Tuggle v. Apfel
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Middle District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-01330-WWC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo William J. Tuggle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by North Penn Legal Service

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garry E. Wamser +1 570 784 8760 +7844 784 784 4840 gwamser@northpennlegal.org
v.
No Logo Kenneth Apfel, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Harrisburg
Filed 7/27/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 862 - Social Security: Black Lung
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County Luzerne
Terminated 5/1/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, HHS, TRANSFER
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Malachy E. Mannion granting motion to remand case to a different administrative law Judge [15-1] Case terminated (cc: all counsel, OHA, Reinhart, info copy Judge Caldwell) (bs)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001, Terminated: 5/1/2001 Motion to RemandCourt Filing
    MOTION by defendant Kenneth Apfel to remand case to administrative law Judge with certif-con and c/s. (ts)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Malachy E. Mannion granting deft's motion to extend time within which to file a brief to and including April 27, 2001 [13-1] (cc: all counsel court) (bs)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001, Terminated: 3/29/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
        MOTION by plaintiff William J. Tuggle to extend time within which to file a brief to and including April 27, 2001 with c/s. (ts)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001 Document Filed
          BRIEF FILED by plaintiff William J. Tuggle regarding complaint [1-1] with c/s. (ts)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Malachy E. Mannion granting motion to extend time to file brief [10-1]. Brief is due on or before 2/20/01. (cc: all counsel court) (bs)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001, Terminated: 1/25/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
              MOTION by plaintiff William J. Tuggle to extend time to file brief w/ Cert. of Concurrence, C of S and prop. order. (ps)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                ORDER by Chief Judge Thomas I. Vanaskie Case referred to Magistrate Judge Malachy E. Mannion (cc: all counsel court) (admin)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Answer
                  ANSWER WITH ATTACHED TRANSCRIPT by defendant Kenneth Apfel; with c/s. (ts)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Mag. Judge Raymond J. Durkin granting motion to extend time to answer from October 10, 2000 to December 11, 2000 [6-1] for Kenneth Apfel (cc: all counsel court) (sm)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000, Terminated: 10/23/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                      MOTION by defendant Kenneth Apfel to extend time to answer from October 10, 2000 to December 11, 2000 with certif-con and c/s. (ts)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Kenneth Apfel 8/16/00; US Atty Scranton, The Attorney General (ts)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Mag. Judge Raymond J. Durkin granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis [2-1] Process shall issue. (cc: all counsel court) (ts)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/9/2000 Summons Issued
                            SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Kenneth Apfel and forwarded to US Marshal for service (ts)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Procedural Order (Social Security Case)Court Filing
                              PROCEDURAL ORDER and referral of case to Mag. Judge Raymond J. Durkin (cc: all counsel court) (rm)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000, Terminated: 8/9/2000 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                MOTION by plaintiff William J. Tuggle to proceed in forma pauperis . (rm)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT - social security appeal. (rm)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?