Tektronix Inc v. Autodesk Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:96-cv-01523-AS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 6:38 AM EST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Tektronix Inc., Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Tut Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Inet Technologies, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank A DeCosta, III +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 frank.decosta@finnegan.com
Space John M. Romary +1 202 408 4010 +1 202 408 4400 john.romary@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RANDOLPH C. FOSTER +1 503 294 9453 +1 503 220 2480 rcfoster@stoel.com
Autodesk Autodesk, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Autodesk Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julianne Ross Davis +1 503 671 6255 +1 503 671 5777
v.
Autodesk Autodesk, Defendant
Officially listed as "Autodesk Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julianne Ross Davis +1 503 671 6255 +1 503 671 5777

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

No Logo Tektronix Inc., Counter-Defendant
Officer/Director, Tut Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Inet Technologies, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank A DeCosta, III +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 frank.decosta@finnegan.com
Space John M. Romary +1 202 408 4010 +1 202 408 4400 john.romary@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RANDOLPH C. FOSTER +1 503 294 9453 +1 503 220 2480 rcfoster@stoel.com
Office Portland
Filed 10/24/1996
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Clackamas
Terminated 6/20/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status dummy
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999 Federal Records Center Information
CASE FILE SENT TO THE FRC Accession number 21-99-0012 Location number 03045521-03045771 Box 105 of 126 (former employee)
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/20/1997 OrderCourt Filing
    STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice & without costs or attorney fees to any party Signed 6/16/97 Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas (counsel notified) (former employee)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 6/16/1997, Entered: 6/17/1997 SchedulingCourt Filing
      RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS Of Time Set For Final Paper Call before Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas Stipulated dismissal with prejudice submitted & signed today (counsel notified) Court Rptr Kathy Eisman (former employee)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 6/1/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997 SchedulingCourt Filing
        RECORD OF ORDER by Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas GRANTING counsel's lette request to the Court dated 5/30/97 to STRIKE the final paper call set for 6/2/97 & RESET to 6/16/97 at 9am (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 4/25/1997, Entered: 4/29/1997 SchedulingCourt Filing
          RECORD OF ORDER by Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas STRIKING Rule 16 conference set for 4/30/97 in light of the report that counsel are in SETTLEMENT negotiations. ORDER setting final paper call for 9:00am on 6/2/97 (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997 SchedulingCourt Filing
            RECORD OF ORDER by Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas RESETTING Rule 16 Conference to 4/30/97 at 10:15am (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Application for special admission pro hac viceCourt Filing
              APPLICATION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by attorney FRANK A. DECOSTA, III; Local Counsel: RANDOLPH C FOSTER representing Plaintiff Tektronix Inc ; Fee paid, receipt # 164400; Approved 3/3/97 by Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas (former employee)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Application for special admission pro hac viceCourt Filing
                APPLICATION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by attorney JOHN M ROMARY; Local Counsel: RANDOLPH C FOSTER representing Plaintiff Tektronix Inc ; Fee paid, receipt # 164400; Approved 3/7/97 by Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas (former employee)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/27/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                  RECORD OF ORDER by Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas GRANTING parties stipulated MOTION FOR SUSPENSION OF DISCOVERY CUTOFF & DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE [13-1] until the 3/19/97 Rule 16 Conference at 10am (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: 2/21/1997, Terminated: 2/25/1997 Motion
                    STIPULATED MOTION by Parties FOR SUSPENSION OF DISCOVERY CUTOFF & DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE (former employee)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/29/1997 Description not available
                      ANSWER TO Defendants COUNTER-CLAIM [5-3] by Plaintiff Tektronix Inc (former employee)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 1/25/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997 Court Trial - BegunCourt Filing
                        RECORD OF ORDER by Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas GRANTING Defendants' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY DAVID M BARKAN & ROGER S BOROVOY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE [8-1] (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/23/1997 Declaration
                          DECLARATION by Defendant Autodesk Inc of David M Barkan re MOTION FOR ATTORNEY DAVID M BARKAN & ROGER S BOROVOY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE [8-1] (former employee)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/23/1997 Declaration
                            DECLARATION by Defendant Autodesk Inc of Roger S Borovoy re MOTION FOR ATTORNEY DAVID M BARKAN & ROGER S BOROVOY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE [8-1] (former employee)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: 1/23/1997, Terminated: 1/25/1997 Motion
                              MOTION by Defendant Autodesk Inc FOR ATTORNEY DAVID M BARKAN & ROGER S BOROVOY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (former employee)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: 1/21/1997 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                RECORD OF ORDER by Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas RESETTING Rule 16 Conference to 10:00am on 3/19/97 (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/12/1997, Entered: 1/13/1997 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                  RECORD OF ORDER by Judge Donald C. Ashmanskas SETTING Rule 16 Conference for 10:45am on 3/4/97 (counsel notified) Court Rptr none (former employee)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 Description not available
                                    ANSWER and JURY TRIAL DEMAND [1-1] and COUNTER-CLAIM by Defendant Autodesk Inc against Plaintiff Tektronix Inc (former employee)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996 Return of Service Executed
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED upon Defendant Autodesk Inc on 12/23/96 (former employee)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996 Summons Issued
                                        SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Autodesk Inc (former employee)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/24/1996 Discovery Order
                                          ORDER: Discovery Schedule Discovery deadline set for 2/21/97 Pretrial Order deadline set for 3/24/97 (gm)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/24/1996 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT & JURY TRIAL DEMAND (Cause Code: 28:1331 - Federal Question: Patent Infringement) (Receipt # 163039) (gm)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 138 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?