SMITH v. BAYER CORPORATION et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:02-cv-04503-CN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Nathaniel Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Weitz & Luxenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry M Kristal +1 856 755 1115 +1 856 755 1995 jkristal@weitzlux.com
v.
Bayer AG Bayer AG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles F Forer +1 215 851 8400 +1 215 851 8383 cforer@eckertseamans.com
Bayer Corporation Bayer Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott LLC

GlaxoSmithKline PLC GlaxoSmithKline PLC, Defendant
Officer/Director, Epix Medical, Inc.
Officer/Director, ADVANCED MEDICINE, INC.
Officer/Director, Affymetrix, Inc.
Officer/Director, Maxygen, Inc.
Officer/Director, Robcor Properties Inc
Officer/Director, Chemocentryx, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amicus Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Human Genome Sciences, Inc.
Officer/Director, Nupathe, Inc.
Officer/Director, Genocea Biosciences, Inc.
Officer/Director, Theravance Biopharma, Inc.
Officer/Director, Crispr Therapeutics Ag
Officer/Director, Spero Therapeutics, LLC
Officer/Director, Liquidia Technologies, Inc.
Officer/Director, Principia Biopharma, Inc.
Officer/Director, Rana Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Tp Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bicycle Therapeutics Ltd.
Officer/Director, Morphic Holding, LLC
Officer/Director, Fulcrum Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Auxogyn, Inc.
Officer/Director, Nkarta, Inc.
Officer/Director, Response Genetics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Aileron Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Orchard Rx Ltd
Officer/Director, Decibel Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Lyell Immunopharma, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ERIN BRENNAN +1 215 994 4000
Space Hope S. Freiwald +1 215 994 4000 +1 215 994 2222 hope.freiwald@dechert.com
Space KIRSTIN MILLER MAZZEO +1 215 994 2701 kirstin.miller@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ALINE FAIRWEATHER +1 215 981 4807 fairweathera@pepperlaw.com
No Logo Smithkline Beecham, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ERIN BRENNAN +1 215 994 4000
Space Hope S. Freiwald +1 215 994 4000 +1 215 994 2222 hope.freiwald@dechert.com
Space KIRSTIN MILLER MAZZEO +1 215 994 2701 kirstin.miller@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ALINE FAIRWEATHER +1 215 981 4807 fairweathera@pepperlaw.com
Office Philadelphia
Filed 7/9/2002
Jury Demand Both
Demand $20000000
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County Outside the State of PA.
Terminated 3/14/2003
Origin 4
Reopened 3/13/2003
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, SPECIAL
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Case Transferred Out
Original record together with certified copy of docket entries forwarded to District of MINNESOTA. (mc, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Terminated Case
    ***Civil Case Terminated. (nt, )
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Certified Copy of Order
      Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-21) that this case is transferred to the District of Minnesota. (tj, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Response
        ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BAYER AG WITH JURY DEMAND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Response
          ANSWER AND DEFENSES by BAYER CORPORATION WITH JURY DEMAND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (jpd)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Jury Demand
            DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BAYER AG. (jpd, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Jury Demand
              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BAYER CORPORATION. (jpd, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN BRENNAN, ALINE FAIRWEATHER, HOPE S. FREIWALD, KIRSTIN J. MILLER on behalf of SMITHKLINE BEECHAM (tj, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer
                  Stipulation Extending Time to Answer the complaint. BAYER CORPORATION answer due 10/10/2002, with Clerk's approval. (jpd, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2002 (mc, ).
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed. Personal service by Marty Gabe. Served upon Kathy Allen on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE and SMITHKLINE BEECHAM served on 8/21/2002, answer due 9/10/2002. (er, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Summons Returned Executed
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed. Personal service by Marty Gabe. Served upon Nancy Armstrong on behalf of BAYER CORPORATION served on 8/21/2002, answer due 9/10/2002. (er, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by KIRSTIN J. MILLER, ALINE FAIRWEATHER, ERIN BRENNAN, HOPE S. FREIWALD on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE, PLC (ti, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 Affidavit of Service
                          AFFIDAVIT of Service by David Gunther re: served summons and complaint upon Bayer AG by registered mail return receipt on (no return receipt attached) (er, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Affidavit of Service
                            AFFIDAVIT of Service by David Gunther re: served summons and complaint upon Glaxosmithkline, PLC by registered mail return receipt on (no return receipt attached) (er, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Suspense Order
                              ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE. (SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER) ON 07/31/02; 08/01/02 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(np) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2002 (vw, ).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 795430.), filed by NATHANIEL SMITH [pla].(iy, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Jury Demand
                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NATHANIEL SMITH [pla]. (iy, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Summons Issued
                                    Summons Issued; 5 given to counsel, 07/10/02. (iy, )
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 54 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?