USA v. Christensen
Criminal Case Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:98-cr-00197-RE

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent S. Robinson +1 503 727 1019 +1 503 727 1117 kent.robinson@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Portland
Filed 4/22/1998
County Multnomah
Terminated 10/30/2000
Reopened
Other Court Case :00- -30400 C/A 12/14/00
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 OrderCourt Filing
Order Continuing and Modifying Supervised Release Term as to Derek Wayne Christensen by Judge James A. Redden signed on 6/15/06. (schman, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 108 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006 Supervised Release - Final Revocation HrgCourt Filing
    Minutes of Proceedings:Supervised Release Final Violation Hearing before Judge James A. Redden as to Derek Wayne Christensen. The defendant admits he has violated conditions of supervised release. It is the finding of the court that the defendant has violated the terms of his supervised released by committing the state crime of Assault IV. The court finds the defendant is suitable for continued community supervision. It is ordered the defendant's term of supervised release is continued, subject to the previously imposed standard and special conditions and the following added special conditions: defendant shall participate in a mental health treatment program to include anger management, as directed by the probation officer; the defendant shall have no contact with Adam Archambault, in person, by telephone, through correspondence or third party. All other aspects of the original judgment shall remain in full force and effect. U.S. Probation to prepare the appropriate order. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Kent Robinson.Counsel Present for Defendant: Renee Maness.(Court Reporter Dennis Grube) (lg, )
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Violation Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
      Supervised Release Violation Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/31/06 as to Derek Wayne Christensen. (schman, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
        Order Setting Conditions of Release as to Defendant Derek Wayne Christensen by Judge Dennis J. Hubel signed on 5/31/06. (jlr, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Initial Appearance - Revocation ProceedingsCourt Filing
          Minutes of Proceedings:Initial Appearance regarding Revocation of Supervised Release before Judge Dennis J. Hubel as to Derek Wayne Christensen. Order appointing counsel. Defendant advised of rights and waived preliminary hearing. Order RELEASED on conditions. Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release is set for 6/13/2006 at 01:30PM before Judge James A. Redden.Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Amy Potter.Counsel Present for Defendant: Rene Manes.(Tape #KB/FTR) (jlr, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Petition for Probation/Supervised Release Action/MCourt Filing
            Petition and Order for Modification of Conditions of Supervised Release as to Defendant Derek Wayne Christensen by Judge James A. Redden signed on 2/28/06. (schman, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER Denying [98] Motion for Modification of Restitution as to Derek Wayne Christensen (1) by Judge James A. Redden signed on 2/3/05. (schman, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 Response(generic)
                Defendant's Reply to the Government's Response to the Defendant's Motion for Modification of Restitution Order by Derek Wayne Christensen (schman, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Response to Motion
                  Response to Motion by USA as to Derek Wayne Christensen regarding Motion Modification of Restitution Order[98] filed by Derek Wayne Christensen, (schman, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/30/2004, Terminated: 2/4/2005 Motion for Order
                    Motion for Modification of Restitution Order (in relation to Case No. CR 00-137-RE) filed by pro se Defendant Derek Wayne Christensen. (kw, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/30/2004 Notice - generic
                      Notice of Motion to Motion for Modification of Restitution Order (in relation to Case No. CR 00-173-RE) filed by pro se Defendant Derek Wayne Christensen. (kw, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 160 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?