Wood v. Georgia-Pacific Corp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:95-cv-00004-AS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo George Wood, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick L Kubin +1 206 423 5220
v.
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy R. Alpern +1 503 221 0309 +1 503 242 2457 aalpern@littler.com
Space Howard Rubin +1 503 221 0309 +1 503 242 2457 hrubin@littler.com
Office Portland
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Outside State
Terminated 9/14/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/27/1998 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-98-0081 Location number 723341-723512 Box 2 of 172 (former employee)
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
    STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice & without costs or attorneys fees to any party. Signed 9/14/95 Magistrate Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas (counsel notified) (former employee)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/20/1995 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
      RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas GRANTING parties stipulated MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT [19-1] (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 7/18/1995, Entered: 7/18/1995 Description not available
        2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT [9-1] and JURY TRIAL DEMAND by Plaintiff George Wood (former employee)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 7/18/1995, Entered: 7/18/1995, Terminated: 7/19/1995 Motion to Amend/Correct
          STIPULATED MOTION by Plaintiff George Wood TO AMEND COMPLAINT (former employee)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 6/2/1995, Entered: 6/7/1995 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
            RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas GRANTING parties stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [17-1]. Discovery ddl set for 9/5/95 & pretrial order ddl set for 10/3/95 (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/6/1995, Terminated: 6/2/1995 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
              STIPULATED MOTION by Plaintiff TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES (former employee)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 5/3/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                STIPULATED FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER re confidential documents (see file) Signed 5/1/95 Magistrate Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas (former employee)
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 5/3/1995 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                  RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas GRANTING Defendants MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [13-1]. Discovery ddl set for 7/5/95 & pretrial order ddl set for 8/3/95 (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 5/1/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 Affidavit
                    AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Georgia Pacific Corp of Amy R Alpern re MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES [13-1] (former employee)
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 5/1/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995, Terminated: 5/2/1995 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                      MOTION by Defendant Georgia Pacific Corp TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES (former employee)
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/5/1995 Description not available
                        ANSWER by Defendant Georgia Pacific Corp to amended complaint [9-1] (former employee)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995 Certificate Of Service.
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of complaint [9-1] by Plaintiff George Wood (former employee)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 3/23/1995, Entered: 3/23/1995 Description not available
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] and JURY TRIAL DEMAND by Plaintiff George Wood (former employee)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 3/20/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                              RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas STRIKING Defendants MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR WRONGFUL DISCHARGE BECAUSE IT FAILS TO STATE A CLAIM [5-1] & MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGATION OF PERSONAL INJURY OR GENERAL DAMAGES IN CONJUNCTION WITH HIS AGE DISCRIMINATION CLAIM UNDER THE AGE DISCRIMINATION IN EMPLOYMENT ACT [5-2] from the 3/20/95 calendar as said MOTION has been WITHDRAWN by Defense counsel.(counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/10/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                                RECORD OF ORDER by MAGISTRATE JUDGE Donald C. Ashmanskas RESETTING Defendants MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR WRONGFUL DISCHARGE BECAUSE IT FAILS TO STATE A CLAIM [5-1] & MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGATION OF PERSONAL INJURY OR GENERAL IN CONJUNCTION WITH HIS AGE DISCRIMINATION CLAIM UNDER THE AGE DISCRIMINATION IN EMPLOYMENT ACT [5-2] to the oral argument calendar of 9:00 3/20/95 (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/2/1995 Court Trial - Begun
                                  RECORD OF ORDER by MAGISTRATE JUDGE Donald C. Ashmanskas SETTING Defendants MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR WRONGFUL DISCHARGE BECAUSE IT FAILS TO STATE A CLAIM [5-1] & MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGATION OF PERSONAL INJURY OR GENERAL IN CONJUNCTION WITH HIS AGE DISCRIMINATION CLAIM UNDER THE AGE DISCRIMINATION IN EMPLOYMENT ACT [5-2] on oral argument calendar of 9:00 3/13/95 (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/30/1995 Memorandum in Support
                                    MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Georgia Pacific Corp re MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR WRONGFUL DISCHARGE BECAUSE IT FAILS TO STATE A CLAIM [5-1] & of MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGATION OF PERSONAL INJURY OR GENERAL DAMAGES IN CONJUNCTION WITH HIS AGE DISCRIMINATION CLAIM UNDER THE AGE DISCRIMINATION IN EMPLOYMENT ACT [5-2] (former employee)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/30/1995, Terminated: 3/20/1995 Motion to Dismiss
                                      MOTION by Defendant Georgia Pacific Corp TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR WRONGFUL DISCHARGE BECAUSE IT FAILS TO STATE A CLAIM , and TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S ALLEGATION OF PERSONAL INJURY OR GENERAL DAMAGES IN CONJUNCTION WITH HIS AGE DISCRIMINATION CLAIM UNDER THE AGE DISCRIMINATION IN EMPLOYMENT ACT Oral Argument Requested (former employee)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/19/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 Return of Service Executed
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Georgia Pacific Corp on 1/10/95 (former employee)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Summons Issued
                                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Georgia-Pacific Corp (former employee)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Discovery Order
                                            ORDER Discovery Schedule discovery ddl set for 5/3/95; pretrial order deadline set for 6/2/95 (former employee)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT and JURY TRIAL DEMAND Employment age discrimination (Cause Code: 42:2000e) (Receipt # 152957) (former employee)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?