Graham v. Action Products Intl, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:95-cv-00003-MA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Harrell Guy Graham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kohel M. Haver +1 503 295 2787 +1 503 295 2737 artcop@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by naylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cyrus W Field, IV +1 503 777 5473 cyrus@naylaw.com
v.
No Logo Action Products International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lachenmeier Enloe Rall & Heinson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay D Enloe +1 503 768 9600
Space Timothy J. Heinson +1 503 768 9600 +1 503 768 9133 tim@lerlaw.com
No Logo Ronald Kaplan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lachenmeier Enloe Rall & Heinson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay D Enloe +1 503 768 9600
Space Timothy J. Heinson +1 503 768 9600 +1 503 768 9133 tim@lerlaw.com
Office Portland
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Cause Section 17 U.S.C. § 101 Copyright Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Multnomah
Terminated 5/22/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/27/1998 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-98-0081 Location number 723341-723512 Box 2 of 172 (former employee)
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 5/22/1995, Entered: 5/26/1995 Order
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh GRANTING stipulated MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE & WITHOUT COSTS TO EITHER PARTY [13-1] Signed 5/22/95 (counsel notified) (former employee)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/26/1995, Terminated: 5/22/1995 Motion to Dismiss
      STIPULATED MOTION by Parties TO DISMISS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE & WITHOUT COSTS TO EITHER PARTY (former employee)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/22/1995 Order
        RECORD OF ORDER CASE SETTLEMENT by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh ORDER-STRIKING the 5/26/95 Rule 16 Conference. All pending motions are moot. See order of dismissal which follows by mail (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 5/3/1995, Entered: 5/4/1995 Court Trial - Begun
          RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh SETTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE [10-1] on oral argument calendar of 9:30 5/26/95 (the same time as the Rule 16 Conference) (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 5/1/1995 Motion to change/transfer venue
            MOTION by Defendant Action Products Intl TO CHANGE VENUE TO DISTRICT IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA Oral Argument Requested (cpriestley)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Order
              RULE 16 ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh re minute order [8-2] (see file). Signed 4/26/95 (counsel notified) (former employee)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995, Terminated: 4/25/1995 Order
                RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER TO 4/28/95 [6-1] Answer deadline reset to 4/28/95 for Ronald Kaplan, for Action Products Intl, GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [6-2] discovery ddl set for 6/27/95 pretrial order ddl set for 7/27/95 Rule 16 Conference set for 9:30 5/26/95 (counsel notified) (cpriestley)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Affidavit
                  AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff of Kohel M. Haver MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER TO 4/28/95 [6-1], MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [6-2] (former employee)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995, Terminated: 4/25/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
                    JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER TO 4/28/95 , TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES expedited consideration requested (former employee)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 3/14/1995, Entered: 3/16/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                      RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER TO 3/20/95 [4-1] Answer deadline reset to 3/20/95 for Ronald Kaplan, for Action Products Intl (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995, Terminated: 3/14/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
                        MOTION by Defendants TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER TO 3/20/95 (former employee)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/14/1995, Entered: 2/14/1995 Waiver of Service Summons
                          WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Defendant Ronald Kaplan on 2/6/95 (former employee)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Discovery Order
                            ORDER Discovery Schedule discovery ddl set for 5/3/95 pretrial order deadline set for 6/2/95 (former employee)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT and JURY TRIAL DEMAND (Cause Code: 17:0101 ) ( Receipt # 152955) (former employee)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?