Floyd v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:95-cv-00005-MA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William Patrick Floyd, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Office Portland
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 510 - Taking - Personalty
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Polk
Terminated 12/1/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CR-92-209-MA[US District Court OR]
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/27/1998 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-98-0081 Location number 723341-723512 Box 2 of 172 (former employee)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/6/1995 Order
    ORDER The remainder of defendant's petition to vacate his conviction pursuant to 28 USC 2255 is DENIED. SO ORDERED by Honorable Malcolm F. Marsh Signed 12/4/95 (counsel notified)(former employee) Modified on 12/06/1995
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Order
      ORDER - Floyd's petition to vacate his conviction pursuant to 28 USC Sec 2255 is DENIED. by Honorable Robert E. Jones Signed 11/30/95 (counsel notified) (former employee)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/4/1995 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255
        MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE all original documents are filed in criminal case CR-92-209-MA (former employee)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 34 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?