NIXON v. BARNHARDT

Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:02-cv-02922-TJS
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo John Nixon, Plaintiff

Represented by mickeyandmoran.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CAROL A. MICKEY +1 215 423 3900 +1 215 423 3901 carol.mickey@mickeyandmoran.net
v.
No Logo JOANNE B. BARNHARDT, Defendant

Represented by United States Small Business Administration

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space NICHOLAS R. CERULLI +1 215 597 1862 nicholas.cerulli@ssa.gov
Space PATRICIA ANNE STEWART +1 215 597 1854 patricia.a.stewart@ssa.gov
Attributes
Office Philadelphia
Filed 5/16/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 865 - Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County Philadelphia
Terminated 7/22/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, SOCIALSECURITY
Timeline
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
ORDER THAT THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED; DEFENDANT COMMISSIONER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED; THE FINAL DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY IS REVERSED AND THE MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE COMMISSIONER FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS, ETC.SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/21/03. 7/22/03 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(cdd, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003, Terminated: 7/22/2003 Report and Recommendations
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DIANE M. WELSH THAT THAT THE CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BE DENIED AND THAT THE CASE BE REMANDED TO THE COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, ETC.OBJECTIONS TO R&R DUE BY 6/12/2003SIGNED BY JUDGE DIANE M. WELSH ON 5/28/03. 5/28/03 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(cdd, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HON. DIANE M. WELSH, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION.SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/2/03. 1/3/03 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(cdd, )
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002, Terminated: 7/22/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY JOANNE B. BARNHARDT, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(cdd, )
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/26/2002, Terminated: 7/22/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY JOHN NIXON, BRIEF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(cdd, )
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002 Affidavit of Service
AFFIDAVIT of Service by U.S. Marshal Service re: attempted service upon JO ANNE B. BARNHART due to plaintiff proceeding in forma pauperis; service unexecuted. (cdd, )
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/27/2002 Order
ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS HEREBY EXTENDED FOR SIXTY (60) DAYS UP TO AND INCLUDING 11/26/02. SIGNED BY JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/26/02. 9/27/02 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(cdd, )
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002, Terminated: 9/26/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
PLAINTIFF'S UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(ajf, )
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 Order Reassigning Case
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HON. CLIFFORD SCOTT GREEN TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HON. TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 9/11/02. 9/11/02 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(cdd, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Answer
Answer to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by DEFENDANT JOANNE B. BARNHARDT, Certificate of Service.(fh)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Issue Joined
Issue Joined.(fh)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Social Security Administrative Record
Social Security Administrative Record. (fh)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Order Setting Answer Deadline
ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED FOR 30 DAYS UP TO AND INCLUDING 8/15/2002.SIGNED BY JUDGE CLIFFORD SCOTT GREEN ON 7/19/02. 7/19/02 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(cdd, )
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
UNCONTESTED MOTION filed by JOANNE B. BARNHARDT [dft] FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, CERTIFICATE OF UNCONTESTED MOTION, CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL. (cdd, )
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/20/2002 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: Gregory A. Jeblonski accepted summons and complaint on behalf of DEFENDANT JOANNE B. BARNHARDT on 5/20/2002, answer due 7/19/2002. (cdd, )
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Procedural Order
Procedural Order 5/16/02 Entered and copies mailed. (ti, )
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002, Terminated: 7/22/2003 Complaint
COMPLAINT against JOANNE B. BARNHARDT ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 791210.), filed by JOHN NIXON .(ti, )
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to JOANNE B. BARNHARDT Two mailed to Counsel, One given to AUSA 5/16/02 . (ti, )
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 28 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?