Lester, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:95-cv-01455-JO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chuck Lester, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William P Koontz +1 541 942 2984
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara Ann Johnson +1 619 448 3673

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristine Olson +1 503 727 1001 +1 503 727 1091 kris.olson@usdoj.gov
Office Portland
Filed 9/18/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $22000
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
Cause Section 26 U.S.C. § 7422 IRS
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Lane
Terminated 11/25/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case :97- -35041[C/A 12/24/96]
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-01-0081 Location number 3010015-3010129 Box 42 of 58 (tomg)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
    CLERK'S RECORD on appeal (one original volume) returned from US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit regarding appeal CA 97-35041 [29-1] (tomg)
      LREF
      Blank 34 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998 Mandate
      MANDATE/JUDGMENT from USCA AFFIRMING the decision of the District Court re appeal filed 12/24/96 [29-1] CA97-35041 (former employee)
        LREF
        Blank 33 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997 Letter
        LETTER to Court from C/A showing that they received the record on appeal on 7/15/97 (former employee)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: 7/14/1997 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
          CLERK'S RECORD on appeal(one original volume) transmitted to US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit regarding [29-1] C/A#97-35041 (cpriestley)
            LREF
            Blank 32 Filed: 3/21/1997, Entered: 3/21/1997 Certificate of Record by Clerk to USCA
            CERTIFICATE OF RECORD transmitted to US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit [29-1]re appeal C/A# 97-35041 filed by Chuck Lester (cpriestley)
              LREF
              Blank 31 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997 USCA Order
              CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER from the US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit re appeal filed 12/24/96 [29-1] CA97-35041 Appellant 7 days from the date of this Order to file the civil appeals docketing statement for this appeal (former employee)
                LREF
                Blank 30 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997 USCA Docket Number
                NOTIFICATION by US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit of Docket Number 97-35041 by Plaintiff regarding appeal filed 12/24/96 [29-1] (former employee)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/30/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Notification of Appeal Sent
                  NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL mailed to Court of Appeals For the Ninth Circuit and to counsel along with copy of appealed document and docket sheet. (cpriestley)
                    LREF
                    Blank 29 Filed: 12/24/1996, Entered: 12/24/1996, Terminated: 5/1/1998 Notice of Appeal
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to Court of Appeals by Plaintiff Chuck Lester from judgment entered 11/25/96 [27-2] Receipt # 163677 (former employee)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 12/24/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Fee Paid
                      RECEIVED APPEAL fee from Chuck Lester in amount of $ 105.00 ( Receipt # 163677) (cpriestley)
                        LREF
                        Blank 28 Filed: 11/29/1996, Entered: 12/2/1996 Court Trial - Begun
                        RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones all pending MOTIONS are MOOT. (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                          LREF
                          Blank 27 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996 Judgment*
                          JUDGMENT this action is DISMISSED. Signed 11/25/96 microfilmed & eod 11/25/96 Honorable Robert E. Jones (counsel notified) (former employee)
                            LREF
                            Blank 26 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996, Terminated: 11/25/1996 Order
                            OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING Defendant USA'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION [16-1] Signed 11/25/96 by Honorable Robert E. Jones microfilmed & eod 11/25/96 (counsel notified) (former employee)
                              LREF
                              Blank 25 Filed: 11/21/1996, Entered: 11/21/1996, Terminated: 11/25/1996 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                              MOTION by Plaintiff Chuck Lester TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PRETRIAL ORDER & JOINT STATUS REPORT (former employee)
                                LREF
                                Blank 24 Filed: 9/25/1996, Entered: 9/25/1996 Certificate Of Service.
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MOTION reply [23-1] by Defendant USA (former employee)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 9/25/1996, Entered: 9/25/1996 reply to motion
                                  REPLY TO Plaintiff's RESPONSE by Defendant USA re [16-1] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION, [16-2] MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (submitted as a response to Plaintiff's opposition) (former employee)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 22 Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 Certificate Of Service.
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Document [21-1] by Plaintiff Chuck Lester. (gm)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/3/1996 reply to motion
                                      REPLY by Plaintiff Chuck Lester TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION [16-1] or alternative MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [16-2]. (gm)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 20 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996 Court Trial - Begun
                                        RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones SETTING Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION [16-1] on not for oral argument calendar of 10/4/96 (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 19 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Certificate Of Service.
                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of declaration [18-1], memorandum [17-1], MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION [16-1], MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [16-2] by Defendant USA (former employee)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 18 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Declaration
                                            DECLARATION by Defendant USA of Barbara A Johnson re MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION [16-1], re MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [16-2] (former employee)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                              MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant USA of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION [16-1], of MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [16-2] (former employee)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: 8/20/1996, Terminated: 11/25/1996 Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION by Defendant USA TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION , or in the alternative FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (former employee)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/9/1996 Order
                                                  RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones GRANTING Plaintiff's MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY TO 10/25/96 [13-1] Discovery ddl set for 10/25/96; pretrial order ddl set for 11/25/96 & Joint status report to be filed by 10/25/96 (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/8/1996 Affidavit
                                                    AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Chuck Lester of William P Koontz MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY TO 10/25/96 [13-1] (former employee)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/8/1996, Terminated: 7/8/1996 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                      MOTION by Plaintiff Chuck Lester TO EXTEND DISCOVERY TO 10/25/96 (former employee)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 7/1/1996 Return of Service Executed
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant USA-thru Jeff Wong Dist Counsel IRS on 6/25/96 (former employee)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 7/1/1996 Return of Service Executed
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant USA thru Kristine Olson-US Attorney on 6/25/96 (former employee)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Summons Issued
                                                            SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant USA thru US Attorney (former employee)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Summons Issued
                                                              SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant USA thru Jeff Wong (Dist Counsel IRS) (former employee)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/6/1996 Summons Issued
                                                                SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant USA thru Janet Reno (former employee)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996 Court Trial - Begun
                                                                  RECORD OF ORDER by Honorable Robert E. Jones Plaintiff has until 6/30/96 in which to serve Defendant [4- 1 & 2] (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 Affidavit
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Chuck Lester of William P Koontz in support of its Response & MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING PROCESS IN THIS CASE TO BE REISSUED [4-1], MOTION TO EXTEND TIME AN ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS TO EFFECT SERVICE [4-2] (former employee)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 Memorandum in Support
                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Plaintiff Chuck Lester of MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING PROCESS IN THIS CASE TO BE REISSUED [4-1], of MOTION TO EXTEND TIME AN ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS TO EFFECT SERVICE [4-2] (former employee)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/28/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 Motion for Order
                                                                        RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE & MOTION by Plaintiff Chuck Lester FOR ORDER ALLOWING PROCESS IN THIS CASE TO BE REISSUED , and TO EXTEND TIME AN ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS TO EFFECT SERVICE (former employee)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/9/1996 Order to Show Cause
                                                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until 5/28/96 to file the Joint Status Report or show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed for want of prosecution for failure to comply with the previous order; signed 5/8/96 Honorable Robert E. Jones (counsel notified) (kw)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995 Discovery Order
                                                                            DISCOVERY ORDER AND ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT discovery ddl set for 1/16/96 Joint status report due 1/17/96 pretrial order deadline set for 2/15/96 (kw)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT (Cause Code: 26:7422rt ) ( Receipt # 156833) (kw)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?