Fort, et al v. Select Leasing OR, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:94-cv-01515-MA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Joi Penkava, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P Picarazzi +1 541 389 5647 picarazzilaw@msn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
No Logo Jolene Hemmer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P Picarazzi +1 541 389 5647 picarazzilaw@msn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
No Logo Joyce Fort, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P Picarazzi +1 541 389 5647 picarazzilaw@msn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
No Logo Wallace C Fort, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P Picarazzi +1 541 389 5647 picarazzilaw@msn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira R Zarov +1 503 224 4094
v.
No Logo Select Leasing Oregon Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo Steven M Schneringer, Defendant
Office Portland
Filed 12/14/1994
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 371 - Personal Property: Truth in Lending
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1640 Truth in Lending
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County Washington
Terminated 8/31/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, IFP, TERMINATED
  Entries (88) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-98-0076 Location number 723513-723655 Box 117 of 143 (tomg)
    LREF
    Blank 87 Filed: 8/31/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995 Consent Judgment
    CONSENT JUDGMENT-(see file) Signed 8/30/95 microfilmed 8/31/95 Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh (cc: Counsel notified) (former employee)
      LREF
      Blank 86 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 Notice of Dismissal of Party
      NOTICE OF DISMISSAL as to party Robert J McDonald, party Athena Group Inc with prejudice (former employee)
        LREF
        Blank 85 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/17/1995 Scheduling
        RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh order to show cause hrg held on 8/14/95 ORDER based on no objections, the class settlement is approved. By 9/5/95, Plaintiffs shall submit form of judgment (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
          LREF
          Blank 84 Filed: 6/12/1995, Entered: 6/14/1995 Scheduling
          RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh based on the 6/12/95 order preliminarily approving settlement, which granted the motion for class certification, for preliminary approval of settlement, & for approval of form of notice to class #81 striking the 7/5/95 status conference. All pending motions moot (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
            LREF
            Blank 83 Filed: 6/12/1995, Entered: 6/14/1995 Order
            ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT - ORDERED This action is certified as a class action under FRCP23(b)(3). Within 10 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiffs' counsel shall provide notice to the class by first-class mail to the last known address of each member of the class. Any class member may appear at the hearing scheduled for 8/14/95 at 1:30 pm (see ORDER FOR DETAILS) Malcolm F. Marsh Signed 6/9/95 (counsel notified) (former employee)
              LREF
              Blank 81 Filed: 6/9/1995, Entered: 6/9/1995, Terminated: 6/12/1995 Motion
              MOTION by Plaintiffs Wallace C Fort, Joyce Fort, Jolene Hemmer, & Joi Penkava FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION , FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT , & FOR APPROVAL OF FORM OF NOTICE TO CLASS (gm)
                LREF
                Blank 82 Filed: 6/8/1995, Entered: 6/9/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Documents [81-1], [81-2], & [81-3] filed by Plaintiffs Wallace C Fort, Joyce Fort, Jolene Hemmer, & Joi Penkava (gm)
                  LREF
                  Blank 80 Filed: 5/26/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995 Order
                  ORDER MODIFYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION-ORDER the Preliminary Injunction entered by this Court on 2/28/95, shall be modified to include Defendant The Athena Group, Inc as an enjoined party to the extent that said order is applicable to Athena. Defendants are enjoined from demanding any further payments in excess of the initial amount of the original "purchase" price paid to exchange for their vehicle titles as states in respective "Bill of Sale" & "receipt" agreements; from repossessing vehicles of puntative class members except upon default of insurance or upon failure to repay principal. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh Signed 5/26/95 (counsel notified) (former employee)
                    LREF
                    Blank 79 Filed: 5/22/1995, Entered: 5/26/1995 Order
                    RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS Of Show Cause Hearing before Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh. No appearance by counsel for Defendants Select Leasing or Athena Group. ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT & TO ADD DEFENDANTS [76-1]. ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [70-1] as to Defendants Athena & Sun States through 6/30/95. ORDER SETTING Plaintiff's MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS [4-1] on not for oral argument calendar of 6/9/95. ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's MOTION MODIFY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [59-1] to include Athena Group. ORDER counsel shall appear on behalf of Select Leasing & Athena Group by 6/16/95 or Plaintiff's shall file a motion to strike their answers; if an answer is not filed by counsel for Sun States, then Plaintiffs shall submit a motion for default. Plaintiffs shall advise Defendant Sun States they must have counsel to appear. ORDER setting status hearing set 7/5/95 at 10:30am for setting pretrial& trial dates as well as considering any motions to strike answers or for default. (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Bob Stimler (former employee)
                      LREF
                      Blank 78 Filed: 5/12/1995, Entered: 5/15/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                      RECORD OF ORDER The court will consider Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a fourth amended complaint #76 at the show cause hearing on Monday 5/22/95 at 3:00 pm by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                        LREF
                        Blank 77 Filed: 5/12/1995, Entered: 5/15/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT & TO ADD DEFENDANTS [76-1] by Plaintiffs (former employee)
                          LREF
                          Blank 76 Filed: 5/12/1995, Entered: 5/15/1995, Terminated: 5/22/1995 Motion for Leave
                          MOTION by Plaintiffs FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT & TO ADD DEFENDANTS expedited decision requested (former employee)
                            LREF
                            Blank 75 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                            RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh SETTING MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [70-1] on oral argument calendar of 3:00 5/22/95 (counsel notified) (cpriestley)
                              LREF
                              Blank 73 Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of declaration [71-1], MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [70-1] by Plaintiff Wallace C Fort (cpriestley)
                                LREF
                                Blank 74 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                                RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh The sheduling of Plaintiffs 4/14/95 motion for modification of Preliminary Injunction #59 will take place during 5/22/95 at order to show hearing at 3:00pm [68-1] (counsel notified) (cpriestley)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 72 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995 Summons Issued
                                  SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Robert J McDonald (cpriestley)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 71 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/24/1995 Declaration
                                    DECLARATION by Plaintiffs of John Picarazzi re MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [70-1] (former employee)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 70 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/24/1995, Terminated: 5/22/1995 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                      MOTION (Unopposed) by Plaintiff TO EXTEND DISCOVERY (former employee)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 69 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/24/1995 Description not available
                                        THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT [48-1], [32-1], [3-1] by Plaintiffs adding Robert J McDonald (former employee)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 68 Filed: 4/21/1995, Entered: 4/24/1995 Order to Show Cause
                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE setting hrg for 3:00pm 5/22/95: Defendants Select Leasing Oregon Inc and The Athena Group Inc shall appear in Courtroom #11 to show cause why appropriate appearances and representation have not been accomplished Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh (counsel notified) (former employee)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 67 Filed: 4/20/1995, Entered: 4/20/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of notice of deposition by Plaintiffs' (former employee)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 66 Filed: 4/18/1995, Entered: 4/19/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                                              RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh GRANTING Plaintiff's MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO ADD DEFENDANT [62-1]. ORDER: for issuance of show cause order against Deft Select Leasing Oregon. See Order Which Follows (counsel notified) (former employee)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 64 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of declaration [63-1], MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO ADD DEFENDANT [62-1], declaration [61-1], memorandum [60-1], MOTION TO MODIFY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [59-1], affidavit [58-1] by Plaintiffs (former employee)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Declaration
                                                  DECLARATION by Plaintiffs of John Picarazzi re MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO ADD DEFENDANT [62-1] (former employee)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995, Terminated: 4/18/1995 Motion for Leave
                                                    MOTION by Plaintiffs FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO ADD DEFENDANT Expedited Decision Requested. (former employee)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Declaration
                                                      DECLARATION by Plaintiffs of John Picarazzi re MOTION TO MODIFY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [59-1] (former employee)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                                        MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Plaintiffs of MOTION TO MODIFY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [59-1] (former employee)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995, Terminated: 5/22/1995 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                          MOTION by Plaintiffs TO MODIFY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Expedited Argument Requested (former employee)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Affidavit
                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBER by Plaintiff of Natalie Francis re MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [28-1] (former employee)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 4/12/1995, Entered: 4/17/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of second amended ` complaint [48-1] by Plaintifsf, (former employee)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 4/6/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995 Description not available
                                                                ANSWER by Defendant Athena Group Inc to complaint [48-1], [32-1], [3-1] (former employee)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 3/27/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of production of documents by Plaintiffs (former employee)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: 3/21/1995 Return of Service Executed
                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Athena Group Inc on 3/16/95 (former employee)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: 3/16/1995 Order
                                                                      ORDER - The court finds that Defendant Select Leasing must obtain counsel for the duration of this action. Failure to obtain counsel may result in a default judgment. SO ORDERED by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh Signed 3/16/95 (counsel notified) (former employee)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995 Order
                                                                        RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS Of Scheduling Conference before Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh. ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' withdrawal of their 2/17/95 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT & TO ADD DEFENDANT [43-1]. ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' 3/13/95 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT & TO ADD DEFENDANT [52-1]. ORDER W Hamilton shall submit letter with citations supporting his representation of Defendant Select Leasing Oregon Inc. ORDER for mediation order. (cc: Counsel notified) Court Bob Stimler (former employee)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995 Motion for Leave
                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiffs' FOR LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT & TO ADD DEFENDANT Expedited decision requested (former employee)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of stipulation [47-1] by Plaintiff (former employee)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT & TO ADD DEFENDANT [43-1] by Plaintiff (former employee)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Summons Issued
                                                                                SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Athena Group Inc (former employee)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Description not available
                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [32-1], [3-1] by Plaintiff; adding Athena Group Inc (former employee)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 Order
                                                                                    STIPULATED ORDER for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (see order) Signed 2/28/95 Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh cc: all counsel (former employee)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 2/28/1995 Stipulation
                                                                                      STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (former employee)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995 Description not available
                                                                                        ANSWER by Defendants Select Leasing OR, & Steven M Schneringer to complaint [3-1], [32-1] (gm)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT & TO ADD DEFENDANT [43-1] by Plaintiffs (former employee)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/17/1995, Terminated: 3/13/1995 Motion for Leave
                                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiffs FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT & TO ADD DEFENDANT expedited decision requested (former employee)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 2/9/1995, Entered: 2/10/1995 Order
                                                                                              RECORD OF TIME SET FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING before Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh ORDER Based on parties' advice they have reached a stipulation, Plaintiffs' 1/20/95 motion for preliminary injuction #28 GRANTED . ORDER Defendant Select Leasing's oral motion for a bond DENIED. ORDER status hearing set for 1:30 3/13/95 (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Bob Stimler (former employee)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 2/7/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995 Supplement
                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Plaintiffs in support of MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [28-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 2/6/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                  RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh RESETTING THE TIME ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [28-1] on oral argument calendar of FROM 9:30 AM TO 2:00 2/9/95 (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 1/31/1995, Entered: 2/1/1995 Order
                                                                                                    STIPULATED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh Defendants are enjoined from demanding payment on the lease agreements (see order & minutes order [34-2] for settings 2/9/95 at 9:30 am & details) Signed 1/31/95 (counsel notified) (former employee)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/31/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                      RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY [35-1] attorney Steven Allan Chase for Steven M Schneringer, attorney Steven Allan Chase for Select Leasing OR (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/30/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of memorandum [36-1], MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY Steven Allan Chase AS ATTORNEY [35-1] by Defendant Select Leasing OR, Defendant Steven M Schneringer (former employee)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/30/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendants Select Leasing & Schneringer of MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY Steven Allan Chase AS ATTORNEY [35-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/30/1995, Terminated: 1/30/1995 Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendant Select Leasing OR, Defendant Steven M Schneringer TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY Steven Allan Chase AS ATTORNEY (former employee)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 1/24/1995, Entered: 1/26/1995 Order
                                                                                                              RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS before Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh ORDER SETTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [28-1] on oral argument calendar of 9:30 2/9/95, ORDER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION [25-1] MOOT, ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING ACCELERATED DISCOVERY [22-1], ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY Steven Allan Chase AS ATTORNEY [17-1] ORDER based on stipulation of parties, entering a TRO which will expire by 5:00 pm on 2/10/95 with statutory bond. (parties to submit order) ORDER the scheduling of Plaintiffs' 12/14/95 motion to certify class #4 will be set at time of injunction hearing. ORDER Defendants' response to complaint shall be filed by 2/24/95 (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Bob Stimler (former employee)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of complaint [32-1], affidavit [31-1], affidavit [30-1], memorandum [29-1], MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [28-1], declaration [27-1], memorandum [26-1], MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION [25-1], affidavit [24-1], memorandum [23-1], MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING ACCELERATED DISCOVERY [22-1] by Plaintiff (former employee)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Description not available
                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT [3-1] and JURY TRIAL DEMAND by Plaintiff; adding Jolene Hemmer, Joi Penkava (former employee)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff of Jolene Hemmer MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [28-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff of Joi Penkava MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [28-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Plaintiff of MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [28-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995, Terminated: 1/24/1995 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiffs FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION o/a at expedited hearing requested (former employee)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Declaration
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION by Plaintiff of John Picarazzi re MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION [25-1] o/a requested (former employee)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Plaintiff of MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION [25-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiffs FOR EXPEDITED HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION (former employee)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff of John Picarazzi MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING ACCELERATED DISCOVERY [22-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Plaintiff of MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING ACCELERATED DISCOVERY [22-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Plaintiffs FOR ORDER ALLOWING ACCELERATED DISCOVERY (former employee)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 1/18/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                        RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh SETTING DEFENDANTS'MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY Steven Allan Chase AS ATTORNEY [17-1] on oral argument calendar of 1:30 1/24/95 . Defendants shall personally appear with their counsel (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of affidavit [19-1], memorandum [18-1], MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY Steven Allan Chase AS ATTORNEY [17-1] by Defendant (former employee)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT by Defendant of Steven A. Chase MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY Steven Allan Chase AS ATTORNEY [17-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant of MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY Steven Allan Chase AS ATTORNEY [17-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendants TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY Steven Allan Chase AS ATTORNEY (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/11/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                  RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh GRANTING IN PART Defendants' MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT TO 2/3/95 [11-1]. (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 1/11/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Steven M Schneringer on 12/29/94 (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/11/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Select Leasing OR on 12/29/94 (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by Defendants of Steven A Chase re MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT TO 3/1/95 [11-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendants of MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT TO 3/1/95 [11-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995, Terminated: 1/11/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendants' Select Leasing OR & Steven M Schneringer TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT TO 3/1/95 Expedited ruling requested (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 12/29/1994, Entered: 12/30/1994 Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Discovery Schedule discovery ddl set for 4/28/95 pretrial order deadline set for 5/30/95 (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 12/29/1994, Entered: 12/30/1994 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Steven M Schneringer (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 12/29/1994, Entered: 12/30/1994 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Select Leasing OR (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 12/21/1994, Entered: 12/23/1994 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                    RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS [1-1] GRANTING MOTION [1-2] The complaint shall be served accordingly. The scheduling of plaintiff's motion #4 is held in abeyance until after defendants have been served and appeared. For housekeeping purposes only, SETTING MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS [4-1] on not for oral argument calendar of 5/22/95 (counsel notified) (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/14/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff of John Picarazzi MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS [4-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 12/14/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Plaintiff of MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS [4-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 12/14/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiffs TO CERTIFY CLASS o/a requested (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/14/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT (Cause Code: 15:1640 ) (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/14/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis subject to further review of the court Signed 12/14/94 P. Gale, Deputy Clerk [1-1], [1-2] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/14/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994, Terminated: 12/21/1994 Application for leave to proceed ifp
                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION by Plaintiffs TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?