Millspaugh v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:95-cv-00001-FR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Duane Leonard Millspaugh, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by mcda.us Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Russell Ratto +1 503 234 5253 +1 503 234 8677 russell.ratto@mcda.us
Office Portland
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 510 - Taking - Personalty
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Yamhill
Terminated 7/18/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/27/1998 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-98-0081 Location number 723341-723512 Box 1 of 172 (former employee)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/18/1996, Entered: 7/18/1996 Order
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Honorable Robert E. Jones DEFENDANTS PETITION IS DENIED & THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED See formal 1-page Order; Signed 7/17/96 (kw)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/30/1994, Entered: 1/4/1995 Notice - generic
      REMARK as to Duane Leonard Millspaugh DO NOT FILE OR DOCKET IN THIS CASE! See CR 90-286FR (28:2255 petition) (former employee)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 37 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?