Talisman Marketing v. American Fam Mut Ins, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-00008-PGR
District Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Talisman Marketing, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph C Dolan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph C Dolan +1 602 266 7667 +1 602 277 9839 joe@jcdolan.com
No Logo American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen & Lewis PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynn M Allen +1 602 443 0364 +1 602 443 0403 lallen@allenandlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl F Mariano +1 602 385 1040 +1 602 385 1051 mariano@lbbslaw.com
v.
No Logo ABC Corporations, Defendant
No Logo American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen & Lewis PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynn M Allen +1 602 443 0364 +1 602 443 0403 lallen@allenandlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl F Mariano +1 602 385 1040 +1 602 385 1051 mariano@lbbslaw.com
No Logo Jane Does, Defendant
No Logo John Does, Defendant
No Logo XYZ Partnerships, Defendant
No Logo Talisman Marketing, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph C Dolan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph C Dolan +1 602 266 7667 +1 602 277 9839 joe@jcdolan.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Maricopa
Terminated 10/18/2001
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV2000-015441[Sup Ct Maricopa]
Def Custody Status
Flags STD, TERMED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting stipulation for dismissal of all claims with prejudice [1-2] by pla Talisman Marketing, dft American Fam Mut Ins (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001, Terminated: 1/16/2003 Stipulation
    STIPULATION for dismissal of all claims with prejudice [1-2] by pla Talisman Marketing, dft American Fam Mut Ins (DMT)
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Motion to Compel
      MOTION to compel disclosure statement from pla by dft American Fam Mut Ins [25-1] , and for sanctions against pla by dft American Fam Mut Ins [25-2] (DMT)
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Witness List
        WITNESS LIST by dft American Fam Mut Ins (DMT)
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to extend time to 7/13/01 to file an amended complaint to add parties to the lawsuit by pla Talisman Marketing [22-1] (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001, Terminated: 7/9/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
            MOTION to extend time (an additional 5 days) to file an amended complaint to add parties to the lawsuit by pla Talisman Marketing [22-1] (former emp) Modified on 07/10/2001
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 Other Notice
              NOTICE by dft American Fam Mut Ins of service of notice of deposition and subpoena duces tecum on custodian of records, Garden State Nutritionals (DMT)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting stipulation to extend time to 7/6/01 to file motions to amend pleadings and motions to join additional parties by pla Talisman Marketing, dft American Fam Mut Ins (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001 Stipulation
                  STIPULATION to extend time to 7/6/01 to file motions to amend pleadings and motions to join additional parties by pla Talisman Marketing, dft American Fam Mut Ins (DMT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt ; discovery ddl set for 1/4/02 ; dispositive motions due 2/15/02 ; PTO ddl set for 3/15/02 ; Pretrial conference set for 3:00 4/1/02 (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Report re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                      REVISED CASE MGT PLAN/REPORT: ; discovery cutoff 1/4/02; dispositive motions filing ddl is 2/15/02 joint pretrial statement 3/15/02 (DMT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Other Notice
                        NOTICE of compliance of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by dft American Fam Mut Ins (DMT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Notice of Deposition
                          NOTICE by dft American Fam Mut Ins OF TAKING DEPO OF custodian of records of Golden Desert Manufacturing on the following date(s): 6/18/01 (DMT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Notice of Deposition
                            NOTICE by dft American Fam Mut Ins OF TAKING DEPO OF Jeff Dawkins, Czar Goetz, Steve Ball on the following date(s): 5/31/01 (DMT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt Crt Rptr: Bill McNutt Appearances: Joseph Dolan for pla, Carl Mariano for dfts A scheduling conference was held. The parties to file an amended joint case management report by 6/5/01 and then the Court will enter its scheduling order. [13-2] (TCA)
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                MINUTE ORDER The Court having to vacate its civil law and motion calendar for 5/21/01, IT IS ORDERED that the scheduling conference set for 5/21/01 is vacated and reset to Tuesday, May 22, 2001 at 1:30 p.m. (cc: all counsel) [12-2] (TCA)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                  MINUTE ORDER a notice of withdrawal from arbitration having been received, counsel/parties are advised that this case is returned to the regular civil docket of the Hon. Paul G. Rosenblatt for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel/PGR/TA) [11-1] re: order [11-1] (MAP)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                    NOTICE of removal from Arbitration (MAP)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Notice of Deposition
                                      NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF Angie, custodian of records of Aire Care Cooling and Heating on the following date(s): 5/7/01 (DMT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/26/2001 ADR-Miscellaneous
                                        NOTICE: this case referred to Arbitration; removal from arbitration due 5/17/01 (cc: all counsel/TA/PGR) (MAP)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt Crt Rptr: Bill McNutt Appearances: Joseph Dolan for pla, Carl Mariano for dfts A hearing was held. IT IS ORDERED resetting the scheduling conference for 5/21/01 at 1:30 p.m. The parties to file a supplemental joint case management report. [8-2] (TCA)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                            JOINT PRETRIAL SCHEDULE Discovery cutoff 1/4/02 Motion filing ddl is 2/15/02 joint pretrial statement 3/15/02 (DMT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 Notice of Deposition
                                              NOTICE by dft American Fam Mut Ins OF TAKING DEPO OF David E Young on the following date(s): 4/20/01 (DMT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Other Notice
                                                NOTICE by pla of dismissal of action as to answer has been filed. (answer filed 1/9/01) (DMT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt that action is designated a standared track case; prel scheduling conf set for 1:30 4/23/01 (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Jury Demand
                                                    DEMAND for jury trial by pla (DMT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Answer
                                                      ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM by dft American Fam Mut Ins against pla (DMT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 ADR-Miscellaneous
                                                        NOTICE of removal from Maricopa County Superior Court; Court Number: CV2000-015441. Considered for possible arbitration. (Summons/Complaint) (LSP)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?