OrthoLogic Corp v. Columbia/HCA Health, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-00006-SRB
District Judge Susan R Bolton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Orthologic Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space P Robert Moya +1 520 770 8700

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP (Indianapolis)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deana S Peck +1 602 229 5719 +1 602 420 5009 dpeck@quarles.com
v.
No Logo ColumbiaHCA Healthcare Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter P. Loughlin +1 212 906 1200

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Noreen A Kelly-Najah +1 212 906 1841
Space Benjamin H Rogoff +1 212 906 1841

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborn Maledon, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maureen Beyers +1 602 640 9305 +1 602 664 2053 mbeyers@omlaw.com
No Logo Galen of Kentucky, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter P. Loughlin +1 212 906 1200

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Noreen A Kelly-Najah +1 212 906 1841
Space Benjamin H Rogoff +1 212 906 1841

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborn Maledon, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maureen Beyers +1 602 640 9305 +1 602 664 2053 mbeyers@omlaw.com
No Logo Smith Laboratories, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter P. Loughlin +1 212 906 1200

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Noreen A Kelly-Najah +1 212 906 1841
Space Benjamin H Rogoff +1 212 906 1841

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborn Maledon, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maureen Beyers +1 602 640 9305 +1 602 664 2053 mbeyers@omlaw.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Maricopa
Terminated 6/24/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags STD, TERMED
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 42 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Mandate of 9th Circuit
CERTIFIED COPY of 9th Circuit Mandate; pursuant to the stipulation of the parties; this appeal is voluntarily dismissed; parties shall bear their own costs and fees on appeal, re: 02-16377 [40-1] (cc: all counsel/judge) (REW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 USCA Case Number
    Notification by 9th Circuit of Appellate Docket Number 02-16377 re NOTICE OF APPEAL [40-1] (REW)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Certificate of Record
      Certificate of Record Transmitted to 9th Circuit NOTICE OF APPEAL [40-1] (REW)
        LREF
        Blank 41 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
        INITIAL NOTICE of Transcript Designation by pla OrthoLogic Corp re NOTICE OF APPEAL [40-1]; no transcripts intended to be ordered (REW)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Notice of Appeal - Notification Form
          APPEAL PACKET forwarded to all parties and 9th Circuit re: NOTICE OF APPEAL [40-1] (REW)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Appeal Remark
            Civil Appeals Docketing Statement forwarded to 9th Circuit re NOTICE OF APPEAL [40-1] (REW)
              LREF
              Blank 40 Filed: 7/5/2002, Entered: 7/5/2002, Terminated: 12/8/2003 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by pla OrthoLogic Corp from District Court judgment [39-1], order filed [38-2] (cc: 9CCA/All Counsel/judge) (former emp) Modified on 07/09/2002
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/5/2002, Entered: 7/5/2002 USCA Appeal Fees
                Received $105.00 appeal fee re NOTICE OF APPEAL [40-1] (former emp) Modified on 07/09/2002
                  LREF
                  Blank 39 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Judgment*
                  JUDGMENT: that the Court has granted the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, therefore, the Plaintiff shall take nothing. This complaint and action are hereby dismissed in part with prejudice, in part without prejudice. (cc: all counsel) re: judgment [39-1] (former emp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 38 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting dfts' mtn to dismiss claims of the amended complaint with prejudice (mtn not received in docket as of this date); Counts 3,4 (only as against dfts Smith Laboratories, Inc, and Galen of Kentucky, Inc) and that part of Count Seven that asserted a claim under A.R.S. 44-1998; all otherclaims in the amended complaint are dismissed without prejudice purs to 28:1367(c) ; terminating case (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                      LREF
                      Blank 37 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by dfts to response to motion to dismiss case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by dfts [33-1] (former emp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 36 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Response to Motion
                        RESPONSE by pla OrthoLogic Corp to motion to dismiss case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by dfts [33-1] (former emp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 35 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting stipulation to extend time that pla may file its response to the motion to dismiss case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by dfts [33-1] by pla, dfts until 6/12/02 (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 34 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 Stipulation
                            STIPULATION to extend time that pla may file its response to the motion to dismiss case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by dfts [33-1] by pla, dfts until 6/12/02 (former emp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 33 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002, Terminated: 6/11/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to dismiss case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by dfts [33-1] (MAP)
                                LREF
                                Blank 32 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 Transcript
                                TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference by Court Reporter: Kim R Myrick for the following date(s): 4/15/02 (former emp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 31 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/17/2002 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
                                  Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Maureen Beyers for pretrial proceeding on 4/15/02 (former emp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Susan R. Bolton . Crt Rptr: Kim Myrick. Appearances: Michael Meehan (telephonically) for pla; Benjamin Rogoff, Walter Loughlin and Maureen Beyers for dfts. This is the time set for preliminary scheduling conference. Discussion held re: jurisdiction. IT IS ORDERED directing pla's counsel to file a motion to amend to assert a federal claim by 5/15/02. If pla will not be filing said pleading, pla's counsel is directed to advise dft counsel. The Court then directs dft counsel to file its Motion to Dismiss by 5/24/02. Upon the Court's determination, a further Rule 16 hearing may be set. [cc: SRB] [30-2] (MAW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 29 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Report re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                      Proposed CASE MGT PLAN (former emp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 28 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting stipulation to continue scheduling conference by pla, dfts for 30 days ; prel scheduling conf set for 11:15 4/15/02 (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 27 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Stipulation
                                          STIPULATION to continue scheduling conference by pla, dfts for 30 days (former emp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 26 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for admission pro hac vice as to Benjamin H Rogoff, atty for dft [25-1] (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 25 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002, Terminated: 3/6/2002 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                              MOTION for admission pro hac vice as to Benjamin H Rogoff, atty for dft [25-1] (former emp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 24 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Susan R. Bolton prel scheduling conf set for 10:00 3/18/02 (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 Answer
                                                  ANSWER to first amended complaint [2-1] and affirmative defenses by dfts (SAT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting in part and denying in part the motion to dismiss case by dfts [10-1]; granted regarding the plas section 1998 claim and dismissing this claim with prejudice; FURTHER ORDERED granted regarding the plas common law fraud (fifth claim), Section 10(b)(eighth claim), and Section 1991 claims. These claims are dismissed without prejudice, with leave granted to the pla to amend its complaint; FURTHER ORDERED denying in part granting the pla's implied indemnity claim against dft HCA (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Susan R. Bolton . Crt Rptr: Kim Myrick. Appearances: Mike Meehan for pla; Walter Loughlin and Maureen Beyers for dfts. Hearing held re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Without opposition by pla, IT IS ORDERED dismissing the 3rd claim. Argument presented re: 4th, 5th 7th and 8th claims. IT IS ORDERED dismissing the 4th claim against dfts Smith and Galen. The Court will rule on the merits as to dft HCA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED taking under advisement the balance of the motion to dismiss case by dfts [10-1] [cc: SRB; docket clerk] (MAW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Remark - Public
                                                        REMARK as to Galen of Kentucky atty Benjamin H Rogoff Latham & Watkins 885 3rd Ave Ste 1000 New York NY 10022 removed from database for noncompliance w/admissions deadline of 05/06/01 pty represented by other counsel (BAS)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Remark - Public
                                                          REMARK as to Smith Laboratories atty Benjamin H Rogoff Latham & Watkins 885 3rd Ave Ste 1000 New York NY 10022 removed from database for noncompliance w/admissions deadline of 05/06/01 pty represented by other counsel (BAS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Remark - Public
                                                            REMARK as to Columbia/HCA Health atty Benjamin H Rogoff Latham & Watkins 885 3rd Ave Ste 1000 New York Ny 10022 removed from database for noncompliance w/admissions deadline of 05/06/01 pty represented by other counsel (BAS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              REPLY by dfts to response to motion to dismiss case by dfts [10-1] (former emp)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                RESPONSE by pla OrthoLogic Corp to motion to dismiss case by dfts [10-1] (former emp)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for pro hac vice by dfts Columbia/HCA Health, Smith Laboratories, Galen of Kentucky [16-1] by counsel Walter P. Loughlin (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for pro hac vice by dfts Columbia/HCA Health, Smith Laboratories, Galen of Kentucky [15-1] by counsel Noreen A Kelly-Najah (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001, Terminated: 4/26/2001 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      MOTION for pro hac vice by dfts Columbia/HCA Health, Smith Laboratories, Galen of Kentucky [16-1] by counsel Walter P. Loughlin (former emp)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001, Terminated: 4/26/2001 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        MOTION for pro hac vice by dfts Columbia/HCA Health, Smith Laboratories, Galen of Kentucky [15-1] by counsel Noreen A Kelly-Najah (former emp)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for extension of time for pla to brief dfts mtn to dismiss until 5/7/01; FURTHER ORDERED dfts shall have until 5/21/01 to file a reply [13-1] (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001, Terminated: 4/25/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            Stipulation and Joint MOTION for extension of time to brief dfts mtn to dismiss until 5/7/01 by pla, dfts [13-1] (former emp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING by dft setting motion to dismiss case by dfts [10-1] at 9:30 6/11/01 (former emp)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Exhibit
                                                                                EXHIBIT A to dfts mtn to dismiss [10-1] (former emp)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001, Terminated: 1/7/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                  MOTION to dismiss case by dfts [10-1] (former emp)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting stipulation to extend time to answer until 4/4/01 by pla OrthoLogic Corp, and dfts Columbia/HCA Health, Smith Laboratories, Galen of Kentucky [8-1] (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001, Terminated: 3/1/2001 Stipulation
                                                                                      STIPULATION to extend time to answer until 4/4/01 by pla OrthoLogic Corp, and dfts Columbia/HCA Health, Smith Laboratories, Galen of Kentucky [8-1] (former emp)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED personal upon dft Columbia/HCA Health, dft Galen of Kentucky on 2/13/01 re: summons and complaint (former emp)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED (summons/complaint) upon Stephanie Arwood for dft Smith Laboratories on 2/7/01 (MAP)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Minute Order - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER that pursuant to Local Rule 1.2(e); a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R. Bolton All further pleadings should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CIV-01-06-PHX-SRB FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause hearing scheduled for 2/26/01 is hereby vacated (cc: all counsel/SRB/VAM) [5-2] (MAP)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Election to Assign Case to District Judge
                                                                                              Party elects assignment of case to district judge ; mag election form ddl satisfied 2/13/01 ; show cause hearing ddl satisfied 2/13/01 (MAP)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDERED that pla OrthoLogic Corp show cause for failure to comply with Local Rule 1.2(e); show cause hearing set for 1:30 2/26/01 for OrthoLogic Corp before Judge Stephen M. McNamee (cc: all counsel/AL) (MAP) Modified on 02/05/2001
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by pla OrthoLogic Corp; jury demand [1-1] (MAP)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT FILED (MAP)
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 144 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?