UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PENNSYLVANIA INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:02-cv-04038-CRW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 12:56 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by Pennsylvania Board of Probation & Parole

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SUSAN SHINKMAN +1 717 787 9348 +1 717 787 1788 sshinkman@state.pa.us

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah N Behles +1 202 514 2463 +1 202 616 6583 deborah.behles@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo PENNSYLVANIA INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN M. WHITLOCK +1 717 783 8452
No Logo PIDC FINANCING CORPORATION, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PHILIP BRANDT
Office Philadelphia
Filed 6/24/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 9604 Comprehensive Envir. Comp. & Liab. Act (CERCLA)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County Philadelphia
Terminated 10/11/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, STANDARD
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 Order
ORDER, CONSENT DECREE WITH COURT APPROVAL. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CHARLES R. WEINER ON 10/11/02.) 10/15/02 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(gn, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Terminated Case
    ***Civil Case Terminated. (kv, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA [pla] re [2] Notice (Other) of Motion to Enter Consent Decree (SHINKMAN, SUSAN)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA [pla] (ss, )
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Complaint
          COMPLAINT against PENNSYLVANIA INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY [dft], PIDC FINANCING CORPORATION [dft] , filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA [pla].(ss, )
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 38 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?