Price v. Taco Bell Corp, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:95-cv-00002-ST

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anne R Price, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tri-Met

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jana Toran +1 503 962 5650 +1 503 962 3095 toranja@tri-met.org
v.
No Logo Taco Bell Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fisher & Phillips LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Corbett Gordon +1 503 242 4262 +1 503 242 4263 cgordon@laborlawyers.com
Office Portland
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $17000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Multnomah
Terminated 11/13/1996
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 9412-08180[Multnomah County]
Def Custody Status
Pending Status dummy
Flags CONSENT, FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (196) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/27/1998 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-98-0081 Location number 723341-723512 Box 1 of 172 (former employee)
    LREF
    Blank 196 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 SchedulingCourt Filing
    RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart Final Paper Call of 11/13/96 & any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT (counsel notified) (gm)
      LREF
      Blank 195 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: 11/13/1996 OrderCourt Filing
      JUDGMENT DISMISSING CASE: It is ORDERED & ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's claims for relief against Defendant are Dismissed With Prejudice & Without Costs or Attorneys' Fees to any party Signed 11/12/96 (microfilmed 11/13/96) by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart (counsel notified) (gm)
        LREF
        Blank 194 Filed: 10/25/1996, Entered: 10/25/1996, Terminated: 10/25/1996 OrderCourt Filing
        RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart Plaintiff's counsel advised the case has settled Pretrial Conference & Jury Trial are STRICKEN AS MOOT ORDER: DENYING AS MOOT all pending motions including: MOTION IN LIMINE #10 [188-1], MOTION TO COMPEL [188-2], MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING [188-3], MOTION IN LIMINE #9 [186-1], MOTION FOR SANCTIONS ON AFTER-ACQUIRED EVIDENCE ISSUE [183-1], MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DISCOVERY ABUSE [172-1], & MOTION IN LIMINE #8 [140-1] Final Paper Call deadline set for 9:00 on 11/13/96 If final papers are filed before that date, counsel need not appear (counsel notified) (gm)
          LREF
          Blank 193 Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996 OrderCourt Filing
          RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart Telephone Conference held 10/22/96 Supplemental Pretrial Conference set for 2:00 on 11/7/96 Defendant's MOTION FOR SANCTIONS ON AFTER-ACQUIRED EVIDENCE ISSUE [183-1] is set on not for oral argument calendar of 11/18/96 (counsel notified) (gm)
            LREF
            Blank 192 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Declaration
            DECLARATION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of Nick Fields IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS [191-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
              LREF
              Blank 191 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Objection
              OBJECTIONS by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESSES [179-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                LREF
                Blank 190 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Witness List
                SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST by Defendant Taco Bell Corp CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                  LREF
                  Blank 189 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Memorandum in Support
                  MEMORANDUM by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #10 [188-1] OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL [188-2], & MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING [188-3] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                    LREF
                    Blank 188 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996, Terminated: 10/25/1996 Motion in Limine
                    MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN LIMINE #10 OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO COMPEL , & FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                      LREF
                      Blank 187 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Memorandum in Support
                      MEMORANDUM by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #9 [186-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                        LREF
                        Blank 186 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996 Motion in Limine
                        MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN LIMINE #9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                          LREF
                          Blank 185 Filed: 10/17/1996, Entered: 10/17/1996 TranscriptCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of PROCEEDINGS 10/8/96 Volume II before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart court reporter: BoJan Johnson (former employee)
                            LREF
                            Blank 184 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/16/1996 Memorandum in Support
                            MEMORANDUM by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS ON AFTER-ACQUIRED EVIDENCE ISSUE [183-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                              LREF
                              Blank 183 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/16/1996 Motion for Sanctions
                              MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp FOR SANCTIONS ON AFTER-ACQUIRED EVIDENCE ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                LREF
                                Blank 182 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/16/1996 Description not available
                                AMENDED ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT [17-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 181 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/16/1996 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                  RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart Telephone Status Conference held 10/15/96 5-day Jury Trial reset for 9:30 on 11/13/96 in Portland Telephone Status Conference set for 9:30 on 10/22/96 (counsel notified) (gm)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 180 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/16/1996 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of 10/7/96 before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart Court Reporter: B Johnson (gm)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 179 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/15/1996 Supplement
                                      SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST to Witness List [150-1] by Plaintiff Anne R Price CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 177 Filed: 10/10/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996 Declaration
                                        DECLARATION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of Kathleen E Cooper-Yoke IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DISCOVERY ABUSE [176-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 176 Filed: 10/10/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996 Response to Motion
                                          RESPONSE by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DISCOVERY ABUSE [172-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 175 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                            RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart Pretrial Conference held on 10/8/96 ORDER: The following exhibits are ADMITTED: Plaintiff's Exhibits # 1-8, 11-14, 15, 17, 18, 20, 22, 23, 37A, & 45-49; Defendant's Exhibits # 103, 105-107, 109-112, 133, 135, 166-169, & 196 ORDER: The following exhibits are REJECTED: Plaintiff's Exhibits # 19, 24-27, 30-36, 40-43, & 52-55; Defendant's Exhibits # 101, 122-125, 129-131, 151-154, 186-188, 196A, & 197A ORDER: The following exhibits are DEFERRED: Plaintiff's Exhibits # 9, 10, 16, 28, 29, 37B, & 44; Defendant's Exhibits # 113, 114, 117, 189, 190, 194, 194A, & 198 The following exhibits have been withdrawn or will be used for demonstrative purposes only: Plaintiff's Exhibits #21, 38, 39, 50, & 51; Defendant's Exhibits # 102, 102A, 120A, 196A, 197, & 197A ORDER: Plaintiff is to prepare a cautionary instruction for the jury as to Plaintiff's Exhibit # 37 ORDER: Plaintiff's objections to Defendant's witnesses are SUSTAINED IN PART & OVERRULED IN PART as follows: SUSTAINED as to Dara Dejbaksh & Molly Weinstein The testimony of Dara Dejbaksh, Harry Stafford & Todd Stafford is DEFERRED until after trial; OVERRULED IN PART as to Jack Davies Doctor Davies may testify only as to what he observed & what Plaintiff told him He is not permitted to testify as to his opinions or any conclusions he may have drawn from his interview with Plaintiff ORDER: Defendant's objections to Plaintiff's witnesses are SUSTAINED IN PART & OVERRULED IN PART as follows: SUSTAINED as to Robin Wisner He may not testify at trial; SUSTAINED as to Brenda Sanders, Duane Pierce, Greg Jackson, Chris Barhyte & Belal Alkhetib Plaintiff is to file more detailed statements of these witnesses' expected testimony by 10/15/96; OVERRULED as to Carol Bridges, Marshall Williams, Ashley Price, Laura Tremaine, Stephen Scherr & Michael Haynes (counsel notified) Court Reporter: B Johnson (gm)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 174 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                              RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart Pretrial Conference held on 10/7/96 Telephone Status Conference set for 9:30 on 10/15/96 The Court will initiate the call Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions due 10/10/96 Amended Answer deadline set for 10/15/96 Plaintiff's MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING OPINIONS ON DISCRIMINATION & ABORTION EVIDENCE [142-1] is GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART as follows: DENIED as to Defendant's introduction of opinion evidence regarding whether or not Plaintiff's race was the reason she was not promoted; GRANTED as to Defendant's introduction of relating to Plaintiff's abortions ORDER: Plaintiff's MOTION TO EXCLUDE AFTER-ACQUIRED EVIDENCE [143-1] is GRANTED Defendant's MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE SUBSTITUTE PAGE [154-1] is GRANTED ORDER: Defendant's MOTION OFFERING PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER TO THE COURT [157-1] is DENIED ORDER: Defendant's MOTION REQUESTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING [162-1] is GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART as follows: GRANTED as to after-acquired evidence, but the hearing is postponed until after trial; DENIED as to Plaintiff's use statistics & introduction of Social Security records ORDER: Defendant's MOTION FOR ORDER REQUESTING THE COURT TO ISSUE TRIAL SUBPOENAS [151-1] is GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART as follows: GRANTED as to compelling Plaintiff to sign a release allowing Defendant to examine certain personnel records; DENIED in all other respects ORDER: DENYING MOTION IN LIMINE #1 [133-1] ORDER: Defendant's MOTION IN LIMINE #2 [134-1] is GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART as follows: GRANTED as to testimony by Randy Leong concerning statements by Julia Stewart & testimony by Robin Wisner; DENIED as to testimony by Randy Leong concerning comments by Joe Ertman ORDER: Defendant's MOTION IN LIMINE #3 [135-1] is DENIED, but the issue of whether Plaintiff's damages should be limited is DEFERRED untill after trial ORDER: Defendant's MOTION IN LIMINE #4 [136-1] is DENIED, but Defendant is directed to prepare a cautionary instruction for the jury ORDER: Defendant's MOTION IN LIMINE #5 [137-1] is DENIED ORDER: Defendant's MOTION IN LIMINE #6 [138-1] is GRANTED except as to evidence of those employees informally promoted prior to 4/94 who were formally promoted thereafter ORDER: Defendant's MOTION IN LIMINE #7 [139-1] is GRANTED ORDER: Defendant's MOTION IN LIMINE #8 [140-1] & Plaintiff's MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DISCOVERY ABUSE [172-1] are DEFERRED ORDER: Witnesses shall be excluded from the courtroom The parties have agreed on a jury panel of 8 persons Pretrial Conference is continued at 1:30 on 10/8/96 in chambers (counsel notified) Court Reporter: B Johnson (gm) Modified on 10/09/1996
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 173 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/7/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Anne R Price IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DISCOVERY ABUSE [172-1] AFFIDAVIT OF JANA TORAN IN SUPPORT CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 172 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/7/1996 Motion for Sanctions
                                                  MOTION by Plaintiff Anne R Price FOR SANCTIONS FOR DISCOVERY ABUSE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 171 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Certificate Of Service.
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Documents [166-1], [167-1], [168-1], [169-1], & [170-1] by Plaintiff Anne R Price (gm)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 170 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Objection
                                                      OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Anne R Price TO DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED VERDICT FORM (gm)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 169 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Objection
                                                        OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Anne R Price TO DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS [130-1] (gm)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 168 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Objection
                                                          OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Anne R Price TO DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST [131-1] (gm)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 167 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Objection
                                                            OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Anne R Price TO DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST [132-1] (gm)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 166 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Objection
                                                              OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Anne R Price TO DEFENDANT'S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS [129-1] (gm)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 165 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Response
                                                                RESPONSE by Plaintiff Anne R Price TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ORDER REQUESTING THE COURT TO ISSUE TRIAL SUBPOENAS [151-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 164 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                  RESPONSE by Plaintiff Anne R Price TO DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE #1 [133-1], #2 [134-1], #3 [135-1], #4 [136-1], #5 [137-1], #6 [138-1], #7 [139-1], & #8 [140-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 163 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN SUPPORT OF MOTION REQUESTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING [162-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 162 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Motion for Hearing
                                                                      MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp REQUESTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 161 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                        RESPONSE by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE REGARDING OPINIONS ON DISCRIMINATION & ABORTION EVIDENCE [142-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 160 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Objection
                                                                          OBJECTIONS by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST [149-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 159 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Objection
                                                                            OBJECTIONS by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST [147-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 158 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Declaration
                                                                              DECLARATION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of Kathleen H Fields IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE SUBSTITUTE PAGE [154-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 157 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Motion
                                                                                MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp OFFERING PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER TO THE COURT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 156 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Objection
                                                                                  OBJECTIONS by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS [144-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 155 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                    RESPONSE by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE AFTER-ACQUIRED EVIDENCE [143-1] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 154 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/3/1996, Terminated: 10/7/1996 Motion for Leave
                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE SUBSTITUTE PAGE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (gm)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 153 Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: 10/2/1996 Declaration
                                                                                        DECLARATION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of Molly A Weinstein re MOTION FOR ORDER REQUESTING THE COURT TO ISSUE TRIAL SUBPOENAS [151-1] (former employee)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 152 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/2/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of MOTION FOR ORDER REQUESTING THE COURT TO ISSUE TRIAL SUBPOENAS [151-1] (former employee)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 151 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/2/1996 Motion for Order
                                                                                            MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp FOR ORDER REQUESTING THE COURT TO ISSUE TRIAL SUBPOENAS (former employee)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 150 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Witness List
                                                                                              AMENDED WITNESS LIST by Plaintiff Anne R Price. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gm)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 149 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Exhibit
                                                                                                AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST by Plaintiff Anne R Price. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gm)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 148 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Proposed Form of Order or Judgment
                                                                                                  PROPOSED VERDICT FORM submitted by Plaintiff Anne R Price. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gm)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 147 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Witness List
                                                                                                    WITNESS LIST by Plaintiff Anne R Price. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gm)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 146 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Exhibit
                                                                                                      EXHIBIT LIST by Plaintiff Anne R Price. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gm)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 145 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Voir Dire Questions
                                                                                                        PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS by Plaintiff Anne R Price. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gm)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 144 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                          REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Plaintiff Anne R Price. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gm)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 143 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996, Terminated: 10/7/1996 Motion
                                                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiff Anne R Price TO EXCLUDE AFTER-ACQUIRED EVIDENCE . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gm)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 142 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996, Terminated: 10/7/1996 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                              MOTIONS by Plaintiff Anne R Price IN LIMINE REGARDING OPINIONS ON DISCRIMINATION & ABORTION EVIDENCE . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gm)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 141 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                TRIAL MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Anne R Price. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gm)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 140 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996, Terminated: 10/25/1996 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN LIMINE #8 (peg)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 139 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996, Terminated: 10/7/1996 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN LIMINE #7 (peg)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 138 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996, Terminated: 10/7/1996 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN LIMINE #6 (peg)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 137 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996, Terminated: 10/7/1996 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN LIMINE #5 (peg)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 136 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996, Terminated: 10/7/1996 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                          MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN LIMINE #4 (peg)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 135 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996, Terminated: 10/7/1996 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN LIMINE #3 (peg)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 134 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996, Terminated: 10/7/1996 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN LIMINE #2 (peg)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 133 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996, Terminated: 10/7/1996 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN LIMINE #1 (peg)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 132 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT LIST by Defendant Taco Bell Corp (peg)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 131 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Witness List
                                                                                                                                    WITNESS LIST by Defendant Taco Bell Corp (peg)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 130 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Voir Dire Questions
                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED VOIR DIRE by Defendant Taco Bell Corp (peg)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 129 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                        REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Defendant Taco Bell Corp (peg)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 128 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                          TRIAL MEMORANDUM by Defendant Taco Bell Corp (peg)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 127 Filed: 9/20/1996, Entered: 9/20/1996 Case Reassignment NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT from Honorable Robert E. Jones to Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (counsel notified) (gm)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 126 Filed: 9/20/1996, Entered: 9/20/1996 Consent to a MagistrateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              FULL CONSENT TO Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart by Plaintiff Anne R Price, & Defendant Taco Bell Corp. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 125 Filed: 9/20/1996, Entered: 9/20/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                JURY TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Signed 9/18/96. (counsel notified) (gm)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 124 Filed: 9/18/1996, Entered: 9/20/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Telephone Conference held 9/17/96 & in person on 9/18/96 . Defendant's MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE [113-1] is GRANTED. Exchange of Expert Disclosure Statements due 9/30/96. Pretrial documents due 9/30/96. Objections to Pretrial Submissions due 10/3/96 . Pretrial Conference set for 1:30 on 10/7/96. 5-day Jury Trial reset for 9:30 on 10/22/96 in Portland . (Alternate Date: If it appears the week before trial that Julia Stewart will be physically unable to testify by the end of October, the trial shall be moved to 11/13/96). Jury Trial Management Order to follow. The parties have consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (counsel notified) (gm)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 123 Filed: 9/18/1996, Entered: 9/19/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones FINDING Defendants MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S OPINION OF 6/21/96 [102-1] ; MOTION CLARIFICATION [102-2] ; MOTION TO CERTIFICATION AN ISSUE OF LAW TO THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS UNDER 28 USC SEC 1292(b) [102-3] MOOT, MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO DEPOSITION JULIA STEWART [108-1] & MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY TO THEIR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE A PERPETUATION DEPOSITION [108-1] [111-1] MOOT CASE REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 122 Filed: 9/13/1996, Entered: 9/17/1996 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      RECORD OF ORDER before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart reassign hearing to Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Telephone Conference set for 3:00 on 9/17/96 before Judge Stewart. The court will initiate the call. (counsel notified) (gm)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 121 Filed: 9/12/1996, Entered: 9/12/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of Kathleen H Fields IN SUPPORT OF MOTION reply [120-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 120 Filed: 9/12/1996, Entered: 9/12/1996 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO Plaintiff's RESPONSE by Defendant Taco Bell Corp re [113-1] MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 119 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/10/1996 Order
                                                                                                                                                            RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E Jones CASE REASSIGNED to Honorable Robert E. Jones for all further proceedings. Court will schedule a status conference to set new trial & pretrial conference dates in approximately 45 days. (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 117 Filed: 9/5/1996, Entered: 9/6/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Plaintiff Anne R Price to Defendants MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE [113-1] (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 118 Filed: 9/3/1996, Entered: 9/6/1996 Case Reassignment NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT from Honorable Robert E. Jones to Honorable James M. Burns All pending motions are transferred to Judge Burns; Jury Trial set for 10/8/96 is STRICKEN from Judge Jones calendar and new dates will be set by Judge Burns (counsel notified) (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 116 Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of Stephanie N McClellan (Physician). CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 8/29/1996, Entered: 8/30/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of Kathleen H Fields IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE [113-1]. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 114 Filed: 8/29/1996, Entered: 8/30/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE [113-1]. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 8/29/1996, Entered: 8/30/1996 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE & REPLY. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Oral Argument Requested. (gm)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 112 Filed: 8/27/1996, Entered: 8/28/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of Kathleen H Fields IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY TO THEIR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE A PERPETUATION DEPOSITION [108-1] [111-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 111 Filed: 8/27/1996, Entered: 8/28/1996 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY TO THEIR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE A PERPETUATION DEPOSITION [108-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 110 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Plaintiff Anne R Price to Defendant's MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE DEPOSITION JULIA STEWART [108-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 109 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/16/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of Julia Stewart IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE DEPOSITION JULIA STEWART [108-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 108 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/16/1996, Terminated: 9/18/1996 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION;CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Taco Bell Corp FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE DEPOSITION JULIA STEWART (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 107 Filed: 8/2/1996, Entered: 8/2/1996 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO Plaintiff's RESPONSE by Defendant Taco Bell Corp re [102-1] MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S OPINION OF 6/21/96, [102-2] MOTION CLARIFICATION, [102-3] MOTION TO CERTIFICATION AN ISSUE OF LAW TO THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS UNDER 28 USC SEC 1292(b) (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 106 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 7/24/1996 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS Of Telephone Conference before Honorable Robert E. Jones Deposition of Mr Long will take place in Judge Jones' chambers. (counsel notified) Court Rptr Kathy Eismann (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 105 Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Plaintiff Anne R Price to Defendant's MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S OPINION OF 6/21/96 [102-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 104 Filed: 7/5/1996, Entered: 7/8/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of Kathleen H Fields MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S OPINION OF 6/21/96 [102-1], MOTION CLARIFICATION [102-2], MOTION TO CERTIFICATION AN ISSUE OF LAW TO THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS UNDER 28 USC SEC 1292(b) [102-3] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 103 Filed: 7/5/1996, Entered: 7/8/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S OPINION OF 6/21/96 [102-1], of MOTION CLARIFICATION [102-2], of MOTION TO CERTIFICATION AN ISSUE OF LAW TO THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS UNDER 28 USC SEC 1292(b) [102-3] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 102 Filed: 7/5/1996, Entered: 7/8/1996 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S OPINION OF 6/21/96 with alternative requests for, CLARIFICATION & TO CERTIFICATION AN ISSUE OF LAW TO THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS UNDER 28 USC SEC 1292(b) Expedited Oral Argument Requested (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 101 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/19/1996, Terminated: 6/19/1996 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                OPINION AND ORDER DENYING Defendants MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1]. ORDER Defendants MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN EVIDENCE IN PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [88-1] & MOTION IN LIMINE EXCLUDING ALL EVIDENCE FROM DISCRIMINATION CHARGE [63-1] are DENIED as MOOT. Signed 6/19/96 by Honorable Robert E. Jones microfilmed & eod 6/19/96 (counsel notified) (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 100 Filed: 6/14/1996, Entered: 6/17/1996 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of PROCEEDINGS HAD 5/13/96 re MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT before Honorable Robert E. Jones court reporter: Katherine Eismann (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 99 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/23/1996 Scheduling
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones Pretrial conference set for 1:30 on 8/12/96; Jury trial reset for 9:00 on 10/8/96 in Portland (counsel notified) (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 98 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS (Hearing) before Honorable Robert E. Jones DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1]; Opinion to follow; Parties are to discuss potential trial dates with Carol Cooper-Skopil (counsel notified) Court Rptr Kathy Eismann (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 5/10/1996 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Anne R Price IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN EVIDENCE IN PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [88-1] (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of 4/5/96 Status Conference before Honorable Robert E. Jones; court reporter: Katherine Eismann (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 95 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones SETTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN EVIDENCE IN PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [88-1] on oral argument calendar of 9:30 on 5/13/96 (counsel notified) (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Susan Dallam (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Joe Ertman RE STORE NO 15503 (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Joe Ertman RE STORE PROFIT REPORTS (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Kathleen Cooper-Yoke (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Corbett Gordon IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TACO BELLS MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN EVIDENCE IN PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [88-1] (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN EVIDENCE IN PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [88-1] (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO STRIKE CERTAIN EVIDENCE IN PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [84-1] (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 4/24/1996, Entered: 4/25/1996 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones RESETTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] on oral argument calendar of 9:30 on 5/13/96 Pretrial conference set for 5/13/96 is stricken from calendar (counsel notified) (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 85 Filed: 4/24/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of 4/5/96 Status Conference before Honorable Robert E. Jones; court reporter: Katherine Eismann (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 84 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/19/1996 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Anne R Price IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] (original memorandum missing pages 7-13) (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Anne R Price IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Plaintiff Anne R Price to DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE EXCLUDING ALL EVIDENCE FROM DISCRIMINATION CHARGE [63-1] (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 4/5/1996, Entered: 4/9/1996 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant, Interrogatory No 2, no later than 4/15/96; Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file supplemental memorandum in opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment relating to matters raised in the interrogatory or its answer Signed 4/5/96 (counsel notified) (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: 3/29/1996 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO Plaintiff's RESPONSE by Defendant Taco Bell Corp re [59-1] MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER INTERROGATORY (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 3/27/1996 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones SETTING Defendant's MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER INTERROGATORY [59-1] on oral argument calendar of 9:00 4/5/96 (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 3/27/1996 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones RESETTING Defendants MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] & MOTION IN LIMINE EXCLUDING ALL EVIDENCE FROM DISCRIMINATION CHARGE [63-1] from the not for oral argument calendar to the oral argument calendar of 4/29/96 at 1:30pm (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 3/22/1996, Entered: 3/22/1996 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones SETTING Defendants MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] & MOTION IN LIMINE EXCLUDING ALL EVIDENCE FROM DISCRIMINATION CHARGE [63-1] on not for oral argument calendar of 4/29/96 (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 3/22/1996, Entered: 3/22/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Plaintiff Anne R Price to Defendant's MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER INTERROGATORY [59-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT by Defendant of Corbett Gordon re MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT by Defendant of Corbett Gordon re MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of Business Records of Taco Bell re MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT by Defendant of Joe Ertman re MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT by Defendant of Susan Dallam re MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT by Defendant of Carl Swinford re MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT by Defendant of Michael Swartz re MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT by Defendant of Business Records re memorandum [45-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS by Defendant Taco Bell Corp in support of MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [65-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996, Terminated: 5/13/1996 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of MOTION IN LIMINE EXCLUDING ALL EVIDENCE FROM DISCRIMINATION CHARGE [63-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996, Terminated: 6/19/1996 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN LIMINE EXCLUDING ALL EVIDENCE FROM DISCRIMINATION CHARGE (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Heidi Earls (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Kathleen H Fields (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER INTERROGATORY [59-1] (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER INTERROGATORY (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 2/28/1996 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ESTABLISHING TRIAL & PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATES & PROCEDURES by Honorable Robert E. Jones Discovery deadline set for 3/20/96; Pretrial order set for 4/29/96; Dispositive motions due 3/20/96; Pretrial conference set for 9:30 on 5/13/96; 5 day jury trial set for 9:00 on 5/28/96 in Portland Signed Deputy Court Clerk (counsel notified) (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones re: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO MENTAL EXAMINATION [49-1] The courts previous minute order dated 2/15/96 granting Defendants motion is modified to clarify that while Plaintiff is required to submit to a mental examination she is not required to submit to any invasive testing or procedures including any procedures involving drugs or hypnosis (counsel notified) (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Jana Toran in support of response [55-1] (Not original signature on document) (kw) Modified on 02/21/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Plaintiff Anne R Price to DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO MENTAL EXAMINATION [49-1] (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT consent to magistrate not given (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/16/1996 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO MENTAL EXAMINATION [49-1] (counsel notified) (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS (Motion Hearing) before Honorable Robert E. Jones GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS [39-1] Plaintiff to sign the authorization for release of employment records & submit to court for in camera review (cc: Counsel notified) (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 2/9/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Corbett Gordon in support of Defendants MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO MENTAL EXAMINATION [49-1] (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 2/9/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO MENTAL EXAMINATION [49-1] (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 2/9/1996, Terminated: 2/15/1996 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp FOR ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO MENTAL EXAMINATION (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 1/31/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Kathleen H Fields (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 1/31/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Defendant Taco Bell Corp IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS [39-1] & [45-1] (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 1/30/1996 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones SETTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS [39-1] on oral argument calendar of 1:30 on 2/8/96 (counsel notified) (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 1/23/1996, Entered: 1/23/1996 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Anne R Price IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS [39-1] (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/17/1996 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones GRANTING PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME [43-1] Discovery ddl set for 2/12/96 Pretrial order ddl set for 4/1/96 , Dispositive motions due 3/12/96 (counsel notified) (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: 1/17/1996, Terminated: 1/16/1996 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by Plaintiff Anne R Price FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 1/12/1996, Entered: 1/16/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Corbett Gordon (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 1/12/1996, Entered: 1/16/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Kathleen H Fields (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 1/12/1996, Entered: 1/16/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS [39-1] (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 1/12/1996, Entered: 1/16/1996 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 1/6/1996, Entered: 1/9/1996 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME [37-1] Discovery ddl reset for 2/12/96 (counsel notified) (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: 1/8/1996, Terminated: 1/6/1996 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiff Anne R Price FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME (kw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 12/28/1995, Entered: 12/28/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing of 6/22/95 before Honorable Robert E. Jones (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones GRANTING Defendant Taco Bell's MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [34-1]. Discovery ddl set for 1/11/96 ; pretrial order ddl set for 2/29/96; Joint Status Report set for 1/11/96 ; dispositive motions due 2/12/96 (counsel notified) Rptr none (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995, Terminated: 8/28/1995 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/8/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER re Discovery materials (for details see file) Signed 8/3/95 (microfilmed 8/8/95) Honorable Robert E. Jones (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [31-1] Discovery ddl set for 11/13/95 Pretrial Order ddl set for 12/15/95 Joint Status Report set for 11/13/95 & Dispositive Motions due 12/13/95 (counsel notified) (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 7/3/1995, Entered: 7/5/1995, Terminated: 7/6/1995 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 6/22/1995, Entered: 6/23/1995 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS before Honorable Robert E. Jones Plaintiffs MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS [19-1] 1) Plaintiffs discovery requests 6-8 are moot 2) Defendant is ORDERED to produce all documents which reflect all age and race discrimination claims, both administrative and judicial which are on-going or settled, from two years prior to the hiring of plaintiff by defendant to the present and within the Mega-West Zone 3) Defendant is ORDERED to produce all documents which reflect the age & race of all managers within the Mega-West Zone 4) Defendant to submit to Judge Jones for IN CAMERA REVIEW all policy & employment manuals distributed from Taco Bell to its employees 5) Defendant shall produce the names addresses & telephone numbers of its employees but this information may not be used by plaintiff to solicit future claims & may not be used by any other person other than plaintiffs attorney for this lawsuit (cc: Counsel notified) Court Rptr Kathy Eismann (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 6/16/1995, Entered: 6/19/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT filed by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of Susan Dallam (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 6/7/1995, Entered: 6/8/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT filed by Plaintiff of Jana Toran IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS [19-1] (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: 6/7/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones GRANTING Plaintiffs MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE an additional affidavit in support of her motion to compel [26-1], RESETTING hearing on Plaintiffs MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS [19-1] on oral argument calendar of 9:00 6/22/95 (counsel notified) (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 6/2/1995, Entered: 6/5/1995, Terminated: 6/6/1995 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Plaintiff Anne R Price FOR LEAVE TO FILE an additional affidavit in support of her motion to compel (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 5/26/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Corbett Gordon In Support of Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Documents[23-1] (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 5/26/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Susan Dallam in Support of Defendants response to Plaintiffs MOTION to Compel Documents[23-1] (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 5/26/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Defendant Taco Bell Corp to Plaintiffs [19-1] MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 5/17/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Plaintiff Anne R Price of MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS [19-1] (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 5/16/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones SETTING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS [19-1] on not for oral argument calendar of 6/6/95 (counsel notified) (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 5/16/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Plaintiff Anne R Price of MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS [19-1] (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 5/16/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiff Anne R Price TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 4/26/1995, Entered: 4/27/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY deadlines; [15-1] Discovery ddl set for 8/1/95; Pretrial order ddl set for 10/2/95 Joint status report to be filed by 8/31/95; Dispositive motions to be filed by 8/31/95 (counsel notified) (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Defendant Taco Bell Corp to Amended Complaint [14-1] (peg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 4/20/1995, Entered: 4/21/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp of Corbett Gordon in support of STIPULATED MOTION OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO EXTEND DISCOVERY deadlines; extend the deadline file dispositive motions; reset the deadline for joint status report and reset PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [15-1] (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 4/20/1995, Entered: 4/21/1995, Terminated: 4/26/1995 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATED MOTION OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO EXTEND DEADLINES filed by Defendant Taco Bell Corp TO EXTEND DISCOVERY deadlines; extend the deadline to file dispositive motions; reset the deadline for joint status report and reset PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 4/11/1995, Entered: 4/11/1995 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and JURY TRIAL DEMAND by Plaintiff Anne Price terminating Defendant Julia Ann Stewart (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 3/31/1995, Entered: 4/3/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER Defendants Rule 21 MOTION TO DISMISS [4-1] Plaintiff's first, third & fifth claims is GRANTED. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend her complaint to allege the jurisdictional prerequisites for her first & third claims. Signed 3/31/95 by Honorable Robert E. Jones microfilmed 4/3/95 (counsel notified) (former employee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/8/1995, Terminated: 3/8/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST, THIRD AND FIFTH CLAIMS [4-1] Plaintiff is granted leave to amend her complaint to allege the jurisdictional prerequisites for her first and third claims. Signed 3/8/95 by Honorable Robert E. Jones microfilmed 3/8/95 (counsel notified) (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones FINDING the MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO 3/13/95 [9-1] MOOT (counsel notified) (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp, Defendant Julia Ann Stewart of Corbett Gordon (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995, Terminated: 3/1/1995 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp, Defendant Julia Ann Stewart TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO 3/13/95 (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/31/1995 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RULE 12 MOTIONS by Defendant Taco Bell Corp, Defendant Julia Ann Stewart re memorandum [7-1] (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Anne R Price in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS [4-1] Oral argument requested (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECORD OF ORDER by Judge Robert E. Jones SETTING MOTION TO DISMISS [4-1] on oral argument calendar of 2:00 3/13/95 (counsel notified) (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Taco Bell Corp, Defendant Julia Ann Stewart of MOTION TO DISMISS [4-1] (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995, Terminated: 3/8/1995 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendant Taco Bell Corp, Defendant Julia Ann Stewart TO DISMISS Oral Argument Requested (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DISCOVERY ORDER AND ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT discovery ddl set for 5/3/95 Joint status report due 5/4/95 pretrial order deadline set for 6/2/95 (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF REMOVAL by Defendant Taco Bell Corp, Defendant Julia Ann Stewart ( Cause of Action: 28:1441ed ) from Multnomah County Circuit Court Receipt # 152953 (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Taco Bell Corp, Defendant Julia Ann Stewart ( Cause of Action: 28:1441ed ) from Multnomah County Circuit Court Receipt # 152953 (kb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?