Bailey, et al v. Brightstar Info Tech, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-00005-ROS
District Judge Roslyn O Silver, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher J Miguel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J Foster +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 bfoster@swlaw.com
Space Gregory James Marshall +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 gmarshall@swlaw.com
No Logo Christopher M Bailey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J Foster +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 bfoster@swlaw.com
Space Gregory James Marshall +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 gmarshall@swlaw.com
No Logo Deryle T House, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J Foster +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 bfoster@swlaw.com
Space Gregory James Marshall +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 gmarshall@swlaw.com
No Logo Integrated Systems Consulting, LLC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J Foster +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 bfoster@swlaw.com
Space Gregory James Marshall +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 gmarshall@swlaw.com
No Logo Raymond M Barry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J Foster +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 bfoster@swlaw.com
Space Gregory James Marshall +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 gmarshall@swlaw.com
v.
No Logo Brightstar Info Tech Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Reece Bader +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 wrbader@orrick.com
Space Cynthia A. Wickstrom +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 cwickstrom@orrick.com
No Logo Donald W Rowley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Reece Bader +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 wrbader@orrick.com
Space Cynthia A. Wickstrom +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 cwickstrom@orrick.com
No Logo Jane Doe Rowley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Reece Bader +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 wrbader@orrick.com
Space Cynthia A. Wickstrom +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 cwickstrom@orrick.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $2000000
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Maricopa
Terminated 4/30/2001
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags STD, TERMED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver granting motion to transfer case (to Northern District of CA) by plas [24-1], finding the motion to substitute attorneys by plas [19-1] - David R Jordan and Titus, Brueckner and Berry in place of Snell and Wilmer for plas moot., finding the motion to dismiss case by dfts (all) [17-1] moot. Case transferred to Northern Didstrict of CA (cc: all counsel,jgmdrwr) (CMM)
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001, Terminated: 4/30/2001 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer Case
    MOTION to transfer case (to Northern District of CA) by plas [24-1] (CMM)
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 Minute Order - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      MINUTE ORDER IT IS ORDERED setting oral argument on motion to dismiss case by dfts (all) [17-1] at 3:00 p.m. on 8/20/01 before Judge Silver. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the prel scheduling conf set for 4/27/01. (cc: all counsel; CD) [23-2] (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 Other Notice
        NOTICE by plas of filing original signature for notice of substitution of counsel with consent (signature of pla Christopher Bailey re substitution of David R Jordan in place of Snell and Wilmer) (CMM)
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver granting stipulation to extend time for plas to file response to dfts motion to dismiss - until 4/10/01 (cc: all counsel) (CMM)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 Stipulation
            STIPULATION by plas, dfts extending time to file response to motion to dismiss (on or before 4/10/01) (CMM)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 Motion to Substitute Attorney
              MOTION to substitute attorneys by plas [19-1] - David R Jordan and Titus, Brueckner and Berry in place of Snell and Wilmer for plas (CMM)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001 Declaration
                DECLARATION of Donald W Rowlwy in support of motion to dismiss case by dfts (all) [17-1] (MAP)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to dismiss case by dfts (all) [17-1] (MAP)
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Amended Answer to Complaint
                    FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to [11-1] by dfts (all); jury demand (MAP)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Roslyn O. Silver ; prel scheduling conf set for 9:00 4/27/01 (cc: all counsel) (CMM)
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver granting motion for pro hac vice (atty W Reece Bader) by dfts (all) [9-1] (cc: all counsel) (CMM)
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver granting stipulation to extend time for Dfts to answer the Complaint by dfts, plas [8-1] - until 2/16/01 (cc: all counsel) (CMM)
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver granting motion for pro hac vice (atty Cynthia Wickstrom) by dfts (all) [10-1] (cc: all counsel) (CMM)
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Answer
                              ANSWER by dfts (all); jury demand (MAP)
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001, Terminated: 2/27/2001 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                MOTION for pro hac vice (atty Cynthia Wickstrom) by dfts (all) [10-1] (MAP)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001, Terminated: 2/27/2001 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                  MOTION for pro hac vice (atty W Reece Bader) by dfts (all) [9-1] (MAP)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001, Terminated: 2/27/2001 Stipulation
                                    STIPULATION to extend time for Dfts to answer the Complaint by dfts, plas [8-1] (MAP)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Minute Order - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                      MINUTE ORDER that pursuant to Local Rule 1.2(e), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Roslyn O. Silver All further pleadins should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CIV-01-5-PHX-ROS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause hearing shcheduled for 2/26/01 is hereby vacated (cc: all counsel/MS/ROS) [5-2] (MAP)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Election to Assign Case to District Judge
                                        Party elects assignment of case to district judge ; mag election form ddl satisfied 2/9/01 ; show cause hearing ddl satisfied 2/9/01 (MAP) Modified on 02/12/2001
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED (summons/complaint) personal upon dft Jane Doe Rowley on 1/29/01 (MAP)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED (summons/complaint) personal upon dft Donald W Rowley on 1/29/01 (MAP)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                              ORDERED that plas Christopher M Bailey, Raymond M Barry, Deryle T House Jr, Christopher J Miguel and Integrated Systems show cause for failure to comply with Local Rule 1.2(e); show cause hearing set for 1:30 2/26/01 for Integrated Systems, for Christopher J Miguel, for Deryle T House Jr, for Raymond M Barry, for Christopher M Bailey before Judge Stephen M. McNamee (cc: all counsel/AL) (MAP)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED (summons/complaint) upon Joanne May for dft Brightstar Info Tech on 1/8/01 (MAP)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001, Terminated: 8/13/2001 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT FILED (MAP)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 261 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?