Banks-Bennett v. Ingram Micro U.S., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Middle District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-01241-YK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Shirley A. Banks-Bennett, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Bill Munley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Thomas and Hafer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Dellasega +1 717 255 7602 pdellasega@tthlaw.com
Ingram Micro Ingram Micro, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ingram Micro U.S."

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Thomas and Hafer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Dellasega +1 717 255 7602 pdellasega@tthlaw.com
No Logo Ken Goodwin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Thomas and Hafer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Dellasega +1 717 255 7602 pdellasega@tthlaw.com
Office Harrisburg
Filed 7/3/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Dauphin
Terminated 12/7/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, HBG, STANDARD
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - And now, this 7th day of December, 2004, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1) Deft's Mot for Summary Judgmnt (Doc. No. 33) is GRANTED. 2) Pltf's Mot for Summary Judgmnt (Doc. No. 40) is DENIED; and 3) Dft's Mot to Strike (Doc. No. 43) is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the file. See Order for more details.Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on December 7, 2004 (kjn )
    LREF
    Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Notice
    NOTICE to Court by Shirley A. Banks-Bennett. (aaa)
      LREF
      Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Pretrial Memorandum
      PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Shirley A. Banks-Bennett. (aaa)
        LREF
        Legal Document 49 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Order Cancelling DeadlineCourt Filing
        ORDER IT IS ORDERED THAT the P/T/C set for 5/25/04 at 10:00 a.m. and jury selection set for 6/7/04, are cancelled, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case is stayed pending resolution of pltf's and defts' mtns for S/J.Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on 5/21/04. (jc)
          LREF
          Legal Document 48 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Pretrial Memorandum
          PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Ingram Micro U.S.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s))(Dellasega, Paul)
            LREF
            Legal Document 47 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the [29] Case Management Order issued on 7/30/03 is AMENDED as follows: the PTC scheduled for 5/25/04 at 10:00am will be held by telephone conference. The Court will initiate the call. Pltf and cnsl for dft are directed to contact the court at 717-221-3990 on or before 5/21/04 with phone numbers where they can be reached on the day of the conference. Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on May 10, 2004. (sc)
              LREF
              Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Letter
              LETTER - from pltf to Court re: Peter Hoffman's social security number. (jc)
                LREF
                Legal Document 45 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Reply Brief
                REPLY BRIEF re [33] MOTION for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to our Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ken Goodwin, Ingram Micro U.S., Bill Munley, Vicki Smith. (Dellasega, Paul)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Docket Annotation
                  Deleted Doc. #42, efiled on 3/19/04, Entitled, "Brief in Support, and REFILED on 3/22/04 as "Reply Brief", efiled on 3/22/04 as Doc. #45. (am)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Brief in SupportCourt Filing
                    BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [43] MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement" and "Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment" filed by Ken Goodwin, Ingram Micro U.S., Bill Munley, Vicki Smith. Brief in Opposition due by 4/6/2004 (Dellasega, Paul)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004, Terminated: 12/7/2004 Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                      MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement" and "Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment" by Ken Goodwin, Ingram Micro U.S., Bill Munley, Vicki Smith. (Attachments: # (1))(Dellasega, Paul)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Brief in Support
                        BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [40] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by pltf Shirley A. Banks-Bennett. Brief in Opposition due by 4/2/2004 (vg, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by pltf Shirley A. Banks-Bennett. C/S(vg, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Brief in Opposition
                            BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re [33] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shirley A. Banks-Bennett. Reply Brief due by 4/1/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) C/S)(vg, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                              ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the clerk of ct shall provide pltf with a signed, but otherwise blank, subpoena with which pltf may serve Peter Hoffman. [30] See order.Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on March 12, 2004. (sc)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Reply Brief
                                REPLY BRIEF re [30] MOTION for leave of Court to issue subpoena filed by Ken Goodwin, Ingram Micro U.S., Bill Munley, Vicki Smith. (Dellasega, Paul)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Reply (Do not use this event if your document is a
                                  REPLY by Shirley A. Banks-Bennett to [32] Order. Shirley A. Banks-Bennett requests subpoena for Mr. Peter Hoffman to provide testimony at trial. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s))(vg, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 Exhibit
                                    EXHIBIT(s) by dfts Ken Goodwin, Ingram Micro U.S., Bill Munley, re: motion for summary judgment. C/S (vg, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Brief in SupportCourt Filing
                                      BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [33] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ken Goodwin, Ingram Micro U.S., Bill Munley, Vicki Smith. Brief in Opposition due by 3/19/2004 (Dellasega, Paul) Modified on 3/2/2004 (vg, ). (voluminous - original to Judge)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004, Terminated: 12/7/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ken Goodwin, Ingram Micro U.S., Bill Munley, Vicki Smith.(Dellasega, Paul)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER Before this Court is pltf's mtn to subpoena Peter Hoffman. [30] Plaintiff, proceeding pro se, has not clearly stated the purpose for which she moves to subpoena Mr. Hoffman. It is unclear whether pltf seeks to subpoena him for depo or for testimony at trial. The Court cannot rule on this mtn w/out more information from pltf. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED THAT w/in 10 days of this order, pltf shall notify the Court of the purpose for which she moves to subpoena Mr. Hoffman. Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on 3/1/04. (jc)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Brief in Support
                                            BRIEF IN SUPPORT re [30] MOTION for leave of Court to issue subpoena filed by pltf Shirley A. Banks-Bennett ; C/S Brief in Opposition due by 9/8/2003 (Attachments: # (1) Subpoena and Letter)(vg, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              MOTION for leave of Court to issue subpoena by pltf Shirley A. Banks-Bennett. (Attachments: # (1) Subpoena and Letter)(vg, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Case Management Order - Standard TrackCourt Filing
                                              ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK Discovery due by 12/31/2003. Jury Selection set for 6/7/2004 09:30 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom #4 before Honorable Yvette Kane. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2004 09:30 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom #4 before Honorable Yvette Kane. Pretrial Memos due by 5/21/2004. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2004 10:00 AM before Honorable Yvette Kane. Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on 7/30/03. (jk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (doc 18), Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (doc 23), Plaintiff's Motion for leave to amend motion for summary judgment and Plaintiff's Request for Leave to Amend Motion for summary judgment are DEEMED WITHDRAWN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. as moot. [18] [20] [23] [25] Signed by Judge Yvette Kane on 7/22/03 (jk, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Request
                                                  REQUEST for leave to amd mtn and br in support for sum jgm by Shirley A. Banks-Bennett; C/S (vg, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Brief in Support
                                                    BRIEF by plaintiff Shirley A. Banks-Bennett IN SUPPORT of motion for leave to amend mtn for s/j [25-1]; C/S. (vg)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                      MOTION by plaintiff Shirley A. Banks-Bennett for leave to amend mtn for s/j ; C/S. (vg)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Brief in Support
                                                        BRIEF by plaintiff Shirley A. Banks-Bennett IN SUPPORT of motion for summary judgment [23-1]; C/S. (vg)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                          MOTION by plaintiff Shirley A. Banks-Bennett for summary judgment ; C/S. (vg)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/25/2002 Document Filed
                                                            DOCUMENT - labelled: Answer Pro Se Plaintiff; with c/s. (sc)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Brief in Support
                                                              BRIEF by dft IN SUPPORT of mtn to strike pltf's Mtn for Summary Jgm [20-1]; with c/s. (sc)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Motion to Strike
                                                                MOTION by dfts to strike pltf's Mtn for Summary Jgm ; with c/s and propo. (sc)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Brief in Support
                                                                  BRIEF by pltf Shirley A. Banks-Bennett IN SUPPORT of mtn for summary judgment [18-1]; with c/s. (sc)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                    MOTION by pltf Shirley A. Banks-Bennett for summary judgment ; with c/s. (sc)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Answer
                                                                      ANSWER by defendants to pltf's complaint and c of s. (jc)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Add and Terminate PartiesCourt Filing
                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: by Judge Yvette Kane - IT IS ORDERED THAT Dfts' motion to dismiss be GRANTED as to dft Vicki Smith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the remainder of Dfts' motion be DENIED as moot. Furthermore, the Clerk of Court is ORDERED to deliver a copy of this order, along w/ a copy of Pltf's responses to the 6/19/02 order to the Dfts. [5-1] terminating party Vicki Smith (cc: all counsel, court) (jk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Document Filed
                                                                          DOCUMENT captioned "Brief In Support Of Motion" by Pltf Shirley Banks-Bennett. (vg)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Document Filed
                                                                            DOCUMENT filed by Pltf Shirley Banks-Bennett. (vg)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER by Judge Yvette Kane: IT IS ORDERED THAT the motion to dismiss is GRANTED w/ leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file an amended complaint containing a more definite statement of her claims. Should plaintiff fail to do so in the allotted time, the Court will direct the Clerk of Court to close the file. [11-1] (cc: all counsel, court) (jk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Brief in Support
                                                                                BRIEF by plaintiff Shirley A. Banks-Bennett IN SUPPORT of motion opposing mtn to dismiss filed by deft Ingram Micro US [11-1]; C/S (pm)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff Shirley A. Banks-Bennett opposing mtn to dismiss viled by deft Ingram Micro US ;C/S (pm)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Yvette Kane - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1)The provisional appointment of counsel for pltf is REVOKED. 2)Pltf shall file a response to defendants pending motion to dismiss w/in 30 days from the date of this order. 3)Dfts shall have 10 days thereafter to file a reply brief. (cc: all counsel, court) (jk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Letter
                                                                                      LETTER to court from Charles Rubendall, Esq. informing the Court that no volunteer attorney will be provided by the FBA. (jk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Yvette Kane - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1)In acc w/ this Court's Pro Bono Atty Program, Pltf's mtn for apptcnsl is GRANTED CONDITIONALLY. If cnsl cannot be found to represent Pltf, the conditional order for apptcnsl will be revoked. See order. [4-1] (cc: cnsl, ct, Chip Rubendall, Esq.) (sc)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Letter
                                                                                          LETTER to court from plaintiff regarding pro bono atty to assist in above case. (pm)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Brief in Support
                                                                                            BRIEF by Dfts., Ingram Micro U.S., Ken Goodwin, Vicki Smith, Bill Munley IN SUPPORT of motion to dismiss complt [5-1]; C/S. (vg)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                              MOTION by Dfts., Ingram Micro U.S., Ken Goodwin, Vicki Smith, Bill Munley to dismiss complt ; C/S. (vg)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff for appointment of counsel with proposed order and c of s. (jc)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Bill Munley 7/6/01 by cert mail w/ green card attached and David Kozemchak 7/6/01, Elizabeth Shuster 7/5/01, Marie Tomasso 7/5/01 & Paul Dellasega 7/5/01 by cert mail. (pm)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Ken Goodwin 7/5/01 by cert mail with green receipt card attached. (pm)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE unexecuted - attempted as to defendant Vicki - Smith -no longer with company Ingram Micro U.S. (pm)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Standing Practice Order ORDER by all Judges informing the parties to this action of their briefing and other responsibilities pursuant to LR 7.1 through 7.8 and 7.10, LR 26.4 and 56.1, and FRCP 56. (cc: pltf, court) (mc)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - No jury demanded. N/C to pltf. Receipt #: 111 134243 Amt: $150.00 (mc)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                                                            SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants, Ingram Micro U.S., Ken Goodwin, Ingram Micro Branch #80 General Manager, Vicki Smith, Senior Human Resource Generalist and Bill Munley, Manager at Shipping Dept. (mc)
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 195 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?