USA v. West, et al
Criminal Case Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:01-cr-60097-AA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank R. Papagni, Jr. +1 541 465 6771 +1 541 465 6582 frank.papagni@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Eugene
Filed 9/20/2001
County Lane
Terminated 4/9/2003
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18371 and 871 - CONSPIRACY TO CAUSE TO BE DEPOSITED FOR CONVEYANCE IN THE MAIL A THREAT AGAINST PRESIDENT
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18371 and 871 - CONSPIRACY TO CAUSE TO BE DEPOSITED FOR CONVEYANCE IN THE MAIL A THREAT AGAINST PRESIDENT
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18871 - THREAT AGAINST PRESIDENT
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18871 - THREAT AGAINST PRESIDENT
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 876.F
Offense Level 4
18876 - MAILING THREATENING COMMUNICATIONS
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 876.F
Offense Level 4
18876 - MAILING THREATENING COMMUNICATIONS
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 128 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: Defendant's motion to dismiss special assessment fee [127] is denied as moot. As defendant states, his obligation to pay the $300.00 assessment fee expired by statute on April 7, 2008. 18 U.S.C. 3013(c). Therefore, defendant is not liable for the special assessment, it cannot be collected from him, and there is no need to dismiss the assessment. by Judge Ann L. Aiken (lae)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008, Terminated: 7/8/2008 Motion for Order
    Motion for Order dismissing $300.00 special assessment fee by Michael Steven West. (sln)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 126 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
      Record of Order: Denying defendant's motion to suspend $300 special assessment until release [125] as to Michael Steven West. by Judge Ann L. Aiken (lae)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006, Terminated: 10/26/2006 Motion for Order
        Motion to suspend $300.00 special assessment fee until release by Michael Steven West. (sln)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Order on Motion to Vacate or Correct Sentence (225Court Filing
          ORDER Denying [118] Motion to Vacate or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Michael Steven West (1); Denying as moot [121] Motion to seal evidence as to Michael Steven West (1) by Judge Ann L. Aiken signed on 5/25/05. (sln, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 reply to motion
            Reply to Response to Motion by Michael Steven West regarding Motion to Vacate or Correct Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 [118] (sln, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Memorandum in Support
              Additional Gournds in Support of Motion by Michael Steven West regarding Motion to Vacate or Correct Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 [118] filed by Michael Steven West, (sln, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Motion for Order
                Motion to seal evidence from government inspection until hearing and trial by Michael Steven West. (sln, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Response to Motion
                  Response to Motion by USA regarding Motion to Vacate or Correct Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 [118] filed by Michael Steven West, (sln, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                    Order government shall answer or otherwise respond to Motion to Vacate or Correct Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 [118] filed by Michael Steven West within 20 days from service of this order; Defendant within 10 days thereafter may file a reply by Judge Ann L. Aiken signed on 2/17/05. (sln, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005, Terminated: 5/26/2005 Motion to Vacate or Correct Sentence (2255)
                      Motion to Vacate or Correct Sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 ( Civil Action 05-6041-AA.) by Michael Steven West. (sln, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 101 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?