Stewart v. Bernier, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:95-cv-00449-JE
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Daniel James Stewart, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David D Gallaher +1 541 278 0722

Represented by HEPWORTH JANIS & KLUKSDAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Charles Hepworth +1 208 343 7510 +1 208 342 2927 HLHBoise@aol.com
v.
No Logo Fleetwood Enterprises, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce C. Hamlin +1 503 778 2158 +1 503 778 2200 hamlinb@lanepowell.com

Represented by rickles-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin William Jaqua +1 503 229 1850 +1 503 229 1856 mjaqua@rickles-law.com
No Logo Fleetwood Travel Trailers Of Oregon Inc, Defendant

Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce C. Hamlin +1 503 778 2158 +1 503 778 2200 hamlinb@lanepowell.com

Represented by rickles-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin William Jaqua +1 503 229 1850 +1 503 229 1856 mjaqua@rickles-law.com
No Logo Hayes Axel Incorporated Delaware, Defendant

Represented by Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald J. Clark +1 503 499 4413 +1 503 295 0915 ron.clark@bullivant.com
Space Douglas G. Houser +1 503 228 6351 +1 503 295 0915 doug.houser@bullivant.com
No Logo Hayes Axel Incorporated Nevada, Defendant

Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Turner +1 503 228 3200 +1 503 248 9085 mark.turner@klgates.com
No Logo Robert Guy Bernier, Defendant

Represented by Yturri Rose, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl Burnham, Jr. +1 541 889 5368 +1 541 889 2432 cburnham@yturrirose.com
No Logo Daniel James Stewart, Cross-Defendant

Represented by HEPWORTH JANIS & KLUKSDAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Charles Hepworth +1 208 343 7510 +1 208 342 2927 HLHBoise@aol.com
No Logo Fleetwood Enterprises, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce C. Hamlin +1 503 778 2158 +1 503 778 2200 hamlinb@lanepowell.com

Represented by rickles-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin William Jaqua +1 503 229 1850 +1 503 229 1856 mjaqua@rickles-law.com
No Logo Fleetwood Travel Trailers Of Oregon Inc, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce C. Hamlin +1 503 778 2158 +1 503 778 2200 hamlinb@lanepowell.com

Represented by rickles-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin William Jaqua +1 503 229 1850 +1 503 229 1856 mjaqua@rickles-law.com
No Logo Hayes Axel Incorporated Nevada, Cross-Defendant

Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Turner +1 503 228 3200 +1 503 248 9085 mark.turner@klgates.com
Other Parties
No Logo Fleetwood Travel Trailers Of Oregon Inc, Cross-Claimant

Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce C. Hamlin +1 503 778 2158 +1 503 778 2200 hamlinb@lanepowell.com

Represented by rickles-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin William Jaqua +1 503 229 1850 +1 503 229 1856 mjaqua@rickles-law.com
No Logo Robert Guy Bernier, Cross-Claimant

Represented by Yturri Rose, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl Burnham, Jr. +1 541 889 5368 +1 541 889 2432 cburnham@yturrirose.com
Attributes
Office Portland
Filed 4/10/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $3500000
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Outside State
Terminated 11/26/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status dummy
Flags CONSENT, FRC, TERMINATED
Timeline
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/29/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-98-0081 Location number 723341-723512 Box 44 of 172 (former employee)
LREF
Blank 103 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: 11/26/1997 OrderCourt Filing
JUDGMENT: Based on the record, (the Stipulation [102-1]), IT IS ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice and without ocsts to any party. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed 11/25/97; Microfilmed 11/26/97; Judge John Jelderks (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 102 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION (filed as a "Stipulation") FOR JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL (peg)
LREF
Blank 101 Filed: 9/26/1997, Entered: 9/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks: Based on Plaintiff's lettere of 9/25/97 informing the court this case has settled: ORDER DENYING as MOOT Defendant Bernier's MOTION IN LIMINE [98-1] and MOTION TO ALLOCATE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES [97-1]. ORDER: STRIKING as MOOT the Pretrial Conference which had been set for 10/2/97 and the 8-Jury Trial that had been set to begin on 10/7/97. (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 100 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/24/1997 OrderCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks GRANTING Defendant Hayes Axle's MOTION TO MOVE DATE FOR SUBMISSION OF TRIAL MATERIALS [96-1]; Pretrial submissions due 9/26/97 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 99 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997 Memorandum in Support
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Robert Guy Bernier of MOTION IN LIMINE [98-1] (peg)
LREF
Blank 98 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997, Terminated: 9/26/1997 Motion in Limine
MOTION by Defendant Robert Guy Bernier IN LIMINE (peg)
LREF
Blank 97 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997 Motion
MOTION by Defendant Robert Guy Bernier TO ALLOCATE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES (peg)
LREF
Blank 96 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/19/1997, Terminated: 9/23/1997 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by Defendant Hayes Axel Inc NV TO MOVE DATE FOR SUBMISSION OF TRIAL MATERIALS ; Expedited Consideration Requested. (peg)
LREF
Blank 95 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: 9/18/1997 SchedulingCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks pretrial conference reset to 9:30 10/2/97 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 94 Filed: 9/9/1997, Entered: 9/9/1997 OrderCourt Filing
MODIFIED ORDER RESETTING TRIAL & PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATES by Judge John Jelderks: Pretrial order lodging ddl reset to 9/15/97; Pretrial Conference set for 10:00 a.m.on 9/22/97; Eight (8) day Jury Trial set to begin at 9:00 a.m. on 10/7/97 ; see full 3 page document for details; Signed 9/9/97 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 93 Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: 9/9/1997 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks GRANTING MOTION TO MODIFY ORDER RESETTING TRIAL [88-1] (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 92 Filed: 8/22/1997, Entered: 9/9/1997 OrderCourt Filing
RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge John Jelderks GRANTING IN PART as specified in open court, and DENIED as to attorney fees and sanctions Defendant Bernier's MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND RULE 37 Attorney Fees and Sanctions [80-1]; ORDER - Pretrial documents due 9/19/97 (counsel notified) Court Rptr Ilene TenBrook (tape 1159) (peg)
LREF
Blank 91 Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/19/1997 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks RESETTING Defendant's MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND RULE 37 Attorney Fees and Sanctions [80-1] on oral argument calendar of 9:15 a.m. on 8/22/97 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 90 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Witness statement
RULE 26 EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE filed by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart (peg)
LREF
Blank 89 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of J. Charles Hepworth IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO MODIFY ORDER RESETTING TRIAL [88-1] (peg)
LREF
Blank 88 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997, Terminated: 8/25/1997 Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart TO MODIFY ORDER RESETTING TRIAL (peg)
LREF
Blank 87 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Description not available
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart of Dick Francisco on 8/18/97 (peg)
LREF
Blank 86 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/13/1997 Notice of Substitution of Defense Attorney
SUBSTITUTION of Attorney David D. Gallaher replacing attorney Michael B. Collins for Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart (peg)
LREF
Blank 85 Filed: 8/6/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks - Based on unopposed telephone request of defendant Fleetwood, MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [80-1] is RESET to oral argument calendar of 9:00 a.m. on 8/22/97 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 84 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 7/29/1997 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks SETTING Defendant Bernier's MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND RULE 37 Attorney Fees and Sanctions [80-1] on oral argument calendar of 11:00 a.m. on 8/7/97 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 82 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/23/1997 Memorandum in Opposition
MEMORANDUM by Defendants Fleetwood Enterprises, Inc. and Fleetwood Travel Trailers of Oregon, Inc. IN OPPOSITION to Bernier's MOTION TO COMPEL [80-1] (peg)
LREF
Blank 83 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997 Description not available
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DESIGNATED DEPONENT for Hayes Axle, Inc., a Delaware corporation on 7/25/97 (peg)
LREF
Blank 81 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997 Description not available
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM of designated deponent for Hayes Axle, Inc., Nevada, by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart on 7/25/97 at 9:00 a.m. (peg) Modified on 07/23/1997
LREF
Blank 80 Filed: 7/7/1997, Entered: 7/8/1997 Motion to Compel
MOTION by Defendant Robert Guy Bernier TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND RULE 37 Attorney Fees and Sanctions Against Fleetwood Enterprises, Inc. and Fleetwood Traive Trailers of Oregon ; Oral Argument Requested (peg)
LREF
Blank 79 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997 Description not available
AMENDED NOTICE of taking Deposition Duces Tecum by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart of Bob Prokop on 6/26/97 (peg)
LREF
Blank 78 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/12/1997 Description not available
NOTICE of taking Deposition Duces Tecum of Bob Prokop on 6/26/97; filed by Plaintiff Daniel Stewart (peg)
LREF
Blank 77 Filed: 5/8/1997, Entered: 5/8/1997 Description not available
ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIMS [76-2] of Defendant Robert Guy Bernier by Defendant Hayes Axel, Inc. (a Nevada corporation) (peg)
LREF
Blank 76 Filed: 4/3/1997, Entered: 4/4/1997 Description not available
ANSWER [68-1] AND CROSS CLAIM by Defendant Robert Guy Bernier against Defendant Fleetwood Enterprise, Fleetwood Travel and Hayes Axel Inc (former employee)
LREF
Blank 75 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/20/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER RESETTING TRIAL & PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by Judge John Jelderks Pretrial Conference reset from 6/2/97 to 10:00 am on 9/22/97; 8 day jury trial reset from 6/10/97 to 9:00 am on 10/7/97 in Pendleton (See formal 2-page Order) Signed 3/20/97 (counsel notified) (kw)
LREF
Blank 74 Filed: 3/20/1997, Entered: 3/20/1997 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks GRANTING Defendant Hayes Axel Inc's unopposed MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY, EXTEND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINE & ESTABLISH NEW TRIAL DATE [73-1] Discovery ddl reset for 7/14/97; Pretrial order ddl & exchanging expert submissions reset for 8/14/97; Dispositive motion ddl reset for 7/14/97 (counsel notified) (kw)
LREF
Blank 73 Filed: 3/14/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997, Terminated: 3/20/1997 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
MOTION by Defendant Hayes Axel Inc TO REOPEN DISCOVERY EXTEND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINE & ESTABLISH NEW TRIAL DATE (former employee)
LREF
Blank 72 Filed: 3/14/1997, Entered: 3/17/1997 Description not available
ANSWER & CROSS CLAIM by Defendant Hayes Axel Inc to 3rd original amended complaint [68-1] (former employee)
LREF
Blank 71 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Return of Service Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Hayes Axel Inc, a Nevada corp on 1/16/97 (peg)
LREF
Blank 70 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/7/1997 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Hayes Axel Inc (peg)
LREF
Blank 68 Filed: 12/24/1996, Entered: 12/24/1996 Description not available
ORIGINAL 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT [65-1] and JURY TRIAL DEMAND by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart (former employee)
LREF
Blank 69 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 1/3/1997 Motion HearingCourt Filing
RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge John Jelderks; The Court having been unable to easily coordinate the telephone hearing and finding that a hearing is unnecessary; ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT [64-1] (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 67 Filed: 12/19/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Judge John Jelderks SETTING Plaintiff's MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT [64-1] Telephone argument set for 9:30 12/23/96 (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
LREF
Blank 66 Filed: 12/18/1996, Entered: 12/19/1996 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of J Charles Hepworth IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT [64-1] (peg)
LREF
Blank 65 Filed: 12/18/1996, Entered: 12/19/1996 Amended Complaint
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT and JURY TRIAL DEMAND by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart (filed prior to leave of court being granted) (peg)
LREF
Blank 64 Filed: 12/18/1996, Entered: 12/19/1996, Terminated: 12/23/1996 Motion for Leave
MOTION by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (peg)
LREF
Blank 63 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: 11/19/1996 Description not available
NOTICE of taking deposition by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart of Ray Belford via telephone on 11/19/96 (peg)
LREF
Blank 62 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/7/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER RESETTING TRIAL & PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATES by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks; Pretrial Conference reset to 9:00 AM on 6/2/97; Ten 10 day Jury Trial reset to begin on 6/10/97 at 9:00 AM in Pendleton; Pretrial documents due 5/26/97 Signed 11/6/96 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 61 Filed: 10/23/1996, Entered: 11/4/1996 SchedulingCourt Filing
RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge John Jelderks (Two week) 10 day Jury Trial reset 6/10/97 at 9:00AM in Pendleton (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 60 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/15/1996 Description not available
NOTICE of taking deposition by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart of Rick Ewing on 10/17/96 (peg)
LREF
Blank 59 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/15/1996 Description not available
NOTICE of taking deposition by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart of Tom Ross on 10/16/96 (peg)
LREF
Blank 58 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/7/1996 SchedulingCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks Telephone Status Conference set for 11:00 AM on 10/23/96 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 57 Filed: 9/23/1996, Entered: 9/24/1996 Description not available
ANSWER by Defendant Hayes Axel Inc to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint [47-1] (peg)
LREF
Blank 56 Filed: 9/11/1996, Entered: 9/12/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER RESETTING TRIAL & PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATES. Signed 9/11/96 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. Pretrial Conference reset for 10:00 on 5/12/97. 10-day Jury Trial reset for 9:00 on 5/13/97 in Pendleton . (counsel notified) (gm)
LREF
Blank 55 Filed: 9/11/1996, Entered: 9/11/1996 Return of Service Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Hayes Axel Inc on 9/3/96 (peg)
LREF
Blank 54 Filed: 9/10/1996, Entered: 9/10/1996, Terminated: 9/10/1996 OrderCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks GRANTING Defendant Hayes Axles MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [53-1] Discovery ddl reset to 12/30/96; Pretrial Order lodging due date reset to 1/28/97; Dispositive Motions due 12/30/96; Pretrial documents due 12/30/96; Two week (14) day Jury Trial set for 9:00 AM on 5/13/97 in Pendleton (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 53 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/10/1996, Terminated: 9/10/1996 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
MOTION by Defendant Hayes Axel Inc TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES (with attached affidavit of Ronald J Clark) (peg)
LREF
Blank 52 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/10/1996 Consent to a MagistrateCourt Filing
CONSENT TO Magistrate Judge John Jelderks filed by all parties (peg)
LREF
Blank 51 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Hayes Axel Inc (peg)
LREF
Blank 50 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Fleetwood Travel Trailers of Oregon Inc (peg)
LREF
Blank 49 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Fleetwood Enterprise (peg)
LREF
Blank 48 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Robert Guy Bernier (peg)
LREF
Blank 47 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Description not available
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [22-1], [1-1] and JURY TRIAL DEMAND by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart; adding Hayes Axel Inc as a Defendant (peg)
LREF
Blank 46 Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/7/1996 OrderCourt Filing
RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge John Jelderks GRANTING Plaintiffs MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT [43-1]; the Complaint is due 8/22/96; ORDER GRANTING the UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [41-1]; Discovery ddl reset for 8/30/96; Pretrial Order ddl reset to 9/30/96 ; Responses to plaintiffs request for production and interrogatories are due 8/16/96; Mr Hepworth will send a written Status Report to the court no later than 9/6/96 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 45 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 SchedulingCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks Telephone Status Conference set for 10:00 AM on 8/6/96 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 44 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of J Charles Hepworth IN SUPPORT OF Plaintiffs MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT [43-1] (peg)
LREF
Blank 43 Filed: 7/25/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996, Terminated: 8/6/1996 Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart TO AMEND COMPLAINT (peg)
LREF
Blank 42 Filed: 7/17/1996, Entered: 7/18/1996 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT by Defendants Fleetwood Enterprise, Fleetwood Travel of Martin W Jaqua MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [41-1] (former employee)
LREF
Blank 41 Filed: 7/17/1996, Entered: 7/18/1996 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
MOTION by Defendants Fleetwood Enterprise, Fleetwood Travel TO EXTEND DISCOVERY FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES (former employee)
LREF
Blank 40 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Consent to a MagistrateCourt Filing
CONSENT TO Magistrate Judge John Jelderks by Plaintiff and all Defendants (peg)
LREF
Blank 39 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/28/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks Pretrial Conference set for 10:00 AM on 11/25/96; Eight (8) day Jury Trial set for 9:00 AM on 12/3/96 in Pendleton; Pretrial documents due 11/18/96 Signed 5/24/96 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 38 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/16/1996 SchedulingCourt Filing
RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge John Jelderks Status Conference held on 4/15/96 ; the court is reserving 11/12/96 as the day to begin the 6-8 day Pendleton jury trial; upon notice that all parties have consented to proceed before Magistrate Jelderks for all purposes the court will issue the formal trial scheduling order (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 37 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/4/1996 SchedulingCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks Status conference RESET from 11:00 AM to 10:00 AM on 4/15/96 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 36 Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: 4/3/1996 OrderCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY FILING OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [34-1]; Discovery ddl RESET to 7/30/96; Pretrial Order ddl RESET to 8/29/96 ; Status conference set for 11:00 AM on 4/15/96 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 35 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: 3/29/1996 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT by Fleetwood Enterprise, Fleetwood Travel of Martin W Jaqua MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY FILING OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [34-1] (former employee)
LREF
Blank 34 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: 3/29/1996, Terminated: 4/1/1996 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
MOTION by Fleetwood Enterprise, Fleetwood Travel TO EXTEND DISCOVERY FILING OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES (former employee)
LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: 3/22/1996 Description not available
ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM [29-2] by Defendants Fleetwood Enterprises Inc & Fleetwood Travel Trailers of Oregon (peg)
LREF
Blank 32 Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: 3/5/1996 Description not available
ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM [29-2] by Defendants Fleetwood Enterprises Inc & Fleetwood Travel Trailers of Oregon Inc (peg)
LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996 OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Amended Compalint to 3/21/96 for Defendant Fleetwood Enterprise Signed 2/21/96 Magistrate Judge John Jelderks (counsel notified) (former employee)
LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996 Description not available
ANSWER by Defendant Robert Guy Bernier to amended complaint [22-1] & ANSWER to Cross-Claim [29] (former employee) Modified on 02/22/1996
LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 2/7/1996, Entered: 2/8/1996 Description not available
ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [22-1] AND CROSS CLAIM by Defendant Fleetwood Travel Trailers of Oregon Inc against Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart (peg)
LREF
Blank 28 Filed: 1/31/1996, Entered: 2/1/1996 Return of Service Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Fleetwood Enterprises Inc on 1/18/96 (peg)
LREF
Blank 27 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 Notice of Substitution of Defense Attorney
SUBSTITUTION of Attorney Michael B Collins replacing attorney Douglas E Hojem as attorney for Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart (peg)
LREF
Blank 26 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/19/1996 Return of Service Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Fleetwood Travel on 1/10/96 (peg)
LREF
Blank 25 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/19/1995 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Fleetwood Enterprise (former employee)
LREF
Blank 24 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/19/1995 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Fleetwood Travel (former employee)
LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/19/1995 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Robert Guy Bernier (former employee)
LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/19/1995 Description not available
AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] and JURY TRIAL DEMAND by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart; adding Fleetwood Enterprise, Fleetwood Travel (former employee)
LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/15/1995 Motion HearingCourt Filing
RECORD OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE/MOTION HEARING before Magistrate Judge John Jelderks GRANTING the STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [19-1] discovery ddl set for 4/1/96 pretrial order ddl set for 5/1/96 ORDER Plaintiffs request to file an amended complaint naming additional defendants is GRANTED ORDER Charles Hepworth will request a further status conference after the new defendants have made their initial appearances(cc: Counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks SETTING MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [19-1] for a Telephone Status Conference/Motion Hearing set for 9:00 on 12/15/95 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995, Terminated: 12/15/1995 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
STIPULATED MOTION (filed as a stipulation only) TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES (peg)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Description not available
NOTICE of Taking Video Deposition to Perpetuate Testimony for use at Trial by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart of Valentine Celaya-Miller on 8/14/95 (peg)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995 Notice
NOTICE by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart of taking Deposition Duces Tecum of Robert Guy Bernier (peg)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995 Notice
NOTICE by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart of taking Deposition of Kelly L Bernier (peg)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 7/27/1995 Notice
NOTICE by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart of taking Deposition Duces Tecum of Jack Bannister (peg)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 7/25/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks GRANTING THE STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES [13-1] Discovery ddl set for 12/1/95 Pretrial Order ddl set for 1/2/96 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995, Terminated: 7/25/1995 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
STIPULATION (MOTION) by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart TO EXTEND DEADLINES (gm)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 Notice
NOTIFICATION OF ADDRESS of Attorney Douglas E Hojem by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart (gm)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 7/20/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995 Notice of Substitution of Defense Attorney
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: Attorney Douglas E Hojem replacing Attorney Bernard Jolles for Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart (gm)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 6/5/1995, Entered: 6/7/1995 OrderCourt Filing
RECORD OF RULE 16 CONFERENCE before Magistrate Judge John Jelderks GRANTING MOTION TO CHANGE PLACE OF TRIAL TO PENDLETON [5-1] ORDER Discovery ddl reset for 10/2/95 Pretrial order ddl reset for 11/3/95 (cc: Counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 5/10/1995, Entered: 5/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks SETTING MOTION TO CHANGE PLACE OF TRIAL TO PENDLETON [5-1] and Rule 16 Conference for 11:00 6/5/95 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 5/10/1995, Entered: 5/12/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS John C Hepworth, J Charles Hepworth and Jeffrey J Hepworth TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE [7-1] Signed 5/10/95 (counsel notified) (peg)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 5/9/1995, Entered: 5/12/1995, Terminated: 5/10/1995 Motion
MOTION by Plaintiff Daniel James Stewart FOR ATTORNEYS John C Hepworth, J Charles Hepworth and Jeffrey J Hepworth TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (peg)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 5/8/1995, Entered: 5/10/1995 Description not available
ANSWER by Defendant Robert Guy Bernier to complaint [1-1] (Kirk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 5/1/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995, Terminated: 6/5/1995 Motion to change/transfer venue
MOTION by Defendant Robert Guy Bernier TO CHANGE PLACE OF TRIAL TO PENDLETON (former employee)
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 4/21/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 Return of Service Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Robert Guy Bernier on 4/13/95 (former employee)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995 Summons Issued
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Robert Guy Bernier (former employee)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995 Discovery Order
ORDER Discovery Schedule discovery ddl set for 8/8/95 pretrial order deadline set for 9/7/95 (former employee)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995 Complaint
COMPLAINT and JURY TRIAL DEMAND (Cause Code: 28:1332ct ) ( Receipt # 154876) (former employee)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 100 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?