to respond to pla's motion for sum jgm by dft [15-1] (second request) (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001, Terminated: 9/18/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                  MOTION to extend time to 9/26/01 to respond to pla's motion for sum jgm by dft [15-1] (second request, originally docketed 9/13/01) (DMT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Robert C. Broomfield granting motion to extend time to 9/12/01 to respond to pla's motion for sum jgm by dft (first request) [13-1] (originally docketed 8/15/01) (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001, Terminated: 8/15/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                      MOTION to extend time to 9/12/01 to respond to pla's motion for sum jgm by dft (first request) [13-1] (originally docketed 8/14/01) (DMT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Statement
                        STATEMENT OF FACTS by pla re motion for summary judgment by pla [10-1] (DMT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Memorandum
                          MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by pla of motion for summary judgment by pla [10-1] [10-1] (DMT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001, Terminated: 3/15/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                            MOTION for summary judgment by pla [10-1] (DMT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge Robert C. Broomfield granting motion to extend time to 7/9/01 to file motion for sum jgm by pla [8-1] (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001, Terminated: 6/18/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                MOTION (second) to extend time to 7/9/01 to file motion for sum jgm by pla [8-1] (DMT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge Robert C. Broomfield granting motion to extend time to 6/8/01 to file motion for sum jgm by pla [6-1] (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001, Terminated: 5/10/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                    MOTION to extend time to 6/8/01 to file motion for sum jgm by pla [6-1] (DMT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 Answer
                                      ANSWER (with 1 volume transcript) by dft (DMT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Robert C. Broomfield granting motion to extend time to 5/4/01 to answer by dft [3-1] (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001, Terminated: 3/7/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                          MOTION to extend time to 5/4/01 to answer by dft [3-1] (DMT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                            SOC SEC SCHED ORDER ( Judge Robert C. Broomfield ) 1) Pltf to file any mtn including mtn for s/j w/in 30 days of filing answer and rcrd ; 2) Dft to file resp and any x-mtn; 3) Pltf to file applicable rply or resp all purs to LR 1.10 of the Rules of Practice (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001, Terminated: 7/12/2001 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT filed. Social Security Scheduling Order forwarded to chambers. (MAP)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 122 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?