MITCHELL v. OBENSKI et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:02-cv-03717-JP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gregory Mitchell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MILTON S. SAVAGE, JR. +1 215 732 5077 ms2@msn.com
v.
No Logo EDWARD OBENSKI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Travelers Indemnity Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID PETER KARAMESSINIS +1 267 675 3028 dkarames@stpaultravelers.com
No Logo Matthew Gale, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Travelers Indemnity Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID PETER KARAMESSINIS +1 267 675 3028 dkarames@stpaultravelers.com
Office Philadelphia
Filed 6/12/2002
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981 Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Outside the State of PA.
Terminated 3/8/2006
Origin 4
Reopened 3/1/2006
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, STANDARD
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Judgment*
JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS EDWARD OBENSKI, MATTHEW GALE AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF GREGORY MITCHELL IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,082.46; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 5/24/06. 5/30/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 5/31/2006 (jl, ).
    LREF
    Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Costs Taxed
    Clerk's Taxation of Costs. 5/30/06 Entered. Copies e-mailed. (jl, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Order
      ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT MAY CLOSE THIS MATTER STATISTICALLY; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/7/06. 3/8/06 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Order Reassigning Case
        ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDER OF THE LATE HONORABLE CHARLES WEINER TO THE CALENDER OF THE HONORABLE JOHN PADOVA; ETC.. SIGNED BY MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 2/9/06. 2/9/06 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 USCA Order
          ORDER of USCA as to [19] Notice of Appeal filed by EDWARD OBENSKI,, MATTHEW GALE, ORDERED AND ADJUDGED BY THIS COURT THAT THE ORDER OF THE DISTRICT COURT ENTERED 9/9/04, BE AND THE SAME IS HEREBY REVERSED AND THE CASE REMANDED WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO GRANT APPELLANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. COSTS TAXED AGAINST APPELLEE. ALL OF THE ABOVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OPINION OF THIS COURT; ETC. (jl, )
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Certified Copy of Order
            Copy of Order from USCA that the certified judgment issued in lieu of formal mandate on 7/20/05, is recalled as it contained an error with respect to the taxation of costs. A corrected mandate will be issued. (sc, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005, Terminated: 9/1/2005 Motion for Bill of Costs
              Objection to Bill of Costs filed by GREGORY MITCHELL.Certificate of Service.(SAVAGE, MILTON) Modified on 9/2/2005 (np).
                LREF
                Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005, Terminated: 5/30/2006 Bill of Costs
                BILL OF COSTS by EDWARD OBENSKI, MATTHEW GALE. (Attachments: # (1) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE# (2) Copies of Bills and Affidavit)(KARAMESSINIS, DAVID) Modified on 5/30/2006 (le, ).
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Order
                ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF THE DEFENDANTS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED; JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF.. SIGNED BY JUDGE CHARLES R. WEINER ON 8/12/05. 8/16/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(afm, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Order
                  ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF THE DEFENDANTS FOR LEAVE TO FILE IS DENIED AS MOOT; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE CHARLES R. WEINER ON 10/28/04. 10/28/04 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                    NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re [19] Notice of Appeal filed by EDWARD OBENSKI, MATTHEW GALE. USCA Case Number 04-3730 (lvj, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004, Terminated: 1/24/2006 Clerks Notice to USCA
                      Clerk's Notice to USCA re [19] Notice of Appeal: (jl, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004, Terminated: 1/24/2006 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by MATTHEW GALE, EDWARD OBENSKI. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 908932. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and DAVID P. KARAMESSINIS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jl, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                          ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED; ETC. . SIGNED BY JUDGE CHARLES R. WEINER ON 9/7/04.9/9/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(jl, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Order
                            ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFF MAY ALSO FILE A REPLY IF HE FEELS IT IS NECESSARY WITHIN 10 DAYS; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE CHARLES R. WEINER ON 5/18/04. 5/18/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(jl, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Response in Opposition to Motion
                              GREGORY MITCHELL MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF FILED BY DEFENDANTS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jl, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004, Terminated: 10/28/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by DEFENDANTS' MATTHEW GALE, EDWARD OBENSKI, Memorandum of Law in Support, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of their Motion for Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment)(KARAMESSINIS, DAVID) Modified on 4/30/2004 (fh)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Response to Motion
                                  GREGORY MITCHELL RESPONSE TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY THE DEFENDANT CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jl, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2004 (mar, ).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004, Terminated: 9/9/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MATTHEW GALE, EDWARD OBENSKI.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits for Motion for Summary Judgment)(KARAMESSINIS, DAVID)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Scheduling Order
                                    STIPULATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/27/2004. MOTIONS DUE BY 4/23/2004. A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL LISTING SHALL BE SCHEDULED AFTER THE RESOLUTION OF ANY DISPOSITVE MOTIONS.SIGNED BY JUDGE CHARLES R. WEINER ON 2/27/04. 2/27/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(stb, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Order Dismissing Case
                                      ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-ENTITLED MATTER IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CASE IS TO REMAIN IN STATUS QUO & THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS IS TOLLED. THIS MATTER REMAINS ACTIVE, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE CHARLES R. WEINER ON 1/9/03. 1/13/03 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(kw, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Terminated Case
                                        ***Civil Case Terminated. (kv, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Order
                                          ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MAY SERVE DEFENDANT, RHONDA MORRIS BY DELIVERING THE COMPLAINTS TO THE DEFENDANT'S EMPLOYER BY FIRST CLASS MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PERIOD OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT IS ENLARGED BY 45 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE CHARLES R. WEINER ON 11/21/02. 11/25/02 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(jl, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Order on Motion to Sever
                                            ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS OBENSKI AND GALE'S MOTION TO SEVER THEIR CLAIMS FROM THOSE AGAINST DEFENDANT MORRIS IS GRANTED AND THAT ALL CLAIMS BY GREGORY MITCHELL AGAINST RHONDA MORRIS ARE SEVERED FROM CASE NUMBER: 02-CV-3717; ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE CHARLES R. WEINER ON 11/21/02.11/25/02 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (jl, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Order
                                              PRETRIAL REPORT AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT WILL SET A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON 2/10/03 AT 10:00; ETC... SIGNED BY JUDGE CHARLES R. WEINER ON 11/22/02. 11/22/02 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED BY CHAMBERS.(jl, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002, Terminated: 11/22/2002 ~Motion to Sever
                                                MATTHEW GALE, EDWARD OBENSKI MOTION TO SEVER THE CLAIM AGAINST RHONDA MORRIS PER FED.R. CIV.P.21, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE..(jl, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                  MATTHEW GALE, EDWARD OBENSKI ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(jl, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2002 (mc, ).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Order
                                                    ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MAY SERVE DEFENDANT, RHONDA MORRIS BY DELIVERING THE COMPLAINTS TO THE DEFENDANT'S EMPLOYER BY FIRST CLASS MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED. IT IS FURHTER ORDERED THAT THE PERIOD OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT IS ENLARGED BY 45 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; ETC. . SIGNED BY JUDGE CHARLES R. WEINER ON 9/25/02. 9/26/02 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(jl, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002 Application/Petition
                                                      PLAINTIFF PETITION TO SERVE COMPLAINTS BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL TO DEFENDANT'S EMPLOYER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jl, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GREGORY MITCHELL. MATTHEW GALE waiver sent on 9/5/2002, answer due 11/4/2002; EDWARD OBENSKI waiver sent on 9/5/2002, answer due 11/4/2002. (jl, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 7/5/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against MATTHEW GALE [dft], RHONDA MORRIS [dft], EDWARD OBENSKI [dft], filed by GREGORY MITCHELL [pla], jury demand.(jl, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/5/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 Summons Issued
                                                            3 Summons Issued as to MATTHEW GALE [dft], RHONDA MORRIS [dft], EDWARD OBENSKI [dft]. (jl, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT against MATTHEW GALE [dft], RHONDA MORRIS [dft], EDWARD OBENSKI [dft] ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 793326.), filed by GREGORY MITCHELL [pla].(ss, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Jury Demand
                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GREGORY MITCHELL [pla]. (ss, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Summons Issued
                                                                  Summons Issued 6/12/02 as to MATTHEW GALE [dft], RHONDA MORRIS [dft], EDWARD OBENSKI [dft]. (ss, )
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?